Mayra Alejandra Alonso v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Mayra Alejandra Alonso
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2023cv09972
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV23-9972 BFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 8, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The Request is GRANTED.; granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (aco)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Mayra Alejandra Alonso. (Rosales, Steven)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (jtil)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mayra Alejandra Alonso, (Rosales, Steven)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mayra Alejandra Alonso. (Rosales, Steven)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Mayra Alejandra Alonso. (Rosales, Steven)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Mayra Alejandra Alonso. (Attorney Steven G. Rosales added to party Mayra Alejandra Alonso(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayra Alejandra Alonso v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra Alejandra Alonso
Represented By: Steven G. Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?