Estate of Christian Baltazar Torres et al v. City of Oxnard et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Christian Baltazar Torres, Plutarco Baltazar and Maria Luisa Torres Cruz
Defendant: City of Oxnard, Oxnard Police Department, Jarrod Sheffield and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2024cv01814
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Josephine L Staton
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Josephine L. Staton re Declaration of Arnoldo Casillas Re Extension of Time to Serve Complaint Pending Attendance at Private Mediation #12 . ***Plaintiff must serve the Complaint, but the parties may seek a reasonable extension of time for Defendant to respond.*** (jp)
April 19, 2024 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File DECLARATION OF ARNOLDO CASILLAS RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT PENDING ATTENDANCE AT PRIVATE MEDIATION filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Christian Baltazar Torres. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Casillas, Arnoldo)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Declaration #10 , for the following reasons: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Request for Extension of Time; (2) Proposed Order NOT submitted to the Court in Word format; (jp)
April 12, 2024 Filing 10 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER COURT'S ORDER #11 ] - DECLARATION of Arnoldo Casillas Re Extension of Time to Serve the Complaint Pending Attendance at Private Mediation filed by Plaintiff Estate of Christian Baltazar Torres. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Casillas, Arnoldo). Modified on 4/18/2024 (jp).
March 8, 2024 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp)
March 6, 2024 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants City of Oxnard, Oxnard Police Department, Jarrod Sheffield. (ghap)
March 6, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
March 6, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 6, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
March 6, 2024 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Christian Baltazar Torres. (Casillas, Arnoldo)
March 6, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Attorney Arnoldo Casillas added to party Plutarco Baltazar(pty:pla), Attorney Arnoldo Casillas added to party Maria Luisa Torres Cruz(pty:pla))(Casillas, Arnoldo)
March 6, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Estate of Christian Baltazar Torres. (Casillas, Arnoldo)
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37042607 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Estate of Christian Baltazar Torres. (Attorney Arnoldo Casillas added to party Estate of Christian Baltazar Torres(pty:pla))(Casillas, Arnoldo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Christian Baltazar Torres et al v. City of Oxnard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Christian Baltazar Torres
Represented By: Arnoldo Casillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plutarco Baltazar
Represented By: Arnoldo Casillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Luisa Torres Cruz
Represented By: Arnoldo Casillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oxnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxnard Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?