Marina Properties, LLC v. Marina Properties Company et al
Defendant: Marina Properties Company, Chung Cho, Young Dai Lee, New Marina Cleaners, LLC, Soon Ae Kim, Jung Yol Lee, Young S Suh and Hae Sun Suh
Counter Defendant: Marina Properties, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00674
Filed: January 24, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Answer to Counterclaim #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): The caption/title page is missing the captions of the pleadings filed. The complaint caption and the Counterclaim caption. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
March 21, 2024 Filing 23 ANSWER OF COUNTER- DEFENDANT MARINA PROPERTIES COMPANY N/K/A MARINA PROPERTIES, LLC ANSWER to Counterclaim, #20 filed by Counter-Defendant Marina Properties, LLC.(Cohen, Albert)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (ys)
March 18, 2024 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Young Dai Lee, Jung Yol Lee, Young S. Suh and Hae Sun Suh Jung Yol Lee, Young Dai Lee, Hae Sun Suh, Young S Suh, (Attorney Murray M Sinclair added to party Hae Sun Suh(pty:dft), Attorney Murray M Sinclair added to party Young S Suh(pty:dft))(Sinclair, Murray)
March 18, 2024 Filing 20 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Marina Properties Company n/k/a Marina Properties, LLC Marina Properties, LLC; Jury Demand, filed by Defendant and Counterclaimants Young Dai Lee, Jung Yol Lee, Young S. Suh and Hae Sun Suh Jung Yol Lee, Young Dai Lee.(Sinclair, Murray)
March 18, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #12 with JURY DEMAND Answer of Defendants Young Dai Lee, Jung Yol Lee, Young S. Suh and Hae Sun Suh to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Jung Yol Lee, Young Dai Lee.(Attorney Murray M Sinclair added to party Jung Yol Lee(pty:dft), Attorney Murray M Sinclair added to party Young Dai Lee(pty:dft))(Sinclair, Murray)
March 8, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff MARINA PROPERTIES, LLC Marina Properties, LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a) or (c) as to New Marina Cleaners, LLC. (Cohen, Albert)
March 5, 2024 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marina Properties, LLC, upon Defendant Jung Yol Lee served on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jung Yol Lee, an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy (Cohen, Albert)
March 5, 2024 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marina Properties, LLC, upon Defendant Young Dai Lee served on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Young Dai Lee, an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Cohen, Albert)
March 4, 2024 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Marina Properties, LLC, upon Defendant Young S Suh served on 3/4/2024, answer due 3/25/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Young S. Suh in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Cohen, Albert)
March 4, 2024 Filing 14 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marina Properties, LLC. (Cohen, Albert)
February 27, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTEIS (Local Rule 7.1-1) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marina Properties, LLC, identifying Charles E. McGuire, Mark Watson, Marina Properties, LLC. (Cohen, Albert)
February 27, 2024 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Marina Properties, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Marina Properties, LLC(Cohen, Albert)
February 27, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Albert Martin Cohen counsel for Plaintiff Marina Properties, LLC. Adding Albert M. Cohen as counsel of record for Plaintiff, MARINA PROPERTIES, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff MARINA PROPERTIES, LLC. (Attorney Albert Martin Cohen added to party Marina Properties, LLC(pty:pla))(Cohen, Albert)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. See order for details. (ys)
January 25, 2024 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marina Properties, LLC. (Hamlin, Richard)
January 25, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
January 25, 2024 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Chung Cho, Soon Ae Kim, Jung Yol Lee, Young Dai Lee, Marina Properties Company, New Marina Cleaners, LLC, Hae Sun Suh, Young S Suh. (ghap)
January 25, 2024 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
January 25, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
January 24, 2024 Filing 4 Corrected NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marina Properties, LLC, (Hamlin, Richard)
January 24, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marina Properties, LLC, (Hamlin, Richard)
January 24, 2024 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Marina Properties, LLC. (Hamlin, Richard)
January 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36789953 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Marina Properties, LLC. (Attorney Richard F Hamlin added to party Marina Properties, LLC(pty:pla))(Hamlin, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marina Properties, LLC v. Marina Properties Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Marina Properties, LLC
Represented By: Richard F Hamlin
Represented By: Albert Martin Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marina Properties Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chung Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Dai Lee
Represented By: Murray M Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Marina Cleaners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soon Ae Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jung Yol Lee
Represented By: Murray M Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young S Suh
Represented By: Murray M Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hae Sun Suh
Represented By: Murray M Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?