Jerry Beeman and Pharmacy Services Inc et al v. Anthem Prescription Management Inc et al

Case Number: 5:2004cv00407
Filed: April 6, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2018 507 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Pursuant to the Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Terminating Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Spoliation of Evidence (Doc. No. 415), IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs' complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court orders that such judgment be entered. (bm)
December 5, 2017 503 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Awarding Defendant's Reasonable Attorney's Fees and Costs Re: Defendant's Motion to Compel [Dkt. 492] by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (dts)
November 17, 2017 498 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: granting 492 Motion to Compel (see Order for details) (dts)
September 14, 2016 449 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Awarding Defendants' Reasonable Attorney's Fees and Costs Re: Defendants Motion to Compel [Dkt. 434] by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, Plaintiffs' Counsel shall pay as reasonable attorney's fees and costs the sum of $15,750.00 to defendant Argus Health Systems, Inc. and the sum of $2,881.00 to defendant Prime Therapeutics within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. (dts)
August 15, 2016 436 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: granting 434 Motion to Compel. (1) Defendants' Motion to Compel is GRANTED. (2) McCarthy shall appear for her deposition at Defendants counsel's office within fourteen (14) da ys of the date of this Order; (3) Counsel for the parties shall meet and confer within three (3) court days of the date of this Order to set the date for McCarthys deposition; (4) Defendants request for payment of their reasonable expenses incurred in making the Motion to Compel is GRANTED; (5) Defendants may file a supplemental brief and declaration regarding the expenses reasonably incurred in making the Motion to Compel no later than seven (7) days from the date of this order and Plaintiffs' Counsel may file a supplemental brief in opposition to the amount of expenses sought within seven (7) from the date of service of Defendants brief; and (6) Plaintiffs' Counsel shall provide a copy of this Order to McCarthy. (dts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerry Beeman and Pharmacy Services Inc et al v. Anthem Prescription Management Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?