Anthony Gallegos v. Sealy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Gallegos
Defendant: Catalina Torres, Sealy, Inc., Sealy Mattress Manufacturing Company and Does
Case Number: 2:2023cv10809
Filed: December 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: A Joel Richlin
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2024 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 11/8/2024 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 11/19/2024 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on February 5, 2024 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby orders this case referred to: ADR Procedure No. 3: Private mediation. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: June 3, 2024. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference is due on: June 7, 2024. (rolm)
January 18, 2024 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 days, filed by Defendants Sealy Mattress Manufacturing Company, Sealy, Inc., Catalina Torres.. (Keegan, Timothy)
January 10, 2024 Filing 12 Notice of Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Sealy, Inc., Catalina Torres. (Keegan, Timothy)
January 5, 2024 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Caleb Anthony Miller as Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Anthony Gallegos. (Miller, Caleb)
January 5, 2024 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Timothy M. Keegan Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendants Sealy Mattress Manufacturing Company, Sealy, Inc., Catalina Torres. (Keegan, Timothy)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for February 5, 2024 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before January 19, 2024. (iv)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
December 28, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
December 28, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
December 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (ghap)
December 27, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, Sealy Mattress Manufacturing Company, Tempur Sealy International, Inc., Catalina Torres. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Anthony Gallegos. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/29/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
December 27, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Anthony Gallegos, upon Defendant Sealy, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 11/20/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Timothy M Keegan, Attorney for Defendant Sealy, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C) (ghap)
December 27, 2023 NON CONFORM COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Anthony Gallegos, upon Defendant Catalina Torres acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Timothy M Keegan, Attorney for Defendant Catalina Torres. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT D) (ghap)
December 27, 2023 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Sealy, Inc., Catalina Torres, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 12/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Notice of Confirmation of E-Filing of Notice of Removal)(Keegan, Timothy)
December 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Sealy, Inc., Catalina Torres, identifying Anthony Gallegos, Sealy, Inc., Catalina Torres. (Keegan, Timothy)
December 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, Los Angeles County, case number 23PSCV03015 Receipt No: ACACDC-36635621 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendants Catalina Torres, Sealy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Timothy E. Keegan, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Accompanying Documents in State Court Action, #5 Exhibit C - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Sealy, Inc.), #6 Exhibit D - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Catalina Torres), #7 Exhibit E - Defendants' Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Timothy Mark Keegan added to party Sealy, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Mark Keegan added to party Catalina Torres(pty:dft))(Keegan, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Gallegos v. Sealy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gallegos
Represented By: Caleb Anthony Miller
Represented By: Justin R. Wilmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalina Torres
Represented By: Timothy Mark Keegan
Represented By: Katie Michelle Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealy, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Mark Keegan
Represented By: Katie Michelle Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealy Mattress Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?