Boyce A. Stringer et al v. American Biltrite, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Boyce Stringer, Nancy Stringer, Boyce A. Stringer and Nancy C. Stringer
Defendant: DOMCO PRODUCTS TEXAS, INC., Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to, and formerly known as DOMCO INC., FLOOR PRODUCTS (TEXAS), AZROCK INDUSTRIES INC., UVALDE ROCK ASPHALT COMPANY, REDCO CORPORATION, formerly known as CRANE CO., Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to COCHRANE CORPORATION, AMERICAN BILTRITE INC., American International Industries, Aurora Pump Company, BFS GROUP OF CALIFORNIA, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DIXIELINE LUMBER COMPANY, BOISE CASCADE COMPANY, Carrier Corporation, The Darcoid Company of California, DOMCO INC., FLOOR PRODUCTS (TEXAS), AZROCK INDUSTRIES INC., UVALDE ROCK ASPHALT COMPANY, EATON CORPORATION, as Successor-in-Interest to CUTLER-HAMMAR, INC., FLOWSERVE US, INC., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as successor to EDWARD VALVE & ROCKWELL MANUFACTURING COMPANY, FMC CORPORATION, Individually and as successor in interest to CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY, PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, and NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, GREEN, TWEED & CO., INC., Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Henry Company LLC, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., Individually and as successor in interest to DELAVAL TURBINE INC. and SHARPLES, INC., JOHNSON CONTROLS, 1NC., Individually and as successor-in-interest to FRICK REFRIGERATION, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., LENNOX INDUSTRIES INC., Metalclad Insulation LLC, PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC., f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation, f/k/a VIACOM, 1NC., successor by merger to CBS CORPORATION, a Pennsylvania Corporation, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTR, PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION as Successor-In-Interest to SACOMO-SIERRA, Pfizer, Inc., CRANE CO., Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to COCHRANE CORPORATION, ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC., individually and as successor-in-interest to ALLEN BRADLEY, CO., LLC, ALLEN-BRADLEY CO., ALLEN-BRADLEY CO., INC. and ROSTONE CORPORATION, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., f/k/a SQUARE D COMPANY, SID'S CARPET BARN, INC., SPIRAX SARCO, 1NC., SQUIRES-BELT MATERIAL COMPANY, SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., Individually and as successor in interest to GTE CORPORATION, successor in interest to ZINSCO ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, Viking Pump, Inc., YORK INTERNATIONAL CORP., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to LILLARD CO. and LILCO, INC., Domco Products Texas, Inc., Paramount Global, Redco Corporation, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Atwood and Morrill, American Biltrite, Inc., BFS Group of California, Floor Products Texas, Azrock Indurstries Inc., Uvalde Rock Asphalt Company, Domco Inc., Eaton Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., FMC Corporation, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Green, Tweed and Co., Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., ViacomCBS Inc., CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, Viacom, Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Crane Co., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Square D Company, Sids Carpet Barn, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., York International Corp., Armstrong International, Inc., Weir Vales and Controls USA, INc., Atwood and Morrill Co., Inc. and Does 1-100
Case Number: 2:2023cv09813
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 Filing 50 Receipt of LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL - REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT. (aco)
December 7, 2023 Filing 49 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. (aco)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER IMMIEDIATELY REMANDING TO STATE COURT THE REMOVED ACTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties Stipulations Immediately Remanding to State Court the Removed Action filed on November 29, 2023 hereto is GRANTED. The above-captioned case is hereby REMANDED to Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6) (aco)
December 4, 2023 Filing 47 First STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by plaintiff Boyce A. Stringer.(Amell, David)
December 1, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney David Edward Ashdown counsel for Defendant American International Industries. Changing Firm Name to Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP, 19191 South Vermont Ave., Ste. 900, Torrance, CA 90502. Changing e-mail to david.ashdown@nelsonmullins.com. Filed by Defendant American International Industries. (Ashdown, David)
November 30, 2023 Filing 45 Notice filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. of Re-filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Cormier, Jennifer)
November 30, 2023 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, identifying The Vanguard Group and BlackRock. (Cormier, Jennifer)
November 30, 2023 Filing 43 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer A Cormier counsel for Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Adding Jennifer A. Cormier as counsel of record for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Cormier, Jennifer)
November 29, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - DECLINED by Party #21 , Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - DECLINED by Party #37 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
November 29, 2023 Filing 41 Notice, Disclosure, and Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc., (Lee, Stacey)
November 29, 2023 Filing 40 Notice of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint and Request for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Lee, Stacey)
November 29, 2023 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stacey Kim Lee counsel for Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. Adding Stacey K. Lee as counsel of record for Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (f/k/a Square D Company) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (f/k/a Square D Company). (Lee, Stacey)
November 28, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Charles T Sheldon on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Attorney Charles T Sheldon added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Sheldon, Charles)
November 28, 2023 Filing 37 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c. (Johnson, Derek)
November 28, 2023 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, Defendant General Electric Company's Notice of Refiling Its State Court Answer To Complaint For Damages filed by Defendant General Electric Company.(Johnson, Derek)
November 28, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Electric Company, identifying T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. and T. Rowe Price Group, Inc.. (Johnson, Derek)
November 28, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Derek S Johnson on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Attorney Derek S Johnson added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Johnson, Derek)
November 27, 2023 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., identifying Flacks Group. (Duffy, Joseph)
November 27, 2023 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company, (Duffy, Joseph)
November 27, 2023 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendants Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.. (Duffy, Joseph)
November 27, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Jo Talarico counsel for Defendants Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.. Adding Amy Talarico as counsel of record for Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
November 27, 2023 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc., identifying Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Jenkins, Charles)
November 27, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Charles William Jenkins on behalf of Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. (Jenkins, Charles)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
November 24, 2023 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American International Industries, identifying Glamour Industries, Co., ARYZ Corp., ERX Corp., RAZY Properties, Inc., SRYZ Corp., Brenntag Specialties, LLC. (Ashdown, David)
November 24, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant American International Industries. Motion set for hearing on 1/8/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of David E. Ashdown, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney David Edward Ashdown added to party American International Industries(pty:dft)) (Ashdown, David)
November 22, 2023 Filing 24 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Northern filed by Defendant Green, Tweed and Co., Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/8/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Point and Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Charles W. Jenkins, #3 Declaration Declaration of Shannon R. Jackson) (Jenkins, Charles)
November 22, 2023 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles William Jenkins counsel for Defendant Green, Tweed and Co., Inc.. Adding Charles W. Jenkins as counsel of record for Greene, Twwed & Co., Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Attorney Charles William Jenkins added to party Green, Tweed and Co., Inc.(pty:dft))(Jenkins, Charles)
November 22, 2023 Filing 22 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Metalclad Insulation LLC Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure, Rule 26 filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC (Sandgren, Michael)
November 22, 2023 Filing 21 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. The Defendant does not consent. (Sandgren, Michael)
November 22, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael E Sandgren on behalf of Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC (Sandgren, Michael)
November 22, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC, identifying ENTRX LLC (Holding Company); Central National Insurance Company (ACE Group); Industrial Underwriters (ACE Group); Motor Vehicle Insurance Company (ACE Group); Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Hartford Group); Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Hartford Group); First State Insurance Company (Hartford Group); Continental Casualty Company (CNA Group); Harbor Insurance Company (CNA Group); Northbrook Insurance Company (Allstate); Granite State Insurance Company (AIG Group); National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (AIG Group); American Home Insurance Company (AIG Group); Transport Case Insurance Company; American Motorist Insurance Company, in liquidation (Chubb Group). (Attorney Michael E Sandgren added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(Sandgren, Michael)
November 22, 2023 Filing 18 Notice Re-Filing State Court Answer To Complaint filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Sandgren, Michael)
November 22, 2023 Filing 17 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. The Defendant does not consent. (Lashinsky, Natalie)
November 22, 2023 Filing 16 Notice filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Lashinsky, Natalie)
November 22, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company, (Lashinsky, Natalie)
November 22, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Natalie Garcia Lashinsky on behalf of Defendant Aurora Pump Company (Attorney Natalie Garcia Lashinsky added to party Aurora Pump Company(pty:dft))(Lashinsky, Natalie)
November 22, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FMC Corporation, identifying The Vanguard Group. (Gittler, Marissa)
November 22, 2023 Filing 12 Notice of Filing State Court Answer and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Gittler, Marissa)
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Marissa K Gittler on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Gittler, Marissa)
November 22, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Pond, Francis)
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Flowserve US, Inc.( Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION ), identifying Flowserve US, Inc.. (Yuen, Nicole)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 Notice filed by Defendant Flowserve US, Inc.( Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION ). NOTICE OF RE-FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Yuen, Nicole)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nicole Brown Yuen on behalf of Defendant Flowserve US, Inc. (Yuen, Nicole)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Flowserve US, Inc.( Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION ). (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Nicole Brown Yuen added to party Flowserve US, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Charles George Manoli, Jr added to party Flowserve US, Inc.(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Nancy Erwin Buck added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Francis D Pond added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Marissa K Gittler added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Charles William Jenkins added to party Gardner Denver, Inc.(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Robert H Baronian added to party Eaton Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Sherrie Soon Diveglia added to party Eaton Corporation(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants American Biltrite, Inc., American International Industries, Armstrong International, Inc., Atwood and Morrill, Aurora Pump Company, BFS Group of California, Boise Cascade Company, Carrier Corporation, Does 1-100, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Eaton Corporation, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc.(solely as successor to EDWARD VALVE and ROCKWELL MANUFACTURING COMPANY ), Flowserve US, Inc.( Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION ), Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Green, Tweed and Co., Inc., Henry Company LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, IMO Industries, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., Lennox Industries, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Paramount Global, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Redco Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sids Carpet Barn, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Squires-Belt Materical Company, The Darcoid Company of California, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Verizon Communications, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., York International Corp..(Filing fee $ 402), filed by plaintiffs Nancy C. Stringer, Boyce A. Stringer. FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/2/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Carmen D Sandgren added to party The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kristi Leigh Kasey Young added to party The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer A Cormier added to party The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Boise Cascade Company. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Gayle Lynne Ketchie added to party Boise Cascade Company(pty:dft), Attorney Nicolas P Martin added to party Boise Cascade Company(pty:dft), Attorney William M Hake added to party Boise Cascade Company(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Domco Products Texas, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Shelley K Tinkoff added to party Domco Products Texas, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark A Love added to party Domco Products Texas, Inc.(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Michael J. Pietrykowski added to party Velan Valve Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Velan Valve Corporation(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft), Attorney Colin Charles West added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Deborah A Smith added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Florence A McClain added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Stacey Kim Lee added to party Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey H. Grant added to party Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Squires-Belt Material Company. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Melissa R Badgett added to party Squires-Belt Material Company(pty:dft), Attorney Todd M Thacker added to party Squires-Belt Material Company(pty:dft), Attorney Gabriel A Jackson added to party Squires-Belt Material Company(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Daniel B Hoye added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa L Oberg added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(ghap)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant GREEN, TWEED & CO., INC. identifying GT Global Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Weiss, Lindsay)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant GREEN, TWEED & CO., INC.. (Weiss, Lindsay)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court, case number 23CV046055 Receipt No: ACACDC-36432836 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant GREEN, TWEED & CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A in Support of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B in Supportof Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C in Support of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D1 in Support of Removal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D2 in Support of Remova) (Attorney Lindsay Weiss added to party GREEN, TWEED & CO., INC.(pty:dft))(Weiss, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyce A. Stringer et al v. American Biltrite, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOMCO PRODUCTS TEXAS, INC., Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to, and formerly known as DOMCO INC., FLOOR PRODUCTS (TEXAS), AZROCK INDUSTRIES INC., UVALDE ROCK ASPHALT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDCO CORPORATION, formerly known as CRANE CO., Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to COCHRANE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN BILTRITE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Industries
Represented By: Julia A Gowin
Represented By: David Edward Ashdown
Represented By: Nilofar Karbassi
Represented By: Robert E Thackston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Michael E Sandgren
Represented By: Natalie Garcia Lashinsky
Represented By: Rochelle R Ileto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFS GROUP OF CALIFORNIA, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DIXIELINE LUMBER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOISE CASCADE COMPANY
Represented By: Gayle Lynne Ketchie
Represented By: Nicolas P Martin
Represented By: William M Hake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Darcoid Company of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOMCO INC., FLOOR PRODUCTS (TEXAS), AZROCK INDUSTRIES INC., UVALDE ROCK ASPHALT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION, as Successor-in-Interest to CUTLER-HAMMAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as successor to EDWARD VALVE & ROCKWELL MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION, Individually and as successor in interest to CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY, PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, and NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Charles William Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Derek S Johnson
Represented By: Charles T Sheldon
Represented By: Edward E Hartley
Represented By: Mariam Pambukyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREEN, TWEED & CO., INC.
Represented By: Lindsay Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Colin Charles West
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., Individually and as successor in interest to DELAVAL TURBINE INC. and SHARPLES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON CONTROLS, 1NC., Individually and as successor-in-interest to FRICK REFRIGERATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LENNOX INDUSTRIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Daniel B Hoye
Represented By: Lisa L Oberg
Represented By: Michael E Sandgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC., f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation, f/k/a VIACOM, 1NC., successor by merger to CBS CORPORATION, a Pennsylvania Corporation, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION as Successor-In-Interest to SACOMO-SIERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO., Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to COCHRANE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC., individually and as successor-in-interest to ALLEN BRADLEY, CO., LLC, ALLEN-BRADLEY CO., ALLEN-BRADLEY CO., INC. and ROSTONE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., f/k/a SQUARE D COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SID'S CARPET BARN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO, 1NC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUIRES-BELT MATERIAL COMPANY
Represented By: Gabriel A Jackson
Represented By: Melissa R Badgett
Represented By: Todd M Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Deborah A Smith
Represented By: Florence A McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., Individually and as successor in interest to GTE CORPORATION, successor in interest to ZINSCO ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK INTERNATIONAL CORP., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to LILLARD CO. and LILCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domco Products Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A Love
Represented By: Shelley K Tinkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Grant
Represented By: Stacey Kim Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood and Morrill
Represented By: Emily D. Bergstrom
Represented By: Kurt T Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Biltrite, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFS Group of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floor Products Texas
Represented By: Mark A Love
Represented By: Shelley K Tinkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azrock Indurstries Inc.
Represented By: Mark A Love
Represented By: Shelley K Tinkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uvalde Rock Asphalt Company
Represented By: Mark A Love
Represented By: Shelley K Tinkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domco Inc.
Represented By: Mark A Love
Represented By: Shelley K Tinkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Robert H Baronian
Represented By: Sherrie Soon Diveglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Represented By: Charles George Manoli, Jr
Represented By: Nicole Brown Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Marissa K Gittler
Represented By: Nancy Erwin Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Carmen Sandgren
Represented By: Jennifer A Cormier
Represented By: Kristi Leigh Kasey Young
Represented By: Stephen V Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green, Tweed and Co., Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay Weiss
Represented By: Charles William Jenkins
Represented By: Christopher Owen Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennox Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D Company
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Grant
Represented By: Stacey Kim Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sids Carpet Barn, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Vales and Controls USA, INc.
Represented By: Emily D. Bergstrom
Represented By: Kurt T Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood and Morrill Co., Inc.
Represented By: Emily D. Bergstrom
Represented By: Kurt T Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boyce Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boyce A. Stringer
Represented By: David Lee Amell
Represented By: Tyler Scott Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy C. Stringer
Represented By: David Lee Amell
Represented By: Tyler Scott Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?