Marine Altunyan et al v. Citigroup Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marine Altunyan, Raymond Aghajanian, Anait Ataryan, Jack Bajakejian, Karine Charchyan, Margarita Chldrian, Ara Dabandjian, Arman Davtyan, Arthur Demirchyan, Dickran Garibyan, Armen Gazdzhyan, Edgar Ghazaryan, Adriana Goryan, Samvel Goryan, Garnik Hakobyan, Meghedi Haritooryan Vartanian, Vache Harutiunian, Avetik Harutunian, Marine Gazdzhyan, John Harutunian, Tigran Hovhannisyan, Armen Iskanian, John Kankababian, Fimi Karajian, Gegham Margaryan, Armen Martirosyan, Saro B. Marukoglu, Raffi A. Marukoglu, Artur Mkrtchyan, Martin Narinyan, Kamo Nazaryan, Armine Oganisyan, Emily Amilia Ordakyan, Zhubert Pettrosian, Satik Sara Pogosyan, Zhanet Pogosyan, Anna Sarkisyan, Sinan Sinanyan, Diana Soibatian, Rose Soibatian, Behnaz Tabibian, Tina Tacheji, Hasmik Tamazyan, Hermine Teroganesyan, Christine Topachikyan, Ani Tsaturyan, Sam Valeri, Manvel Voskerichyan, Henrick Yeghikian and Vartan Chldrian
Defendant: Citigroup, Inc., Citibank N.A. and Does 1-10 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2024cv01257
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
2 Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
3 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. All of the cases except Grigorian, CV 23-9519, are STAYED pending the Court's hearing and ruling on the Motion to Compel Arbitration in Grigorian. Any deadlines to file responses to Complaints or First Amended Complaints are STAYED. No further Motions and no further briefing on already filed motions shall be filed pending the Court's ruling on the Motion to Compel Arbitration in Grigorian, CV 23-9519. (iv)
March 18, 2024 Filing 15 MINUTES OF New Case Status Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court is advised that the case has been transferred to the Honorable Michael W. Fitzgerald. The conference is adjourned. Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Eileen Keusseyan. Attorney for Defendant(s): Kalama M. Lui-Kwan. Courtroom Deputy: Paul M. Cruz. Time in Court: 10 mins. Court Reporter: April Lassiter-Benson. (pc)
March 18, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Aghajanian, Marine Altunyan, Anait Ataryan, Jack Bajakejian, Karine Charchyan, Margarita Chldrian, Vartan Chldrian, Ara Dabandjian, Arman Davtyan, Arthur Demirchyan, Dickran Garibyan, Armen Gazdzhyan, Marine Gazdzhyan, Edgar Ghazaryan, Adriana Goryan, Samvel Goryan, Garnik Hakobyan, Meghedi Haritooryan Vartanian, Vache Harutiunian, Avetik Harutunian, John Harutunian, Tigran Hovhannisyan, Armen Iskanian, John Kankababian, Fimi Karajian, Gegham Margaryan, Armen Martirosyan, Raffi A. Marukoglu, Saro B. Marukoglu, Artur Mkrtchyan, Martin Narinyan, Kamo Nazaryan, Armine Oganisyan, Emily Amilia Ordakyan, Zhubert Pettrosian, Satik Sara Pogosyan, Zhanet Pogosyan, Anna Sarkisyan, Sinan Sinanyan, Diana Soibatian, Rose Soibatian, Behnaz Tabibian, Tina Tacheji, Hasmik Tamazyan, Hermine Teroganesyan, Christine Topachikyan, Ani Tsaturyan, Sam Valeri, Manvel Voskerichyan, Henrick Yeghikian. Related Case(s): 2:23-cv-09539-MWF-E; 2:24-cv-01214-ODW-PD; 2:24-cv-01489-HDV-BFM (Keusseyan, Eileen)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Declaration Remote Appearance filed by Plaintiffs #10 - The request for remote appearance is DENIED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE by Judge Percy Anderson, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. This case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings.All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The case number will now read as: 2:24-cv-01257 MWF(Ex). (rn)
March 8, 2024 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Eileen Keusseyan re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #8 re: Remote Appearance filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Aghajanian, Marine Altunyan, Anait Ataryan, Jack Bajakejian, Karine Charchyan, Margarita Chldrian, Vartan Chldrian, Ara Dabandjian, Arman Davtyan, Arthur Demirchyan, Dickran Garibyan, Armen Gazdzhyan, Marine Gazdzhyan, Edgar Ghazaryan, Adriana Goryan, Samvel Goryan, Garnik Hakobyan, Meghedi Haritooryan Vartanian, Vache Harutiunian, Avetik Harutunian, John Harutunian, Tigran Hovhannisyan, Armen Iskanian, John Kankababian, Fimi Karajian, Gegham Margaryan, Armen Martirosyan, Raffi A. Marukoglu, Saro B. Marukoglu, Artur Mkrtchyan, Martin Narinyan, Kamo Nazaryan, Armine Oganisyan, Emily Amilia Ordakyan, Zhubert Pettrosian, Satik Sara Pogosyan, Zhanet Pogosyan, Anna Sarkisyan, Sinan Sinanyan, Diana Soibatian, Rose Soibatian, Behnaz Tabibian, Tina Tacheji, Hasmik Tamazyan, Hermine Teroganesyan, Christine Topachikyan, Ani Tsaturyan, Sam Valeri, Manvel Voskerichyan, Henrick Yeghikian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Keusseyan, Eileen)
February 20, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Conformed Answer re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Citibank's Answer)(Nikdel, Susan)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 3/18/2024 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
February 15, 2024 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
February 15, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
February 15, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (sh)
February 14, 2024 CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Citibank N.A., Citigroup, Inc., Does. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Emily Amilia Ordakyan, Armine Oganisyan, Tigran Hovhannisyan, Ara Dabandjian, Armen Martirosyan, Vache Harutiunian, Raymond Aghajanian, Marine Altunyan, Avetik Harutunian, Martin Narinyan, Meghedi Haritooryan Vartanian, Hermine Teroganesyan, Saro B. Marukoglu, Gegham Margaryan, Raffi A. Marukoglu, Rose Soibatian, John Harutunian, Samvel Goryan, Henrick Yeghikian, Fimi Karajian, Dickran Garibyan, Kamo Nazaryan, Satik Sara Pogosyan, Armen Gazdzhyan, Manvel Voskerichyan, Tina Tacheji, Armen Iskanian, Ani Tsaturyan, Adriana Goryan, John Kankababian, Artur Mkrtchyan, Margarita Chldrian, Diana Soibatian, Zhanet Pogosyan, Anait Ataryan, Arthur Demirchyan, Behnaz Tabibian, Edgar Ghazaryan, Sam Valeri, Garnik Hakobyan, Sinan Sinanyan, Arman Davtyan, Vartan Chldrian, Jack Bajakejian, Zhubert Pettrosian, Christine Topachikyan, Anna Sarkisyan, Hasmik Tamazyan, Marine Gazdzhyan, Karine Charchyan. [FILED IN STATE COURT 11/29/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
February 14, 2024 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF SUMMONS AND ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Citibank N.A.[STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh)
February 14, 2024 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Emily Amilia Ordakyan, Armine Oganisyan, Tigran Hovhannisyan, Ara Dabandjian, Armen Martirosyan, Vache Harutiunian, Raymond Aghajanian, Marine Altunyan, Avetik Harutunian, Martin Narinyan, Meghedi Haritooryan Vartanian, Hermine Teroganesyan, Saro B. Marukoglu, Gegham Margaryan, Raffi A. Marukoglu, Rose Soibatian, John Harutunian, Samvel Goryan, Fimi Karajian, Dickran Garibyan, Kamo Nazaryan, Satik Sara Pogosyan, Armen Gazdzhyan, Manvel Voskerichyan, Tina Tacheji, Armen Iskanian, Ani Tsaturyan, Adriana Goryan, John Kankababian, Artur Mkrtchyan, Margarita Chldrian, Diana Soibatian, Zhanet Pogosyan, Anait Ataryan, Arthur Demirchyan, Behnaz Tabibian, Edgar Ghazaryan, Sam Valeri, Garnik Hakobyan, Sinan Sinanyan, Arman Davtyan, Vartan Chldrian, Jack Bajakejian, Zhubert Pettrosian, Christine Topachikyan, Anna Sarkisyan, Hasmik Tamazyan, Marine Gazdzhyan, Karine Charchyan pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Citigroup, Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 1/22/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
February 14, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Citibank, N.A., identifying Citicorp LLC, Citigroup Inc.. (Lui-Kwan, Kalama)
February 14, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Citibank, N.A.. (Lui-Kwan, Kalama)
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23STCV29174 Receipt No: ACACDC-36920682 - Fee: $405, filed by defendant Citigroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Kalama Mark Lui-Kwan added to party Citibank, N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Kalama Mark Lui-Kwan added to party Citigroup, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lui-Kwan, Kalama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marine Altunyan et al v. Citigroup Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marine Altunyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Aghajanian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anait Ataryan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Bajakejian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karine Charchyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Chldrian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ara Dabandjian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arman Davtyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Demirchyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dickran Garibyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armen Gazdzhyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Ghazaryan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Goryan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samvel Goryan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garnik Hakobyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghedi Haritooryan Vartanian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vache Harutiunian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avetik Harutunian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marine Gazdzhyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Harutunian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tigran Hovhannisyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armen Iskanian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kankababian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fimi Karajian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gegham Margaryan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armen Martirosyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saro B. Marukoglu
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raffi A. Marukoglu
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artur Mkrtchyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Narinyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamo Nazaryan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armine Oganisyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Amilia Ordakyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhubert Pettrosian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satik Sara Pogosyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhanet Pogosyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Sarkisyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sinan Sinanyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Soibatian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Soibatian
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Behnaz Tabibian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Tacheji
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hasmik Tamazyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hermine Teroganesyan
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Topachikyan
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ani Tsaturyan
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Valeri
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manvel Voskerichyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrick Yeghikian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vartan Chldrian
Represented By: Harout Greg Keosian
Represented By: Eileen Keusseyan
Represented By: Melkon Rafi Melkonian
Represented By: Zareh Jack Kousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank N.A.
Represented By: Kalama Mark Lui-Kwan
Represented By: Susan Nona Nikdel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?