Los Angeles Waterkeeper v. Dywidag Systems International USA Inc.
Plaintiff: LOS ANGELES WATERKEEPER, and Los Angeles Waterkeeper
Defendant: DYWIDAG SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, USA, INC., a New York Corporation and Dywidag Systems International USA Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv01657
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper. upon Dywidag Systems International USA Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/17/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Douglas Fournier. (Lozeau, Michael)
April 4, 2024 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper. (Lozeau, Michael)
April 4, 2024 Filing 8 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (et)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar #5 under the Civil Consent Pilot Project. The parties are reminded to review the time requirements for consent set forth in the Notice to Counsel that was issued at the time of the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff is instructed to forthwith serve a copy of this Order on all parties that have already been served with the summons and complaint, or to serve all parties with a copy of this Order at the time of service of the summons and complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 1, 2024 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Dywidag Systems International USA Inc.. (sh)
March 1, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh)
February 28, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff LOS ANGELES WATERKEEPER,, (Lozeau, Michael)
February 28, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff LOS ANGELES WATERKEEPER,. (Lozeau, Michael)
February 28, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LOS ANGELES WATERKEEPER,. (Lozeau, Michael)
February 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37001275 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff LOS ANGELES WATERKEEPER,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Michael R Lozeau added to party LOS ANGELES WATERKEEPER,(pty:pla))(Lozeau, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Los Angeles Waterkeeper v. Dywidag Systems International USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOS ANGELES WATERKEEPER,
Represented By: Michael R Lozeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Angeles Waterkeeper
Represented By: Michael R Lozeau
Represented By: Barak Kamelgard
Represented By: Benjamin Avi Harris
Represented By: Marjan Abubo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DYWIDAG SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, USA, INC., a New York Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dywidag Systems International USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?