GE Realprop, L.P. et al v. West American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: GE Realprop, L.P., Eleanor Kalman and George Kalman
Defendant: West American Insurance Company and RLI Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv04320
Filed: May 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2024 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant RLI Insurance Company identifying RLI Insurance Company as Corporate Parent. (Moriarty, Denis)
July 22, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant RLI Insurance Company.(Moriarty, Denis)
July 22, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant West American Insurance Company.(Johnston, Ann)
June 20, 2024 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to RLI Insurance Company answer now due 7/22/2024, filed by Defendant RLI Insurance Company.(Attorney Denis J. Moriarty added to party RLI Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Moriarty, Denis)
June 14, 2024 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to West American Insurance Company answer now due 7/22/2024, filed by defendant West American Insurance Company.(Attorney Ann Kathryn Johnston added to party West American Insurance Company (pty:dft))(Johnston, Ann)
June 4, 2024 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff GE Realprop, L.P., Eleanor Kalman, George Kalman, upon Defendant West American Insurance Company served on 5/30/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss of CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified (Kantor, Glenn)
June 3, 2024 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff GE Realprop, L.P., Eleanor Kalman, George Kalman, upon Defendant RLI Insurance Company served on 5/31/2024, answer due 6/21/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss of CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified (Kantor, Glenn)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H Wu. See document for details and deadlines. (es)
May 28, 2024 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants RLI Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company. (lh)
May 28, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
May 28, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 28, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh)
May 24, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Kantor, Glenn)
May 24, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff GE Realprop, L.P., Eleanor Kalman, George Kalman. (Kantor, Glenn)
May 24, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs GE Realprop, L.P., Eleanor Kalman, George Kalman. (Kantor, Glenn)
May 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37530726 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff GE Realprop, L.P., Eleanor Kalman, George Kalman. (Attorney Glenn R. Kantor added to party GE Realprop, L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney Glenn R. Kantor added to party Eleanor Kalman(pty:pla), Attorney Glenn R. Kantor added to party George Kalman(pty:pla))(Kantor, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GE Realprop, L.P. et al v. West American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West American Insurance Company
Represented By: Ann Kathryn Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLI Insurance Company
Represented By: Denis J. Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GE Realprop, L.P.
Represented By: Jaclyn Denise Conover
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Kalman
Represented By: Jaclyn Denise Conover
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Kalman
Represented By: Jaclyn Denise Conover
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?