Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC v. Churchill MRA Funding I, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, and Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Churchill MRA Funding I, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, Sunrise NPL, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, Justin Ehrlich, Sorabh Maheshwari, Derrick Land, Travis Masters, Luke Alexander Ware, Does 1 to 25 Inclusive, Churchill MRA Funding I, LLC, Sunrise NPL, LLC and DOES 1 to 10 Inclusive
Cross Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver For First Republic Bank, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, First Republic Bank, ROES, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (as acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of cross-defendant First Republic Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver), Benjamin Donel, Easy Financial LLC and Holy Huton LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv10742
Filed: December 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Cross-Complainant Sunrise NPL, LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (as acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of cross-defendant First Republic Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver). (Selvin, Peter)
January 24, 2024 Filing 29 Verified ANSWER to Amended Crossclaim of Sunrise NPL, LLC filed by Cross-Defendant Benjamin Donel, Easy Financial LLC, Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC.(Attorney Jeffre Todd Lowe added to party Benjamin Donel(pty:crd), Attorney Jeffre Todd Lowe added to party Easy Financial LLC(pty:crd), Attorney Jeffre Todd Lowe added to party Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC(pty:crd))(Lowe, Jeffre)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2024 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 11/22/2024 at 08:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 12/3/2024 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on January 29, 2024 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby orders this case referred to: ADR Procedure No. 3: Private mediation. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: April 1, 2024. (iv)
January 22, 2024 Filing 26 RESPONSE filed by Cross Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (as acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of cross-defendant First Republic Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver)to Order to Show Cause, #19 (Henderson, Matthew)
January 22, 2024 Filing 25 STATEMENT Joint Statement re: Civil L.R. 7-3 Conference on Cross-Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (as acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of cross-defendant First Republic Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver) (Henderson, Matthew)
January 22, 2024 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Jeffre T Lowe re Order to Show Cause, #19 filed by Plaintiff Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC. (Lowe, Jeffre)
January 19, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Lowe, Jeffre)
January 19, 2024 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Jeffre T Lowe filed by Plaintiff Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC. (Lowe, Jeffre)
January 19, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Churchill MRA Funding I, LLC, identifying Cross-Complainant Sunrise NPL, LLC. (Attorney Peter S Selvin added to party Churchill MRA Funding I, LLC(pty:dft))(Selvin, Peter)
January 19, 2024 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Peter S. Selvin filed by Defendant Churchill MRA Funding I, LLC. (Selvin, Peter)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT by Judge John F. Walter. In light of FDIC-R's dismissal from this action, the Court orders the parties to show cause, in writing, on or before January 22, 2024, why this court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's remaining claims and remand this action to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (iv)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION AGAINST CROSS-DEFENDANT FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION AS RECEIVER FOR FIRST REPUBLIC BANK #16 by Judge John F. Walter. The Eighth Cause of Action for Unjust Enrichment, which is the only claim and/or cause of action alleged against FDIC-R in the First-Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross-Complainant Sunrise NPL, LLC, is dismissed without prejudice, thereby dismissing FDIC-R from this entire case. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (iv)
January 12, 2024 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 Days, filed by Defendant Churchill MRA Funding I, LLC.. (Selvin, Peter)
January 12, 2024 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Dismiss Cross-Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation filed by Cross-Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Scott)
January 8, 2024 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Matthew S. Henderson filed by Cross Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (as acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of cross-defendant First Republic Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver). (Henderson, Matthew)
January 8, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Cross-Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (as acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of cross-defendant First Republic Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver), identifying The Vanguard Group, Inc.; Fidelity National Title Insurance Company; and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Henderson, Matthew)
January 4, 2024 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Scott S. Humphreys filed by Cross Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Humphreys, Scott)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) #10 , by Judge John F. Walter. The date by which Chase shall respond to Sunrise's first amended cross-complaint is extended to January 29, 2024. (rolm)
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING filed December 28, 2023 re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less),, #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Henderson, Matthew)
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (as acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of cross-defendant First Republic Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver) answer now due 1/29/2024, re Amended Crossclaim filed by Cross-Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (as acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of cross-defendant First Republic Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver).(Attorney Matthew S Henderson added to party JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (as acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of cross-defendant First Republic Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver)(pty:crd))(Henderson, Matthew)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for January 29, 2024 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before January 12, 2024. The title page of the Joint Report must state the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. Both the Court and counsel bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in Federal Court. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
December 28, 2023 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 25, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 27, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
December 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
December 22, 2023 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC in Los Angeles Superior Court on 4/27/2023, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
December 22, 2023 CROSS COMPLAINT filed by Defendant/Cross Complainant Sunrise NPL, LLC filed in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/7/2023, attached as Exhibit 10. (jtil) Modified on 12/27/2023 (jtil).
December 22, 2023 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Churchill MRA Funding I, LLC, AND Sunrise NPL, LLC in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/7/2023, attached as Exhibit 12.(jtil)
December 22, 2023 ANSWER to Cross Complaint filed by Plaintiffs/Cross-Defendants Easy Financial LLC, Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC, and Benjamin Donel. (jtil)
December 22, 2023 AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT filed by Defendant/Cross Complainant Sunrise NPL, LLC, in Los Angeles Superior Court on 11/14/2023, attached as Exhibit 60(jtil)
December 22, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Cross-Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver For First Republic Bank, identifying Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Humphreys, Scott)
December 22, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Cross Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver For First Republic Bank. (Humphreys, Scott)
December 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 23STCV09703 Receipt No: ACACDC-36624871 - Fee: $405, filed by Cross-Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver For First Republic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67) (Attorney Scott S. Humphreys added to party Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver For First Republic Bank(pty:crd))(Humphreys, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC v. Churchill MRA Funding I, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jeffre Todd Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Churchill MRA Funding I, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise NPL, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorabh Maheshwari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Alexander Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Churchill MRA Funding I, LLC
Represented By: Peter S Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise NPL, LLC
Represented By: Stanton Lawrence Stein
Represented By: Erica Sang-Ah Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver For First Republic Bank
Represented By: Scott S. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Scott S. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: First Republic Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ROES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (as acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of cross-defendant First Republic Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver)
Represented By: Matthew S Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Benjamin Donel
Represented By: Jeffre Todd Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Easy Financial LLC
Represented By: Jeffre Todd Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Holy Huton LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?