Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. et al v. Phanteks Europe et al
Plaintiff: Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. and Chien-Hao Chen
Defendant: Phanteks Europe, Axpertec Inc. and Phanteks USA
Case Number: 2:2023cv07471
Filed: September 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Referring Judge: Hernan D Vera
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Axpertec Inc., Phanteks Europe, identifying Che-Sheng Tang. (Attorney Ming-Tao Yang added to party Phanteks Europe(pty:dft))(Yang, Ming-Tao)
November 6, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
November 2, 2023 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Axpertec Inc..(Attorney Ming-Tao Yang added to party Axpertec Inc.(pty:dft))(Yang, Ming-Tao)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (lom)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:23-cv-07470HDV(MARx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue and Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Hernan D. Vera and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-07471 HDV(MARx). Signed by Judge Hernan D. Vera (rn)
October 18, 2023 Filing 17 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Phanteks Europe answer now due 11/20/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 filed by Plaintiffs Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.; Chien-Hao Chen.(Chen, Kyle)
October 4, 2023 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd., Chien-Hao Chen, upon Defendant Phanteks Europe served on 9/29/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Axpertec International B.V. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified (Chen, Kyle)
October 3, 2023 Filing 15 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Axpertec Inc. answer now due 11/2/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.; Chien-Hao Chen.(Means, Samuel)
September 21, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark R Weinstein on behalf of Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. (Weinstein, Mark)
September 14, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
September 14, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Samuel C Means on behalf of Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. (Means, Samuel)
September 13, 2023 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd., Chien-Hao Chen, upon Defendant Axpertec Inc. served on 9/12/2023, answer due 10/3/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CHE SHENG TANG - REGISTERED AGENT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Chen, Kyle)
September 12, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Spencer Bloch on behalf of Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. (Bloch, David)
September 12, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Axpertec Inc., Phanteks Europe. (ghap)
September 12, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
September 12, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 12, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap)
September 8, 2023 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Chen, Kyle)
September 8, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Chen, Kyle)
September 8, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. (Chen, Kyle)
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Chien-Hao Chen, Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Chen, Kyle)
September 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36007786 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd., Chien-Hao Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Kyle Dakai Chen added to party Chien-Hao Chen(pty:pla), Attorney Kyle Dakai Chen added to party Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.(pty:pla))(Chen, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd. et al v. Phanteks Europe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lian Li Industrial Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kyle Dakai Chen
Represented By: David Spencer Bloch
Represented By: Mark R Weinstein
Represented By: Samuel C Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chien-Hao Chen
Represented By: Kyle Dakai Chen
Represented By: David Spencer Bloch
Represented By: Mark R Weinstein
Represented By: Samuel C Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phanteks Europe
Represented By: Ming-Tao Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axpertec Inc.
Represented By: Ming-Tao Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phanteks USA
Represented By: Ming-Tao Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?