Thomas Mackey v. County of San Bernardino et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Mackey
Defendant: County of San Bernardino, Gary Penrod, Morris Brickley, Palomino, Doug Wolfe, Gabriel Padilla, Don Dougan, Alan Girard, Robert McCoy, John Walker, Caesar Alban and Jane Doe
Case Number: 5:2009cv01124
Filed: June 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Eastern Division - Riverside Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Wu
Presiding Judge: Mumm
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Forma Pauperis Denial
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, in favor of NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ADJUDGED, ORDERED and DECREED that judgment be entered in favor of defendants County of San Bernardino, Gary Penrod, Morris Brickley, Palomino, Don Dougan, Alan Girard, Robert McCoy, John Walker, Ceasar Alban Gabriel Padilla and Doug Wolfe, and that they be awarded any statutorily recoverable and reasonably incurred costs. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pj)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CONTROL AND USE OF CONFIDENTIAL PEACE OFFICER RECORDS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym [NOTE CHANGES MADE BY COURT]. (kca)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge George H Wu: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: (1) the defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in favor of defendants Brickley, Palomino, Dougan, Girard, McC oy, Walker, Alban, and Doe, and these defendants and the claims involving kicking, rough handling, exposure to asphalt, and a cover-up are dismissed; and (2) defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on the claims of excessive force by defendants Wolfe and Padilla for shooting plaintiff is denied. (ad)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PAY INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. On June 18, 2009, plaintiff was granted permission pursuant to 28 USC 1915(b)(1) to file the above-referenced action without paying the full filing fee of $350.00, butplaintiff was ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee, in the amount of $5.00, within thirty(30) days to the Clerk of Court. To date, the payment has not been received. The plaintiff has not complied with 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (b)(1) and is hereby ordered to show cause why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for plaintiffs failure timely to pay the initial partial filing fee. (mrgo)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym:, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. Both parties are ordered to submit the ordered status report and to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the court order by December 14, 2011 (SEE MINUTES FOR DETAILS). (kca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas Mackey v. County of San Bernardino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Bernardino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Penrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Brickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palomino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Dougan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Girard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesar Alban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?