Molly Tracy et al v. John H. Morris et al
Plaintiff: Molly Tracy and Tramor Properties, Inc.
Defendant: John H Morris and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2023cv08022
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
November 21, 2023 Filing 29 Withdrawal of Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule (DKT 27) for Defendant John Morris's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Molly Tracy re: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #27 (Macaulay, Brendan)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-121) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, this case is transferred from Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong to the calendar of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-08022-KK-RAOx. (rn)
November 15, 2023 Filing 27 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Plaintiff Molly Tracy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Macaulay, Brendan)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF No. #23 ) by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from February 8, 2024 to February 22, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 10, 2023 Filing 25 DECLARATION of John W. Baumann re Request for Judicial Notice #24 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Defendant John H Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Tayback, Christopher)
November 10, 2023 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Defendant John H Morris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tayback, Christopher)
November 10, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant John H Morris. Motion set for hearing on 2/8/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tayback, Christopher)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 12/28/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (dbe)
October 26, 2023 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Tramor Properties, Inc. (Garber, Steven)
October 26, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Nominal Defendant Tramor Properties, Inc., identifying John H. Morris/John H. Morris Trust; Thomas K. Tracy/Thomas K. Tracy Family Trust; Michael S. Tracy/Michael S. Tracy Trust; Marisa Prasifka; Tramor Properties, Inc.; Molly Tracy/Molly Veronica Tracy Trust. (Garber, Steven)
October 26, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Nominal Defendant Tramor Properties, Inc..(Attorney Steven M Garber added to party Tramor Properties, Inc.(pty:dft))(Garber, Steven)
October 25, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sean Taheri on behalf of Defendant John H Morris (Attorney Sean Taheri added to party John H Morris(pty:dft))(Taheri, Sean)
October 25, 2023 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to John H Morris answer now due 11/10/2023, filed by Defendant John H Morris.(Tayback, Christopher)
October 25, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John Wall Baumann on behalf of Defendant John H Morris (Attorney John Wall Baumann added to party John H Morris(pty:dft))(Baumann, John)
October 25, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph C Sarles on behalf of Defendant John H Morris (Attorney Joseph C Sarles added to party John H Morris(pty:dft))(Sarles, Joseph)
October 25, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher Tayback on behalf of Defendant John H Morris (Attorney Christopher Tayback added to party John H Morris(pty:dft))(Tayback, Christopher)
October 11, 2023 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 6, 2023 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Molly Tracy, upon Defendant Tramor Properties, Inc. served on 10/5/2023, answer due 10/26/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process for Nominal Defendant Tramor Properties, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Macaulay, Brendan)
October 5, 2023 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Molly Tracy, upon Defendant John H Morris served on 10/5/2023, answer due 10/26/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Named Defendant John H. Morris in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Macaulay, Brendan)
October 3, 2023 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants John H Morris and Tramor Properties, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Tramor Properties, Inc.) (jtil)
October 3, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
October 3, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 3, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
September 25, 2023 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Molly Tracy. (Macaulay, Brendan)
September 25, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Molly Tracy. (Macaulay, Brendan)
September 25, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Molly Tracy (Macaulay, Brendan)
September 25, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Molly Tracy, (Macaulay, Brendan)
September 25, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Molly Tracy. (Macaulay, Brendan)
September 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36102677 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Molly Tracy. (Attorney Brendan Francis Macaulay added to party Molly Tracy(pty:pla))(Macaulay, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molly Tracy et al v. John H. Morris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Tracy
Represented By: Brendan Francis Macaulay
Represented By: Kasia Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tramor Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Morris
Represented By: Christopher Tayback
Represented By: John Wall Baumann
Represented By: Joseph C Sarles
Represented By: Sean Taheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?