Nancy Tomei v. Wyeth et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Tomei and Tod Tomei
Defendant: Wyeth, Wyeth LLC, Pfizer, Pfizer Inc and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv10100
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
2 Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Filing 30 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei.(iv)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON STIPULATION #28 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
January 22, 2024 Filing 28 STIPULATION to FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to File First Amended Complaint (with Complaint Attached))(Newdorf, David)
January 4, 2024 Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Stipulation #25 is accepted as filed and approved. The First Amended Complaint shall be filed by 1/22/2024. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 4, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
January 3, 2024 Filing 25 STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei.(Hersh, Nancy)
December 18, 2023 Filing 24 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendants Pfizer Inc, Wyeth LLC. as to Objection #23 . (Beroukhim, E.)
December 15, 2023 Filing 23 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s) #17 filed by Defendants Pfizer Inc, Wyeth LLC. (Beroukhim, E.)
December 15, 2023 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei, upon Defendant Wyeth LLC served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation as Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Newdorf, David)
December 15, 2023 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei, upon Defendant Wyeth served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation as Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Newdorf, David)
December 15, 2023 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei, upon Defendant Pfizer Inc served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation as Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Newdorf, David)
December 15, 2023 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei, upon Defendant Pfizer served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hersh, Nancy)
December 13, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Association of Counsel.. Signature missing on document for the firm of Hersh and Hersh. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 11, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei. Related Case(s): 2:23-cv-10102 (Hersh, Nancy)
December 11, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nancy Hersh on behalf of Plaintiffs Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei (Hersh, Nancy)
December 5, 2023 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 1, 2023 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Wyeth, Wyeth LLC. (aco)
December 1, 2023 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Pfizer, Pfizer Inc. (aco)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:23-cv-10100 FMO(BFMx). (rn)
November 30, 2023 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei. (Hersh, Nancy)
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei. (Hersh, Nancy)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 , Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (lh)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei, (Hersh, Nancy)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei. (Hersh, Nancy)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei. (Hersh, Nancy)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Nancy Tomei, Tod Tomei. (Hersh, Nancy)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36494271 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Nancy Hersh added to party Nancy Tomei(pty:pla), Attorney Nancy Hersh added to party Tod Tomei(pty:pla))(Hersh, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nancy Tomei v. Wyeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Tomei
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Represented By: Kate Hersh-Boyle
Represented By: David B Newdorf
Represented By: Kathleen Rachel Hersh-Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tod Tomei
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Represented By: Kate Hersh-Boyle
Represented By: David B Newdorf
Represented By: Kathleen Rachel Hersh-Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth LLC
Represented By: E. Alex Beroukhim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: E. Alex Beroukhim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?