Anna McNiffe v. Zahida R. Bhutto et al
Plaintiff: Anna McNiffe
Defendant: MD Zahida R. Bhutto, MD Justinder Malhotra, MD John Kim, Philips North America LLC, Philips Holding USA, Inc., Philips RS North America LLC, DOES 1 through 50, inclusive., Zahida R. Bhutto, Justinder Malhotra, John Kim and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv09196
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Hernan D Vera
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2023 Filing 25 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Western District of Pennsylvania, 2:23-cv-02048 filed 11/30/2023. (rolm)
November 29, 2023 Filing 24 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 85) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3014, transferring case to USDC, Western District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. IN RE: PHILIPS RECALLED CPAP, BILEVEL PAP, AND MECHANICAL VENTILATOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera Granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Franco A Corrado APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Phillips RS North America LLC, designating Yardena R Zwang-Weissman as local counsel. (bm)
November 15, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Transfer to MDL 3014 filed by Defendant Philips RS North America LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/18/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Hernan D. Vera. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A (Tag Along Notice), #3 Exhibit B (MDL No. 3014 CTO-85), #4 Exhibit C (Stay Orders), #5 Proposed Order) (Zwang-Weissman, Yardena)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS #13 , for the following reasons: Local Rule 11-8 Memorandum/brief exceeding 10 pages shall contain table of contents. (bm)
November 14, 2023 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Franco A. Corrado to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Philips RS North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/8/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-36373767) filed by Defendant Philips RS North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zwang-Weissman, Yardena)
November 14, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (wm)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (wm)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney #14 , for the following reasons: Other: DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Reassignment, dated 11/7/23, Dkt. 12. (bm)
November 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Transfer to MDL 3014 #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-8 Memorandum/brief exceeding 10 pages shall contain table of contents. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
November 9, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Franco A. Corrado to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Philips RS North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36373767) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Reassignment, dated 11/7/23, Dkt. 12. Letter S is missing from names, courts, etc. (lt)
November 8, 2023 Filing 14 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 11/13/2023, SEE DKT. No. #17 . APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Franco A. Corrado to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Philips RS North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36373767) filed by Defendant Philips RS North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zwang-Weissman, Yardena) Modified on 11/14/2023 (bm).
November 8, 2023 Filing 13 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 11/14/2023, SEE DKT. No. #21 . NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Transfer to MDL 3014 filed by Defendant Philips RS North America LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/18/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Hernan D. Vera. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A (Tag Along Notice), #3 Exhibit B (MDL No. 3014 CTO-85), #4 Exhibit C (Stay Orders), #5 Proposed Order) (Zwang-Weissman, Yardena) Modified on 11/15/2023 (bm).
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Hernan D. Vera for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-09196 HDV(MRWx). (rn)
November 3, 2023 Filing 11 CORRECTED NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John P Lavelle, Jr.. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
November 3, 2023 Filing 10 Corrected Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
November 3, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Notice to Counsel docket item #7 and Notice of Pro Hac Vice Application item #8 should be disregarded due to incorrect caption on the forms. Corrected forms will be re-docketed. (car)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 11/3/2023, SEE ITEM #9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John P Lavelle, Jr. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) Modified on 11/3/2023 (car).
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 11/3/2023, SEE ITEM #9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) Modified on 11/3/2023 (car).
November 3, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
November 1, 2023 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Zahida R. Bhutto, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, John Kim, Justinder Malhotra, Philips Holding USA, Inc., Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Anna McNiffe. Filed in State Court on 10/3/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 11/3/2023 (car).
November 1, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael H Steinberg counsel for Defendants Philips Holding USA, Inc., Philips North America LLC. Adding Michael H. Steinberg as counsel of record for Philips North America LLC and Philips Holding USA, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Philips North America LLC and Philips Holding USA, Inc.. (Attorney Michael H Steinberg added to party Philips Holding USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael H Steinberg added to party Philips North America LLC(pty:dft))(Steinberg, Michael)
November 1, 2023 Filing 4 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Philips RS North America LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on 11/1/2023. (Zwang-Weissman, Yardena)
November 1, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Philips RS North America LLC identifying Koninklijke Philips Naamloze Vennootschap as Corporate Parent. (Zwang-Weissman, Yardena)
November 1, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Philips RS North America LLC. (Zwang-Weissman, Yardena)
November 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court County of Los Angeles, case number 23PSCV03049 Receipt No: ACACDC-36331164 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Philips Holding USA, Inc., Philips RS North America LLC, Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Philips RS North America LLC Corporate Records & Business Registrations), #3 Exhibit C (Philips RS North America Holding Corporation Corporate Records & Business Registrations), #4 Exhibit D (Philips North America LLC Corporate Records & Business Registrations), #5 Exhibit E (Philips Holding USA Inc. Corporate Records & Business Registrations), #6 Exhibit F (JPML Transfer Order)) (Attorney Yardena R Zwang-Weissman added to party Philips RS North America LLC(pty:dft))(Zwang-Weissman, Yardena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anna McNiffe v. Zahida R. Bhutto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna McNiffe
Represented By: Margot P Cutter
Represented By: C. Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Zahida R. Bhutto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Justinder Malhotra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD John Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips North America LLC
Represented By: Michael H Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Holding USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips RS North America LLC
Represented By: Yardena R Zwang-Weissman
Represented By: Franco A. Corrado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zahida R. Bhutto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justinder Malhotra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?