Larisa Lyn Back v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Larisa Lyn Back
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2023cv09905
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV23-9905 BFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 8, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The Request is GRANTED.; granting #2 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (aco)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Larisa Lyn Back. (Lambert, Meghan)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 CORRECTED NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (car)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) form #5 was issued with the incorrect date. Docket item 5 should be disregarded. (car)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 11/28/2023, SEE ITEM #6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (car) Modified on 11/28/2023 (car).
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Larisa Lyn Back, identifying none. (Lambert, Meghan)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Larisa Lyn Back. (Lambert, Meghan)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Larisa Lyn Back. (Lambert, Meghan)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Larisa Lyn Back. (Attorney Meghan O Lambert added to party Larisa Lyn Back(pty:pla))(Lambert, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larisa Lyn Back v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larisa Lyn Back
Represented By: Meghan O Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?