Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London v. STG Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London
Defendant: STG Logistics, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc., CTS Global Supply Chain Solutions, Mediteraneo Line, Container Freight Services and Does 1-25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv08364
Filed: October 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Filing 23 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for January 22, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for further details). (aco)
November 28, 2023 Filing 22 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant STG Logistics, Inc., (Estrella, Mark)
November 28, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant STG Logistics, Inc..(Attorney Mark P. Estrella added to party STG Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Estrella, Mark)
November 21, 2023 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, upon Defendant STG Logistics, Inc. served on 11/3/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ty Chandler, Corporate Creations Network, agent for service for STG Logistics, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Brown, Adam)
November 21, 2023 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, upon Defendant XPO Logistics, Inc. served on 11/3/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jackson Yang, Registered Agent Solutions, agent for service for XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Brown, Adam)
November 3, 2023 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant STG Logistics, Inc.(aco)
November 3, 2023 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mediteraneo Line. (aco)
November 3, 2023 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant CTS Global Supply Chain Solutions. (aco)
November 3, 2023 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Container Freight Services. (aco)
November 3, 2023 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants XPO Logistics, Inc. (aco)
November 3, 2023 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London. (Brown, Adam)
November 3, 2023 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London. (Brown, Adam)
November 3, 2023 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London. (Brown, Adam)
November 3, 2023 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London. (Brown, Adam)
November 3, 2023 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London. (Brown, Adam)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:23-cv-06927 PA(MARx). Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-08364 PA(MARx). Signed by Judge Percy Anderson (rn)
October 6, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
October 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
October 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, (Brown, Adam)
October 4, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London. (Brown, Adam)
October 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36163985 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London. (Attorney Adam C Brown added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London(pty:pla))(Brown, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London v. STG Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London
Represented By: Adam C Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STG Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Mark P. Estrella
Represented By: Michael S. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTS Global Supply Chain Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediteraneo Line
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Container Freight Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?