Malika Bailey v. CCWF Warden
Petitioner: Malika Bailey
Respondent: CCWF Warden
Case Number: 2:2023cv09826
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff: Granting #9 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the application is GRANTED and Respondent may file a motion to dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus on or before February 16, 2024, and an answer on or before March 2, 2024. (es)
January 10, 2024 Filing 9 First APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File MOTION TO DISMISS AND AN ANSWER filed by Respondent CCWF Warden. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Harris, Julie)
December 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Julie A. Harris on behalf of Respondent CCWF Warden. (Attorney Julie Ann Harris added to party CCWF Warden(pty:res))(Harris, Julie)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (28 U.S.C. 2254) by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. Respondent shall serve and file a notice of appearance NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 28, 2023. Respondent shall file a single motion to dismiss NO LATER THAN JANUARY 17, 2024, or an Answer and Return to Petition NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 1, 2024. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 blank consent form) (ch)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #2 by Judge John F. Walter. The Request is GRANTED. (iv)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 Letter Re Habeas Corpus Transfer-In) (car)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
November 13, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Malika Bailey. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Malika Bailey. (Lawrence, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 11/21/2023.] Modified on 11/21/2023 (car).
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against CCWF Warden by Malika Bailey. (Lawrence, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 11/21/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malika Bailey v. CCWF Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Malika Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CCWF Warden
Represented By: Julie Ann Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?