Sans Souci LLC v. Lord and Taylor ECOMM LLC et al
Plaintiff: SANS SOUCI, LLC and Sans Souci LLC
Defendant: Lord & Taylor ECOMM LLC, Saadia Group LLC, NY and Co Ecomm LLC, Jack Saadia and Lord and Taylor ECOMM LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv02288
Filed: March 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2024 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Sans Souci LLCto Notice (Other), #24 PROPOSED JUDGEMENT (Wander, Perry)
May 13, 2024 Filing 24 Notice OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL filed by PLAINTIFF Sans Souci LLC. APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, #2 Declaration IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)(Wander, Perry)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTES [In Chambers] Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before May 23, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
April 19, 2024 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sans Souci LLC, upon Defendant Saadia Group LLC served on 4/11/2024, answer due 5/2/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Office Manager, for Saadia Group in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Wander, Perry)
April 19, 2024 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sans Souci LLC, upon Defendant NY and Co Ecomm LLC served on 4/9/2024, answer due 4/30/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Riverside Agent Services, Inc. Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Wander, Perry)
April 8, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Wander, Perry)
April 5, 2024 Filing 19 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #15 as to Defendants NY and Co Ecomm LLC, Saadia Group LLC. (gk)
April 4, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed 3/25/2024 #9 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The document is stricken. (gk)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. In light of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 15), the Courts Order to Show Cause (Dkt. No. 14) is hereby DISCHARGED. SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 3, 2024 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #15 filed by Plaintiff Sans Souci LLC. (Wander, Perry)
April 3, 2024 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Sans Souci LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wander, Perry)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's response should be a First Amended Complaint filed by April 4, 2024. (iv)
March 28, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #10 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons caption as to the plaintiff is not identical to the Complaint. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
March 28, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: The form is blank. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
March 25, 2024 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 filed by Plaintiff Sans Souci LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment to Summons, #2 Supplement Attachment to Summons)(Wander, Perry)
March 25, 2024 Filing 9 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 4/4/2024, SEE DOCKET NO. 18] NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sans Souci LLC, (Wander, Perry) Modified on 4/5/2024 (gk).
March 21, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (sh)
March 21, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (sh)
March 21, 2024 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
March 21, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
March 21, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (sh)
March 20, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF SANS SOUCI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Wander, Perry)
March 20, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SANS SOUCI, LLC. (Wander, Perry)
March 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37130555 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff SANS SOUCI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Perry C Wander added to party SANS SOUCI, LLC(pty:pla))(Wander, Perry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sans Souci LLC v. Lord and Taylor ECOMM LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANS SOUCI, LLC
Represented By: Perry C Wander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sans Souci LLC
Represented By: Perry C Wander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lord & Taylor ECOMM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saadia Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NY and Co Ecomm LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Saadia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lord and Taylor ECOMM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?