Jane Nazzal et al v. Wyeth et al
Plaintiff: Jane Nazzal and Hussam Nazzal
Defendant: Wyeth, Wyeth LLC, Pfizer, Pfizer Inc and DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv10102
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Filing 20 STIPULATION to FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Hussam Nazzal, Jane Nazzal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to File First Amended Complaint (with Complaint Attached))(Newdorf, David)
January 3, 2024 Filing 19 STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Hussam Nazzal, Jane Nazzal.(Hersh, Nancy)
December 18, 2023 Filing 18 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendants Pfizer Inc, Wyeth LLC. as to Objection #17 . (Beroukhim, E.)
December 15, 2023 Filing 17 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s) #11 filed by Defendants Pfizer Inc, Wyeth LLC. (Beroukhim, E.)
December 15, 2023 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jane Nazzal, Hussam Nazzal, upon Defendant Wyeth LLC served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation as Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Newdorf, David)
December 15, 2023 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jane Nazzal, Hussam Nazzal, upon Defendant Wyeth served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation as Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Newdorf, David)
December 15, 2023 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jane Nazzal, Hussam Nazzal, upon Defendant Pfizer Inc served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation as Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Newdorf, David)
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jane Nazzal, Hussam Nazzal, upon Defendant Pfizer served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation as Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Newdorf, David)
December 13, 2023 Filing 12 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Hussam Nazzal, Jane Nazzal. Related Case(s): 2:23-cv-10100 (Hersh, Nancy)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nancy Hersh on behalf of Plaintiffs Hussam Nazzal, Jane Nazzal (Hersh, Nancy)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Pfizer, Pfizer Inc, Wyeth, Wyeth LLC. (Attachments: #1 Pfizer) (jtil)
December 2, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Hussam Nazzal, Jane Nazzal. (Hersh, Nancy)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Hussam Nazzal, Jane Nazzal. (Hersh, Nancy)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Hussam Nazzal, Jane Nazzal, (Hersh, Nancy)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Hussam Nazzal, Jane Nazzal. (Hersh, Nancy)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Hussam Nazzal, Jane Nazzal. (Hersh, Nancy)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Hussam Nazzal, Jane Nazzal. (Hersh, Nancy)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36494412 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Jane Nazzal, Hussam Nazzal. (Attorney Nancy Hersh added to party Hussam Nazzal(pty:pla), Attorney Nancy Hersh added to party Jane Nazzal(pty:pla))(Hersh, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Nazzal et al v. Wyeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Nazzal
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Represented By: David B Newdorf
Represented By: Kathleen Rachel Hersh-Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hussam Nazzal
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Represented By: David B Newdorf
Represented By: Kathleen Rachel Hersh-Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?