R. Lance Hill v. Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc. et al
Plaintiff: R. Lance Hill
Defendant: Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc., Amazon Studios LLC, United Artists Pictures Inc, Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2024cv01587
Filed: February 27, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stephanie S Christensen
Referring Judge: Hernan D Vera
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dylan J Price counsel for Defendants Amazon Studios LLC, Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc., United Artists Pictures Inc. Adding Dylan J. Price as counsel of record for Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc., Amazon Studios LLC and United Artists Pictures Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc., Amazon Studios LLC and United Artists Pictures Inc.. (Attorney Dylan J Price added to party Amazon Studios LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dylan J Price added to party Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dylan J Price added to party United Artists Pictures Inc(pty:dft))(Price, Dylan)
April 22, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Wook Hwang attorney for Defendants Amazon Studios LLC, Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc., United Artists Pictures Inc. Changing firm name to Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP and address to 30 Rockefeller Plaza, New York, New York 10112-0015. Filed by Defendants Amazon Studios LLC, Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc., United Artists Pictures Inc. (Hwang, Wook)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #14 by Judge Hernan D. Vera. The Court HEREBY ORDERS THAT the deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, shall be extended from March 28, 2024 to May 3, 2024. (lom)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Wook Hwang APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amazon Studios LLC, Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc., United Artists Pictures Inc, designating David A Grossman as local counsel. (lom)
March 27, 2024 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Wook Hwang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amazon Studios LLC, Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc., United Artists Pictures Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37171725) filed by Defendants Amazon Studios LLC, Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc., United Artists Pictures Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grossman, David)
March 22, 2024 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 5/3/24 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Amazon Studios LLC, Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc., United Artists Pictures Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney David Aaron Grossman added to party Amazon Studios LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Aaron Grossman added to party Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Aaron Grossman added to party United Artists Pictures Inc(pty:dft))(Grossman, David)
March 7, 2024 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff R. Lance Hill, upon Defendant United Artists Pictures Inc served on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Toberoff, Marc)
March 7, 2024 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff R. Lance Hill, upon Defendant Amazon Studios LLC served on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saechao, Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Toberoff, Marc)
March 7, 2024 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff R. Lance Hill, upon Defendant Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc. served on 3/7/2024, answer due 3/28/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Toberoff, Marc)
March 6, 2024 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants Amazon Studios LLC, Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc., United Artists Pictures Inc. (lom)
March 5, 2024 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff R. Lance Hill. (Toberoff, Marc)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (wm)
February 29, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
February 29, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
February 29, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Hernan D. Vera and Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (sh)
February 27, 2024 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by R. Lance Hill. (Toberoff, Marc)
February 27, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff R. Lance Hill, identifying R. Lance Hill, Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc., Amazon Studios LLC, United Artists Pictures Inc.. (Toberoff, Marc)
February 27, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff R. Lance Hill. (Toberoff, Marc)
February 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36985507 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff R. Lance Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chart of Similarities) (Attorney Marc Toberoff added to party R. Lance Hill(pty:pla))(Toberoff, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. Lance Hill v. Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Lance Hill
Represented By: Marc Toberoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Studios LLC
Represented By: Dylan J Price
Represented By: Wook Hwang
Represented By: David Aaron Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Artists Pictures Inc
Represented By: David Aaron Grossman
Represented By: Dylan J Price
Represented By: Wook Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc.
Represented By: David Aaron Grossman
Represented By: Wook Hwang
Represented By: Dylan J Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?