Loretta Bradley v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Loretta Bradley
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc, Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sandoz Inc, Accord Healthcare Inc, Hospira Worldwide Inc, Hospira Inc, Sun Pharma Global FZE and Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd
Case Number: 2:2023cv10264
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
2 Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties filed a notice of settlement on 1/9/2024 #27 . This action is therefore dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. For 90 days from the date of this order, the Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this order and to reopen the action nunc pro tunc on motion of any party. By operation of this order and without further court action, the dismissal in this case will convert to a dismissal with prejudice on the 91st day, absent a timely motion to vacate and reopen. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-10264 SB(KESx). (rn)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-10264 CAS(KESx). (rn)
January 9, 2024 Filing 27 Notice of Pending Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings filed by Defendants Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weiler, Eva Marie)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-10264 DDP(KESx). (rn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Paige N. Boldt on behalf of Plaintiff Loretta Bradley. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney is a licensed California attorney, CSB 308772, admitted to this Court on 4/3/2018, is active and in good standing. (lt)
December 8, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paige N Boldt on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
December 8, 2023 Filing 23 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
December 8, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
December 8, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:23-cv-1985 GPC-BLM, from Southern District of California (San Diego). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:23-cv-10264 CBM (KESx). (ghap)
December 8, 2023 Filing 20 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
December 6, 2023 Filing 19 Case transferred to District of United States District Court, Central District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of United States District Court, Central District of California*.*255 East Temple Street, Room 180**Los Angeles, CA 90012-3332*. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/6/23. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(A)) (jmo) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/6/2023) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
December 5, 2023 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Loretta Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paige N. Boldt ISO Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a))(Boldt, Paige) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: On November 28, 2023, the parties filed a joint status report wherein they state that "[p]rior to the MDL Court's transfer of Plaintiff's case to this Court, Plaintiff's and Defendant's counsel conferred and agreed that the Central District of California would be the proper venue for transfer." ECF No. 16 at 3. The parties further state that the MDL court erroneously transferred this case to the Southern District of California. Id. In light of this, the Court VACATES the December 5, 2023 Case Management Conference [ECF No. 15] and ORDERS the parties to file a joint motion to transfer venue, with a proposed order, on or before December 5, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11.29.23.(no document attached) (ajf) [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
November 28, 2023 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT JOINT by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Mannoia Weiler, Eva) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Setting Videoconference, Attorneys-Only Case Management Conference. Joint Status Report due by 11/28/2023. Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/6/23.(jmo) [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
November 6, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Counsel by Loretta Bradley (Boldt, Paige) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
November 6, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ryan L. Thompson and Mikal C. Watts by Loretta Bradley. (Boldt, Paige)Attorney Paige N. Boldt added to party Loretta Bradley(pty:pla) **QC mailer to withdraw motion and refile as a notice event 11/6/2023** (jmo). Modified on 11/16/2023 ** Second QC Mailer sent re: withdrawing motion (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
October 27, 2023 Filing 12 Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major assigned to transfer case from Eastern District of Lousianna. (no document attached) (jpp) [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
October 27, 2023 Filing 11 Case transferred in from the Eastern District of Louisiana; Case Number 2:17-cv-11798-JTM-MBN. Original file received electronically. [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to Southern District of California. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc 16511) (nml) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.] [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
September 26, 2023 Filing 9 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specified MDL Records to Be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(McRae, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.] [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC filed by Loretta Bradley. See Rec Doc 3090, filed 6/19/18 in 16md2740.(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.] [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.] [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
February 23, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sun Pharma Global FZE. (cbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.] [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
January 23, 2018 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Sun Pharma Global FZE filed by Loretta Bradley re #1 Complaint,. (Thompson, Ryan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.] [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Payton, Paige) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.] [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.] [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (Stall, Ellen) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.] [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6454010) filed by Loretta Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)Attorney Ryan L. Thompson added to party Loretta Bradley(pty:pla).(Thompson, Ryan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.] [Transferred from California Southern on 12/8/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loretta Bradley v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Eva Marie Mannoia Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Bradley
Represented By: Paige N Boldt
Represented By: Ryan L Thompson
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: Paige N. Boldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?