Carter v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jessie L. Carter
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc and Does 1-25
Case Number: 2:2023cv10077
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
2 Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 20 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case number: 23STCV15708. (jp)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Re Joint Stipulation Limiting Recovery for Plaintiff's Damages at Less than $75,000 and Remand Action Back to State Court #18 . The case is therefore REMANDED to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. 23STCV15708. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp)
January 25, 2024 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Los Angeles Superior Court Case Number 23STCV15708 filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION LIMITING RECOVERY FOR PLAINTIFFS DAMAGES AT LESS THAN $75,000 AND REMAND ACTION BACK TO STATE COURT, #2 Supplement CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Dixon, Robert)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-10077 DSF(JDEx). (rn)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-10077 DSF(PDx). (rn)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (pk)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk)
December 1, 2023 Filing 13 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:23-cv-01984-BAS-DDL, from Southern District of California. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:23-cv-10077 DSF (RAOx). (sh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred to District of Central California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central California*.*350 West 1st Street STE 4311, 4th Floor**Los Angeles, CA 900124565*. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (mjw) [Transferred from California Southern on 12/1/2023.]
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order to Show Cause RE: Transfer of Action to the Central District of California. Order to Show Cause Response due by 11/20/2023. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/13/2023.(mjw) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/1/2023.]
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice and Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference set for 12/27/2023 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 11/01/2023.(mjw) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/1/2023.]
November 1, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc... (Hurwitz, Daniel) (mjw). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/1/2023.]
November 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hurwitz, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Scott Hurwitz added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft) (mjw). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/1/2023.]
October 26, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (rxc) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/1/2023.]
October 26, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (rxc)(jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/1/2023.]
October 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-18301661.), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Robert Dixon In Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:23-cv-1984-BAS-DDL. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case.(rxc) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/1/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie L. Carter
Represented By: Kenneth C Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A Inc.
Represented By: Lilly Nizam
Represented By: Robert Kenneth Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Daniel Scott Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?