Gerald A. Gauthier v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Gerald A Gauthier
Defendant: 3M Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, American Optical Corporation, Arkema, Inc., Aventis Inc., A.W. Chesterton Company, Elliot Company, Fisons Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., General Electric Company, GSK Consumer Health, Inc., Hill Brothers Chemical Company, IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, LTL Management, LLC, Metalclad Insulation LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Novartis Corporation, Paramount Global, Pfizer Inc., Puget Sound Commerce Center, LLC, Redco Corporation, Robert Shaw Controls Company, SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., Valves and Controls US, Inc., Viad Corp., Warren Pumps LLC, Does 1 through 1000, Inclusive and LLT Management LLC
Intervenor: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Compay, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Argonaut Insurance Company and Fireman s Fund Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv01951
Filed: March 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2024 Filing 127 Notice filed by defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Aspericueta, Erika)
May 8, 2024 Filing 126 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel M Glassman counsel for Defendant Redco Corporation. Damon M. Pitt is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Redco Corporation formerly known as Crane Co.. (Glassman, Daniel)
May 8, 2024 Filing 125 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel M Glassman counsel for Defendant Redco Corporation. Adding Daniel M. Glassman as counsel of record for Redco Corporation formerly known as Crane Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Redco Corporation formerly known as Crane Co.. (Attorney Daniel M Glassman added to party Redco Corporation(pty:dft))(Glassman, Daniel)
May 8, 2024 Filing 124 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Crossclaim #91 filed by Intervenors Argonaut Insurance Company, Fireman s Fund Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Compay, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company.(Galfayan, Arpi)
May 8, 2024 Filing 123 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Erika Rose Aspericueta counsel for Cross Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Adding Erika R. Aspericueta as counsel of record for METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attorney Erika Rose Aspericueta added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:crd), Attorney Erika Rose Aspericueta added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Aspericueta, Erika)
May 8, 2024 Filing 122 NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Damon M. Pitt to Daniel M. Glassman. filed by Defendant Redco Corporation, (Glassman, Daniel)
May 8, 2024 Filing 121 Hill Brothers Chemical Company's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Crossclaim #91 filed by Defendant; Cross-Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company.(Attorney Edward R Ulloa added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:crd))(Ulloa, Edward)
May 8, 2024 Filing 120 Elliott Company's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Crossclaim #91 filed by Defendant; Cross-Defendant Elliot Company.(Attorney Edward R Ulloa added to party Elliot Company(pty:crd))(Ulloa, Edward)
May 8, 2024 Filing 119 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of 3M Company's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Defendant 3M Company (Kort, Jason)
May 7, 2024 Filing 118 Initial DISCLOSURE of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Plaintiff Gerald A Gauthier (Bricker, David)
May 6, 2024 Filing 117 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael B Giaquinto counsel for Defendants Elliot Company, Hill Brothers Chemical Company. Adding Michael B. Giaquinto as counsel of record for Elliott Company and Hill Brothers Chemical Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Elliott Company and Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Attorney Michael B Giaquinto added to party Elliot Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael B Giaquinto added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Giaquinto, Michael)
May 3, 2024 Filing 116 DISCLOSURE Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 26(A)(1) filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC (Carpenter, Erin)
May 2, 2024 Filing 115 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle counsel for Defendant Robert Shaw Controls Company. Adding Anthony D. Brosamle as counsel of record for Robertshaw Controls Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Robertshaw Controls Company. (Brosamle, Anthony)
May 2, 2024 Filing 114 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Robert Shaw Controls Company, (Brosamle, Anthony)
May 2, 2024 Filing 113 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Robert Shaw Controls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle added to party Robert Shaw Controls Company(pty:dft))(Brosamle, Anthony)
April 23, 2024 Filing 112 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edward R Ulloa counsel for Defendants Elliot Company, Hill Brothers Chemical Company. Adding Edward R. Ulloa as counsel of record for Elliott Company and Hill Brothers Chemical Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Elliott Company and Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Attorney Edward R Ulloa added to party Elliot Company(pty:dft), Attorney Edward R Ulloa added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Ulloa, Edward)
April 23, 2024 Filing 111 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Crossclaim #91 Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center LLC's Answer to Cross-Claims by Redco Corporation (Formerly Known As Crane Co.) For Contribution and Indemnity filed by Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center, LLC.(Yaron, George)
April 22, 2024 Filing 110 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Fisons Corporation identifying RPR (US) Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 22, 2024 Filing 109 NOTICE and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fisons Corporation, identifying RPR (US) Ltd., Plaintiff Gerald A. Gauthier, other witnesses and entities unknown at this time. (DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 22, 2024 Filing 108 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Fisons Corporation.(DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 22, 2024 Filing 107 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Fisons Corporation. correcting Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Crossclaim #76 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #77 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #79 (DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 22, 2024 Filing 106 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Aventis Inc. identifying RPR (US) Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 22, 2024 Filing 105 NOTICE and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aventis Inc., identifying RPR (US) Ltd., Plaintiff Gerald A. Gauthier, other witnesses and entities unknown at this time. (DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 22, 2024 Filing 104 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Aventis Inc..(DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 22, 2024 Filing 103 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Aventis Inc.. correcting Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Crossclaim #71 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #75 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #74 (DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 21, 2024 Filing 102 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #100 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 21, 2024 Filing 101 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #97 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 19, 2024 Filing 100 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle counsel for Defendant Flowserve US, Inc.. Adding Anthony D. Brosamle as counsel of record for Flowserve US Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc.. (Brosamle, Anthony)
April 19, 2024 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Flowserve US, Inc., (Brosamle, Anthony)
April 19, 2024 Filing 98 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Flowserve US, Inc..(Attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle added to party Flowserve US, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brosamle, Anthony)
April 18, 2024 Filing 97 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle counsel for Defendant American Optical Corporation. Filed by Defendant American Optical Corporation. (Brosamle, Anthony)
April 18, 2024 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Optical Corporation, (Brosamle, Anthony)
April 18, 2024 Filing 95 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant American Optical Corporation.(Attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle added to party American Optical Corporation(pty:dft))(Brosamle, Anthony)
April 18, 2024 Filing 94 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: ONLY CROSSCLAIM PORTION OF Combined Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Crossclaim #91 by Defendant Redco Corporation. The following error(s) was/were found: 1) FRCP 10 MISSING CROSS CLAIM CAPTION IDENTIFYING CROSS CLAIM PARTIES. 2) DOCKET ENTRY reads CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants ; 3) Title page does not cite CROSS CLAIM on title of document; 4) BODY TEXT on PAGE 16 has CROSSCLAIM however no crossclaim defendants named. 5) Although the document does not name any cross claim parties., filer has created numerous cross claim defendants on the docket which can not be verified. 5) Case docket reflects defendant and cross claimant Redco has erroneously named itself as a cross defendant. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 17, 2024 Filing 93 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Redco Corporation, identifying Redco Corporation, formerly known as Crane Co., Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC. Globe Indemnity, Liberty Mutual, Hartford, Aetna, Continental, INA, Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies, The Employers Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas, The Home Insurance Company, Firemans Fund Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, Midland Insurance Company, Highlands Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Prudential Reinsurance Company, The North River Insurance Company, AIU Insurance Company, Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Insurance Company of North America, Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty, American Excess Insurance, Transit Casualty Company, First State Insurance Company, New England Reinsurance Corporation, Employers Insurance of Wausau, Government Employees Insurance Company, Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance, Mission Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, Centaur Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Transamerica Insurance Company, American Centennial Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Pacific Insurance Company, and Integrity Insurance Company. (Pitt, Damon)
April 17, 2024 Filing 92 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Redco Corporation identifying Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC as Corporate Parent. (Pitt, Damon)
April 17, 2024 Filing 91 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Defendant Redco Corporation.(Attorney Damon M. Pitt added to party Redco Corporation(pty:dft))(Pitt, Damon)
April 11, 2024 Filing 90 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #89 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 11, 2024 Filing 89 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edward Martinovich counsel for Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.. Adding Edward Martinovich as counsel of record for Imo Industries, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Imo Industries, Inc. (Martinovich, Edward)
April 11, 2024 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc., identifying Imo Holdings Inc, ESAB Corporation. (Martinovich, Edward)
April 11, 2024 Filing 87 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc..(Attorney Edward Martinovich added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Martinovich, Edward)
April 10, 2024 Filing 86 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shane Michael Cohen counsel for Defendants Johnson & Johnson, LTL Management, LLC. Adding Shane Cohen as counsel of record for Johnson & Johnson and LLT Management LLC (formerly known and sued as LTL Management LLC) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson and LLT Management LLC (formerly known and sued as LTL Management LLC). (Attorney Shane Michael Cohen added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Shane Michael Cohen added to party LTL Management, LLC(pty:dft))(Cohen, Shane)
April 10, 2024 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew Smith Russell on behalf of Defendant Warren Pumps LLC (Attorney Andrew Smith Russell added to party Warren Pumps LLC(pty:dft))(Russell, Andrew)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE [DKT. 34] by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's request and CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference in this action to May 31, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. (lom)
April 5, 2024 Filing 83 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #69 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #78 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #70 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number incomplete; incorrect initials of Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 5, 2024 Filing 82 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: AVENTIS INC'S Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Crossclaim #71 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Defendant Defendant Aventis Incs Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Crossclaim 71. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. Document entitled as an Answer Only. However, docket entry created a CROSSCLAIM on case docket. Upon review, the "CROSSCLAIM" was found on Page 49. FRCP 10 COMPLETE CROSS CLAIM CAPTION IS MISSING. Page 49 does NOT name any specific cross defendants, but instead reads " cross-claims against each and every co-defendant and responsible third-party". The case docket and entry names "Gerald A Gauthier", but does NOT appear in the filing itself. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 5, 2024 Filing 81 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Defendant Fisons Corporation's Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Crossclaim #76 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. Document entitled as an Answer Only. However, docket entry created a CROSSCLAIM on case docket. Upon review, the "CROSSCLAIM" was found on Page 49. FRCP 10 COMPLETE CROSS CLAIM CAPTION IS MISSING. Page 49 does NOT name any specific cross defendants, but instead reads " cross-claims against each and every co-defendant and responsible third-party". The case docket and entry names "Gerald A Gauthier", but does NOT appear in the filing itself. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) Modified on 4/5/2024 (lc).
April 5, 2024 Filing 80 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement #77 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #79 by Fisons Corporation. The following error(s) was/were found: It appears filer 's no.77 is the Notice of Interested party, and No. 79 is the corporate Disclosure when pdfs are reviewed... In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 4, 2024 CONFORMED FILED STAMPED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/12/24 (FILED AS AN EXHIBIT WITHIN THE NOTICE DOCKET NO.73) filed by defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC.(lc) Modified on 4/5/2024 (lc).
April 4, 2024 Filing 79 NOTICE and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fisons Corporation, identifying RPR (US) Ltd., Plaintiff Gerald A. Gauthier, other witnesses and entities unknown at this time. (DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 4, 2024 Filing 78 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ronald Tran counsel for Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Adding Ronald Tran as counsel of record for Metalclad Insulation LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendamt Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attorney Ronald Tran added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(Tran, Ronald)
April 4, 2024 Filing 77 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cross Claimant Fisons Corporation, Defendant Fisons Corporation identifying RPR (US) Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 4, 2024 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against Gerald A Gauthier filed by Defendant Fisons Corporation.(Attorney Jacqueline Kirk DuBois added to party Fisons Corporation(pty:dft))(DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 4, 2024 Filing 75 NOTICE and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aventis Inc., identifying RPR (US) Ltd., Plaintiff Gerald A. Gauthier, other witnesses and entities unknown at this time. (DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 4, 2024 Filing 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cross Claimant Aventis Inc., Defendant Aventis Inc. identifying RPR (US) Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 4, 2024 Filing 73 Notice filed by Defendants Metalclad Insulation LLC. Re-Filing State Court Answer (Carpenter, Erin)
April 4, 2024 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendamt Metalclad Insulation LLC, identifying ENTRIX LLC (Holding Company). (Carpenter, Erin)
April 4, 2024 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against Gerald A Gauthier filed by Defendant Aventis Inc..(Attorney Jacqueline Kirk DuBois added to party Aventis Inc.(pty:dft))(DuBois, Jacqueline)
April 4, 2024 Filing 70 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Erin M Carpenter counsel for Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Adding Erin M. Carpenter as counsel of record for Metalclad Insulation LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendamt Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attorney Erin M Carpenter added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(Carpenter, Erin)
April 4, 2024 Filing 69 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradford J DeJardin counsel for Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Adding Bradford J. DeJardin as counsel of record for Metalclad Insulation LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendamt Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attorney Bradford J DeJardin added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(DeJardin, Bradford)
April 4, 2024 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bartek R Rejch on behalf of Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Attorney Bartek R Rejch added to party Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Rejch, Bartek)
April 4, 2024 Filing 67 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Powell, Glen)
April 3, 2024 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bartek R Rejch on behalf of Defendant Warren Pumps LLC (Attorney Bartek R Rejch added to party Warren Pumps LLC(pty:dft))(Rejch, Bartek)
April 3, 2024 Filing 65 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Defendant Warren Pumps LLC's Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #63 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 3, 2024 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC, identifying ESAB Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc.. (Powell, Glen)
April 3, 2024 Filing 63 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC.(Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Warren Pumps LLC(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
April 1, 2024 Filing 62 DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 3M Company, (Kort, Jason)
April 1, 2024 Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY'S NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Answer)(Kort, Jason)
April 1, 2024 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jason A Kort on behalf of Defendant 3M Company (Attorney Jason A Kort added to party 3M Company(pty:dft))(Kort, Jason)
March 28, 2024 Filing 58 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Local Rule 7.1-1) of Interested Parties filed by Defendant John Crane, Inc., (Weglarz, Claire)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew S. Wainwright to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Gerald A Gauthier and designating David Bricker as local counsel #49 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (lc)
March 27, 2024 Filing 57 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hanna Mira Thompson counsel for Defendant Viad Corp.. Adding Hanna M. Thompson as counsel of record for VIAD CORP for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant VIAD CORP. (Attorney Hanna Mira Thompson added to party Viad Corp.(pty:dft))(Thompson, Hanna)
March 27, 2024 Filing 56 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Claire C Weglarz counsel for Defendant John Crane, Inc.. Changing Address and Firm to Womble, Bond, Dickinson (US) LLP, 400 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 1700, Irvine, CA 92618. Changing Email to claire.weglarz@wbd-us.com. Filed by Defendant John Crane, Inc.. (Weglarz, Claire)
March 26, 2024 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/15/2024 (ATTACHED AS AN EXHIBIT TO NOTICE DOCKET NO. 51) filed by defendant Johnson & Johnson.(lc)
March 26, 2024 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/15/2024 FILED AS AN EXHIBIT TO NOTICE DOCKET NO. 53 filed by defendant LLT MANAGEMENT LLC (formerly known and sued as LTL MANAGEMENT LLC)(lc) Modified on 3/27/2024 (lc).
March 26, 2024 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER IN INVERVENTION WITH JURY DEMAND FILED IN STATE COURT 0N 3/15/2024 FILED AS EXHIBIT TO NOTICE DOCKET NO 54) to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by intervenors Argonaut Insurance Company, Fireman s Fund Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Compay, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company.(lc)
March 26, 2024 Filing 55 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Intervenors Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, et al., Insurers of Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., a suspended California corporation SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., identifying Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company; Hartford Casualty Insurance Company; Zurich American Insurance Company; Argonaut Insurance Company; Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Attorney Arpi Galfayan added to party SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.(pty:dft))(Galfayan, Arpi)
March 26, 2024 Filing 54 Notice of Filing State Court Answer-In-Intervention to Plaintiff's Complaint for Personal Injury; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Intervenors Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company et al., insurers of Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., a suspended California corporation SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.. (Galfayan, Arpi)
March 26, 2024 Filing 53 Notice OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER filed by Defendant LTL Management, LLC. (presently known as LTT MANAGEMENT LLC) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Filed Answer))(Romano, Julia)
March 26, 2024 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant LTL Management, LLC identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent. (Romano, Julia)
March 26, 2024 Filing 51 Notice OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER filed by Defendant Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Filed Answer))(Romano, Julia)
March 26, 2024 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Johnson & Johnson identifying N/A as Corporate Parent. (Romano, Julia)
March 26, 2024 Filing 49 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew S. Wainwright to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Gerald A Gauthier (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37166208) filed by Plaintiff Gerald A Gauthier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bricker, David)
March 26, 2024 Filing 48 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Julia Elizabeth Romano counsel for Defendants Johnson & Johnson, LTL Management, LLC. Adding Julia Elizabeth Romano as counsel of record for Johnson & Johnson and LLT Management LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson and LLT Management LLC. (Attorney Julia Elizabeth Romano added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Julia Elizabeth Romano added to party LTL Management, LLC(pty:dft))(Romano, Julia)
March 26, 2024 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lindsay Weiss counsel for Defendant Arkema, Inc.. Adding Lindsay Weiss as counsel of record for ARKEMA, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ARKEMA, INC.. (Weiss, Lindsay)
March 26, 2024 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Arkema, Inc., identifying Arkema Inc.; Arkema, S.A., a French public company. (Weiss, Lindsay)
March 26, 2024 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by ARKEMA, INC. Arkema, Inc..(Attorney Lindsay Weiss added to party Arkema, Inc.(pty:dft))(Weiss, Lindsay)
March 25, 2024 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/15/24 FILED WITHIN THE NOTICE AS EXHBIT DOCKET NO. 44) filed by defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.(lc)
March 25, 2024 Filing 44 Notice OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER filed by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Filed Answer))(King, Bryan)
March 25, 2024 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC identifying Sag Main Holding, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A (Partners List))(King, Bryan)
March 25, 2024 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bryan Lawrence King counsel for Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Adding Bryan Lawrence King as counsel of record for Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. (Attorney Bryan Lawrence King added to party Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC(pty:dft))(King, Bryan)
March 25, 2024 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexander G. Calfo counsel for Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Adding Alexander Gerard Calfo as counsel of record for Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. (Attorney Alexander G. Calfo added to party Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Calfo, Alexander)
March 25, 2024 Filing 40 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Party Defendant Novartis Corporation #39 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Pdf document was a COMBINED "Stipulation and Order" a format not applicable in e-filing, which requires proposed orders be formally prepared and Submitted a Separate attachment. Stipulation MISSING LR 5-4.34(A)(2)(i) Attestation of signatories In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 22, 2024 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/15/2024 FILED WITHIN THE NOTICE OF LODGING DOCKET NO. 35 AS EXHIBIT A filed by defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc.(lc)
March 22, 2024 Filing 39 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Novartis Corporation filed by Plaintiff Gerald A Gauthier.(Bricker, David)
March 22, 2024 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D. Bergstrom counsel for Defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc.. Adding Kurt T. Putnam as counsel of record for Defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc. fka Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc. fka Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill. (Bergstrom, Emily)
March 22, 2024 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D. Bergstrom counsel for Defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc.. Adding Emily D. Bergstrom as counsel of record for Defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc. fka Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc. fka Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill. (Bergstrom, Emily)
March 22, 2024 Filing 36 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc., identifying TWG Investments Limited. (Attorney Emily D. Bergstrom added to party Valves and Controls US, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bergstrom, Emily)
March 22, 2024 Filing 35 Notice Defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc. fka Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., fka Atwood & Morrill's Notice of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily)
March 22, 2024 Filing 34 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from May 17, 2024 to on or after May 27, 2024 filed by Plaintiff Gerald A Gauthier. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Bricker, David)
March 21, 2024 Filing 33 Notice Of Appearance for Michael J. Pietrykowski filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Pietrykowski, Michael)
March 21, 2024 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance for James G. Scadden filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Scadden, James)
March 21, 2024 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Viad Corp., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #25 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #26 served on 03/21/2024. (Langbord, Peter)
March 21, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company, (Duffy, Joseph)
March 21, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Elliot Company, identifying Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. and Ebara Corporation. (Talarico, Amy)
March 21, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: John Crane, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 20, 2024 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) DEFENDANT JOHN CRANE INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS filed by Defendant John Crane, Inc..(Attorney Claire C Weglarz added to party John Crane, Inc.(pty:dft))(Weglarz, Claire)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2024 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge George H Wu. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge George H Wu to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-01951 FLA(JCx). (rn)
March 18, 2024 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Duffy, Joseph)
March 18, 2024 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT DEFENDANT PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, LLC'S FED R. CIV. P. 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (F.R.Civ.P.7.1) filed by Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center, LLC identifying Lone Star Funds, The Carlyle Group, Stellex Capital Managment, Miles Marine, Inc., Puget Sound Commerce Center, LLC, and/or Vigor Shipyards, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Yaron, George)
March 18, 2024 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center, LLC.(Yaron, George)
March 18, 2024 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company.(Duffy, Joseph)
March 18, 2024 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney George D. Yaron counsel for Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center, LLC. Adding George D. Yaron/Michael R. Lawlor as counsel of record for Puget Sound Commerce Center, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center, LLC. (Attorney George D. Yaron added to party Puget Sound Commerce Center, LLC(pty:dft))(Yaron, George)
March 18, 2024 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for Hill Brothers Chemical Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
March 18, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Jo Talarico counsel for Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company. Adding Amy Jo Talarico as counsel of record for Hill Brothers Chemical Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
March 15, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, identifying Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation and Utica National Insurance Group, Resolute Management Inc., Fireman's Fund and Liberty Mutual. (Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
March 15, 2024 Filing 15 JOINDER filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Powell, Glen)
March 15, 2024 Filing 14 JOINDER filed by Defendant John Crane, Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Chan, Macy)
March 15, 2024 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Elliot Company identifying Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Talarico, Amy)
March 15, 2024 Filing 12 Notice of Joinder in Defendant Viad Corp's Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Elliot Company. (Talarico, Amy)
March 15, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Jo Talarico counsel for Defendant Elliot Company. Adding Amy Jo Talarico as counsel of record for Elliott Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Elliott Company. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Elliot Company(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
March 15, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendant Elliot Company. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for Elliott Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Elliott Company. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Elliot Company(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge George H Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:24-cv-01951 GW(JCx). (rn)
March 13, 2024 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Viad Corp., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 served on 03/13/2024. (Langbord, Peter)
March 12, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
March 12, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 12, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
March 11, 2024 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Viad Corp. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/26/2024, attached as Exhibit D. (jtil)
March 11, 2024 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Gerald A Gauthier in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/2/2024, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
March 11, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Viad Corp., identifying Blackrock Inc., Crestview Partners IV GP, L.P and Crestview IV VC Holdings, L.P.. (Langbord, Peter)
March 11, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Viad Corp. (Langbord, Peter)
March 11, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Viad Corp.. (Langbord, Peter)
March 11, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV02995 Receipt No: ACACDC-37070516 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Viad Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Process Transmittal, #4 Exhibit D - Answer, #5 Exhibit E - Preliminary Fact Sheet) (Attorney Peter B Langbord added to party Viad Corp.(pty:dft))(Langbord, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerald A. Gauthier v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald A Gauthier
Represented By: David Bricker
Represented By: Andrew S. Wainwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Jason A Kort
Represented By: Jayme C Long
Represented By: Stephanie Ghanem Peatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Bartek R Rejch
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: James G. Scadden
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Optical Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline Kirk DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Company
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Edward R Ulloa
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisons Corporation
Represented By: Jacqueline Kirk DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSK Consumer Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Colin Charles West
Represented By: Edward R Ulloa
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Edward Martinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Claire C Weglarz
Represented By: Macy M Chan
Represented By: Mirna Jeftic Scheffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Shane Michael Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTL Management, LLC
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Shane Michael Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Ronald Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Erika Rose Aspericueta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC
Represented By: Alexander G. Calfo
Represented By: Bryan Lawrence King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center, LLC
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Represented By: Michael R. Lawlor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Daniel M Glassman
Represented By: Damon M. Pitt
Represented By: Peter E. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Shaw Controls Company
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valves and Controls US, Inc.
Represented By: Emily D. Bergstrom
Represented By: Kurt T Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp.
Represented By: Peter B Langbord
Represented By: Hanna Mira Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Andrew Smith Russell
Represented By: Bartek R Rejch
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: James G. Scadden
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 1000, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLT Management LLC
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Shane Michael Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Compay
Represented By: Grace Chen Mori
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Sherrie Soon Diveglia
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Grace Chen Mori
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Sherrie Soon Diveglia
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Grace Chen Mori
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Sherrie Soon Diveglia
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By: Grace Chen Mori
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Sherrie Soon Diveglia
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Fireman s Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Grace Chen Mori
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Sherrie Soon Diveglia
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?