Kenneth Burgarin v. Martin O'Malley
Plaintiff: Kenneth Burgarin
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Case Number: 2:2024cv02797
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 2:24-cv-02797-JDE on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. RE: Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) - Non-Final #8 , Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) - Non-Final #9 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (et)
April 15, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Martin O'Malley. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Martin O'Malley(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
April 9, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Burgarin. (Warren, Jessica)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The Request is GRANTED.; granting #4 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support. (aco)
April 8, 2024 Filing 6 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Subject to any ruling by the District Judge on Plaintiffs Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, the parties are directed to comply with the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), effective 12/1/22, as well as the Local Rules of this Court and the Fed. R. Civ. P., as applicable, in presenting the matter for decision by the Court. All briefs must comply with the Local Civil Rules, including Local Civil Rules 11-6.1 and 11-6.2. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mba) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 8, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (sh)
April 5, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Burgarin. (Warren, Jessica)
April 5, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Burgarin, (Warren, Jessica)
April 5, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Burgarin. (Warren, Jessica)
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Burgarin. (Attorney Jessica Elizabeth Warren added to party Kenneth Burgarin(pty:pla))(Warren, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth Burgarin v. Martin O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Burgarin
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?