Barry Tubb v. Paramount Pictures Corporation
Plaintiff: Barry Tubb
Defendant: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Case Number: 2:2024cv01417
Filed: February 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Filing 33 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Paramount Pictures Corporation, identifying Paramount Global, f/k/a ViacomCBS Inc.; National Amusements, Inc.; and Barry Tubb. (Cate-Gumpert, Sam)
April 19, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
April 19, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Paramount Pictures Corporation. Items not conducive to e-filing: Exhibit B and C: DVD. (lom)
April 19, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #21 , Notice of Appearance #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 18, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Paramount Pictures Corporation of DVDs - Top Gun: Maverick and Top Gun. (Cate-Gumpert, Sam)
April 18, 2024 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Dan Laidman in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #24 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Causes of Action Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Special Motion to Strike #23 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Bond Security for Costs and Fees #25 filed by Defendant Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Manually Filed, #2 Exhibit C - Manually Filed, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F)(Cate-Gumpert, Sam)
April 18, 2024 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Amanda Hutchison in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Causes of Action Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Special Motion to Strike #23 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Bond Security for Costs and Fees #25 filed by Defendant Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cate-Gumpert, Sam)
April 18, 2024 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #24 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Causes of Action Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Special Motion to Strike #23 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Bond Security for Costs and Fees #25 filed by Defendant Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Cate-Gumpert, Sam)
April 18, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Bond Security for Costs and Fees filed by Defendant Paramount Pictures Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 6/24/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cate-Gumpert, Sam)
April 18, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Paramount Pictures Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 6/24/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cate-Gumpert, Sam)
April 18, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Causes of Action Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Special Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Paramount Pictures Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 6/24/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cate-Gumpert, Sam)
April 18, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sam F Cate-Gumpert on behalf of Defendant Paramount Pictures Corporation (Attorney Sam F Cate-Gumpert added to party Paramount Pictures Corporation(pty:dft))(Cate-Gumpert, Sam)
April 18, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kelli L Sager on behalf of Defendant Paramount Pictures Corporation (Attorney Kelli L Sager added to party Paramount Pictures Corporation(pty:dft))(Sager, Kelli)
April 17, 2024 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Hearing re Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Special Motion to Strike, Motion to Dismiss, Bond Motion filed by defendant Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Daniel Aaron Laidman added to party Paramount Pictures Corporation(pty:dft))(Laidman, Daniel)
March 6, 2024 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Barry Tubb. upon Paramount Pictures Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/27/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Jonathan Strauss. (Casas, Joseph)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge George H Wu. APPLICATION of Attorney Dennis C. Postiglione to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Barry Tubb, designating Alexander T. Gruft as local counsel GRANTED.; granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Dennis C. Postiglione. (aco)
February 26, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number incomplete; missing initials of Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER IN RESPONSE TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dennis C. Postiglione to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Barry Tubb (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36957111) #7 by Judge George H Wu. Docket No. 7 is stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice #8 filed on February 22, 2024. (rolm)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
February 23, 2024 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dennis C. Postiglione to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Barry Tubb (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 2/22/2024, Receipt No. 36957111) filed by Plaintiff Barry Tubb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gruft, Alexander)
February 23, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexander T Gruft counsel for Plaintiff Barry Tubb. Filed by Plaintiff Alexander T Gruft. (Attorney Alexander T Gruft added to party Barry Tubb(pty:pla))(Gruft, Alexander)
February 23, 2024 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Paramount Pictures Corporation. (sh)
February 23, 2024 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
February 23, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
February 23, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (sh)
February 22, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dennis C. Postiglione to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Barry Tubb (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36957111) #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District for the practice of law, in which the attorney is physically present on a regular basis to conduct business. (lt)
February 22, 2024 Filing 7 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 2/23/24 SEE DOCKET NO. 16] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dennis C. Postiglione to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Barry Tubb (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36957111) filed by Plaintiff Barry Tubb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Casas, Joseph) Modified on 2/25/2024 (rolm).
February 21, 2024 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Barry Tubb. (Casas, Joseph)
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Barry Tubb. (Casas, Joseph)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Barry Tubb, (Casas, Joseph)
February 21, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Barry Tubb. (Casas, Joseph)
February 21, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Barry Tubb. (Casas, Joseph)
February 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36951910 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Barry Tubb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memo Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Top Gun Credit, #3 Exhibit C - Original Ritts Image, #4 Exhibit D - TG2 Screenshot, #5 Exhibit E - Paramount Global) (Attorney Joseph N Casas added to party Barry Tubb(pty:pla))(Casas, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barry Tubb v. Paramount Pictures Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Tubb
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: Joseph N. Casas
Represented By: Alexander T Gruft
Represented By: Dennis C. Postiglione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Represented By: Kelli L Sager
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Laidman
Represented By: Sam F Cate-Gumpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?