LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc. v. UNCAS International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.
Defendant: UNCAS International, LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv08831
Filed: October 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UNCAS International, LLC answer now due 12/20/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UNCAS International, LLC.(Attorney Erica J. Van Loon added to party UNCAS International, LLC(pty:dft))(Van Loon, Erica)
November 2, 2023 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc., upon Defendant UNCAS International, LLC served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeffrey Brenner - Partner at Nixon Peabody LLP agreed to accept on behalf of Adam Gwaltney, the Registered Agent for UNCAS International, LLC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Keshishian, Milord)
October 23, 2023 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UNCAS International, LLC. (jtil)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
October 20, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
October 20, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
October 19, 2023 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.. (Keshishian, Milord)
October 19, 2023 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc. (Keshishian, Milord)
October 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc., (Keshishian, Milord)
October 19, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.. (Keshishian, Milord)
October 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.. (Keshishian, Milord)
October 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36258770 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.. (Attorney Milord A Keshishian added to party LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.(pty:pla))(Keshishian, Milord)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc. v. UNCAS International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.
Represented By: Milord A Keshishian
Represented By: Kirstin Anna Jensvold-Rumage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNCAS International, LLC
Represented By: Joshua J Pollack
Represented By: Erica J. Van Loon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?