Coastal Ranches Conservancy v. California Department of Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Coastal Ranches Conservancy
Defendant: California Department of Transportation and Tony Tavares
Case Number: 2:2024cv00468
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2024 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-4 days, filed by Plaintiff Coastal Ranches Conservancy.. (Maharg, Erica)
March 14, 2024 Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) CONTINUING TIME OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The time of the scheduling conference in this matter has been continued from 11:00 AM on March 25, 2024, to 1:30 PM, the same date and time as the pending motions at Dkt. Nos. #12 and #20 .THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 13, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Causes of Action #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. (2) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Reply (Motion related) - under Category - Responses, Replies and Other Motion Related Documents. (3) Motion event utilized in docketing this filing. Counsel shall use the SEARCH function on the CM/ECF toolbar for events if you are unsure of the events to use. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
March 11, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Causes of Action filed by Defendants California Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares. Motion set for hearing on 3/25/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Wynne, Justin)
March 4, 2024 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Plaintiff Coastal Ranches Conservancy. (Maharg, Erica)
March 4, 2024 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Plaintiff Coastal Ranches Conservancy. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Erica Maharg ISO Oppn to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Doug Campbell ISO Oppn to Motion to Dismiss)(Maharg, Erica)
February 26, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin Wynne counsel for Defendants California Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares. Adding Hunter Collins as counsel of record for California Department of Transportation; Tony Tavares for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants California Department of Transportation; Tony Tavares. (Wynne, Justin)
February 26, 2024 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin Wynne counsel for Defendants California Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares. Adding Abigail Mullett as counsel of record for Department of Transportation; Tony Tavares for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants California Department of Transportation; Tony Tavares. (Wynne, Justin)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court hereby orders the following: 1. The hearing for the Motion to Dismiss shall be continued to March 25, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. 2. Plaintiff shall file its opposition to the Motion to Dismiss on or before March 4, 2024, in accordance with L.R. 7-11. 3. Defendants shall file any reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss on or before March 11, 2024, in accordance with L.R. 7-11. (rolm)
February 22, 2024 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Continue Defendant's Motion to Dismiss from 3/18/2024 to 3/25/2024 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by plaintiff Coastal Ranches Conservancy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maharg, Erica)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (pk)
February 13, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants California Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Request for Judicial Notice) (Attorney Justin Wynne added to party California Department of Transportation(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Wynne added to party Tony Tavares(pty:dft)) (Wynne, Justin)
January 30, 2024 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Coastal Ranches Conservancy, upon Defendant Tony Tavares served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tony Tavares, Director of California Department of Transportation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Maharg, Erica)
January 30, 2024 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Coastal Ranches Conservancy, upon Defendant California Department of Transportation served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon California Department of Transportation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Maharg, Erica)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk)
January 18, 2024 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants California Department of Transportation, Tony Tavares. (Attachments: #1 Tony Tavares) (sh)
January 18, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
January 18, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
January 18, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh)
January 18, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Coastal Ranches Conservancy, (Maharg, Erica)
January 18, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Coastal Ranches Conservancy. (Maharg, Erica)
January 18, 2024 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Coastal Ranches Conservancy. (Attachments: #1 Tavares summons request)(Maharg, Erica)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36749250 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff Coastal Ranches Conservancy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NOI) (Attorney Erica A Maharg added to party Coastal Ranches Conservancy (pty:pla))(Maharg, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coastal Ranches Conservancy v. California Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coastal Ranches Conservancy
Represented By: Erica A Maharg
Represented By: Daniel G Cooper
Represented By: Harrison M. Beck
Represented By: Harrison Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Transportation
Represented By: Justin Wynne
Represented By: Abigail Mullett
Represented By: Hunter Wesley Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Tavares
Represented By: Justin Wynne
Represented By: Abigail Mullett
Represented By: Hunter Wesley Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?