Alvaro Orosco v. Ramon Esquivel Melgoza et al
Plaintiff: Alvaro Orosco
Defendant: Ramon Esquivel Melgoza, Jr. doing business as Rogers Mexican Grill & Sports Bar, Rogelio Mata Rosales and DOES 1 to 10,
Case Number: 2:2023cv10022
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Wesley L Hsu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Filing 17 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Ramon Esquivel Melgoza, Jr. dba Rogers Mexican Grill & Sports Bar (lom)
January 18, 2024 Filing 16 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Ramon Esquivel Melgoza, Jr filed by plaintiff Alvaro Orosco. (Kim, Jason)
January 2, 2024 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alvaro Orosco, upon Defendant Ramon Esquivel Melgoza, Jr served on 12/21/2023, answer due 1/11/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ramon Esquivel Melgoza, Jr D/B/A Rogers Mexican Grill & Sports Bar, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
December 14, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Alvaro Oroscoto Order to Show Cause #13 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 12/14/2023. (hc)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc)
November 30, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Re: STANDING ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT (Dkt. 10): Due to clerical error the wrong order was attached to Docket Entry #10 . Refer to Docket Entry 11 (hc)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU. (hc)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Ramon Esquivel Melgoza, Jr, and Rogelio Mata Rosales. (jtil)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Wesley L. Hsu and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Alvaro Orosco. (Kim, Jason)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alvaro Orosco. (Kim, Jason)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36478928 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Alvaro Orosco(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvaro Orosco v. Ramon Esquivel Melgoza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Orosco
Represented By: Jason J. Kim
Represented By: Jason T. Yoon
Represented By: Kevin Hyunjong Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Esquivel Melgoza, Jr. doing business as Rogers Mexican Grill & Sports Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogelio Mata Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?