Henry Kouyoumdjian v. Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC
Plaintiff: Henry Kouyoumdjian
Defendant: Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC and Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Alphia, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv10140
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2024 at 3:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 12/10/2024 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet) (iv)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (iv)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/26/2024. (iv)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the February 14, 2024, Scheduling Conference. Trial Order to be issued. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #23 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Scheduling Conference is continued to February 14, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. (iv)
January 12, 2024 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from January 17, 2024 to February 14, 2024 filed by Defendant Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Scheduling Worksheet)(Yudelson, David)
January 9, 2024 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sydney M. Wright counsel for Defendant Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC. Adding Sydney M. Wright as counsel of record for Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC. (Attorney Sydney M. Wright added to party Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC(pty:dft))(Wright, Sydney)
January 8, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER RE DEFICIENCY by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed at (Dkt. No. 20) does not comply with the Courts Order Setting Scheduling Conference as it does not include the required Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet. The parties must complete and file the worksheet by January 12, 2023. The January 10, 2024, scheduling conference is continued to January 17, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 27, 2023 Filing 20 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Defendant Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC.. (Yudelson, David)
December 26, 2023 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #16 as to ThirdParty Defendant Alphia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(rolm)
December 22, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC, identifying Henry Kouyoumdjian; Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC; and Alphia, Inc.. (Yudelson, David)
December 22, 2023 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint #16 filed by Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Yudelson, David)
December 22, 2023 Filing 16 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendant Alphia, Inc. ; Jury Demand, filed by Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC.(Yudelson, David)
December 12, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of Filing of State Court File with District Court filed by Defendant Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Yudelson, David)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/27/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC.(Yudelson, David)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER FOR NEWLY ASSIGNED CIVIL CASES by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (iv)
December 5, 2023 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
December 1, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendant Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC, filed by Plaintiff Henry Kouyoumdjian. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/12/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC, re Request for Judicial Notice #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Declaration #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Declaration #5 served on December 1, 2023. (Yudelson, David)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC. (Yudelson, David)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 DECLARATION of David Yudelson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC. (Yudelson, David)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Patrick Burke re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC. (Yudelson, David)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC identifying Tender & True Pet Nutrition LLC as Corporate Parent. (Yudelson, David)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC, identifying Henry Kouyoumdjian, Tender & True Pet Nutrition LLC. (Yudelson, David)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC. (Yudelson, David)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 23STCV24993 Receipt No: ACACDC-36501806 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Ntc Case Assign, #4 Exhibit Initial Status Conf Order, #5 Exhibit Min Order, #6 Exhibit Cert Mailing) (Attorney David A. Yudelson added to party Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC(pty:dft))(Yudelson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry Kouyoumdjian v. Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Kouyoumdjian
Represented By: Scott J Ferrell
Represented By: Victoria C. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tender & True Pet Nutrition, LLC
Represented By: David A. Yudelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tender and True Pet Nutrition, LLC
Represented By: David A. Yudelson
Represented By: Sydney M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Alphia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?