Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Shenzhen Lanxun Trade Co., Ltd et al
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation, and Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: SHENZHEN LANXUN TRADE CO., LTD, SHENZHEN CHIRREY TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC,, Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00615
Filed: January 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2024 Filing 23 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., (Goldstein, Aaron)
March 19, 2024 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. (Goldstein, Aaron)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey M. Zielinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and designating Henry L. Whitehead as local counsel #20 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
February 27, 2024 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey M. Zielinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-36986151) filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Whitehead, Henry)
February 15, 2024 Filing 19 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This case has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Otis D. Wright II. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls not only upon the attorneys in the action, but upon the court as well. Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
February 14, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Amazon's Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..(Attorney Aaron Robert Goldstein added to party Amazon.com Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Robert Goldstein added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Goldstein, Aaron)
February 7, 2024 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thaddeus S. Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36878008) filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Whitehead, Henry)
January 29, 2024 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Shenzhen Chirrey Technology Co., Ltd, Shenzhen Lanxun Trade Co., Ltd. (lc)
January 26, 2024 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Whitehead, Henry)
January 25, 2024 Filing 14 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Whitehead, Henry)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR Motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
January 24, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The event is located under Civil Events- Other Filings - Miscellaneous Filings and by selecting Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71). (car)
January 24, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 , Summons Request #7 , Summons Request #6 , Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
January 24, 2024 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
January 24, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
January 24, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (car)
January 24, 2024 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation,. (Whitehead, Henry)
January 24, 2024 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation,. (Whitehead, Henry)
January 24, 2024 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation,. (Whitehead, Henry)
January 24, 2024 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation,. (Whitehead, Henry)
January 24, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation,, identifying TOKIO MARINE GROUP. (Whitehead, Henry)
January 24, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation, identifying Tokio Marine Group as Corporate Parent. (Whitehead, Henry)
January 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36772113 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Henry Louis Whitehead added to party PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation,(pty:pla))(Whitehead, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Shenzhen Lanxun Trade Co., Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation,
Represented By: Henry Louis Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Henry Louis Whitehead
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHENZHEN LANXUN TRADE CO., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHENZHEN CHIRREY TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Kichong Hwang
Represented By: Aaron Robert Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Represented By: Steven Kichong Hwang
Represented By: Aaron Robert Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?