Sam Benford v. Juan C. Pasillas et al
Plaintiff: Sam Benford
Defendant: Juan C. Pasillas doing business as Valley Mufflers And Automotive 2, MMK Partners, LLC, Does 1 to 10 and Keyvan Rahbar
Case Number: 2:2023cv10319
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Sam Benford. (Kim, Jason)
January 11, 2024 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sam Benford, upon Defendant Keyvan Rahbar served on 1/8/2024, answer due 1/29/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Keyvan Rahbar, as General Partner of M & K Partners, A General Partnership, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
January 8, 2024 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sam Benford, upon Defendant Juan C. Pasillas served on 1/6/2024, answer due 1/29/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Juan C. Pasillas D/B/A Valley Mufflers and Automotive 2, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
January 3, 2024 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #12 as to Defendants Juan C. Pasillas, Keyvan Rahbar. (rolm)
January 2, 2024 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Plaintiff Sam Benford. (Kim, Jason)
January 2, 2024 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Kevin Rahbar amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Sam Benford(Kim, Jason)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (cb)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE.: PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants MMK Partners, LLC, Juan C. Pasillas. (lh)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Sam Benford. (Kim, Jason)
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sam Benford. (Kim, Jason)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-36541023 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Sam Benford(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sam Benford v. Juan C. Pasillas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Benford
Represented By: Jason J. Kim
Represented By: Jason T. Yoon
Represented By: Kevin Hyunjong Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan C. Pasillas doing business as Valley Mufflers And Automotive 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMK Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keyvan Rahbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?