Dennis Lee Townsend et al v. Menu Foods Limited et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Dennis Lee Townsend and Glenna Townsend
Defendant: Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Inc, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods Holdings Inc, Nestle SA, Nestle Holdings Inc, Nestle USA Inc, Nestle Purina Petcare Co and Chemnutra Inc
Case Number: 5:2007cv00398
Filed: April 5, 2007
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Eastern Division - Riverside Office
County: El Dorado
Referring Judge: Oswald Parada
Presiding Judge: Virginia A. Phillips
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2007 29
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation MDL 1850, transferring case to USDC District of New Jersey, assigned to Judge Noel L Hillman. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.), (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.)(bg)
May 22, 2007 18 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge George H. King GRANTING MOTION to Stay Case Pending All Proceedings [9] and For Preservation of Evidence.(pbap, )
May 16, 2007 15
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge George H. King re: Defendants' EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order An Order Shortening time to hear Motion to Stay All Proceedings[12], is GRANTED. MOTION to Stay Case pending All Proceedings[9], is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR, and its hearing date is VACATED. Plaintiffs SHALL file any opposition to the Motion by no later than 5/23/07, after which the Motion will be taken under submission. Court Reporter: n/a. (pbap, )
May 11, 2007 8 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT. This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge George H. King. The Court fully adheres to Rule 1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure which requires that the Rules be "construed to secure the just, speedy and inexpensive determination of every action." Counsel should also be guided by the following special requirements (herein).(pbap, )
April 24, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: EDCV 07-398 GHK(AJWx). Case transfered from Judge Oswald Parada and Virginia A. Phillips to Judge George H. King and Andrew J. Wistrich for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge EDCV 07-398 GHK(AJWx).Signed by Judge George H. King (kg, )
April 10, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court
STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (See original document for further information),(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis Lee Townsend et al v. Menu Foods Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lee Townsend
Represented By: Cheryl A Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenna Townsend
Represented By: Cheryl A Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Limited
Represented By: Gina E Och
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Inc
Represented By: Gina E Och
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Represented By: Gina E Och
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: Gina E Och
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods South Dakota Inc
Represented By: Gina E Och
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings Inc
Represented By: Gina E Och
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Purina Petcare Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemnutra Inc
Represented By: Megan S Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?