Linda Moore v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Linda Moore
Defendant: General Motors LLC, AM General LLC and Does 1 to 50
Interested Party: PM General Purchaser, LLC, PM General Midco LLC and PM General Topco, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv07631
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2023 Filing 12 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
September 22, 2023 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 20, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, identifying General Motors Holdings LLC, Sole Member of GM LLC and General Motors Company, Sole member of GM Holdings LLC. (Bush, Tamara)
September 15, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
September 15, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 15, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap)
September 13, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Linda Moore, upon Defendant AM General LLC served on 8/16/2023, answer due 9/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT-Corporation System-Patrick Jones in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/1/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT J) (ghap)
September 13, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants AM General LLC, Does 1 to 50, General Motors LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Linda Moore. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/17/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT E) (ghap)
September 13, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants AM General LLC, General Motors LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT K)(ghap)
September 13, 2023 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, identifying General Motors LLC. (Bush, Tamara)
September 13, 2023 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AM General LLC, identifying AM General LLC. (Attorney Tamara A. Bush added to party AM General LLC(pty:dft))(Bush, Tamara)
September 13, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Bush, Tamara)
September 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court - Long Beach, case number 23LBCV01334 Receipt No: ACACDC-36035347 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Declaration) (Attorney Tamara A. Bush added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft))(Bush, Tamara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linda Moore v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Moore
Represented By: Ronald Allen Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Tamara A. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM General LLC
Represented By: Tamara A. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PM General Purchaser, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PM General Midco LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PM General Topco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?