Uresh Patel et al v. City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Uresh Patel, Ajaykumar M. Patel, Dharmeshbhai Dhiru Patel, Bhartiben Balubhai Patel, Sai Balaji, a California Corporation and Sai Balaji Hotel Group
Defendant: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation, Rocky Patel, Bhavna Rocky Patel, RBS Empire LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, City of Los Angeles and RBS Empire LLC
Petitioner: Does 1-10 Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2024cv01669
Filed: February 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2024 Filing 11 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (IN CHAMBERS) STANDING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (see document for details) (hr)
March 1, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Subpoena Request (AO 88),,, Summons Request, #5 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Document No. 5. The correct event is Summons Request. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
March 1, 2024 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Bhavna Rocky Patel, Rocky Patel, RBS Empire LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendant Bhavna Rocky Patel, #2 Summons as to Defendant RBS Empire LLC) (lh)
March 1, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
February 29, 2024 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Ajaykumar M. Patel, Bhartiben Balubhai Patel, Dharmeshbhai Dhiru Patel, Uresh Patel, Sai Balaji, a California Corporation. (Weiser, Frank)
February 29, 2024 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiffs Ajaykumar M. Patel, Bhartiben Balubhai Patel, Dharmeshbhai Dhiru Patel, Uresh Patel, Sai Balaji, a California Corporation., Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Ajaykumar M. Patel, Bhartiben Balubhai Patel, Dharmeshbhai Dhiru Patel, Uresh Patel, Sai Balaji, a California Corporation. (Weiser, Frank)
February 29, 2024 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Ajaykumar M. Patel, Bhartiben Balubhai Patel, Dharmeshbhai Dhiru Patel, Uresh Patel, Sai Balaji, a California Corporation. (Weiser, Frank)
February 29, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Weiser, Frank)
February 29, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Ajaykumar M. Patel, Bhartiben Balubhai Patel, Dharmeshbhai Dhiru Patel, Uresh Patel, Sai Balaji, a California Corporation. (Weiser, Frank)
February 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37006917 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Dharmeshbhai Dhiru Patel, Ajaykumar M. Patel, Bhartiben Balubhai Patel, Uresh Patel, Sai Balaji, a California Corporation. (Attorney Frank A Weiser added to party Ajaykumar M. Patel(pty:pla), Attorney Frank A Weiser added to party Bhartiben Balubhai Patel(pty:pla), Attorney Frank A Weiser added to party Dharmeshbhai Dhiru Patel(pty:pla), Attorney Frank A Weiser added to party Uresh Patel(pty:pla), Attorney Frank A Weiser added to party Sai Balaji, a California Corporation(pty:pla))(Weiser, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uresh Patel et al v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uresh Patel
Represented By: Frank A Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ajaykumar M. Patel
Represented By: Frank A Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dharmeshbhai Dhiru Patel
Represented By: Frank A Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bhartiben Balubhai Patel
Represented By: Frank A Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sai Balaji, a California Corporation
Represented By: Frank A Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sai Balaji Hotel Group
Represented By: Frank A Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Does 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhavna Rocky Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Empire LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Empire LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?