Darby Quezada et al v. United Airlines Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Darby Quezada and Dawn Todd
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Inc. and Does 1 through 50 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv10008
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 23-4170, as to Defendant United Airlines Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jason Sickler at jsickler@reedsmith.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Gehrke, Michele)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 Receipt of Letter of Transmittal- Remand to Superior Court (rolm)
December 14, 2023 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 23-4170 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #13 as to defendant United Airlines Inc.. (mat)
December 14, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant United Airlines Inc.. Appeal of Status Conference - optional html form,,, Terminated Case,,, Set/Clear Flags,, #11 . (Appeal Fee - $605 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36571920.) (Gehrke, Michele)
December 4, 2023 Filing 12 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (aco)
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Percy Anderson. The Court waived Local Rule 6-1 barring oral motions and plaintiffs' counsel moved to remand the action to the Los Angeles County Superior Court based on Defendant's failure to adequately allege a basis for the Court's subject matter jurisdiction in the Notice of Removal. The Court granted Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Accordingly, this action is hereby remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case Number 23STCV26112, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (See document for further details). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: April Lassiter-Benson. (aco)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United Airlines Inc., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 served on November 30, 2023. (Gehrke, Michele)
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for January 22, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Percy Anderson Status Conference set for 12/4/2023 03:00 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lfa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (sh)
November 28, 2023 CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant United Airlines Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 11/27/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT J TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh)
November 28, 2023 CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, United Airlines Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Darby Quezada, Dawn Todd.[FILED IN STATE COURT 10/25/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE AND CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc., identifying United Airlines Holding, Inc.. (Gehrke, Michele)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Gehrke, Michele)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23STCV26112 Receipt No: ACACDC-36476337 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele Haydel Gehrke, #2 Declaration of Dorota Karpierz, #3 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Michele Haydel Gehrke added to party United Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gehrke, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darby Quezada et al v. United Airlines Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darby Quezada
Represented By: Sam Yebri
Represented By: Alexander M Merino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Todd
Represented By: Sam Yebri
Represented By: Alexander M Merino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Michele Haydel Gehrke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines Inc.
Represented By: Michele Haydel Gehrke
Represented By: Brandon Nhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?