Latanya Williams v. Foothill Plaza Shopping Center LLC et al
Plaintiff: Latanya Williams
Defendant: Foothill Plaza Shopping Center, LLC, Foothill Plaza Shopping Center LLC and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2023cv10318
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Foothill Plaza Shopping Center LLC answer now due 2/18/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Foothill Plaza Shopping Center LLC.(Attorney Mark R Stapke added to party Foothill Plaza Shopping Center LLC(pty:dft))(Stapke, Mark)
January 3, 2024 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams, upon Defendant Foothill Plaza Shopping Center LLC served on 12/29/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mark R. Stapke - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Foothill Plaza Shopping Center LLC. (sh)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
December 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (sh)
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason)
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36540858 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Latanya Williams(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latanya Williams v. Foothill Plaza Shopping Center LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latanya Williams
Represented By: Jason J. Kim
Represented By: Jason T. Yoon
Represented By: Kevin Hyunjong Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foothill Plaza Shopping Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foothill Plaza Shopping Center LLC
Represented By: Mark R Stapke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?