Alisa Margaret Ahedo v. Martin O'Malley
Plaintiff: Alisa Margaret Ahedo
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Petitioner: Commissioner of SS Martin O'Malley
Case Number: 2:2024cv02407
Filed: March 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 2:24-cv-02407 SK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (rn)
April 1, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Martin O'Malley. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Martin O'Malley(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (see document for details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Consent Form) (hr)
March 27, 2024 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Alisa Margaret Ahedo. (Cho, Young)
March 26, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (sh)
March 25, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alisa Margaret Ahedo, (Cho, Young)
March 25, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alisa Margaret Ahedo. (Cho, Young)
March 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37154150 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Alisa Margaret Ahedo. (Attorney Young Chul Cho added to party Alisa Margaret Ahedo(pty:pla))(Cho, Young)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alisa Margaret Ahedo v. Martin O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Margaret Ahedo
Represented By: Young Chul Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Commissioner of SS Martin O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?