Julio Aviles Sr v. USP Lompoc Warden
Petitioner: Julio Aviles, Sr
Respondent: USP Lompoc Warden
Case Number: 2:2024cv00776
Filed: January 24, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
2 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2024 Filing 8 BRIEF filed by Petitioner Julio Aviles, Sr. (hr)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#24-020) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Monica Ramrez Almadani, this case is transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr to the calendar of Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-00776 MRA(MRW). (cbr)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Habeas). (gk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cameron Cortez Vanderwall counsel for Respondent USP Lompoc Warden. Filed by Respondent USP Lompoc Warden. (Attorney Cameron Cortez Vanderwall added to party USP Lompoc Warden(pty:res))(Vanderwall, Cameron)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: SCREENING OF HABEAS PETITION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court will allow Petitioner to supplement his petition with a clear, direct, and focused statement (not to exceed five pages) explaining how this California federal court has jurisdiction over the claims in the petition. Petitioner's statement will be due by March 15. The assigned AUSA will file a notice of appearance within 14 days. (see document for further details) Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (hr)
January 31, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (et)
January 24, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR PERMISSION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Petitioner Julio Aviles, Sr. (et)
January 24, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Filing fee $ 5 FEE DUE.), filed by Petitioner Julio Aviles, Sr. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julio Aviles Sr v. USP Lompoc Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julio Aviles, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USP Lompoc Warden
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Cameron Cortez Vanderwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?