Michael Aram, Inc. v. Sagebrook Home, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Aram, Inc.
Defendant: Sagebrook Home, LLC and DOES 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2024cv01530
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2024 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sagebrook Home, LLC answer now due 4/24/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Sagebrook Home, LLC.(Attorney David Martinez added to party Sagebrook Home, LLC(pty:dft))(Martinez, David)
March 8, 2024 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Aram, Inc., upon Defendant Sagebrook Home, LLC served on 3/4/2024, answer due 3/25/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jason Kachan c/o Patricia Romerez/Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Doniger, Stephen)
March 6, 2024 Filing 11 On March 1, 2024, the Court updated its standing orders, including the Civil Standing Order, the Mandatory Scheduling Conference Order, the Motion for Summary Judgment Order, and the Civil Pretrial and Trial Order. The parties are directed to read and, where possible (e.g., on any summary judgment motion for which the parties have not yet exchanged papers), comply with these updated standing orders, which can be found on Judge Blumenfeld's webpage. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Civil standing order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
February 26, 2024 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sagebrook Home, LLC. (lh)
February 26, 2024 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
February 26, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 26, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
February 23, 2024 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Aram, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
February 23, 2024 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Michael Aram, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
February 23, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Aram, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen)
February 23, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Aram, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen)
February 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36971238 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Michael Aram, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Michael Aram, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Aram, Inc. v. Sagebrook Home, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Aram, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M. Doniger
Represented By: Kelsey Marie Schultz
Represented By: Scott A. Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagebrook Home, LLC
Represented By: Zachary A Cohen
Represented By: David Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?