William Edwards v. Mercedes Benz USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: William Edwards
Defendant: Does 1 through 20 inclusive and Mercedes Benz USA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv04158
Filed: May 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Filing 16 Receipt of Letter of Transmittal- Remand to Superior Court (rolm)
June 6, 2024 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court for the State of California, Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court for the State of California, Los Angeles. (rolm)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES(IN CHAMBERS) Order Remanding Action to State Court by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court REMANDS the action to state court for all further proceedings. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (rolm)
June 5, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Mercedes Benz USA, LLCto Order to Show Cause, #8 regarding Jurisdictional Requirement (Chan, Macy)
June 4, 2024 Filing 12 Opposition in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's 3rd Cause of Action #9 filed by Plaintiff William Edwards. (Barry, David)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #10 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Other error(s) with document(s): Document lacks word count certification per L.R. 11-6.2. Counsel shall file a corrected document within one day of the date of this order. (jre)
June 3, 2024 Filing 10 (DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #11 ) - Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's 3rd Cause of Action #9 filed by Plaintiff William Edwards. (Barry, David) Modified on 6/4/2024 (jre).
May 24, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's 3rd Cause of Action filed by Defendant Mercedes Benz USA, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/24/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Chan, Macy)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Re: Amount in Controversy [DE #1 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Defendant to show cause in writing why the jurisdictional requirements are or are not satisfied. Such a response shall not exceed five pages and must be submitted within fourteen days of this Order's issuance. (jp)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
May 21, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment(s): # 1 Civil Cover Sheet. The document(s) should have been filed separately using their true events. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs.. (sh)
May 21, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
May 21, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
May 21, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (sh)
May 17, 2024 CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Mercedes Benz USA, LLC., filed by Plaintiff William Edwards. [FILED IN STATE COURT 4/9/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
May 17, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLCL, (Chan, Macy)
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 24STCV08953 Receipt No: ACACDC-37494087 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLCL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Macy M Chan added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLCL(pty:mov))(Chan, Macy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Edwards v. Mercedes Benz USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Thomas W Remillard
Represented By: Julia Erin Lynn Wood
Represented By: Macy M Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Edwards
Represented By: David N Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?