Debbie Ko v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Debbie Ko
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive, LLC and DOES 1 through 50 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2023cv10281
Filed: December 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Motion to Dismiss #8 is granted. No later than 2/19/2024, plaintiff may file a first amended complaint. (vdr)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 1/7/2025 at 9:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr)
January 18, 2024 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2 days, filed by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation.. (Norman, Robert)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 1/22/2024. (vdr)
January 12, 2024 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss #8 is taken off the 1/18/2024 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 1/18/2024. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 9, 2024 Filing 13 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #8 filed by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Norman, Robert)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #8 filed by Plaintiff Debbie Ko. (iv)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
December 18, 2023 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #8 filed by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit "2" - Substitution of Trustee, #3 Exhibit "3" - Notice of Default, #4 Exhibit "4" - Notice of Trustee's Sale)(Norman, Robert)
December 14, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 1/18/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Norman, Robert)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 served on 12/11/2023. (Norman, Robert)
December 10, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
December 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
December 7, 2023 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Debbie Ko in Los Angeles Superior Court on 10/16/2023, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation, (Norman, Robert)
December 7, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Norman, Robert)
December 7, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 23BBCV02398 Receipt No: ACACDC-36533021 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Complaint, #2 Exhibit "B" - Docket) (Attorney Robert W Norman, Jr added to party PHH Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft))(Norman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debbie Ko v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Ko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Represented By: Alexandra Coronado King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?