Tracy Wendell Adams v. Doerer
Petitioner: Tracy Wendell Adams
Respondent: Warden Doerer
Case Number: 2:2023cv09875
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 4 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 from Tracy Wendell Adams. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #1 . Receipt number 11428. (fa)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111). Upon submission of your petition for writ of habeas corpus, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) #1 . (Attachments: #1 CV60P Request for IFP)(et)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Senior District Judge George H Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (et)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241). Case assigned to Senior District Judge George H Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Filing fee $ 5 FEE DUE.), filed by Petitioner Tracy Wendell Adams. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tracy Wendell Adams v. Doerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tracy Wendell Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Doerer
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?