William Zepeda v. BMO Harris Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: William Zepeda
Defendant: BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A., Quality Loan Service Corporation and Does 1 through 20, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv08044
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-133) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, this case is transferred from Judge Hernan D. Vera to the calendar of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-08044-KK-JPRx. (rn)
November 20, 2023 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to BMO Harris Bank, N.A. answer now due 12/7/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant BMO Harris Bank, N.A..(Coe, Loren)
November 1, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark D Lonergan on behalf of Defendant BMO Harris Bank, N.A. (Lonergan, Mark)
November 1, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to BMO Harris Bank, N.A. answer now due 11/22/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant BMO Harris Bank, N.A..(Attorney Loren W. Coe added to party BMO Harris Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Coe, Loren)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Hernan D. Vera: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Amended Complaint #12 , for the following reasons: Attached document is not an amended complaint. If the filer intends to file an amended complaint, then a complete amended complaint must be filed with proper caption identifying new/termed parties. (lom)
October 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe 1 #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: attached document is not an amended complaint but an "Amendment to Complaint" that does not identify another party in the case caption In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
October 12, 2023 Filing 12 STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 14 - AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Does amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff William Zepeda(Murphy, Susan) Modified on 10/17/2023 (lom).
October 11, 2023 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William Zepeda, upon Defendant BMO Harris Bank, N.A. served on 10/3/2023, answer due 10/24/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon BMO Harris Bank, N.A. successor by merger to BANK OF THE WEST, a corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Murphy, Susan)
October 4, 2023 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William Zepeda, upon Defendant Quality Loan Service Corporation served on 10/3/2023, answer due 10/24/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Quality Loan Service Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Murphy, Susan)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
September 28, 2023 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Quality Loan Service Corporation. (et)
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Hernan D. Vera and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et)
September 26, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff William Zepeda, identifying Unknown. (Murphy, Susan)
September 26, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff William Zepeda. (Murphy, Susan)
September 26, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff William Zepeda. (Murphy, Susan)
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36107916 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff William Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O) (Attorney Susan M Murphy added to party William Zepeda(pty:pla))(Murphy, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Zepeda v. BMO Harris Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Zepeda
Represented By: Susan M Murphy
Represented By: Mark A Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Mark D Lonergan
Represented By: Loren W. Coe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?