Kyle Christner v. Mike Shinoda et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Christner
Defendant: Mike Shinoda, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson, Joseph Hahn, Machine Shop Entertainment LLC, Warner Records Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2023cv09459
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE STIPULATION BY THE PARTIES TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #19 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through and including February 5, 2024. (iv)
December 7, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 5, 2024 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Machine Shop Entertainment LLC, Warner Records Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE STIPULATION BY THE PARTIES TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT)(Attorney Edwin F. McPherson added to party Machine Shop Entertainment LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Edwin F. McPherson added to party Warner Records Inc.(pty:dft))(McPherson, Edwin)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #15 #17 by Judge John F. Walter. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Christner, designating Lawrence J Zerner as local counsel. Granting #15 #17 Non-Resident Attorney Maxwell J Goss (rolm)
November 22, 2023 Filing 17 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxwell J. Goss to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Christner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 11/21/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-36446184) filed by plaintiff Kyle Christner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Zerner, Lawrence)
November 21, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxwell J. Goss to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Christner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36446184) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: The application needs actual signatures from both attorneys, that is not text nor handwritten font. (sbou)
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxwell J. Goss to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Christner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36446184) filed by Plaintiff Kyle Christner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Zerner, Lawrence)
November 20, 2023 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Maxwell Goss re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 filed by Plaintiff Kyle Christner. (Zerner, Lawrence)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Kyle Christner. (Zerner, Lawrence)
November 13, 2023 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson, Joseph Hahn, Machine Shop Entertainment LLC, Mike Shinoda, Warner Records Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued- Rob Bourdon, #2 Summons Issued- Brad Delson, #3 Summons Issued- Joseph Hahn, #4 Summons Issued- Machine Shop Entertainment, #5 Summons Issued- Mike Shinoda)(rolm)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
November 9, 2023 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Kyle Christner. (Zerner, Lawrence)
November 9, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
November 9, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
November 9, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 9, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 9, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
November 8, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kyle Christner, identifying Kyle Christner, Mike Shinoda, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson, Joseph Hahn, Machine Shop Entertainment LLC, Warner Records, Inc.. (Zerner, Lawrence)
November 8, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kyle Christner. (Zerner, Lawrence)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kyle Christner. (Zerner, Lawrence)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36376569 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Kyle Christner. (Attorney Lawrence J Zerner added to party Kyle Christner(pty:pla))(Zerner, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyle Christner v. Mike Shinoda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Christner
Represented By: Lawrence J Zerner
Represented By: Maxwell J Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Shinoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Bourdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Delson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machine Shop Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Edwin F. McPherson
Represented By: Pierre B. Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Records Inc.
Represented By: Edwin F. McPherson
Represented By: Pierre B. Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?