City of Colton v. American Promotional Events Inc et al
Plaintiff: Goodrich Corporation, County of San Bernardino, United States of America, Emhart Industries, Inc., Rialto Utility Authority, City of Rialto, Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc. and City of Colton
Defendant: E.T.I. Explosive Technologies International, Inc. of California, Rialto Concrete Products Inc, Mildred Wilkins, Does 1-10, Environmental Enterprises, Inc., Broco, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, Ensign-Bickford Company, Raytheon Company, Rialto Concrete Products, The Marquardt Company, Ensign Bickford Company, Whittaker Corporation, The 1996 Thomas O Peters and Kathleen S Peters Revocable Trust, J.S. Brower & Associates, Inc., Ordnance Associates, Golden State Explosives, American Pyrodyne, Thomas O. Peters Revocable Trust, Devova Environmental, Inc., Stonehurst Site LLC, Thomas O Peters, Survival Systems, Inc., American West Marketing, Inc., James Hescox, Ken Thompson Inc, American West Inc, Trojan Fireworks Co, Hughes Aircraft Company, Ken Thompson, Inc., Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, Michelle Ann Pointon, Denova Environmental, Inc., Freedom Fireworks Inc, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust under Trust Agreement dated February 20, 1985, Pyrotronics Corporation, United States Department of Defense, Black and Decker, Inc., Chung Ming Wong, Anthony Rodriguez, Estate of Wong, Pyrodyne American Corporation, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, American West Marketing Inc, Harry Hescox, Tung Chun Company, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Wong Chung Ming, American Hardware Corporation, West Coast Loading Corporation, Linda Fredericksen and Delta T. Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Astro Pyrotechnics Inc, Astro Pyrotechnics, John Callagy, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Kwikset Corporation, Kwikset Locks Inc, Stephen Callagy, Pyro Spectaculars Inc, Black & Decker Inc, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated Feb. 20, 1985, Mary Mitchell, Jeanine Elzie, John Callagy as Trustee of the Fredericksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 20, 1985, Emhart Industries Inc, American Promotional Events Inc, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated, Edward Stout, Elizabeth Rodriguez, American Promotional Events Inc-West, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Pyro Spectaculars, Inc., Linda Frederiksen and The Schulz Trust
Cross Defendant: Survival Systems Inc, John Callagy, as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated Feb. 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated, The City of Colton, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Denova Environmental Inc, Fred Skovgard, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co. Pyrotechnics, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Broco Environmental, Inc., Freedom Fireworks, Inc., Ordnance Associates Inc, Broco Inc, Ferranti International, Inc., Brower & Associates, Inc., The United States of America, -, John Callagy as Trustee of The E.F. Schulz Trust, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company Inc, The Ensign-Bickford Company, Pyro Spectaculars, Explosives Engineering, Inc., American West Explosives, The United States of America, Edward Stout as the Trustee of the Stout-Rodriguez Family, Linda Frederiksen, as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated Feb. 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The E.F. Schulz Trust, Explosives Engineering Inc, Linda Frederiksen, as Trustee of The Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated Nov. 19, 1991, John Callagy as Trustee of the Shulz Trust, Delta T., Inc., Ordnance Associates, Inc. and Edward Stout as The Trustee of The Stout Rodriquez Trust
Counter Defendant: Kwikset Locks, Inc., JS Brower & Associates Inc and Black & Decker Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: The 1996 Thomas O. Peters and Kathleen S. Peters Revocable Trust, Environmental Enterprises Inc, Linda Frederiksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated November 19, 1991, Real Property Development and Acquistion Company LLC, Real Property Acquisition & Development Company, LLC, Broco Environmental Inc, Black & Decker, Inc., Mary Callagy and Linda Frederiksen as Trustee of the Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985
Special Master: Venetta S Tassopulos
Case Number: 5:2009cv01864
Filed: October 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Eastern Division - Riverside Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2057 ORDER REGARDING PAYMENT FROM THE COURT REGISTRY ACCOUNT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez re Stipulation for Order #2056 : Pursuant to the Stipulation submitted by Plaintiff the United States of America, on behalf of the United States Environmental Protection Agency ("United States"), Goodrich Corporation ("Goodrich"), and Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, Representative of the Estate of Chung Ming Wong, deceased (the "Estate") (collectively, the "Parties"), the Court hereby ORDERS the following: The Registry of the Court for the Central District of California ("Registry") shall wire or otherwise transfer $2,950,000 deposited in the Registry by the Estate to the United States. The Registry shall wire or otherwise transfer $2,950,00for deposited in the Registry by the Estate to Goodrich Corporation. (See Order for further details) (yl)
April 11, 2018 Filing 2056 STIPULATION for Order re Payment from Court Registry Account filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wickersham, Matthew)
February 16, 2018 Filing 2055 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily L Murray counsel for Defendants Black & Decker Inc, Emhart Industries Inc, Kwikset Locks Inc. Filed by defendants Emhart Industries, Inc.; Black & Decker Inc.; Kwikset Locks, Inc.. (Murray, Emily)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2054 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #2052 Request to Substitute Attorney: The Court hereby orders that the request of: Goodrich Corporation, Plaintiff, Defendant to substitute Jeffrey Dintzer who is Retained Counsel as attorney of record instead of Patrick Ward Dennis and Dana Lynn Craig. The clerk is hereby ordered to terminate Notices of Electronic Filing for the withdrawing attorney(s) in this case. (bm)
February 8, 2018 Filing 2053 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Patrick Ward Dennis and Dana Lynn Craig as counsel of record #2052 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Request for Approval of Withdrawal of Counsel)(Wickersham, Matthew)
February 8, 2018 Filing 2052 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Patrick Ward Dennis and Dana Lynn Craig as counsel of record filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
January 10, 2018 Filing 2051 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs City of Rialto, Rialto Utility Authority for Court Reporter. Court will contact Adam M. Reich at adamreich@paulhastings.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Reich, Adam)
January 8, 2018 Filing 2050 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jeffrey David Dintzer counsel for Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. Changing firm name and address to Alston & Bird LLP, 333 S. Hope St., 16th Fl., Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing email to jeffrey.dintzer@alston.com. Filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. (Dintzer, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2018 Filing 2049 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Matthew C Wickersham counsel for Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. Changing firm name and address to Alston & Bird LLP, 333 S. Hope St., 16th Fl., Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing email to matt.wickersham@alston.com. Filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
December 5, 2017 Filing 2048 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #2044 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 5, 2017 Filing 2047 CONSENT DECREE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (bm)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2046 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re Order GRANTING motion for entry of the Estate of Wong Chung Ming Consent Decree by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: re: Notice of Motion, #2030 : For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the United States' motion to enter the Estate of Wong Consent Decree. (see document for further details) (bm)
December 4, 2017 Filing 2045 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE and MOTION HEARING; DEFENDANT USA'S MOTION TO ENTER ESTATE OF WONG CONSENT DECREE FILED 11-06-17 (DOC. 2030); DEFENDANT GOODRICH CORP.'S JOINDER IN U.S.' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE U.S.' MOTION TO ENTER ESTATE OF WONG CONSENT DECREE FILED 11/30/17 (DOC. 2043) held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Having considered all papers submitted in support of and in opposition to the Motions referenced above, and the oral argument presented today, the Court takes the motion Under Submission. A ruling will be issued after full consideration of the submitted pleadings. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (bm)
December 1, 2017 Filing 2044 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine T Weadock on behalf of Defendant Harry Hescox (Attorney Katherine T Weadock added to party Harry Hescox(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine T Weadock added to party Harry Hescox(pty:dft))(Weadock, Katherine)
November 30, 2017 Filing 2043 JOINDER filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation joining in Reply (Motion related) #2040 . (Wickersham, Matthew)
November 30, 2017 Filing 2042 NOTICE of Joinder in United States' (1) Motion to Enter Estate of Wong Consent Decree and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #2030 and (2) Reply In Support of Motion to Enter Consent Decree #2040 filed by defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong filed by defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Sostrin, Matthew)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2041 ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY #2039 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The parties are granted leave from the standard briefing schedule on the pending motion. The United States, Goodrich Corporation and the Estate of Wong shall have until Thursday, November 30, 2017, to file a reply brief in further support of the United States motion to enter a consent decree (Dkt. #. #2030 ). (ab)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2040 REPLY SUPPORT United States' Reply in Support of the United States' Motion to Enter Estate of Wong Consent Decree filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (O'Brien, Bradley)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2039 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to Notice (Other), #2030 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MacAyeal, James)
November 22, 2017 Filing 2038 STIPULATION to Clarify United States' Motion to Enter Estate of Wong Consent Decree as to Certain Settled Parties, Re: Notice (Other), #2030 , filed by Defendant Pyro Spectaculars, Pyro Spectaculars Inc, Pyro Spectaculars, Inc..(Attorney Brian L Zagon added to party Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Brian L Zagon added to party Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.(pty:cc))(Zagon, Brian)
November 20, 2017 Filing 2037 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs City of Rialto, Rialto Utility Authority. Re: Notice (Other), #2030 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dennis S. Ellis in Support of Opposition, #2 Declaration of Adam M. Reich in Support of Opposition, #3 Exhibit A to Adam M. Reich's Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Adam M. Reich's Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Adam M. Reich's Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Adam M. Reich's Declaration)(Ellis, Dennis)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2036 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher I Rendall-Jackson on behalf of Defendants American Promotional Events Inc, American Promotional Events Inc-West (Attorney Christopher I Rendall-Jackson added to party American Promotional Events Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher I Rendall-Jackson added to party American Promotional Events Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher I Rendall-Jackson added to party American Promotional Events Inc-West(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher I Rendall-Jackson added to party American Promotional Events Inc-West(pty:dft))(Rendall-Jackson, Christopher)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2035 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Donald E Sobelman on behalf of Defendants American Promotional Events Inc, American Promotional Events Inc-West (Attorney Donald E Sobelman added to party American Promotional Events Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Donald E Sobelman added to party American Promotional Events Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Donald E Sobelman added to party American Promotional Events Inc-West(pty:dft), Attorney Donald E Sobelman added to party American Promotional Events Inc-West(pty:dft))(Sobelman, Donald)
November 9, 2017 Filing 2034 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: MOTION TO ENTER ESTATE OF WONG CONSENT DECREE #2030 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. The document is accepted as filed. (wm)
November 9, 2017 Filing 2033 MODIFICATION OF GOODRICH CONSENT DECREE (ECF. No. 1821) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation for #2031 (bm)
November 7, 2017 Filing 2032 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Motion #2030 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions /Requests-Approve Consent Judgment. Other error(s) with document(s): Hearing is noticed for a date that is closed on the court's calendar. Motion hearing noticed date is not indicated in docket entry text. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
November 6, 2017 Filing 2031 Joint STIPULATION for Order Modification of Goodrich Consent Decree (ECF No. 1821) filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Bradley)
November 6, 2017 Filing 2030 NOTICE of Motion and Motion to Enter Estate of Wong Consent Decree filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (O'Brien Declaration), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Rialto Public Comment), #3 Exhibit Exhibit C (Praskins Declaration), #4 Exhibit Exhibit D (Gitin Declaration), #5 Proposed Order)(Gitin, Deborah)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2029 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY #2027 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court hereby orders that the request of: Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, Trustee of the Estate of Chung Ming Wong, Defendant to substitute Mark Rivera as attorney of record instead of Jeffrey A. Rosenfeld, Grant P. Alexander. (bp)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2028 ORDER RE STIPULATION REQUESTING AUGUST 21, 2017 HEARING BE RESCHEDULED TO DECEMBER 4, 2017 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation #2025 : The Court having considered the Stipulation submitted by the Parties on July 31, 2017, and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The hearing currently set for August 21, 2017, is cancelled and will be held on December 4, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. (bm)
August 3, 2017 Filing 2027 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Jeffrey A. Rosenfeld as counsel of record filed by defendant Estate of Wong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2026 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Continue #2024 . (Status Conference continued from 8/21/2017 to 9/25/2017 AT 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez.) (mrgo)
July 31, 2017 Filing 2025 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Stipulation to Continue #2024 , Amended Minutes #2015 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Bradley)
July 28, 2017 Filing 2024 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing from August 21, 2017 to September 25, 2017 Re: Amended Minutes #2015 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Bradley)
July 18, 2017 Filing 2023 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Lodging #2021 e-mailed to owright@downeybrand.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.7.1 Unable to deliver to <' (delivery attempts: 0). Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to Olivia.Wright@dtsc.ca.gov. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 18, 2017 Filing 2022 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Lodging #2021 e-mailed to danielle@jsl-law.com bounced due to 550 5.1.1 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipNotFound; not found. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 18, 2017 Filing 2021 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Consent Decree re Amended Minutes #2015 (Attachments: #1 Lodged Consent Decree)(O'Brien, Bradley)
May 10, 2017 Filing 2020 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A),,, #2017 , REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Jeffrey A. Rosenfeld as counsel of record #2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2017 Filing 2019 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth Boucher Dawson counsel for Defendant United States Department of Defense. Elizabeth Boucher Dawson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States Department of Defense. (Attorney Elizabeth Boucher Dawson added to party United States Department of Defense(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Boucher Dawson added to party United States Department of Defense(pty:dft))(Dawson, Elizabeth)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2018 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: REQUEST TO APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION #2016 , for the following reasons: Other: Proposed Order Missing. See deficiency notice no. 2017 (bm)
May 5, 2017 Filing 2017 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel #2016 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Proposed G-01 order was not included as a separate, additional attachment to the Request. A stand-alone proposed order can be e-filed by submitting a Notice of Lodging, with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
May 4, 2017 Filing 2016 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 5/8/17, DOCUMENT #2018 . REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Jeffrey A. Rosenfeld as counsel of record filed by Defendant Estate of Wong. (Attorney Jeffrey A Rosenfeld added to party Estate of Wong(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey A Rosenfeld added to party Estate of Wong(pty:dft)) (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/9/2017 (bm).
March 6, 2017 Filing 2015 CORRECTED MINUTES RE STATUS CONFERENCE #2014 held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. The Court, having been updated on the status of the case, sets a Status Conference and Motion Hearing for August 21, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. (lom)
March 6, 2017 Filing 2014 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court, having been updated on the status of the case, sets a Status Conference and Motion Hearing for August 21, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel for Rialto may submit an ex parte application regarding probate. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (bm)
March 3, 2017 Filing 2013 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Adam Michael Reich on behalf of Plaintiffs City of Rialto, Rialto Utility Authority (Attorney Adam Michael Reich added to party City of Rialto(pty:pla), Attorney Adam Michael Reich added to party City of Rialto(pty:pla), Attorney Adam Michael Reich added to party Rialto Utility Authority(pty:pla), Attorney Adam Michael Reich added to party Rialto Utility Authority(pty:pla))(Reich, Adam)
March 2, 2017 Filing 2012 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #2011 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Request for Substitution of Attorney. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 1, 2017 Filing 2011 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven H Goldberg counsel for Defendants American Promotional Events Inc, American Promotional Events Inc-West. Olivia Wright is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Promotional Events, Inc. and American Promotional Events, Inc.-West. (Goldberg, Steven)
February 27, 2017 Filing 2010 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Mark Riera counsel for Defendant Estate of Wong. Changing firm and address to Akerman LLP, 725 South Figueroa Street, 38th Floor, Los Angeles, California 90017. Changing fax number 213-627-6342 to e-mail: mark.riera@akerman.com. Filed by Defendant JIMMY CHI HO WONG, Trustee of the Estate of Chung Ming Wong. (Riera, Mark)
February 27, 2017 Filing 2009 STATUS REPORT OF DEFENDANT JIMMY CHI HO WONG RE: SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT DECREE filed by Defendant Estate of Wong. (Riera, Mark)
February 14, 2017 Filing 2008 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: On September 2, 2016, Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong filed a Status Update. See Dkt #2001 . In the report, defense counsel advised that a petition would be filed in the third week of September. As of today, no petition or status report has been filed. Accordingly, the Court schedules a Status Report for 03/06/17 at 2:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2007 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Granting #2005 Non-Resident Attorney Richard F. Bulger APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong, designating Andrew Z. Edelstein as local counsel. (bm)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2006 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #2004 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew C. Sostrin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong, designating Andrew Z. Edelstein as local counsel. (pso)
January 26, 2017 Filing 2005 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard E. Bulger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19257491) filed by defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Attachments: #1 Prop osed Order) (Edelstein, Andrew)
January 26, 2017 Filing 2004 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew C. Sostrin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19257269) filed by defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Attachments: #1 Pro posed Order) (Attorney Andrew Zachary Edelstein added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Zachary Edelstein added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:dft)) (Edelstein, Andrew)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2003 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RETURNING NON-PAPER PHYSICAL EXHIBITS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Counsel for Defendant Goodrich Corporation is hereby notified to arrange pick-up with the Clerk via email of the following non-physical exhibits, lodged on May 10, 2013, at their earliest convenience but no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. Discovery Matter (Referred to Special Master) Lodging of Non-Paper Physical Exhibits Pursuant to LR 11-5.1 in Support of Goodrich Corp.'s Motion for Sanction Against the United State for Spoliation of Evidence. Please be advised exhibits not retrieved within 30 days of this Order will be classified as abandoned and will be destroyed. (bm)
December 9, 2016 Filing 2002 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Phillip S. Gutierrez. Effective December 19, 2016, Judge Gutierrez will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 6A on the 6th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 6A of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 2, 2016 Filing 2001 STATUS REPORT of Defendant Jimmy Wong, Trustee of the Estate of Chung Ming Wong filed by Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Riera, Mark)
July 15, 2016 Filing 2000 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Having read and considered the July 13 Status Report #1999 , the Court vacates the August 8 Status Conference. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 13, 2016 Filing 1999 STATUS REPORT United States' July 13, 2016 Status Report filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (O'Brien, Bradley)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1998 ORDER ESTABLISHING SCHEDULE FOR ESTATE OF WONG CONSENT DECREE AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. On or before July 9, 2016, the United States, Goodrich Corporation ("Goodrich"), and the Estate shall complete the negotiations of the terms of th eProposed Consent Decree. The parties will not be required by July 9, 2016, to seek or obtain signatures from authorized officials for the Proposed Consent Decree. If the negotiation of terms of the Proposed Consent Decree are not completed by July 9, 2016, the United States shall inform the Court. 2. Once the parties' negotiating teams shall have agreed to the form of a Consent Decree, the Estate shall seek all necessary approvals of beneficiaries and probate courts. On or before September 1, 2016, the Estate shall sign the Consent Decree and provide the executed document to the United States. If the Estate does not execute the Proposed Consent Decree by September 1, 2016, the Estate shall inform the Court. 3. Upon receipt of the Estate's signed Consent Decree and Goodrich's signed Consent Decree, the United States shall have thirty (30) days to seek Consent Decree approval from authorized government officials. Goodrich will be a signatory to the Proposed Consent Decree if it approves the terms of the Consent Decree. Upon receipt of the Estate's signed Consent Decree, Goodrich shall have fifteen (15) days to sign the Consent Decree. If the United States or Goodrich do not sign the Proposed Consent Decree within their respective time periods, it or they shall inform the Court. 4. Upon receipt of the signed Proposed Consent Decree from the relevant Parties, the United States shall timely lodge the proposed Consent Decree with this Court and initiate the public comment process, after which the United States will evaluate received public comments and then advise the Court whether entry of the Proposed Consent Decree is warranted. 5. The Consent Decree will not be considered a final proposed settlement subject to public review and comment until the parties' appropriate authorized officials sign the Proposed Consent Decree and the Consent Decree is lodged with the Court. 6. The United States, the Estate, and Goodrich are required to attend a Status Conference at 2:00 p.m. PDT on August 8, 2016. To the extent the Court's Motion Calendar allows and depending upon the Parties adherence to the above deadlines, the Court may order the Parties to appear prior to August 8, 2016. (bm)
June 8, 2016 Filing 1997 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Establishing Schedule for the Estate of Wong Consent Decree and Setting Status Conference re Status Conference, #1996 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Bradley)
May 9, 2016 Filing 1996 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court, having been updated on the status of the case, orders the following: 1) Mr. Riera to provide a redline version of the consent degree to government counsel by 8:00am tomorrow; and 2) government counsel to prepare an order consistent with today's proposal to the Court. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (bm)
May 2, 2016 Filing 1995 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court, having been updated on the status of the case, continues the Status Conference to May 9 at 2:00pm. Estate Representative, Dr. Wong Chi Ho Jimmy, is ordered to appear on that date and time. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (bm)
April 29, 2016 Filing 1994 STATUS REPORT for the May 2, 2016 Status Conference filed by Plaintiffs City of Rialto, Rialto Utility Authority. (Ellis, Dennis)
April 29, 2016 Filing 1993 STATUS REPORT for May 2, 2016 Status Conference filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
April 28, 2016 Filing 1992 STATUS REPORT US' Status Report for May 2, 2016 Status Conference filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (O'Brien, Bradley)
March 4, 2016 Filing 1991 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael C Augustini counsel for Cross Defendant The United States of America. Robert H Foster is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attorney Michael C Augustini added to party The United States of America(pty:crd), Attorney Michael C Augustini added to party The United States of America(pty:crd))(Augustini, Michael)
March 3, 2016 Filing 1990 NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS WITH COURT REGISTRY filed by Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong (Riera, Mark)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1989 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OFSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #1987 Request to Substitute Attorney: The Court hereby orders that the request of: Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, Defendant, to substitute Jeffrey Rosenfeld and Mark Riera, who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record instead of Thomas T. Chan and Philip L. Hinerman. (bm)
January 13, 2016 Filing 1988 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: [Proposed] Order, Request #1987 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Request should be the first and main attachment, while the [proposed] order should be a separate, additional attachment to the request (not submitted as one document in the incorrect order). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
January 12, 2016 Filing 1987 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Jeffrey Rosenfeld and Mark Riera in place of attorney Thomas T. Chan and Philip L. Hinerman filed by defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Hinerman, Philip)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1986 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdraw #1984 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel #1982 , for the following reasons: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is: See Deficiency Notice Nos. 1983 and 1985. Other: Please make sure proper form is completed and filed. If a proposed order is necessary, then please submit (bm)
January 6, 2016 Filing 1985 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel #1984 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below The correct event is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests-Substitute Attorney (G-01). Other: Motion should not be noticed for court hearing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
January 5, 2016 Filing 1984 DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 1/8/16, DOCUMENT #1986 . REQUEST of Philip L. Hinerman to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. Request set for hearing on 3/7/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Hinerman, Philip) Modified on 1/8/2016 (bm).
January 5, 2016 Filing 1983 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #1982 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. See court's website for form: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123). This form is used for terminating attorneys from the same law firm. The form that you used is Requesting Substitution of Attorney from another law firm to represent the parties; therefore, you will need a [Prop] Order. This Request is set before the Judge for review. To find the correct event, search for: Request for Substitute Attorney (G-01). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
January 4, 2016 Filing 1982 DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 1/8/16, DOCUMENT #1986 . Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Philip L Hinerman counsel for Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. Philip L. Hinerman is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Attorney Philip L Hinerman added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:dft), Attorney Philip L Hinerman added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:dft))(Hinerman, Philip) Modified on 1/8/2016 (bm).
December 1, 2015 Filing 1981 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian L Zagon counsel for Defendant Pyro Spectaculars Inc. Maureen B. Hodson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Pyro Spectaculars, Inc. and Astro Pyrotechnics, Inc. (Zagon, Brian)
November 25, 2015 Filing 1980 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #1976 , Order on Motion to Lift Stay on Case,, #1974 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #1975 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #1977 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #1978 e-mailed to Maureen S. Bayer bounced due to invalid email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to maureenbhodson@gmail.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 25, 2015 Filing 1979 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #1976 , Order on Motion to Lift Stay on Case,, #1974 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #1975 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #1977 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #1978 e-mailed to Danielle R. Teeters bounced due to invalid email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to danielle@jsl-law.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 24, 2015 Filing 1978 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen C Lewis counsel for Defendant Ensign Bickford Company. Adding R. Morgan Gilhuly as counsel of record for Defendant The Ensign-Bickford Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Ensign-Bickford Company. (Lewis, Stephen)
November 24, 2015 Filing 1977 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen C Lewis counsel for Defendant Ensign Bickford Company. J. Thomas Boer is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Ensign-Bickford Company. (Lewis, Stephen)
November 24, 2015 Filing 1976 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen C Lewis counsel for Defendant Ensign Bickford Company. Donald E. Sobelman is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Ensign-Bickford Company. (Lewis, Stephen)
November 24, 2015 Filing 1975 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen C Lewis counsel for Defendant Ensign Bickford Company. Estie M. Kus is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Ensign-Bickford Company. (Lewis, Stephen)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1974 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order DENYING motion to lift discovery stay by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez denying #1968 MOTION to Lift Stay on Case: The Court disagrees. The fairness of any consent decree will be addressed when it is actually lodged with the Court. There is simply no reason that discovery presently needs to be taken relating to the fairness of a consent decree that has yet to be finalized. The Court therefore DENIES the motion to lift the discovery stay. (see document for further details) (bm)
November 9, 2015 Filing 1973 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Discovery #1968 filed by Plaintiffs City of Rialto, Rialto Utility Authority. (Ellis, Dennis)
November 2, 2015 Filing 1972 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Discovery #1968 filed by Trustee Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Riera, Mark)
November 2, 2015 Filing 1971 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Discovery #1968 Goodrich Corporation's Joinder in the UnitedStates' Opposition to Rialto's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey D. Dintzer in Opposition to Rialto's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay)(Wickersham, Matthew)
November 2, 2015 Filing 1970 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Discovery #1968 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James R. MacAyeal)(MacAyeal, James)
October 8, 2015 Filing 1969 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Matthew C. Bures and Christopher T. Johnson on behalf of Defendant Whittaker Corporation. Filed by Defendant Whittaker Corporation (Bures, Matthew)
October 6, 2015 Filing 1968 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Discovery filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto, Rialto Utility Authority. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Dennis S. Ellis, #3 Declaration of Councilman Ed Scott) (Ellis, Dennis)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1967 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Discovery #1965 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. The hearing date selected was closed on *8/14/15 as to new motions only. (lom)
September 22, 2015 Filing 1966 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Lift Discovery Stay #1965 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Hearing is noticed for a date that is closed on the court's calendar. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
September 21, 2015 Filing 1965 DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN on 9/23/15, see docket entry no. 1967 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Discovery filed by Plaintiffs City of Rialto, Rialto Utility Authority. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Councilman Ed Scott, #3 Declaration of Dennis S. Ellis, #4 Exhibit A through K to Ellis Declaration, #5 Exhibit L through U to Ellis Declaration) (Ellis, Dennis) Modified on 9/23/2015 (lom).
August 17, 2015 Filing 1964 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Counsel for the United States updates the Court on the status of the mediated settlement reached in June. Based on counsel's representation, the Court sets another Status Conference for Monday, May 2, 2016 at 1:30pm. Counsel for City of Rialto advises that a motion to lift the stay and conduct some discovery regarding the consent decree, as well as, the city's claims will be filed. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (wm)
August 14, 2015 Filing 1963 NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS WITH COURT REGISTRY in the amount of $2,950,000.00, Deposit of funds into Account No. 19860, filed by defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (bm)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1962 ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEPOSIT SETTLEMENT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation #1960 : The Court having considered the Stipulation of defendants Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, Representative of the Estate of Chung Ming Wong, a Hong Kong Estate, and Goodrich Corporation, and plaintiff United States of America on behalf of the United States Environmental Protection Agency, and finding good cause therefor, orders as follows: 1) The stipulating parties shall be permitted to deposit funds for the proposed settlement of the action with the Court Registry, and the Court Clerk is ordered to accept all settlement deposits for deposit into an interest bearing account in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 67(b) and 28 U.S.C. Sections 2041-42; 2) Upon the entry of a consent decree fully adjudicating the claims between and among the United States, Goodrich, and the Estate, and upon the presentation of a stipulation for payment of the deposited funds, the principal and interest shall be paid over jointly to the United States and Goodrich; 3) In the event a final consent decree is not entered for any reason, and upon the declaration of counsel for the Estate, all amounts deposited together with all accrued interest shall be returned to counsel for the Estate in the form of a check made payable to Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, Representative of the Estate of Chung Ming Wong. (bm)
August 7, 2015 Filing 1961 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs City of Rialto, Rialto Utility Authorityto Stipulation for Order, #1960 to Deposit of Settlement Funds into Court Registry (Ellis, Dennis)
August 5, 2015 Filing 1960 STIPULATION for Order To Deposit of Settlement Funds into Court Registry filed by Defendant Estate of Wong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Mark Riera added to party Estate of Wong(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Riera added to party Estate of Wong(pty:dft))(Riera, Mark)
June 15, 2015 Filing 1959 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Estate of Wong, Jimmy Chi Ho Wong amending Amended Complaint, #722 , filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(MacAyeal, James)
June 12, 2015 Filing 1958 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gene Tanaka counsel for Cross Defendant City of Colton. Gene Tanaka will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Gene Tanaka is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff City of Colton. (Tanaka, Gene)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1957 ORDER RE STIPULATION OF THE UNITED STATES, GOODRICH CORPORATION, AND THE ESTATE OF CHUNG MING WONG INFORMING THE COURT OF A TENTATIVE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, REQUESTING THAT CMO DATES BE VACATED, AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Stay Case #1956 : The Court having considered the Stipulation submitted by the Parties on June 9, 2015, and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court stays all discovery and vacates the deadlines established in the Case Management Orders entered by this Court on November 18, 2014 and April 3, 2015 (Dkt. 1923 and 1949). The Court sets a status conference for August 17, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. 2. The United States informs the Court that it intends to file a second amended complaint pursuant to the Courts Order dated June 4, 2015 (Dkt. 1955). In light of the Court staying all discovery, vacating the deadlines outlined in the Case Management Orders and the potential resolution of this matter, the Court orders that the Estate of Wongs answer to the second amended complaint is stayed. (bm)
June 9, 2015 Filing 1956 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Bradley)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1955 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Order GRANTING Plaintiffs motion to file a second amended complaint #1947 . [T]he Court GRANTS Plaintiffs motion to file a SAC. Plaintiff must file a SAC by June 22, 2015. (Please see the attached document for details.) (dgon)
May 22, 2015 Filing 1954 REPLY in further support MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #1947 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (MacAyeal, James)
May 18, 2015 Filing 1953 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #1947 filed by Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Attorney Mark Riera added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Riera added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:dft))(Riera, Mark)
May 1, 2015 Filing 1952 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark Riera on behalf of Trustee Jimmy Chi Ho Wong (Attorney Mark Riera added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:trust), Attorney Mark Riera added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:trust))(Riera, Mark)
May 1, 2015 Filing 1951 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey A Rosenfeld on behalf of Trustee Jimmy Chi Ho Wong (Attorney Jeffrey A Rosenfeld added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:trust), Attorney Jeffrey A Rosenfeld added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:trust))(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2015 Filing 1950 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Grant P Alexander on behalf of Trustee Jimmy Chi Ho Wong (Attorney Grant P Alexander added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:trust), Attorney Grant P Alexander added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:trust))(Alexander, Grant)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1949 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date #1948 : Having received and reviewed the Parties Joint Stipulation to Extend Discovery Cutoff, the Court issues the following Order:1. The percipient discovery cut-off is extended to August, 21, 2015.2. All other deadlines in the Case Management Order entered November 18, 2014 shall remain unaffected.(Please see attached document for details.) (dgon)
April 23, 2015 Filing 1948 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to August 21, 2015 filed by Defendant Trustee of the Estate of Chung Ming Wong, Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip L. Hinerman, #2 Proposed Order)(Hinerman, Philip)
April 14, 2015 Filing 1947 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redline of Second Amended Complaint to Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(MacAyeal, James)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1946 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #1944 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. The hearing date selected was closed on 04/08/15. Please review this Court's Procedures and Schedules located on the web site. (lom)
April 13, 2015 Filing 1945 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #1944 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. The motion hearing date was closed on 4/8/15 . Counsel to adhere to the rules and procedures of the Court when e-filing. The year of the motion date indicates 2011 not 2015. You must view the website for closed motion dates before selecting a date.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ab) Modified on 4/13/2015 (ab). Modified on 4/13/2015 (ab).
April 13, 2015 Filing 1944 DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN, see document no. #1946 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2nd Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redline, #3 Proposed Order)(MacAyeal, James) Modified on 4/14/2015 (lom).
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1943 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Motion for Leave to File 2nd A/C #1938 , Motion for Leave to Filed 2nd A/C #1939 , for the following reasons: Incorrect event selected. Correct eve nt is Motions-Leave. Other: Doc 1938. is actually a proposed second amended complaint, which should have been docketed as an attachment to Doc No. 1939, because it has not been approved. Caption in the proposed second amended complaint does not reflect new/termed parties. Also, failure to comply with L.R. 5-4.5 Re: Mandatory Chambers Copies due next business day (bm)
April 9, 2015 Filing 1942 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew C Wickersham counsel for Defendant Goodrich Corporation. Elizabeth McClure Burnside is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
April 9, 2015 Filing 1941 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew C Wickersham counsel for Defendant Goodrich Corporation. Kimberly Nortman is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
April 8, 2015 Filing 1940 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint #1938 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below The correct event is: Motions-Leave.: Docket entry text does not match caption of attached document. Document appears to be a duplicate of document #1939 , which was submitted correctly. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
April 7, 2015 Filing 1939 DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 4/9/15, DOCUMENT #1943 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redline)(MacAyeal, James) Modified on 4/9/2015 (bm).
April 7, 2015 Filing 1938 DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 4/9/15, DOCUMENT #1943 . Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Chung Ming Wong amending Amended Complaint, #722 , filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amend. Comp., #2 Exhibit Redline, #3 Proposed Order)(MacAyeal, James) Modified on 4/9/2015 (bm).
February 3, 2015 Filing 1937 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Donald E Sobelman counsel for Defendant Ensign Bickford Company. Estie M. Kus/Estie A. Manchik is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Ensign-Bickford Company. (Sobelman, Donald)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1936 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #1935 Request to Substitute Attorney Thomas N. Jacobson for Defendant Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc. as attorney of record instead of Attorneys Penelope Alexander-Kelley, Ruth E. Stringer (no longer with the office) and Jean-Rene Claude Basle, Office of the County Counsel, County of San Bernardino. (lom)
January 23, 2015 Filing 1935 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Thomas N. Jacobson in place of attorney Penelope Alexander-Kelley, Ruth E. Stringer (no longer with the office) and Jean-Rene Claude Basie, Office of the County Counsel, County of San Bernardino as counsel of record filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Bloomfield, Thomas)
December 23, 2014 Filing 1934 Initial DISCLOSURE of Jimmy Chi Ho Wong Represented for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong filed by Defendant Wong Chung Ming (Hinerman, Philip)
December 10, 2014 Filing 1933 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gene Tanaka counsel for Plaintiff City of Colton. Amy R. Rodes is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff City of Colton. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Tanaka, Gene)
December 9, 2014 Filing 1932 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas Alan Bloomfield counsel for Defendants County of San Bernardino, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Counter Claimant The Schulz Trust. Elizabeth D. Paranhos is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Bloomfield, Thomas)
December 9, 2014 Filing 1931 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Thomas Alan Bloomfield counsel for Defendants County of San Bernardino, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Counter Claimant The Schulz Trust. Changing firm name and address for attorney Elizabeth Paranhos to Delone Law, Inc., 1555 Jennine Place, Boulder, Colorado 80304. Changing e-mail to elizabethparanhos@delonelaw.com. Filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Bloomfield, Thomas)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1930 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #1927 Request to Substitute Attorney: The Court hereby orders that the request of: Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc., Defendant, to substitute Thomas N. Jacobson, who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record instead of The Gallagher Group PC. (bm)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1929 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re AMENDED REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY #1928 : The Court hereby orders that the request of: Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc., Defendant, to substitute Thomas N. Jacobson, Retained Counsel, as attorney of record instead of Martin N. Refkin, Thomas Alan Bloomfield, Timothy P. Gallagher, David H. Lawton, and Elizabeth Paranhos (no longer with the firm), The Gallagher Law Group PC. (bm)
November 25, 2014 Filing 1928 AMENDED REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY re REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Thomas N. Jacobson in place of attorney Martin N. Refkin, Thomas Alan Bloomfield, Timothy P. Gallagher, and Elizabeth Paranhos as counsel of record #1927 filed by Defendant Robertson's Ready Mix Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Bloomfield, Thomas)
November 25, 2014 Filing 1927 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Thomas N. Jacobson in place of attorney Martin N. Refkin, Thomas Alan Bloomfield, Timothy P. Gallagher, and Elizabeth Paranhos as counsel of record filed by Defendant Robertson's Ready Mix Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request fur Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Bloomfield, Thomas)
November 20, 2014 Filing 1926 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings #1923 e-mailed to Elizabeth Paranhos at eparanhos@thegallaghergroup.com bounced due to invalid email. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to elizabethparanhos@delonelaw.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1925 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL: Final Pretrial Conference: 01/25/16 at 2:30 p.m. Trial Date: 02/09/16 at 9:00 a.m. by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: UNLESS OTHERWISE ORDERED BY THE COURT, THE FOLLOWING RULES SHALL APPLY: (see document for further details) (bm)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1924 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than December 1, 2015. (bm)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1923 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Report #1916 : NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. Proposed Case Management Deadlines The case management dates are set forth below:Percipient Discovery Cut-off: May 22, 2015; Expert Witness Disclosures: June 30, 2015; Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures: July 15, 2015; Final Supplementation of Expert Reports: August 14, 2015; Expert Discovery Cut-off: September 23, 2015; Dispositive Motions: November 16, 2015; Pretrial Status Conference: January 25, 2016; Trial Date: February 9, 2016 (see document for further details) (bm)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1922 ESI CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation for Discovery #1917 . (bm)
November 6, 2014 Filing 1921 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Scheduling Conference Report #1916 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Pretrial and Trial Documents-Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
November 5, 2014 Filing 1920 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sarah E Johnston counsel for ThirdParty Defendant American West Explosives, Defendants E.T.I. Explosive Technologies International, Inc. of California, Golden State Explosives. Filed by Defendants American West Explosives, Golden State Explosives, ETI Holding Corporation. (Johnston, Sarah)
November 5, 2014 Filing 1919 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sarah E Johnston counsel for ThirdParty Defendant American West Explosives, Defendants E.T.I. Explosive Technologies International, Inc. of California, Golden State Explosives. Filed by Defendants ETI Explosive Technologies, American West Explosives, Golden State Explosives. (Attorney Sarah E Johnston added to party American West Explosives(pty:3pd), Attorney Sarah E Johnston added to party American West Explosives(pty:3pd), Attorney Sarah E Johnston added to party E.T.I. Explosive Technologies International, Inc. of California(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah E Johnston added to party E.T.I. Explosive Technologies International, Inc. of California(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah E Johnston added to party Golden State Explosives(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah E Johnston added to party Golden State Explosives(pty:dft))(Johnston, Sarah)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1918 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ASSERTED BY THE WONG ESTATE, JURY DEMAND, AND THE WONG ESTATE'S COUNTERCLAIM AGAINST THE UNITED STATES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation #1914 . (bm)
November 3, 2014 Filing 1917 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Electronically Stored Information filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MacAyeal, James)
November 3, 2014 Filing 1916 REPORT of Rule 26 Joint Conference filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MacAyeal, James)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1915 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #1913 Request to Substitute Attorney: The Court hereby orders that the request of: Goodrich Corporation, Defendant, to substitute Jeffrey D. Dintzer, who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record instead of Peter R. Duchesneau. (bm)
October 31, 2014 Filing 1914 Joint STIPULATION for Order Dismissing Certain Affirmative Defenses Asserted By The Wong Estate and The Wong Estate's Counterclaim Against The United States filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Augustini, Michael)
October 28, 2014 Filing 1913 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Peter R. Duchesneau and Whitney R. Cale (Whitney Cale is no longer with Manatt) as counsel of record filed by defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duchesneau, Peter)
September 24, 2014 Filing 1912 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Grace Y Du counsel for Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. Grace Du is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Du, Grace)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1911 Answer of Jimmy Chi Ho Wong to United States Amended Complaint ANSWER filed by defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong.(Attorney Philip L Hinerman added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:trust), Attorney Philip L Hinerman added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:trust))(Hinerman, Philip)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1910 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re: Order to Show Cause by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez re: Report #1907 , Response #1909 : The Court has read and considered United States' response to the Court's Order to Show Cause (dkt. no. 1907) and Goodrich Corporation's response to the Court's Order to Show Cause (dkt. no. 1909). Accordingly, the Order to Show Cause Why this Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute is hereby DISCHARGED. The trial date is VACATED and a scheduling conference is set for November 24, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. (bm)
September 16, 2014 Filing 1909 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporationto Pretrial Conference - Final,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #1904 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 12, 2014 Filing 1908 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Response to Order to Show Cause #1907 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Miscellaneous Filings (Non-Motion)-Response (non-motion). Other error(s) with document(s): Response should be linked back to the court's order to show cause. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1907 REPORT of of United States in Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James R. MacAyeal)(MacAyeal, James)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1906 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael C Augustini counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Kimberly N. Smaczniak is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States. (Augustini, Michael)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1905 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael C Augustini counsel for Defendant United States of America. Ignacia S. Moreno is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States. (Augustini, Michael)
September 8, 2014 Filing 1904 MINUTES OF FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court having called the case, and no appearances made or pretrial filings submitted, hereby issues an Order to Show Cause Hearing for September 22, 2014 at 2:30pm, as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (bm)
August 29, 2014 Filing 1903 ANSWER TO GOODRICH CORPORATIONS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong.(Attorney Thomas Tak-Wah Chan added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Tak-Wah Chan added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:dft))(Chan, Thomas)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1902 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING Jimmy Chi Ho Wong's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and DENYING Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Enter Default Judgment Against Jimmy Chi Ho Wong as MOOT. by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: finding as moot #1890 Motion for Order; granting #1895 Motion to Set Aside Default Jimmy Chi Ho Wong: After considering the requisite factors, the Court finds that there is good cause to set aside entry of default against J. Wong. Thus, the Court GRANTS J. Wong's Set Aside Motion. J. Wong is ordered to file his Answer to Goodrich's FAC by August 29, 2014. Based on the foregoing, Goodrich's Default Judgment Motion is DENIED as MOOT. (see document for further details) (bm)
August 7, 2014 Filing 1901 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Trustee Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. correcting Reply (Motion related) #1900 (Du, Grace)
August 4, 2014 Filing 1900 REPLY Reply in Support of MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) #1887 . #1895 filed by Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Philip L. Hinerman)(Du, Grace)
August 4, 2014 Filing 1899 REPLY in support MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong #1888 filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
July 28, 2014 Filing 1898 Opposition in opposition to re: MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) #1887 . #1895 filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham)(Wickersham, Matthew)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1897 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS CONTINUING Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Enter Default Judgment Against Jimmy Chi Ho Wong by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: re: MOTION #1890 , Amendment #1891 : On June 10, 2014, Goodrich Corporation ("Goodrich") filed an application for entry of default against Jimmy Chi Ho Wong ("Mr. Wong"). See Dkt. No. 1881. The Clerk of the Court entered default against Mr. Wong one week later. See Dkt. No. 1887. On June 24, 2014, Goodrich filed a motion for an order entering default judgment against Mr. Wong. See Dkt. Np. 1891. The motion is calendared for hearing on July 28, 2014. See id. On July 7, 2014, Mr. Wong filed an opposition brief to Goodrich's motion for default judgment. See Dkt. No. 1891. Mr. Wong also filed a motion to set aside the entry of default, which is set for hearing on August 18, 2014. See Dkt. Np. 1896. Because Mr. Wong's motion to set aside the entry of default may render Goodrich's motion for default judgment moot, the Court CONTINUES the hearing on Goodrich's motion for default judgment to August 18, 2014. (bm)
July 7, 2014 Filing 1896 OPPOSITION TO GOODRICH CORPORATION'S MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST JIMMY CHI HO WONG re: MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong #1888 filed by Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Philip L. Hinerman, #2 Declaration Declaration of Grace Y. Du)(Du, Grace)
July 7, 2014 Filing 1895 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) #1887 . filed by Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. Motion set for hearing on 8/18/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Philip L. Hinerman, #2 Declaration Declaration of Grace Y. Du, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Attorney Grace Y Du added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:dft), Attorney Grace Y Du added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:dft))(Du, Grace)
June 26, 2014 Filing 1894 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Corrected [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Enter Default Judgment Against Jimmy Chi Ho Wong re Amendment (Motion related) #1891 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Corrected [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Enter Default Judgment Against Jimmy Chi Ho Wong)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 25, 2014 Filing 1892 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: [Proposed] Order #1890 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Notices-Notice of Lodging. Other error(s) with document(s): A stand-alone proposed order should be e-filed as a separate, additional attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1893 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Relief from the February 2011 Order and any Confidentiality Provisions regarding Mediation-Related Information by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez denying #1877 Motion for Relief: The Court thus DENIES the motion for relief from the February 2011 Order and the confidentiality provisions regarding disclosure of mediation-related information. (see document for further details) (bm)
June 24, 2014 Filing 1891 Amendment to MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong #1888 Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to Enter Default Judgment Against Jimmy Chi Ho Wong filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
June 23, 2014 Filing 1890 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Default Judgment Against Jimmy Chi Ho Wong filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 7/28/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Wickersham, Matthew)
June 23, 2014 Filing 1889 REPLY reply in support of MOTION for Relief from Courts February 23, 2011 Order and from Confidentiality Provisions regarding Disclosure of Mediation-Related Information re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, #608 #1877 filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
June 23, 2014 Filing 1888 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 7/28/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Bruce C. Amig Part 1 of 10, #2 Declaration Declaration of Bruce C. Amig Part 2 of 10, #3 Declaration Declaration of Bruce C. Amig Part 3 of 10, #4 Declaration Declaration of Bruce C. Amig Part 4 of 10, #5 Declaration Declaration of Bruce C. Amig Part 5 of 10, #6 Declaration Declaration of Bruce C. Amig Part 6 of 10, #7 Declaration Declaration of Bruce C. Amig Part 7 of 10, #8 Declaration Declaration of Bruce C. Amig Part 8 of 10, #9 Declaration Declaration of Bruce C. Amig Part 9 of 10, #10 Declaration Declaration of Bruce C. Amig Part 10 of 10, #11 Declaration Declaration of Brian J. Yeich Part 1 of 4, #12 Declaration Declaration of Brian J. Yeich Part 2 of 4, #13 Declaration Declaration of Brian J. Yeich Part 3 of 4, #14 Declaration Declaration of Brian J. Yeich Part 4 of 4, #15 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey D. Dintzer)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 17, 2014 Filing 1887 DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED as to *Trustee Jimmy Chi Ho Wong* (bm)
June 17, 2014 Filing 1886 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Goodrich Corporation of [Proposed] Order re APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong #1881 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 16, 2014 Filing 1885 JOINDER filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., ThirdParty Plaintiff The Schulz Trust joining in Response in Opposition to Motion, #1883 . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bloomfield, Thomas)
June 16, 2014 Filing 1884 JOINDER filed by Defendant Emhart Industries Inc joining in Response in Opposition to Motion, #1883 . (Meeder, James)
June 16, 2014 Filing 1883 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Relief from Courts February 23, 2011 Order and from Confidentiality Provisions regarding Disclosure of Mediation-Related Information re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, #608 #1877 filed by Counter Claimant United States of America. (Attorney James Robertson MacAyeal added to party United States of America(pty:cc), Attorney James Robertson MacAyeal added to party United States of America(pty:cc))(MacAyeal, James)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1882 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING Defendant's Ex Parte Motion by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez denying #1879 Ex Parte Application: Thus, for all of the foregoing reasons, Defendants ex parte motion is DENIED. (see document for further details) (bm)
June 10, 2014 Filing 1881 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 10, 2014 Filing 1880 Opposition in opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extend Time to File Answer to 6/20/2014 #1879 filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 9, 2014 Filing 1879 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extend Time to File Answer to 6/20/2014 filed by Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of P. Hinerman in support of Jimmy Chi Ho Wong's Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Du, Grace)
June 5, 2014 Filing 1878 Notice of Electronic Filing re MOTION for Relief from Courts February 23, 2011 Order and from Confidentiality Provisions regarding Disclosure of Mediation-Related Information re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #608 #1877 e-mailed to Attorney Daniel J Coyle at dcoyle@delfinomadden.com bounced due to invalid email. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to dcoyle@delfinomadden.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 5, 2014 Filing 1877 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Courts February 23, 2011 Order and from Confidentiality Provisions regarding Disclosure of Mediation-Related Information re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, #608 filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 7/7/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham, #2 Declaration of Sallie Lux, #3 Proposed Order)(Wickersham, Matthew)
April 29, 2014 Filing 1876 Mail Returned - RETURN TO SENDER/UNABLE TO FORWARD addressed to Ignacia S. Mareno re Consent Judgment #1869 (lw)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1872 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING Motion for Substitution by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #1856 Motion to Substitute Party: Thus, for the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion to substitute Mr. Wong, as legal trustee for the estate of Chung Ming Wong, for Chung Ming Wong. The Court enters this Order in both the Goodrich Action and all other actions consolidated under City of Colton v. American Promotional Events, Inc., No. EDCV 09-1864 PSG. (see document for further details) (bm)
April 10, 2014 Filing 1875 Mail Returned - Insufficient Address - addressed to Amilia Glikman re Minutes of In Chambers Order/, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines, #1867 (lw)
April 9, 2014 Filing 1874 Mail Returned addressed to Chris Almand, Addressee Unknown, Return to Sender, re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112) #1863 (bm)
April 9, 2014 Filing 1873 Mail Returned addressed to Igancia S Moreno, Return to Sender, Unable To Forward, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive #1867 (bm)
April 7, 2014 Filing 1870 Sur-Sur-Reply in support of re MOTION to Substitute Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, as Legal Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong for Defendant Chung Ming Wong #1856 filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Second Supplemental Declaration of Matthew Wickersham, #2 Supplemental Declaration of David Chu, #3 Declaration of Lim Siam Luan)(Wickersham, Matthew)
April 4, 2014 Filing 1871 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacia S Moreno, Return to Sender, Unable to Forward, re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112) #1863 (bm)
April 4, 2014 Filing 1869 CONSENT DECREE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez Related to: Notice of Lodging #1855 , MOTION for Settlement Approval of Estate of Hescox Consent Decree #1865 . (bm)
March 31, 2014 Filing 1868 REPLY Opposition MOTION to Substitute Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, as Legal Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong for Defendant Chung Ming Wong #1856 filed by Trustee Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grace Du)(Du, Grace)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1867 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re Order CONTINUING Hearing re: Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Substitution of Chung Ming Wongby Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Goodrich Corporation's ("Goodrich") motion for substitution of Chung Ming Wong was set for hearing on March 31, 2014. See Dkt. No. 1856. After reviewing the submitted papers, the Court finds that Goodrich's reply brief raises a host of factual and legal arguments that were not raised in its original motion. See Dkt. # 1856, 1864, 1866. As such, Jimmy Chi Ho Wong ("J. Wong") has not had a fair opportunity to rebut Goodrichs arguments. The Court therefore CONTINUES the hearing regarding Goodrich's motion for substitution of Chung Min Wong to April 21, 2014. J. Wong may file a sur-reply, not to exceed ten pages, by March 31, 2014. Goodrich may file a sur-sur-reply, not to exceed five pages, by April 7, 2014. (bm)
March 17, 2014 Filing 1866 REPLY in support of MOTION to Substitute Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, as Legal Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong for Defendant Chung Ming Wong #1856 filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Matthew Wickersham, #2 Declaration of David Chu, #3 Declaration of Jeffrey Dintzer, #4 Declaration of Patrick Hamlin)(Wickersham, Matthew)
March 13, 2014 Filing 1865 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Estate of Hescox Consent Decree filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 4/21/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Bradley R. O'Brien, #2 Declaration Wayne Praskins, #3 Declaration Katherine Moore, #4 Proposed Order Entering Consent Decree)(O'Brien, Bradley)
March 10, 2014 Filing 1864 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION to Substitute Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, as Legal Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong for Defendant Chung Ming Wong #1856 filed by Trustee Jimmy Chi Ho Wong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jimmy Chi Ho Wong In Support of Opposition to Goodrick Corporation's Motion for Substitution of Chung Ming Wong, #2 Declaration of Cheryl Galgo Carman In Support of Jimmy Chi Ho Wong's Opposition To Goodrich Corporation's Motion For Substitution Of Chung Ming Wong)(Du, Grace)
March 5, 2014 Filing 1863 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation and Proposed Order #1861 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed order (Exhibit A) should have been e-filed as a separate, additional attachment to the Stipulation. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1862 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE RE GOODRICH CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF CHUNG MING WONG by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Continue, #1861 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The hearing on the Motion for Substitution of Chung Ming Wong is continued from March 17, 2014 to March 31, 2014. The opposition and reply are due consistent with the new hearing date and in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules of the Central District. RE: MOTION to Substitute Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, as Legal Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong for Defendant Chung Ming Wong #1856 , ( Motion CONTINUED for hearing on 3/31/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez.) (lw)
March 3, 2014 Filing 1861 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Substitution from March 17, 2014 to March 31, 2014 Re: MOTION to Substitute Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, as Legal Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong for Defendant Chung Ming Wong #1856 , STIPULATION for Hearing re Substitution filed by Trustee Jimmy Chi Ho Wong.(Attorney Grace Y Du added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:trust), Attorney Grace Y Du added to party Jimmy Chi Ho Wong(pty:trust))(Du, Grace)
March 3, 2014 Filing 1860 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation, re MOTION to Substitute Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, as Legal Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong for Defendant Chung Ming Wong #1856 served on February 15, 2014. (Wickersham, Matthew)
February 25, 2014 Filing 1859 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas Alan Bloomfield counsel for Defendants County of San Bernardino, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Counter Claimant The Schulz Trust. Filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Bloomfield, Thomas)
February 25, 2014 Filing 1858 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas Alan Bloomfield counsel for Defendants County of San Bernardino, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Counter Claimant The Schulz Trust. Filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Bloomfield, Thomas)
February 24, 2014 Filing 1857 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition filed by Plaintiffs City of Rialto, Rialto Utility Authority re: MOTION to Substitute Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, as Legal Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong for Defendant Chung Ming Wong #1856 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Dennis)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1856 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute Defendant Jimmy Chi Ho Wong, as Legal Trustee for the Estate of Chung Ming Wong for Defendant Chung Ming Wong filed by Plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/17/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham in Support of Goodrich Corporations Motion for Substitution of Chung Ming Wong, #2 Proposed Order Granting Goodrich Corporations Motion for Substitution of Chung Ming Wong)(Wickersham, Matthew)
January 30, 2014 Filing 1855 NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Lodging) Consent Decree re Amended Complaint, #722 (Attachments: #1 Att. - Hescox Consent Decree)(O'Brien, Bradley)
December 10, 2013 Filing 1854 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacia S Moreno, Return to Sender, Unable to Forward, re Order #1846 . (bm)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1853 ORDER VACATING ESTATE OF HARRY HESCOX CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES IN LIGHT OF TENTATIVE SETTLEMENT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED:The Court vacates the deadlines established in the Case Management Order for Claims Relating to the Estate of Harry Hescox ("Hescox CMO") entered by this Court on September 16, 2013. (Dkt. No. 1837). In the event the Hescox Consent Decree is not entered by this Court, case management dates are subject to reinstatement. re Order, #1837 , Stipulation to Vacate, #1851 . (lw)
December 3, 2013 Filing 1852 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven H Goldberg counsel for Defendants American Promotional Events Inc, American Promotional Events Inc-West. Leslie Fredrickson is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Promotional Events, Inc. and American Promotional Events, Inc.-WEST. (Goldberg, Steven)
December 2, 2013 Filing 1851 Joint STIPULATION to Vacate Hescox Case Management Order Deadlines in Light of Tentative Settlement Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,, #1837 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Bradley)
November 8, 2013 Filing 1850 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacia S Moreno, Return to Sender, Unable to Forward, re Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106), #1845 . (bm)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1849 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by defendant Goodrich Corporation pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Broco Environmental, Inc.; Denova Environmental, Inc.; and as to Survival Systems, Inc.. (Wickersham, Matthew)
October 9, 2013 Filing 1848 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacia S Moreno, Return to Sender, re Order #1837 . (bm)
October 8, 2013 Filing 1847 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacia S Moreno, re Status Conference #1838 (bm)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1846 ORDER re NOTICE OF DISMISSAL #1843 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 41 (a)(1)(A)(i) and (c), Defendants COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, and ROBERTSONS READY MIX, INC., ("Claimants") hereby voluntarily dismiss their Complaint against TUNG CHUN COMPANY and WONG CHUNG MING aka CHUNG MING WONG filed in Case No. CV 09-6632 PSG (SSx). This Notice of Dismissal is also directed to all deemed crossclaims, counter-claims, and third-party claims held by Claimants against TUNG CHUN COMPANY and WONG CHUNG MING aka CHUNG MING WONG pursuant to that Order dated January 20, 2010 consolidating City of Colton v. American Promotional Events, Inc., et al., Case No. ED CV 09-01864 PSG (SSx), filed October 6, 2009; City of Rialto et al. v. United States Department of Defense, et al., Case No. CV 09-07501 PSG(SSx), filed October 15, 2009; Goodrich Corporation v. Chung Ming Wong, et al., Case No. CV 09- 6630 PSG (SSx), filed October 6, 2009; County of San Bernardino, et al. v. Tung Chun Co., et al., Case No. CV 09-06632 PSG (SSx), filed October 6, 2009; and Emhart Industries, Inc. v. American Promotional Events, Inc.-West, et al., Case No. CV 09-07508 PSG (SSx), filed October 15, 2009. No Court order is necessary to effectuate this dismissal given that neither TUNG CHUN COMPANY and/or WONG CHUNG MING aka CHUNG MING WONG has filed an answer or a motion for summary judgment. See, Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a)(1) (A)(i) and (c). This voluntary dismissal shall not constitute any admission of liability with respect to Claimants. This voluntary dismissal shall be without prejudice. (bm)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1845 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Notice of Dismissal #1841 , for the following reasons: Document submitted in the wrong case. Incorrect case number & title. (ir)
October 2, 2013 *** Party General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation, General Dynamics Corporation and General Dynamics Corporation terminated. (bp)
October 2, 2013 *** Party Golden State Explosives, Golden State Explosives, Golden State Explosives, Golden State Explosives, Golden State Explosives and Golden State Explosives terminated. (bp)
October 2, 2013 *** Party E.T.I. Explosive Technologies International, Inc. of California, E.T.I. Explosive Technologies International, Inc. of California, E.T.I. Explosive Technologies International, Inc. of California, E.T.I. Explosive Technologies International, Inc. of California, E.T.I. Explosive Technologies International, Inc. of California and E.T.I. Explosive Technologies International, Inc. of California terminated. (bp)
October 2, 2013 *** Party American West Explosives, American West Explosives, American West Explosives, American West Explosives and American West Explosives terminated. (bp)
October 2, 2013 *** Party Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation (a New York corporation), Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation (a New York corporation), Goodrich Corporation (a New York corporation), Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Corporation and Goodrich Corporation terminated. (bp)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1844 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, CLAIMS BY AND AGAINST GOODRICH CORPORATION, AMERICAN WEST EXPLOSIVES, E.T.I. EXPLOSIVES TECHNOLOGIES, INC. OF CALIFORNIA, GOLDEN STATE EXPLOSIVES, GENERAL DYNAMICS, AND REAL PROPERTY ACQUISITION & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: All federal and state claims, whether pled or "deemed" by American West Explosives, E.T.I. Golden State Explosives, General Dynamics and RPAD against Goodrigh shall be dismissed, without prejudice; All federal and state claims, whether pled or "deemed" by Goodrich against American West Explosives, E.T.I., Golden State Explosives, General Dynamics and RPAD shall be dismissed, without prejudice; Nothing set forth in this Stipulation shall operate as "an adjudication on the merits" of Goodrich's claims against American West Explosives, E.T.I., Golden State Explosives, General Dynamics, and RPAD or the claims of American West Explosives, E.T.I., Golden State Explosives, General Dynamics, and RPAD against Goodrich and the effect of Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(B) shall not apply to these stipulated dismissals, without prejudice; and Goodrich, American West Explosives, E.T.I., Golden State Explosives, General Dynamics, and RPAD are to bear their own costs and bear their own attorneys'fees, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #1840 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #1839 , (bp)
October 2, 2013 Filing 1843 NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino. and Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc. (Refkin, Martin)
October 1, 2013 Filing 1842 STATUS REPORT as to its Dismissal of Various Parties filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
October 1, 2013 Filing 1841 **STRICKEN 10/7/13**NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Goodrich Corporation pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Broco Environmental, Inc., as to Denova Environmental, Inc. and as to Survival Systems, Inc.. (Wickersham, Matthew) Modified on 10/7/2013 (ir).
October 1, 2013 Filing 1840 Corrected STIPULATION to Dismiss cross-defendants American West Explosives, E.T.I. Explosives Technologies, Inc. of California, Golden State Explosives, General Dynamics, and Real Property Acquisition & Development Company, LLC filed by defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 30, 2013 Filing 1839 STIPULATION to Dismiss Third party Real Property Acquisition & Development Company, LLC and cross-defendants E.T.I Explosives Technologies, Inc. of CA, Golden State Explosives, General Dynamics and American West Explosives filed by defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 16, 2013 Filing 1838 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Case called. Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the case. The Court sets the Final Pretrial Conference for September 8, 2014 at 2:30 p.m. and the Jury Trial for September 23, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. The Court signs and approves the proposed case management order. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (bm)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1837 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DEADLINES FOR CLAIMS RELATING TO THE ESTATE OF HARRY HESCOX by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation #1835 : The Court having considered the Joint Stipulation submitted by the parties on September 9, 2013, and having held a scheduling conference on September 16, 2013, and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The October 22, 2013 trial date is vacated, and the following deadlines shall apply to the claims relating to the Estate of Harry Hescox: Expert witness disclosures exchanged: January 16, 2014; Rebuttal expert witness disclosures exchanged: March 16, 2014; Expert discovery closes: May 16, 2014; Deadline for filing dispositive motions: June 16, 2014; Pretrial Status Conference: September 08, 2014 at 2:30 p.m.; Trial Date: September 23, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. 2. Service of pleadings and production of documents shall take place according to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and any applicable local rules, and the parties need no longer use Lexis Nexis File and Serve or the common document depository. Fact discovery is closed. 3. The Special Discovery Master is no longer required and discovery disputes shall be resolved according to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and any applicable local rules, by the presiding Magistrate Judge and the Court as appropriate. (bm)
September 9, 2013 Filing 1836 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Goodrich Corporation re Stipulation to Reset #1835 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Case Management Order Setting Deadlines for Claims Relating to the Estate of Harry Hescox)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 9, 2013 Filing 1835 Joint STIPULATION to Reset filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Bradley)
September 9, 2013 Filing 1834 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report re Hescox Consent Decree filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (O'Brien, Bradley)
September 4, 2013 Filing 1833 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacio S. Moreno re Status Conference, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #1829 (bp)
August 22, 2013 Filing 1831 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacia S. Moreno re Status Conference, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #1826 (bp)
August 22, 2013 Filing 1830 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacia S. Moreno re USCA Order,,, #1827 (bp)
August 19, 2013 Filing 1829 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court, having read and considered the Status Report filed on August 15th (Dkt.#1828), and the oral argument presented today, sets another Status Conference for September 16, 2013 at 3:00 p.m. The court also orders that a proposed case management order, along with a new joint status report, be filed by September 9th.Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (bp)
August 15, 2013 Filing 1828 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (O'Brien, Bradley)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1827 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #812 filed by Goodrich Corporation, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #1294 filed by The United States of America, The United States of America, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #869 filed by United States of America, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #1319 filed by Goodrich Corporation, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #1214 filed by Emhart Industries Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #821 filed by Emhart Industries Inc, Black & Decker Inc, Kwikset Corporation, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #1333 filed by Emhart Industries Inc CCA # 11-56130, 11-56159, 11-56309, 12-55083, 12-55342, 12-55409, 12-55410,. These appeals are voluntarily dismissed. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. Order received in this district on 8/6/2013. (dmap)
August 5, 2013 Filing 1826 MINUTES OF NEW STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Having been updated by plaintiff's counsel, the Court resets the Status Conference to August 19, 2013 at 3pm, and orders that a written status report be submitted by close of business day on August 15th. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (bp)
August 1, 2013 Filing 1832 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacia S. Moreno re Status Conference, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #1819 (bp)
July 29, 2013 Filing 1825 STATUS REPORT of the United States and Hescox Regarding Hescox Consent Decree filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (O'Brien, Bradley)
July 26, 2013 Filing 1824 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian L Zagon counsel for Defendants Astro Pyrotechnics Inc, Pyro Spectaculars Inc. Erik S. Mroz is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Pyro Spectaculars, Inc. and Astro Pyrotechnics, Inc.. (Zagon, Brian)
July 15, 2013 Filing 1823 TEXT ONLY ENTRY IN CHAMBERS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: On the Court's own motion, the Jury Trial is continued from 10/21/13 (Monday) #1768 to 10/22/13 at 9am. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(wm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 2, 2013 Filing 1822 CONSENT DECREE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez Re: KTI Consent Decree. FINAL JUDGMENT. The United States and Settling Defendants agree, and this Court by entering this Consent Decree finds, that this Consent Decree has been negotiated by the Parties in good faith, that settlement of this matter will avoid prolonged and complicated litigation between the Parties, and that this Consent Decree is fair, reasonable, and in the public interest. The Court finds that there is no just reason for delay of entry of this Consent Decree, and therefore enters this judgment as a final judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 and 58. (see document for further details) Related to: MOTION for Settlement Approval of Proposed Consent Decrees #1807 . (bm)
July 2, 2013 Filing 1821 CONSENT DECREE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Re: OU2/OU3 Work Consent Decree. FINAL JUDGMENT: This Consent Decree and its appendices constitute the final, complete, and exclusive agreement and understanding among the Parties and UTC regarding the settlement embodied in the Consent Decree. The Parties and UTC acknowledge that there are no representations, agreements or understandings relating to the settlement other than those expressly contained in this Consent Decree. 149. Upon entry of this Consent Decree by the Court, this Consent Decree shall constitute a final judgment between and among the United States, Settling Work Defendant, and UTC. The Court finds that there is no just reason for delay and therefore enters this judgment as a final judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 and 58. (see document for further details) Related to: MOTION for Settlement Approval of Proposed Consent Decrees #1807 . (bm)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1820 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #1807 Motion for Settlement CONSENT DECREE: OUI Work Consent Decree. FINAL JUDGMENT: This Consent Decree and its appendices constitute the final, complete, and exclusive agreement and understanding among the Parties regarding the settlement embodied in the Consent Decree. The Parties acknowledge that there are no representations, agreements or understandings relating to the settlement other than those expressly contained in this Consent Decree. Upon entry of this Consent Decree by the Court, this Consent Decree shall constitute a final judgment between and among the United States, Rialto, Colton, and Settling Defendants. The Court finds that there is no just reason for delay and therefore enters this judgment as a final judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 and 58. (see document for further details) (bm)
July 1, 2013 Filing 1819 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Having question counsel regarding Defendant James Hescox, the Court sets a new status conference for Monday, August 5, 2013 at 3pm, with a written report to be filed by close of business day on July 28th. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (bm)
June 19, 2013 Filing 1818 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, The Schulz Trust, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., re Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06),, #1815 , Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06),, #1817 , Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06),, #1814 , Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06),, #1816 for The Gallagher Law Group PC attorneys Timothy P. Gallagher, Martin N. Refkin, Thomas Alan Bloomfield and David H. Lawton served on June 19, 2013. (Bloomfield, Thomas)
June 19, 2013 Filing 1817 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Thomas Alan Bloomfield counsel for Defendants County of San Bernardino, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Counter Claimant The Schulz Trust. Changing firm name and address for attorney Thomas Alan Bloomfield to The Gallagher Law Group PC, 1875 Century Park East, Suite 1550, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino; Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc.; Schulz Trust Parties; Zambelli Parties. (Bloomfield, Thomas)
June 19, 2013 Filing 1816 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Thomas Alan Bloomfield counsel for Defendants County of San Bernardino, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Counter Claimant The Schulz Trust. Changing firm name and address for attorney Timothy P. Gallagher to The Gallagher Law Group PC, 1875 Century Park East, Suite 1550, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino; Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc.; Schulz Trust Parties; Zambelli Parties. (Bloomfield, Thomas)
June 19, 2013 Filing 1815 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Thomas Alan Bloomfield counsel for Defendants County of San Bernardino, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Counter Claimant The Schulz Trust. Changing firm name and address for attorney Martin N. Refkin to The Gallagher Law Group PC, 1875 Century Park East, Suite 1550, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino; Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc.; Schulz Trust Parties; Zambelli Parties. (Bloomfield, Thomas)
June 19, 2013 Filing 1814 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Thomas Alan Bloomfield counsel for Defendants County of San Bernardino, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Counter Claimant The Schulz Trust. Changing firm name and address for attorney David H. Lawton to The Gallagher Law Group PC, 1875 Century Park East, Suite 1550, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino; Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc.; Schulz Trust Parties; Zambelli Parties. (Bloomfield, Thomas)
June 12, 2013 Filing 1813 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacia S Moreno, BC, re USCA Order, #1801 . (bm)
June 10, 2013 Filing 1812 STATUS REPORT REGARDING RECEIPT OF THE HESCOX CONSENT DECREE SIGNATURE filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Rigau, Mark)
June 6, 2013 Filing 1811 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff United States of America. correcting MOTION for Settlement Approval of Proposed Consent Decrees #1807 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Corrected Proposed Order)(Gitin, Deborah)
June 3, 2013 Filing 1810 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacia S Moreno, Return to Sender, Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward, re Order, #1806 . (bm)
May 29, 2013 Filing 1809 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacia S Moreno, Return to Sender, Unable to Forward, re USCA Order #1799 . (bm)
May 23, 2013 Filing 1808 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacia S Moreno, Return to Sender, Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward, re Order #1804 . (bm)
May 20, 2013 Filing 1807 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Proposed Consent Decrees filed by plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gitin, Deborah)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1806 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION Of The United States And Hescox Regarding Certification And Setting Of Status Conference In The Event Certification Deadline Not Met by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Reset #1805 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: On or before June 10, 2013, the United States shall file with the Court, on behalf of Hescox, a certification that the United States has received the Hescox signature page for the Hescox Consent Decree, or otherwise inform the Court of the status of the Hescox Consent Decree. In the event the United States does not by June 10, 2013, file a certification that the United States has received the Hescox signature page for the Hescox Consent Decree, the United States and Hescox are required to appear before this Court for a Status Conference on July 1, 2013. Counsel and principles for Hescoxs insurance carriers are also required to appear before this Court at the July 1, 2013, Status Conference. In the event the United States certifies receipt of the Hescox signature page by June 10, 2013, the Status Conference scheduled for July 1, 2013, is cancelled. (bm)
May 9, 2013 Filing 1805 Joint STIPULATION to Reset filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Certification and Request for Status Conference)(O'Brien, Bradley)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1804 ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF CERTIFICATION LINE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File, #1802 : of the Harry Hescox Trust and as Executor of the Estate of Harry Hescox ("Hescox"), and the United States of America ("United States"), submitted on May 3, 2013, and good cause appearing; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: On or before May 9, 2013, the United States shall file with the Court, on behalf ofHescox, a certification that the United States has received the Hescox signature page for the Hescox Consent Decree, or otherwise inform the Court of the status of the Hescox Consent Decree. (bm)
May 3, 2013 Filing 1802 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Certification of Signatures to Consent Decree filed by Defendant James Hescox in his capacity of Trustee of the Harry Hescox Trust James Hescox. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Isola, David)
April 29, 2013 Filing 1803 Notice of Electronic Filing re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File, #1802 , USCA Order, #1801 e-mailed to tjb@bcltlaw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.7.1 Recipient rejected. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to jtb@bcltlaw.com. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1801 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #1334 filed by Astro Pyrotechnics Inc, Pyro Spectaculars Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #807 filed by Astro Pyrotechnics Inc, Pyro Spectaculars, Inc., CCA # 11-56104 and 12-55411. Appeal Nos. 11-56104 and 12-55411 only, are voluntarily dismissed. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. Order received in this district on 4/29/13. (mat)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1800 ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF CERTIFICATION DEADLINE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File, #1798 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: On or before May 3, 2013, the United States shall file with the Court, on behalf of Hescox, a certification that the United States has received the Hescox signature page for the Hescox Consent Decree, or otherwise inform the Court of the status of the Hescox Consent Decree. (lw)
April 23, 2013 Filing 1798 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Certification of Hescox Signature Page for Hescox Consent Decree filed by Defendant James Hescox. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Regarding Extension of Certification Deadline)(Isola, David)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1799 ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #1334 filed by Astro Pyrotechnics Inc, Pyro Spectaculars Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #812 filed by Goodrich Corporation, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #1294 filed by The United States of America, The United States of America, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #869 filed by United States of America, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #1319 filed by Goodrich Corporation, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #1214 filed by Emhart Industries Inc, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #821 filed by Emhart Industries Inc, Black & Decker Inc, Kwikset Corporation, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #807 filed by Astro Pyrotechnics Inc, Pyro Spectaculars, Inc., Consent Judgment #1258 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #1333 filed by Emhart Industries Inc, CCA # 11-56104, 11-56130,11-56159, 11-56309,12-55083,12-55342,12-55409,12-55410, 12-55411. The Order is These appeals are voluntarily dismised. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. Order received in this district on 4/22/2013. (dmap)
April 19, 2013 Filing 1797 NOTICE CHANGE OF ADDRESS filed by Special Master Venetta S Tassopulos. (bp)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1796 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, OF PYRO SPECTACULARS, INC.'S Claims Against Real Property Acquisition And Development Company, LLC And Real Property Acquisition And Development Company, LLC's Claims Against Pyro Spectaculars by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1795 : After full consideration by the Court of the Joint Stipulation To Dismiss, Without Prejudice, Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.'s ("PSI") Claims Against Real Property Acquisition And Development Company, LLC ("RPAD") and RPAD's Claims Against PSI, and for good cause showing: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. PSI's July 14, 2011 Third-Party Complaint, filed in the United States Action, is dismissed, without prejudice; 2. All deemed claims by PSI against RPAD in the Consolidated Actions are dismissed, without prejudice; 2. All "deemed" claims by RPAD against PSI in the Consolidated Actions are dismissed, without prejudice; and, 3. PSI and RPAD shall bear their own costs and fees. (bm)
March 28, 2013 Filing 1795 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Third-Party Defendant Real Property Acquisition & Development Company, LLC filed by Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mroz, Erik)
March 26, 2013 Filing 1794 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Consent Decree re Statement #1787 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Decree)(Gitin, Deborah)
March 26, 2013 Filing 1793 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Consent Decree re Statement #1788 (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(O'Brien, Bradley)
March 20, 2013 Filing 1792 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Carissa M Beecham counsel for Plaintiff City of Colton.Carissa M. Beecham is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff City of Colton (Beecham, Carissa)
March 19, 2013 Filing 1791 CONSENT DECREE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED: This Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1331 and 1345; 42 U.S.C. 6973(a), 9607, and 9613(b); and also has personal jurisdiction over Settling Defendants. Solely for the purpose of this Consent Decree and the underlying complaints, Settling Defendants waive all objections and defense that they may have to jurisdiction of the Court or to venue in this District. Settling Defendant shall not challenge entry or the terms of this Consent Decree or this Court's jurisdiction to enter and enforce this Consent Decree. The Settling Defendants shall severally pay a total of five million six hundred sixty-three thousand dollars ($5,663,000) to the United States and the Local Government Entities. Of this amount, the United States shall receive four million three hundred thirty thousand dollars ($4,330,000); Colton shall receive five hundred thousand dollars ($500,000); Rialto shall receive five hundred thousand dollars ($500,000); and the County shall receive three hundred thirty-three thousand dollars ($333,00).Off Calendar #1783 Motion for Settlement (bp)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1790 ORDER RE STIPULATION OF THE UNITED STATES AND THE ESTATE OF HESCOX INFORMING THE COURT OF TENTATIVE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND REQUESTING VACATING OF CMO DATES FOR THE ESTATE OF HESCOX by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct, #1789 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Court vacates all fact discovery dates, expert discovery dates, other pretrial dates, and the trial dates as to Hescox at this time, subject to reinstatement of an appropriate pretrial schedule in the event that the parties for any reason fail to reach agreement as to the terms of the Hescox Consent Decree. 2. On or before April 23, 2013, the United States shall file with the Court, on behalf of Hescox, a certification that the United States has received a signature page for the Hescox Consent Decree, or otherwise inform the Court of the status of the Hescox Consent Decree. (bm)
February 27, 2013 Filing 1789 Joint STIPULATION to Amend CMO to Vacate Hescox's Dates as a Result of Tentative Settlement Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1736 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Bradley)
February 20, 2013 Filing 1788 STATEMENT Certification Regarding Receipt of Goodrich Corporation Consent Decree Signature filed by Plaintiff United States of America re: Order,,,,,, #1785 . (O'Brien, Bradley)
February 20, 2013 Filing 1787 STATEMENT U.S.' Certification Re Receipt of KTI Consent Decree Signatures filed by Plaintiff United States of America re: Order,,,,,, #1785 . (Gitin, Deborah)
February 5, 2013 Filing 1786 JOINDER in MOTION for Settlement Approval of Consent Decree Motion to Enter Consent Decree and Memorandum of Law in Support #1783 filed by Defendants Astro Pyrotechnics Inc, Pyro Spectaculars, Inc., Stonehurst Site LLC, The 1996 Thomas O Peters and Kathleen S Peters Revocable Trust, Thomas O. Peters Revocable Trust, Trojan Fireworks Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zagon, Brian)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1785 ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF SETTLEMENT DEADLINES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #1781 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. On or before February 20, 2013, the United States, on behalf of the EPA, shall file a certification regarding the receipt of signature pages for the Consent Decree between Goodrich and the United States ("Goodrich Consent Decree"). This supersedes the January 23, 2013 certification date indicated in paragraph 3 of this Court's Order of December 7, 2012 (Dkt. 1778). The United States, on behalf of the EPA, shall also file a certification by February 20, 2013, regarding the receipt of signature pages for the Consent Decree between KTI, Rialto Concrete Products, and the United States (the "KTI Consent Decree"). On or before this date, the United States, on behalf of the EPA, shall also file a certification regarding the receipt of signature pages for any other future consent decree(s) finalized by that date, and shall identify any remaining non-settling parties in such certification. 2. All parties certified by the United States as having submitted signature pages for the Goodrich Consent Decree, the KTI Consent Decree, and/or any future consent decree(s) finalized by that date shall receive the same relief from remaining litigation calendar dates described in paragraph 4 of the Court's Order of October 15, 2012 (Dkt. 1768). 3. This Order does not alter any of the future dates in the trial or pretrial calendars as set forth in Paragraph 8 of CMO No. 1 (Dkt. 601, as amended by Orders (Dkt. 1432, 1550, 1736, and 1768)). The dates remain as described in the most recent amending Order (Dkt. 1768). (bm)
January 23, 2013 Filing 1784 Mail Returned addressed to Ignacio S Moreno, Return to Sender, re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 1779 . (bm)
January 23, 2013 Filing 1783 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Consent Decree Motion to Enter Consent Decree and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 3/25/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathleen Salyer in Support of Motion to Enter Consent Decree, #2 Declaration of Wayne Praskins in Support of Motion to Enter Consent Decree, #3 Declaration of Bradley R. O'Brien in Support of Motion to Enter Consent Decree, #4 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Bradley)
January 23, 2013 Filing 1782 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradley R O'Brien on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (O'Brien, Bradley)
January 23, 2013 Filing 1781 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation Regarding Extension of Settlement Deadlines filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wickersham, Matthew)
January 8, 2013 Filing 1780 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney William W Funderburk, Jr counsel for Defendants John Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust under Trust Agreement dated February 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Mary Mitchell, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Third Party Defendants John Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust under Trust Agreement dated February 20, 1985, Linda Frederiksen as Trustee of the Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Frederiksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated November 19, 1991, Mary Mitchell, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Counter Claimants John Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Fredericksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Mary Mitchell, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Cross Defendants John Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Fredericksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Mary Mitchell, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Cross Claimants John Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Fredericksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Mary Mitchell, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Third Party Plaintiffs John Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Fredericksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Mary Mitchell, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout. Ross H. Hirsch will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Ross H. Hirsch is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Edward Stout; Elizabeth Rodriguez; John Callagy, as Trustee of the Frederiksen Childrens Trust under Trust Agreement dated February 20, 1985; Linda Frederiksen; Linda Frederiksen, as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91; Linda Frederiksen, as Trustee of the Michelle Ann Pointon Trust under Trust Agreement dated February 15, 1985; John Callagy; Mary Callagy (erroneously named as Mary Mitchell); Jeanine Elzie; and Stephen Callagy (collectively, The Schulz Parties) (Funderburk, William)
January 7, 2013 Filing 1779 TEXT ONLY ENTRY IN CHAMBERS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Please be advised the January 14th Trial Management Conference #1256 is hereby vacated per minute order issued on December 4, 2012 #1775 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(wm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1778 ORDER RE: LITIGATION AND SETTLEMENT DEADLINES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The United States shall file its initial brief regarding entry of the PSI Consent Decree on or before January 23, 2013. Subsequent briefing and/or hearing schedules will be set according to the Local Rules. 2. Aside from the instant [Proposed] Order, no additional Proposed Orders regarding the briefing and hearing schedules for the PSI Consent Decree are required to be filed pursuant to the Courts October 22, 2012 Order Re: Briefing and Hearing Schedules for Motions to Enter Consent Decree (Dkt. 1772). 3. On or before January 23, 2013, the United States, on behalf of the EPA, shall file a certification regarding the receipt of signature pages for the Goodrich Consent Decree and any other future consent decree(s) finalized by that date, and shall identify any remaining non-settling parties in such certification. This supersedes the December 14, 2012 certification date indicated in paragraph 3 of this Courts Order of October 15, 2012 (Dkt. 1768). All parties certified by the United States as having submitted signature pages for the Goodrich Consent Decree and/or any other future consent decree(s) finalized by that date shall receive the same relief from remaining litigation calendar dates described in paragraph 4 of that same Order (Dkt. 1768). 4. This Order does not alter any of the future dates in the trial or pretrial calendars as set forth in Paragraph 8 of CMO No. 1 (Dkt. #601, as amended by Orders (Dkt. # 1432, 1550, 1736, and 1768)). The dates remain as described in the most recent amending Order (Dkt. 1768). (bm)
December 5, 2012 Filing 1777 NOTICE of Submission of Proposed Order Pursuant to Minute Order of December 4, 2012 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Litigation and Settlement Deadlines)(Gitin, Deborah)
December 5, 2012 Filing 1776 STATEMENT United States' Third Supplemental Certification Regarding Receipt of Work CD Signatures filed by Plaintiff United States of America re: Statement #1770 , Statement #1773 , Statement #1766 . (Gitin, Deborah)
December 4, 2012 Filing 1775 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENTS held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court and counsel confer regarding ongoing settlement negotiations, remaining claims and forthcoming consent decrees. Counsel for the government shall submit a proposed order regarding deadlines. The Court determines that further status conferences will not be needed. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (bm)
December 4, 2012 Filing 1774 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Consent Decree re Statement #1773 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Decree, #2 Appendix A to Proposed Consent Decree, #3 Appendix B Part 1 to Proposed Consent Decree, #4 Appendix B Part 2 to Proposed Consent Decree, #5 Appendices C-K to Proposed Consent Decree)(Gitin, Deborah)
November 16, 2012 Filing 1773 STATEMENT United States' Second Supplemental Certification Re Receipt of Work Consent Decree Signatures filed by Plaintiff United States of America re: Statement #1770 , Statement #1766 . (Gitin, Deborah)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1772 ORDER RE: BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULES FOR MOTIONS TO ENTER CONSENT DECREES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Report, #1771 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Within ten (10) Court days after the closing of the public comment period for each Consent Decree, the United States, and all parties to the Consolidated Action shall lodge with the Court, if they can agree, Proposed Order(s), which establish the briefing and hearing schedules for any motion(s) for entry of the Consent Decree(s) and determinations that the settlements set forth in the Consent Decree(s) are fair, reasonable, and in the public interest. 2. If, after meeting and conferring in good faith, the parties cannot agree on the briefing and hearing schedules, they shall, within ten (10) Court days after the closing of the public comment period for each Consent Decree, file a Joint Report Regarding Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Proposed Consent Decree(s), which set forth their respective positions on these issues along with Proposed Orders. (bm)
October 18, 2012 Filing 1771 JOINT REPORT of Re Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Proposed Consent Decree(s) filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Briefing and Hearing Schedules for Motions to Enter Consent Decree(s))(Gitin, Deborah)
October 17, 2012 Filing 1770 STATEMENT of First Supplemental Certification Regarding Receipt of Work Consent Decree Signatures re: Statement #1766 . (Gitin, Deborah)
October 15, 2012 Filing 1769 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1768 e-mailed to WCale@manatt.com bounced due to Delivery to the following recipients failed.. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1768 ORDER RE STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES TO REQUEST TO EXTEND LITIGATION SCHEDULE FOR 90 DAYS AND PROPOSED ORDER TO AMEND CMO NO. 1 (Dkt. # 601), AS MODIFIED BY ORDERS (Dkt. #s 1432, 1550,1736) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct, #1767 , NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. STATUS CONFERENCE SET 12/4/2012 AT 03:00 PM. Expert witness disclosures exchanged: December 14, 2012 NEW DATE: March 14, 2013; Rebuttal expert witness disclosures exchanged: February 15, 2013 NEW DATE: May 16, 2013; Expert discovery closes: May 30, 2013 NEW DATE: August 28, 2013; Deadline for filing dispositive motions: March 29, 2013 NEW DATE: June 27, 2013; Pretrial Status Conference: May 13, 2013 NEW DATE: August 12, 2013; Trial Date: July 22, 2013 NEW DATE: October 21, 2013. Nothing in this Order modifies the relief described in Paragraphs 1 - 4 of this Court's September 10, 2012 Order, relating to vacating CMO dates for specified parties that sign the PSI Consent Decree or the Work Consent Decree. (Dkt.#1736). 2. At the Court's discretion, a status conference may be set in November, which will be attended by: a) all parties that have not reached a tentative settlement with the United States; and b) all parties that have reached tentative settlement agreements with the United States but have not lodged a consent decree with the Court. The purpose of the status conference would be to advise the Court of the status of these settlement efforts and to discuss further scheduling, if appropriate. 3. On or before December 14, 2012, the United States, on behalf of theEPA, and any additional settling parties, including Goodrich Corporation, shall filea certification regarding the receipt of signature pages for the Goodrich ConsentDecree. The United States also should identify any remaining non-settling partiesin the certification...... (PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) (lw)
October 12, 2012 Filing 1767 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1550 , Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1736 , Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #601 , Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1432 filed by Plaintiff The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Request to Extend Litigation Schedule)(O'Brien, Bradley)
October 10, 2012 Filing 1766 STATEMENT of Certification Regarding Receipt of Work Consent Decree Signatures (Gitin, Deborah)
October 10, 2012 Filing 1765 NOTICE OF LODGING filed October 10, 2012 by United States re Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1736 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Decree)(Gitin, Deborah)
September 19, 2012 Filing 1764 SEALED DOCUMENT- DISCOVERY MATTER (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1763 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #1750 UNITED STATES' APPLICATION For an Order to File Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order Regarding EPA Deliberative Process Documents and Information, DN 1162, Exhibits I-O (Excerpts of the Deposition Transcripts of Michele Benson and Dustin Minor) to the Declaration of Andrew Ingersoll in Support of United States Opposition to Goodrich's Motion to Compel Further Deposition Testimony of Michele Benson and Dustin Minor filed by Defendant United States of America. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States' ex parte application for sealed filing is granted. The documents sought to be filed under seal and the United States' ex parte application for seal documents shall be filed under seal. The government may produce the document as permitted or required by applicable law. (lw)
September 19, 2012 Filing 1760 REPORT of SPECIAL MASTER RE GOODRICH CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL The United States To Review Its Entire Privilege Log And Produce All Non-Privileged Documents. (bm)
September 19, 2012 Filing 1759 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Goodrich's Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff (Joinder in Oppositions of Broco and County) filed by Defendant Whittaker Corporation. (Johnson, Christopher)
September 19, 2012 Filing 1758 OPPOSITION of the County Parties re: MOTION for Order for to Continue the Discovery Cut-Off To October 1, 2012 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Order for to Continue the Discovery Cut-Off To October 1, 2012 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1740 filed by Counter Claimant County of San Bernardino. (Lawton, David)
September 19, 2012 Filing 1757 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION for Order for to Continue the Discovery Cut-Off To October 1, 2012 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Order for to Continue the Discovery Cut-Off To October 1, 2012 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1740 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Broco Environmental Inc, Cross Defendants Broco, Inc., JS Brower & Associates Inc. (Ceran, Allan)
September 19, 2012 Filing 1756 NOTICE of Change of address by Jad T Davis attorney for Cross Defendants Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co. Pyrotechnics, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company Inc, Third Party Defendants Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company Inc, Defendants Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co.. Changing attorneys address to 5 Park Plaza, Suite 1500, Irvine, CA 92614. Filed by Cross Defendants Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co. Pyrotechnics, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company Inc, Third Party Defendants Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Company, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Inc., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company Inc, Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company Inc, Defendants Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co., Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co.. (Davis, Jad)
September 19, 2012 Filing 1752 OPPOSITION of the United States re: MOTION for Order for to Continue the Discovery Cut-Off To October 1, 2012 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Order for to Continue the Discovery Cut-Off To October 1, 2012 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1740 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Cox)(MacAyeal, James)
September 19, 2012 Filing 1751 OPPOSITION of the United States re: MOTION to Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Corporation [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Corporation [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Corporation [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Corporation [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1732 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Yogi)(MacAyeal, James)
September 18, 2012 Filing 1750 UNITED STATES' APPLICATION For an Order to File Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order Regarding EPA Deliberative Process Documents and Information, DN 1162, Exhibits I-O (Excerpts of the Deposition Transcripts of Michele Benson and Dustin Minor) to the Declaration of Andrew Ingersoll in Support of United States Opposition to Goodrich's Motion to Compel Further Deposition Testimony of Michele Benson and Dustin Minor filed by Defendant United States of America. Lodged proposed order. (lw)
September 14, 2012 Filing 1746 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1570 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David H. Garabrant, M.D., M.P.H., In Support of Goodrich's Supplemental Reply Brief Regarding Its Motion To Compel the United States To Re-Run Document Searches Using More Expansive Search Terms)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 14, 2012 Filing 1745 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Exhibits I-O to the Declaration of Andrew Ingersoll. (Ingersoll, Andrew)
September 14, 2012 Filing 1744 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony From Michele Benson and Dustin Minor [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1702 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Ingersoll, #2 Exhibit A-H to the Declaration of Andrew Ingersoll, #3 Exhibit I-O to the Declaration of Andrew Ingersoll, #4 Exhibit P to the Declaration of Andrew Ingersoll)(Ingersoll, Andrew)
September 14, 2012 Filing 1743 SUPPLEMENT [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Brief Regarding Its Opposition To The United States' Motion To Compel Goodrich To Answer The United States' Requests For Admission (Set Four) And Requests for Production of Documents (Set Six))(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 14, 2012 Filing 1742 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to United States' 4th Requests for Admission and 6th Request for Production of Documents to Goodrich Corp. #1391 filed by Defendant United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits)(Dawson, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2012 Filing 1755 SEALED DOCUMENT- PORTIONS OF EXHIBITS to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel The Production of all Documents Withheld by CSC filed Under Seal. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1754 ORDER GRANTING Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed in Support of Goodrich's Motion to Compel the Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Corporation #1753 , by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Exhibits V, X, Y and portions of Exhibit W to the Declaration of Matthew Wickersham, in Support of Goodrich's Motion to Compel the Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Corporation, shall be filed under seal. (lw)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1748 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez ORDERING Notice of Interim Suspension from the Practice of Law of Robert D. Wyatt submitted by Defendants Black & Decker Inc, Emhart Industries Inc, Kwikset Corporation received on 9/12/2012 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (lw)
September 13, 2012 Filing 1741 NOTICE Notice of Entry of Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time To Hear Its Motion to Compel The Production Of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Corporation filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] (Wickersham, Matthew)
September 12, 2012 Filing 1749 NOTICE OF INTERIM SUSPENSION From the Practice of Law of Robert D. Wyatt, State Bar No. 73240 filed by Defendants Black & Decker Inc, Emhart Industries Inc, Kwikset Corporation. (lw)
September 12, 2012 Filing 1740 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for to Continue the Discovery Cut-Off To October 1, 2012 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dana Craig In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion To Continue the Discovery Cut-Off to October 1, 2012)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 12, 2012 Filing 1739 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time To Hear Its Motion To Continue the Discovery Cut-Off To October 1, 2012)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1738 MINUTES: (In Chambers) Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgment #1569 : The Court DENIES Goodrich's motion for partial summary judgment WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ir)
September 12, 2012 Filing 1737 Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1733 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bonnie Cosgrove)(Cosgrove, Bonnie)
September 11, 2012 Filing 1753 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed in Support of Goodrich's Motion to Compel the Production of All documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Corporation filed by Goodrich Corporation. (lw)
September 11, 2012 Filing 1734 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Exhibits to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham. (Attachments: #1 Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Motion To Compel the Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Corporation, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Motion To Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Corporation)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1736 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Joint Status Report #1715 : with regard to the lodging of the Consent Decree(s), that: 1. Within seven (7) days following formal approval by the City of Colton City Council and the appropriate United States government officials, but no later than October 10, 2012, the United States, on behalf of the Environmental Protection Agency ("EPA"), and the Settling Parties identified at Paragraph 1 of the August 31,2012 Joint Status Report shall lodge the PSI Consent Decree with this Court 2. Upon the lodging of the PSI Consent Decree, all fact discovery dates,expert discovery dates, other pre-trial dates, and the trial date set forth in this Order are vacated as to each Settling Party, other than governmental parties, which have signed the PSI Consent Decree. 3. On or before October 10, 2012, the United States, on behalf of the EPA, and the Settling Parties identified at Paragraph 2 of the August 31, 2012 Joint Status Report shall file a certification regarding receipt of signature pages for the Work Consent Decree. 4. Upon the filing of the certification regarding receipt of signature pages for the Work Consent Decree, all fact discovery dates, expert discovery dates, other pre-trial dates, and the trial date set forth in this Order are vacated as to each Settling Party who has signed that decree. 5. On or before October 19, 2012, the United States, on behalf of EPA, the Settling Parties, and all non-settling parties also shall lodge with the Court, if they can agree, Proposed Order(s), which establish the briefing and hearing schedule(s) for the motion(s) for entry of the Consent Decree(s) and determination(s) that the settlements set forth in the Consent Decree(s) are fair, reasonable, and have been entered in good faith. 6. If, after meeting and conferring in good faith, the United States, on behalf of EPA, the Settling Parties, and the non-settling parties cannot agree on the briefing and hearing schedules, they shall, on or before October 19, 2012, file a Joint Report Regarding Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Proposed Consent Decree(s), which set forth their respective positions on these issues along with Proposed Orders IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, with regard to fact discovery, that: 1. To the extent fact discovery remains, the following fact discovery deadlines shall be stayed and suspended, effective February 17, 2012, pending further order of the Court: (a) those between and among the Settling Defendants; 2 (b) those between and among the Governmental Parties; (c) those between and among any Settling Defendant and any Governmental Party; and (d) those between and among the Settling Parties and all other parties to the Consolidated Actions, except as set forth in paragraph 2, below; 2. The fact discovery deadlines involving the United States and Goodrich Corporation shall remain August 31, 2012, unless otherwise modified by court order subject to any appeal. 3. All objections to the fact discovery which were preserved by paragraph 3 of Order (Dkt. # 1432), entered on April 4, 2012, shall continue to be preserved; in the event that a tentative settlement agreement as to a particular party or parties is not finalized and approved by the Court, any pending discovery motion directed at that party or parties which was withdrawn pursuant to Order (Dkt. # 1432), enteredon April 4, 2012, may be re-noticed; and IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, with regard to expert witness discovery and other related pre-trial dates, that paragraph 8 of CMO No. 1 (Dkt. # 601), as amended by Order (Dkt. # 1432), is further amended as follows: Status Conference N/A; Expert Witness disclosures exchanged 12/14/12; Rebuttal expert witness disclosures exchanged 2/15/13; Expert discovery closes 5/30/13; Deadline for filing disposition motions 3/29/13; Pretrial Status Conference 5/13/13; Trial date 7/22/13. (ir)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1735 MINUTES: STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENTS: Having read the joint status report #1715 and proposed order to amend the Case Management Order (CMO), and having asked if anyone would like to be heard on the matter, the Court signs the proposed order on the record by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (ir)
September 10, 2012 Filing 1733 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time To Hear Its Motion to Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Corporation)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 10, 2012 Filing 1732 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Corporation [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion To Compel the Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Coproration, #2 Part 2 to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion To Compel the Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Coproration, #3 Part 3 to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion To Compel the Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Coproration, #4 Part 4 to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion To Compel the Production of All Documents Withheld by Computer Sciences Coproration)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 10, 2012 Filing 1730 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Firm Name Change #1729 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Notices-Change of Attorney Information (G-06). Other error(s) with document(s): Forms are available at our court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1762 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #1761 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION REQUESTING SEALING Of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Compel The Production Of All Documents Withheld By The United States As Work Product That Fall Under The Scope Of The FUDS Report And Request For Clarification Of The Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Exhibits C, E, F and H and portions of Exhibit A to the Declaration of Matthew Wickersham, in Support of Goodrich's Reply in support of its Motion to Compel the Production of All Documents withheld by the United States as Work Product that fall under the Scope of the FUDS Report and Request for Clarification of the Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order, shall be filed under seal. (bm)
September 7, 2012 Filing 1747 SEALED DOCUMENT- PORTIONS OF EXHIBITS to Declaration of Matthew Wickersam in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply in Support of its MOTION to Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld By the United States As Work Product That Fall Under the Scope of the FUDS Report And Request Clarification of the Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order filed Under Seal. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1731 ORDER DENYING Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel further responses to its Seventeenth Requests for production of documents to the United States of America #1589 by Special Master. (ir)
September 7, 2012 Filing 1729 NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE filed by Defendants Astro Pyrotechnics Inc, Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.. (Hunsucker, Philip)
September 7, 2012 Filing 1728 SUPPLEMENT Regarding United States' Opposition to Goodrich's Motion to Compel the U.S. to Re-Run Document Searches Using More Expansive Search Terms filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Davis Forsythe, #2 Exhibit A-J to the Declaration of Davis Forsythe, #3 Exhibit K-P to the Declaration of Davis Forsythe, #4 Exhibit Q-BB to the Declaration of Davis Forsythe, #5 Declaration of Kathy Camarda, #6 Declaration of Michael Conner, #7 Declaration of Mary Cooke, #8 Declaration of Deniz Ergener, #9 Declaration of Gregory Faloye, #10 Declaration of James MacAyeal, #11 Declaration of Mary McCullough, #12 Declaration of Gracie Pendleton, #13 Declaration of Krystal-Rose Perez, #14 Exhibit A-E to the Declaration of Krystal-Rose Perez, #15 Declaration of Andrew Schulman, #16 Declaration of David Yogi)(Gillespie, Amy)
September 5, 2012 Filing 1761 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S CORRECTED APPLICATION REQUESTING SEALING Of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Compel The Production Of All Documents Withheld By The United States As Work Product That Fall Under The Scope Of The FUDS Report And Request For Clarification Of The Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order filed by defendant Goodrich Corporation. (bm)
September 5, 2012 Filing 1727 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS T, U and CC to the Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Brief Regarding its Motion to Compel the United States to Re-Run Document Searches Using More Expansive Search Terms filed Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order. (mat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2012: Part 2, Part 3) (mat). Modified on 9/7/2012 (mat).
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1726 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits filed in support of Goodrich's Supplemental Brief regarding its Motion to compel the United States to Re-Run document searches using more expansive search terms #1720 . Exhibits T, U, and CC to the Declaration of David Edsall Jr in support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Brief regarding its Motion to compel the United States to Re-Run document searches using more expansive search terms shall be filed under seal. (ir)
September 5, 2012 Filing 1725 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER RE UNITED STATES' MOTIONS To Determine The Sufficiency Of Goodrich's Answers And To Compel Answers To Requests For Admission (Set Three); To Compel Answers To Interrogatories (Set Three); And To Compel Goodrich To Permit Arcadis To Respond To United States' Subpoena For Documents (bm)
September 5, 2012 Filing 1724 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Exhibits to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham. (Attachments: #1 Goodrich Corporation's Corrected Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Compel the Production of All Documents Withheld By The United States As Work Product that Fall Under the Scope of the FUDS Report and Request for Clarification of the Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Corrected Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Compel the Production of All Documents Withheld By The United States As Work Product that Fall Under the Scope of the FUDS Report and Request for Clarification of the Special Master's August 9, 2012 Orde)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 5, 2012 Filing 1723 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Exhibits to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham. (Attachments: #1 GOODRICH CORPORATIONS APPLICATION REQUESTING SEALING OF PORTIONS OF EXHIBITS FILED IN SUPPORT OF GOODRICHS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF ALL DOCUMENTS WITHHLED BY THE UNITED STATES AS WORK PRODUCT THAT FALL UNDER THE SCOPE OF THE FUDS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTERS AUGUST 9, 2012 ORDER, #2 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING GOODRICH CORPORATIONS APPLICATION REQUESTING SEALING OF PORTIONS OF EXHIBITS FILED IN SUPPORT OF GOODRICHS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF ALL DOCUMENTS WITHHLED BY THE UNITED STATES AS WORK PRODUCT THAT FALL UNDER THE SCOPE OF THE FUDS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTERS AUGUST 9, 2012 ORDER)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 5, 2012 Filing 1721 REPLY Support of [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion To Compel the Production of All Documents Withheld by the United States as Work Product That Fall Under the Scope of the FUDS Report and Request for Clarification of the Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order, #2 Part 2 to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion To Compel the Production of All Documents Withheld by the United States as Work Product That Fall Under the Scope of the FUDS Report and Request for Clarification of the Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 4, 2012 Filing 1718 REPLY Support of MOTION for Protective Order for Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of the U.S. Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of the U.S. Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1681 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Protective Order Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of the United States' Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation, #2 Exhibit A Part 1 to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Protective Order Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of the United States' Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation, #3 Exhibit A Part 2 to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Protective Order Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of the United States' Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation, #4 Exhibit A Part 3 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Protective Order Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of the United States' Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation, #5 Exhibits B-J to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Protective Order Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of the United States' Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation, #6 Exhibits K-P to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Protective Order Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of the United States' Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation)(Wickersham, Matthew)
September 4, 2012 Filing 1717 DECLARATION of Robert Storer re Report,, #1566 Supplemental Declaration filed by Defendant United States Department of Defense. (Dawson, Elizabeth)
August 31, 2012 Filing 1720 APPLICATION Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed in Support of Goodrich's Supplemental Brief Regarding its Motion to Compel the United States to Re-Run Document Searches Using More Expansive Search Terms filed by Goodrich Corporation. Lodged Proposed Order. (lw)
August 31, 2012 Filing 1719 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND ORDER of Special Master re Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery filed by Special Master Venetta S Tassopulos. (ir)
August 31, 2012 Filing 1716 OPPOSITION to Goodrich Motion to Compel Production of All Work Product the Falls Under Scope of FUDS Report filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Beers, #2 Exhibit A and B to Beers Declaration, #3 Exhibit C-J of Beers Declaration)(Beers, James)
August 31, 2012 Filing 1715 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED ORDER TO AMEND CMO NO. 1 (DKT.#601), AS MODIFIED BY ORDERS (DKT.#S 1432 AND 1550) filed by Defendant Emhart Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Re Joint Status Report and Proposed Order to Amend CMO NO. 1, AS MODIFIED BY ORDERS (DKT.#s 1432 and 1550), #2 Certificate of Service)(Meeder, James)
August 31, 2012 Filing 1714 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1570 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Edsall, Jr. Exhibits A-Y, #2 Exhibt Z to the Declarartion of David Edsall, Jr., #3 Exhibits AA-GG to the Declaration of David Edsall, Jr.)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 31, 2012 Filing 1713 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits in Support of Goodrich's Supplemental Brief Regarding its Motion to Compel the United States to Re-Run Document Searches; Proposed Order and Under seal exhibits. (Wickersham, Matthew)
August 30, 2012 Filing 1712 REPLY in support of motion MOTION to Compel Answers to United States' 4th Requests for Admission and 6th Request for Production of Documents to Goodrich Corp. #1391 filed by Defendant United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits)(Dawson, Elizabeth)
August 29, 2012 Filing 1722 SEALED DOCUMENT- PORTIONS OF EXHIBITS D and E to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Further Deposition Testimony From Michele Benson and Dustin Minor and EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing the Motion filed Under Seal. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1711 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez GRANTING #1710 Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing Of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support Of Goodrich's Motion To Compel Further Deposition Testimony From Michele Benson And Dustin Minor And Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time To Hear The Motion: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Exhibit E and portions of Exhibit D to the Declaration of Matthew Wickersham, in Support of Goodrich's Motion to Compel Further Deposition Testimony from Michele Benson and Dustin Minor, and Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time to Hear the Motion, shall be filed under seal. (bm)
August 29, 2012 Filing 1709 Mail Returned addressed to Kimberly A. Nortman, Addressee Unknown, re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 1679 . (bm)
August 29, 2012 Filing 1708 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Cross Defendant The United States of America. correcting Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) #1691 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UNITED STATES (CORRECTED) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING ITS OPPOSITION TO GOODRICHS MOTION FOR REINSTATEMENT OF A STAY ON EPAS AFFIRMATIVE DISCOVERY)(Forsythe, Davis)
August 28, 2012 Filing 1710 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION REQUESTING SEALING OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS FILED IN SUPPORT OF GOODRICH'S Motion To Compel Further Deposition Testimony From Michele Benson And Dustin Minor And Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time To Hear The Motion. Lodged prop ord. (bm)
August 28, 2012 Filing 1707 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Protective Order for Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of the U.S. Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of the U.S. Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1681 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rachael Amy Kamons, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-K)(Kamons, Rachael)
August 28, 2012 Filing 1706 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1704 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brian K. Thompson, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Kamons, Rachael)
August 28, 2012 Filing 1705 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Portions of Exhibits D & E to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham. (Attachments: #1 Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Motion to Compel Further Deposition Testimony From Michele Benson and Dustin Minor and Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time To Hear the Motion, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Motion To Compel Further Deposition Testimony from Michele Benson and Dustin Minor And Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time To Hear Motion)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 27, 2012 Filing 1704 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application of Goodrich Corporation For An Order Shortening Time To Hear Its Motion To Compel Further Deposition Testimony From Michele Benson and Dustin Minor)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 27, 2012 Filing 1703 DECLARATION of Matthew Wickerhsam Support of MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony From Michele Benson and Dustin Minor [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1702 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Further Deposition Testimony From Michele Benson and Dustin Minor and Ex Parte Application for An Order Shortening Time To Heart The Motion)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 27, 2012 Filing 1702 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony From Michele Benson and Dustin Minor [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
August 23, 2012 Filing 1701 REPLY Support MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1684 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion For Protective Order To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 23, 2012 Filing 1700 JOINDER in MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1692 , MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1684 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
August 23, 2012 Filing 1699 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld By the United States As Work Product That Fall Under the Scope of the FUDS Report And Request Clarification of the Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion To Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld by the United States As Work Product That Fall Under the Scope of The FUDS Report and Request For Clarification of the Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order, #2 Part 2 to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion To Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld by the United States As Work Product That Fall Under the Scope of The FUDS Report and Request For Clarification of the Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order, #3 Part 3 to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion To Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld by the United States As Work Product That Fall Under the Scope of The FUDS Report and Request For Clarification of the Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order, #4 Part 4 to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion To Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld by the United States As Work Product That Fall Under the Scope of The FUDS Report and Request For Clarification of the Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order, #5 Part 5 to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion To Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld by the United States As Work Product That Fall Under the Scope of The FUDS Report and Request For Clarification of the Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order, #6 Part 6 to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion To Compel The Production of All Documents Withheld by the United States As Work Product That Fall Under the Scope of The FUDS Report and Request For Clarification of the Special Master's August 9, 2012 Order)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 23, 2012 Filing 1697 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1692 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rachael Amy Kamons, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-G, #3 Exhibit Exhibits H-L, #4 Exhibit Exhibits M-V, #5 Exhibit Exhibits W-Y)(Kamons, Rachael)
August 22, 2012 Filing 1696 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Order for Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Order for Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1635 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporations Supplemental Reply Brief Regarding Its Motion For the Reinstatement of A Stay on EPAs Affirmative Discovery)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 21, 2012 Filing 1695 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1684 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rachael Amy Kamons, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-H, #3 Exhibit Exhibits I-O)(Kamons, Rachael)
August 20, 2012 Filing 1692 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Regarding Shortened briefing Schedule For Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips; and [Proposed] Order, #2 Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Protective Order To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips, #3 Exhibit A Part 1 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Protective Order To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips, #4 Exhibit A Part 2 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Protective Order To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips, #5 Exhibit A Part 3 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Protective Order To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips, #6 Exhibits B-N to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Protective Order To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips, #7 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Dintzer In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order To Prevent the Deposition of Bobby Phillips)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 20, 2012 Filing 1691 SUPPLEMENT to United States' Opposition to Goodrich's Motion for Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Davis Forsythe, #2 Exhibit A-J to the Declaration of Davis Forsythe, #3 Exhibit K-P to the Declaration of Davis Forsythe, #4 Exhibit Q-BB to the Declaration of Davis Forsythe, #5 Declaration of Kathy Camarda, #6 Declaration of Michael Conner, #7 Declaration of Deniz Ergener, #8 Declaration of Gregory Faloye, #9 Declaration of Krystal-Rose Perez, #10 Declaration of Andrew Schulman)(Gillespie, Amy)
August 20, 2012 Filing 1690 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Answers to United States' 4th Requests for Admission and 6th Request for Production of Documents to Goodrich Corp. #1391 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition To the United States' Motion To Compel Goodrich To Answer The United States' Requests for Admission (Set Four) and Requests for Production of Documents (Set Six))(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 20, 2012 Filing 1689 NOTICE filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] (Wickersham, Matthew)
August 17, 2012 Filing 1698 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS F, R, and S to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Brief Regarding its Motion for the Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery Filed Under Seal. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1694 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits filed in support of Goodrich's Supplemental Brief regarding its Motion for the Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery #1693 . Portions of Exhibit F, and Exhibits R & to the Declaration of David Edsall Jr in support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Brief regarding its Motion for the Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery shall be filed under seal. (ir)
August 17, 2012 Filing 1688 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1686 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rachael Amy Kamons, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-L)(Kamons, Rachael)
August 17, 2012 Filing 1687 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1683 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rachael Amy Kamons, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-L)(Kamons, Rachael)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1686 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich's Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time To Hear Its Motion For Protective Order To Prevent Deposition of Floyd Phillips)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1685 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Dintzer In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion For Protective Order To Prevent the Deposition of Floyd Phillips MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1684 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1684 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion For Protective Order To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips, #2 Part 2 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion For Protective Order To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips, #3 Part 3 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion For Protective Order To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips, #4 Part 4 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion For Protective Order To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips, #5 Part 5 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion For Protective Order To Prevent The Deposition of Floyd Phillips)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1683 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed[ Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time To Hear Its Motion For Protective Order Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of The U.S. Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1682 DECLARATION of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion For Protective Order Over Topic Numbers 52-56 Of the U.S. Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation MOTION for Protective Order for Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of the U.S. Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Protective Order for Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of the U.S. Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1681 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion For Protective Order Over Topic Numbers 52-56 Of the U.S. Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation, #2 Part 2 to to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion For Protective Order Over Topic Numbers 52-56 Of the U.S. Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation, #3 Part 2 to to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion For Protective Order Over Topic Numbers 52-56 Of the U.S. Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1681 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Over Topic Numbers 52-56 of the U.S. Third Amended Cross-Notice of Deposition of Goodrich Corporation [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1680 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #1678 . The following error was found: Notice of manual filing and Application to seal certain exhibits should not be e-filed together. Application to seal certain exhibits should be manually filed along with the Proposed Order and documents to be placed under seal to the Civil Intake Department. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ir)
August 15, 2012 Filing 1693 APPLICATION requesting sealing of Certain Exhibits filed in support of Goodrich's Supplemental Brief regarding its Motion for the Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery Lodged Proposed Order. (ir)
August 15, 2012 Filing 1679 TEXT ONLY ENTRY IN CHAMBERS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE UNITED STATES LIABILITY #1569 set for hearing on 08/20/12 is taken under submission and off calendar. Accordingly, no appearance by counsel is necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of the submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(wm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 15, 2012 Filing 1678 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Exhibits F, R, & S to Declaration of David Edsall Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Supplemental Brief Regarding Its Motion For the Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Supplemental Brief Regarding Its Motion For the Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 15, 2012 Filing 1677 OPPOSITION to Goodrich's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Rachael Amy Kamons filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Kamons, Rachael)
August 14, 2012 Filing 1676 OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF RACHAEL AMY KAMONS IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO DETERMINE THE SUFFICIENCY OF GOODRICHS ANSWERS AND TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET THREE), TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SET THREE); AND TO COMPEL GOODRICH TO PERMIT ARCADIS TO RESPOND TO UNITED STATES SUBPOENA FOR DOCUMENTS [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF VAUGHN A. BLACKMAN IN SUPPORT OF GOODRICH CORPORATIONS OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF RACHAEL AMY KAMONS IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO DETERMINE THE SUFFICIENCY OF GOODRICHS ANSWERS AND TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET THREE), TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SET THREE); AND TO COMPEL GOODRICH TO PERMIT ARCADIS TO RESPOND TO UNITED STATES SUBPOENA FOR DOCUMENTS)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 14, 2012 Filing 1675 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Order for Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Order for Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1635 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Brief Regarding Its Motion For The Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery, #2 Part 2 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Brief Regarding Its Motion For The Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery, #3 Part 3 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Brief Regarding Its Motion For The Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 14, 2012 Filing 1674 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) #1569 Response to Goodrich's Objections filed by Defendants United States Department of Defense, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit James F. Nagle)(Smaczniak, Kim)
August 13, 2012 Filing 1673 REPLY in support of MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Goodrich Corporation #1377 , MOTION to Compel Goodrich to Permit Arcadis to Respond to Subpoena for Documents #1379 , MOTION to Compel Answers to Requests for Admission (Set Three) #1378 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rachael Amy Kamons, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-G, #3 Exhibit Exhibits H-N, #4 Exhibit Exhibit O part 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit O part 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit O part 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit P-Q, #8 Exhibit Exhibit R part 1, #9 Exhibit Exhibit R part 2, #10 Exhibit Exhibit R part 3, #11 Exhibit Exhibit R part 4)(Kamons, Rachael)
August 9, 2012 Filing 1672 REPORT AND ORDER OF SPECIAL MASTER RE GOODRICH CORPORATION'S AND UNITED STATES' BRIEFS REQUESTING CLARIFICATION REGARDING THE UNITED STATES' ASSERTION OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE OVER SAIC DOCUMENTS AND WITHHOLDING OF ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS #1637 by Special Master Venetta S Tassopulos. (See Order for details) (afe)
August 8, 2012 Filing 1671 NOTICE of Entry of Special Master's Order Re Stipulation for Discovery as to Goodrich's Twenty-First RFP to the United States and Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of the United States re EPA Document Issues filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Rosskam, David)
August 7, 2012 Filing 1670 REPORT AND ORDER OF SPECIAL MASTER RE GOODRICH CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR THE REINSTATEMENT OF A STAY ON EPA'S AFFIRMATIVE DISCOVERY (bm)
August 6, 2012 Filing 1663 SEALED DOCUMENT-PORTIONS OF EXHIBIT T to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition Briefs to the United States' March 21, 2012 Motions to Compel Discovery of Universal Propulsion Company, Inc. Filed Under Seal (mg) Modified on 8/7/2012 (mg).
August 6, 2012 Filing 1662 REPLY Reply in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) #1569 filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Goodrich Corporation's Reply in Response to United States' Statement of Genuine Issues and Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Goodrich Corporation's Objections to the Declaration of Michael C. Augustini, #3 Goodrich Corporation's Objections to the Declaration of James F. Nagle, #4 Supplemental Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein in Support of Reply, #5 Certificate of Service)(Dennis, Patrick)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1661 ORDER GRANTING GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION REQUESTING SEALING Of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support Of Goodrich's Opposition Briefs To The United States' March 21, 2012 Motions To Compel Discovery Of Universal Propulsion Company, Inc. by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #1660 Application to Seal. (bm)
August 6, 2012 Filing 1659 NOTICE of Entry of Special Master's Order Re Stipulation By and Between The United States and Goodrich Corporation on Deposition of Maya Kuttan filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Ingersoll, Andrew)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1667 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS F & G to Supplemental Declaration of Matthew Wickersham in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply in Support of its Motion for Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery Filed Under Seal (mg)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1665 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Granting Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits filed in support of Goodrich's Reply in support of its Motion for the Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery #1664 . Exhibits F & G to the Supplemental Declaration of Matthew Wickersham shall be filed under seal. (ir)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1660 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION REQUESTING SEALING OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS Filed In Support Of Goodrich's Opposition Briefs To The United States' March 21, 2012 Motion To Compel Discovery Of Universal Propulsion Company, Inc. filed by plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. Lodged proposed order. (bm)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1658 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Deposition of Maya Kuttan filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beers, James)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1657 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Portions of Exhibit T To Declaration of David Edsall Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Opposition Briefs To The United States' March 21, 2012 Motions To Compel Discovery of Universal Propulsion Company, Inc., #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Opposition Briefs To The United States' March 21, 2012 Motions To Compel Discovery of Universal Propulsion Company, Inc.)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1656 DECLARATION of David Edsall Jr. In Opposition To MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Goodrich Corporation #1377 , MOTION to Compel Goodrich to Permit Arcadis to Respond to Subpoena for Documents #1379 , MOTION to Compel Answers to Requests for Admission (Set Three) #1378 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits F-K To Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition Briefs To The United States' March 21, 2012 Motions To Compel Discovery of Universal Propulsion Company, Inc., #2 Exhibits L-P To Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition Briefs To The United States' March 21, 2012 Motions To Compel Discovery of Universal Propulsion Company, Inc., #3 Exhibits Q-U To Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition Briefs To The United States' March 21, 2012 Motions To Compel Discovery of Universal Propulsion Company, Inc., #4 Exhibits V-Z To Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition Briefs To The United States' March 21, 2012 Motions To Compel Discovery of Universal Propulsion Company, Inc., #5 Exhibits AA-FF To Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition Briefs To The United States' March 21, 2012 Motions To Compel Discovery of Universal Propulsion Company, Inc.)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1655 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Goodrich Corporation #1377 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1654 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Answers to Requests for Admission (Set Three) #1378 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1653 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Goodrich to Permit Arcadis to Respond to Subpoena for Documents #1379 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1669 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Granting United States' Application for Order to file under seal pursuant to Protective order exhibits 6, 11, 12, 16 & 33 to the Declaration of Michael Augustini in support of United States' opposition to Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #1668 . The documents sought to be filed under seal shall be filed under seal. The government may produce the document as permitted or required by applicable law. (ir) Modified on 4/19/2013 (bp).
August 2, 2012 Filing 1666 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBITS 6, 11, 12, 16 AND 33 OF THE DECLARATION OF MICHAE C AUGUSTINI in Support of the United States' Opposition to Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Protective Order Docket #406 (mg)
August 2, 2012 Filing 1664 APPLICATION requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits filed in support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply in support of its Motion for the Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery Lodged Proposed Order. (ir)
August 2, 2012 Filing 1652 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) #1651 . The following error was found: Attachments # 1 & 2 should not be submitted as attachments, but rather manually filed at the Intake window along with the documents you are requesting to be filed under seal. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ir)
August 2, 2012 Filing 1651 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Exhibits F & G to Supplemental Declaration of Matthew Wickersham. (Attachments: #1 Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion for the Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion for the Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery)(Wickersham, Matthew)
August 1, 2012 Filing 1668 APPLICATION for an order to File under seal pursuant to Protective order Exhibits 6, 11, 12, 16 & 33 to the Declaration of Michael Augustini in support of United States' opposition to Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant United States Department of Defense. Lodged Proposed Order. (ir)
August 1, 2012 Filing 1650 REPLY in support of MOTION for Order for Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Order for Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1635 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Matthew Wickersham and Exhibits A-L, #2 Exhibit Exhibit M Part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit M Part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit N, #5 Exhibit Exhibit O, #6 Exhibit Exhibit P, #7 Exhibit Exhibits Q-V)(Wickersham, Matthew)
July 31, 2012 Filing 1649 REPLY Support MOTION to Strike Portions of The United States' Interrogatory Responses [Discovery Matter Referred To Special Master] MOTION to Strike Portions of The United States' Interrogatory Responses [Discovery Matter Referred To Special Master] #1622 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion To Strike Portions of the United States' Interrogatory Responses)(Wickersham, Matthew)
July 31, 2012 Filing 1648 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants United States Department of Defense, United States of America of Notice of Manual Filing (Sealed Documents). (Hill, Leslie)
July 30, 2012 Filing 1647 to Goodrich's Motion to Reinstate Stay on United States' Affirmative Discovery opposition re: MOTION for Order for Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Order for Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1635 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of A. Gillespie in support of United States' Opposition to Motion to Reinstate Stay on Affirmative Discovery)(Gillespie, Amy)
July 30, 2012 Filing 1646 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Defendant Goodrich Corporation filed by Counter Claimants County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, ThirdParty Plaintiff County of San Bernardino, Cross Claimants County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, Cross Defendants County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, Plaintiff County of San Bernardino, Counter Defendants County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Lawton, David)
July 30, 2012 Filing 1645 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) #1569 filed by Defendants United States Department of Defense, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Augustini with Exhibits, #2 Affidavit of James F. Nagle, #3 U.S. Response to Goodrich's Statement of Undisputed Fact, #4 Proposed Order denying motion for summary judgment)(Smaczniak, Kim)
July 30, 2012 Filing 1644 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Cross Defendant The United States of America, Defendant United States Department of Defense of Exhibits 6,11,12,16, and 33 to Augustini Declaration. (Smaczniak, Kim)
July 30, 2012 Filing 1643 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1570 United States' Opposition to Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum Requesting Attorneys Fees #1628 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (MacAyeal, James)
July 27, 2012 Filing 1642 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER; RE GOODRICH CORPORATION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION For An Order Shortening Time To Hear Its Motion For Reinstatement Of A Stay On EPA's Affirmative Discovery And Order, HEARING DATE: JULY 24, 2011. (bm)
July 26, 2012 Filing 1641 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike Portions of The United States' Interrogatory Responses [Discovery Matter Referred To Special Master] MOTION to Strike Portions of The United States' Interrogatory Responses [Discovery Matter Referred To Special Master] #1622 Opposition filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits)(Dawson, Elizabeth)
July 25, 2012 Filing 1640 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff United States of America. correcting Brief (non-motion non-appeal), Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #1637 Correcting United States' Brief Requesting Clarification Regarding Continued Withholding of Attorney Client Privileged Communications Involving SAIC [ DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit United States' CORRECTED Brief)(Ingersoll, Andrew)
July 24, 2012 Filing 1638 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1310 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Brief Regarding The United States' Assertion of Attorney-Client Privilege Over SAIC Documents and Withholding of Addtional Documents)(Wickersham, Matthew)
July 24, 2012 Filing 1637 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Requesting Clarification Regarding Continued Withholding of Attorney Client Communications Involving SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] regarding Miscellaneous Document #1554 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Ingersoll with Exhibits A-F attached)(Ingersoll, Andrew)
July 24, 2012 Filing 1636 NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY filed by Defendant Whittaker Corporation. (Johnson, Christopher)
July 24, 2012 Filing 1635 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion For The Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery)(Wickersham, Matthew)
July 24, 2012 Filing 1634 DECLARATION of Robert Storer re Report,, #1566 Certificate of Compliance filed by Defendant United States Department of Defense. (Dawson, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2012 Filing 1639 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER RE UNITED STATES' MOTION TO LIFT STAY ON DISCOVERY AND REPORT OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDERS filed by Special Master Venetta S Tassopulos. (bp)
July 23, 2012 Filing 1633 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1632 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Gillespie, Amy)
July 20, 2012 Filing 1632 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application for An Order Shortening Time To Hear Its Motion for Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery, #2 Part 2 to Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application for An Order Shortening Time To Hear Its Motion for Reinstatement of a Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery, #3 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time To Hear Its Motion For Reinstatement of A Stay on EPA's Affirmative Discovery)(Wickersham, Matthew)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1631 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, having been advised by the parties to the Stipulation #1618 . Whittaker Corporation should be added to the list of parties with whom the United States has reached tentative agreement. That list appears in the Joint Status Report filed with this Court on June 6, 2012 (Dkt. #1541). (ir)
July 18, 2012 Filing 1628 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1570 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
July 17, 2012 Filing 1630 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER RE GOODRICH CORPORATION'S AND PYRO SPECTACULARS INC.'S MOTION REQUESTING IN CAMERA REVIEW OF DOCUMENTS LOGGED ON THE UNITED STATE'S PRIVILEGE LOGS REPORT filed by Special Master Venetta S Tassopulos. (bp)
July 17, 2012 Filing 1627 Second STIPULATION to Produce Redacted Litigation Hold Materials filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MacAyeal, James)
July 17, 2012 Filing 1626 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #1619 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
July 16, 2012 Filing 1622 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of The United States' Interrogatory Responses [Discovery Matter Referred To Special Master] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Strike Portions of The United States' Interrogatory Responses)(Wickersham, Matthew)
July 16, 2012 Filing 1621 STATEMENT Regarding Production of Additional Litigation Hold Communication [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] (Wickersham, Matthew)
July 16, 2012 Filing 1620 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1494 Opposition to Motion to Strike Declarations in Support of United States Opposition filed by Defendants United States Department of Defense, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kim Smaczniak, #2 Exhibit Deposition Volume I of Lara Beasley, #3 Exhibit Deposition Volume II of Lara Beasley, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Allen, #6 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Durkee, #7 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Sloan)(Smaczniak, Kim)
July 16, 2012 Filing 1619 DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Spector In Opposition to MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1494 Supplemental Declaration filed by Defendants United States Department of Defense, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Jerry O. Smith, #2 Exhibit First Declaration of Allen Curlee)(Smaczniak, Kim)
July 16, 2012 Filing 1618 STIPULATION for Settlement to Add Whittaker Corporation to List of Parties Who Have Reached Tentative Agreements with the United States, as Listed in June 6, 2012 Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gitin, Deborah)
July 16, 2012 Filing 1617 STATEMENT Regarding Litigation Submission Hold Documents filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alyse Story, #2 Declaration of Bonnie Cosgrove)(Cosgrove, Bonnie)
July 13, 2012 Filing 1629 SEALED DOCUMENT- CERTAIN EXHIBITS to Rebuttal Declaration of Krista Hernandez in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order. (mat) (Additional attachment(s) Part 2), Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6) (mat).
July 13, 2012 Filing 1625 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND ORDER OF SPECIAL MASTER RE United States' Motion to compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules by Special Master Venetta S. Tassopulos : IT IS ORDERED: 1. Goodrich shall return the documents identified under the following Tab numbers: 21,22,70, 71, and 77, shall eliminate the documents from any database which permits access to documents in this litigation, and may not use the documents in this litigation. 2. Goodrich may retain and use the documents identified under Tab numbers 28 and 75, in this litigation for the reasons stated above. 3. Pursuant to the provisions of the Order Re Redesignation of Venetta S. Tassopulos, United States Magistrate (Ret.), as Special Master and Rule 53(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the "Report and Order" shall be filed with the clerk and a copy provided for the Honorable Suzanne Segal and served on each party by First Resolution Services Inc. re: #1348 Motion to Compel (PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) (lw)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1624 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS ORDERED THAT: Exhibits 1,15,16,33,35,48,49,61 and 63 to the Rebuttal Declaration of Krista Hernandez in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Sanctions Against the United States Spoliation of Evidence shall be filed under seal. re: granting #1623 Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed in Support of Goodrich's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence. (lw)
July 13, 2012 Filing 1616 REPLY Support MOTION to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1570 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply Brief In Support of Its Motion To Compel the United States To Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms)(Wickersham, Matthew)
July 13, 2012 Filing 1615 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Goodrich's Twenty-First RFP to the United States and Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of the United States re EPA Document Issues filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosskam, David)
July 11, 2012 Filing 1623 APPLICATION Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits filed in Support of Goodrich's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Sanctions Against The United States for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Goodrich Corporation. Lodged proposed order. (lw)
July 11, 2012 Filing 1614 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Application Requesting sealing of certain exhibits filed in Support of Goodrich's Reply Brief re Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation; [Proposed] Order and Under seal exhibits to the Rebuttal Declaration of Krista Hernandez. (Dennis, Patrick)
July 11, 2012 Filing 1613 NOTICE of Entry of Ruling filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application for an Order Allowing Goodrich to file an Oversized Reply in Support of Goodrich's Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence Signed by the Special Master)(Wickersham, Matthew)
July 10, 2012 Filing 1612 REPLY In support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1494 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Strike the Declarations of Dana M. Allen, Danny C. Durkee, and George Sloan in Support of United States' Opposition to Goodrich's Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence, #2 Goodrich Corporation's Objections and Motion to Strike the Declaration of James R. MacAyeal filed in Opposition to Goodrich's Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation, #3 Rebuttal Declaration of Jeffrey D. Dintzer in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Sanctions against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence, #4 Rebuttal Declaration of Krista Hernandez in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Sanctions against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence, #5 Exhibits 1-7 to the Rebuttal Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #6 Exhibits 8-23 to the Rebuttal Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #7 Exhibits 24-30 to the Rebuttal Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #8 Exhibits 31-39 to the Rebuttal Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #9 Exhibits 40-52 to the Rebuttal Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #10 Exhibits 53-64 to the Rebuttal Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #11 Rebuttal Declaration of Adam Bennett in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Sanctions against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence, #12 Declaration of Dennis Hussey in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence, #13 Certificate of Service)(Dennis, Patrick)
July 10, 2012 Filing 1611 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation to Reply In Support of Goodrich's Motion For Sanctions For Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application For An Order Allowing Goodrich To File and Oversized Reply In Support of Goodrich's Motion For Sanctions For Spoliation of Evidence)(Wickersham, Matthew)
July 9, 2012 Filing 1610 REPLY Support of MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Its Seventeenth Set of Requests For Production of Documents To The United States of America [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Its Seventeenth Set of Requests For Production of Documents To The United States of America [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1589 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
July 6, 2012 Filing 1609 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1570 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James R. MacAyeal, #2 Declaration of Michael Conner, #3 Declaration of Alex Panio)(Cosgrove, Bonnie)
July 3, 2012 Filing 1608 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joinder in Opposition #1602 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Miscellaneous Filings (Non-Motion)-Joinder (non-motion). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
July 2, 2012 Filing 1607 THE EMHART PARTIES' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO GOODRICH CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO ITS SEVENTEENTH SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS YES re: MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Its Seventeenth Set of Requests For Production of Documents To The United States of America [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Its Seventeenth Set of Requests For Production of Documents To The United States of America [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1589 filed by Defendant Emhart Industries Inc. (Wyatt, Robert)
July 2, 2012 Filing 1606 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1523 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
July 2, 2012 Filing 1605 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Motion to Compel 17th Set of Requests for Production filed by Counter Claimant County of San Bernardino. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lawton)(Lawton, David)
July 2, 2012 Filing 1604 REPLY to Goodrich's Opposition to United States' Motion to Lift Stay on Discovery and Report of Compliance with Discovery Orders filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy R. Gillespie, #2 Declaration Elizabeth B. Dawson, #3 Declaration Krystal-Rose Perez)(Gillespie, Amy)
July 2, 2012 Filing 1603 OPPOSITION of the United States re: MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Its Seventeenth Set of Requests For Production of Documents To The United States of America [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Its Seventeenth Set of Requests For Production of Documents To The United States of America [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1589 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James R. MacAyeal)(MacAyeal, James)
July 2, 2012 Filing 1602 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Its Seventeenth Set of Requests For Production of Documents To The United States of America [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Its Seventeenth Set of Requests For Production of Documents To The United States of America [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1589 Rialto's Limited Joinder in City of Colton's Opposition filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto. (Ellis, Dennis)
July 2, 2012 Filing 1601 OPPOSITION of the United States re: MOTION to Compel The United States to Comply with The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request For Monetary Sanctions [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Comply with The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request For Monetary Sanctions [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Comply with The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request For Monetary Sanctions [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1514 and Supplement to Motion to Compel #1586 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James R. MacAyeal)(MacAyeal, James)
June 29, 2012 Filing 1600 CITY OF COLTON'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Its Seventeenth Set of Requests For Production of Documents To The United States of America [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Its Seventeenth Set of Requests For Production of Documents To The United States of America [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1589 filed by Plaintiff City of Colton. (Tanaka, Gene)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1599 ORDER GRANTING GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits filed in Support of Goodrich's Opposition to The United States' Motion to Lift Stay on Discovery and Report of Compliance with Discovery Orders by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #1597 Application to Seal: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Exhibit G to the Declaration of David Edsall Jr. shall be filed under seal. (lw)
June 27, 2012 Filing 1598 SEALED DOCUMENT-EXHIBIT G to the Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Opposition to the MOTION to Lift Stay on Discovery and Report of Compliance With Discovery Orders. (mg)
June 26, 2012 Filing 1597 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION REQUESTING SEALING Of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support Of Goodrich's Opposition To The United States' Motion To Lift Stay On Discovery And Report Of Compliance With Discovery Orders filed by defendant Goodrich Corporation. Lodged prop ord. (bm)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1596 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, After full consideration by the Court of the Stipulation To Dismiss, With 2 Prejudice, Goodrich Corporation's ("Goodrich") Claims Against Astro Pyrotechnics, 3 Inc. ("API") and API's Claims Against Goodrich, and having dismissed Goodrich's 4 claims against API and API's claims against Goodrich, without prejudice, on 5 December 13, 2011, and for further good cause showing:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. All claims, whether plead or "deemed" by the Court's Consolidation Orders, by API against Goodrich in the Consolidated Actions shall be dismissed, with prejudice; 2. All claims, whether plead or "deemed" by the Court's Consolidation Orders, by Goodrich against API in the Consolidated Actions shall be dismissed, with prejudice; and, 3. API and Goodrich are to bear their own costs. re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1585 (lw)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1595 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, After full consideration by the Court of the Stipulation To Dismiss, With Prejudice, Goodrich Corporation's ("Goodrich") Claims Against Pyro Spectaculars, Inc. ("PSI") and PSI's Claims Against Goodrich, and for good cause showing IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. All "deemed" claims by PSI against Goodrich in the Consolidated Actions shall be dismissed, with prejudice;2. All "deemed" claims by Goodrich against PSI in the Consolidated Actions shall be dismissed, with prejudice; and, 3. PSI and Goodrich are to bear their own costs. re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1584 (lw)
June 26, 2012 Filing 1594 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Exhibit G To Declaration of David Edsall Jr.. (Wickersham, Matthew)
June 25, 2012 Filing 1593 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER and Order re Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Production by the United States of Weston Solutions, Inc. and Computer Sciences Corporation Documents in accordance with Rule 34 by Special Master. (See order for complete details) (afe)
June 25, 2012 Filing 1592 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION to Lift Stay re Discovery [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1567 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition To the United States' Motion To Lift Stay on Discovery and Report of Compliance with Discovery Orders, #2 Part 2 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition To the United States' Motion To Lift Stay on Discovery and Report of Compliance with Discovery Orders, #3 Part 3 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition To the United States' Motion To Lift Stay on Discovery and Report of Compliance with Discovery Orders, #4 Part 4 to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition To the United States' Motion To Lift Stay on Discovery and Report of Compliance with Discovery Orders, #5 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Dintzer In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition To The United States' Motion To Lift Stay on Discovery And Report of Compliance With Discovery Orders)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 25, 2012 Filing 1591 NOTICE of Entry of Order of Special Master Entered by Stipulation and Resolving Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Extension of Percipient Discovery Cut-off United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Special Master's Order)(MacAyeal, James)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1590 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: ORDER #1576 , for the following reasons: Image and docket entry do not match; document is a copy of an order signed by Special Master; a Notice of Entry should be filed; no proof of service. (lw)
June 22, 2012 Filing 1589 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Its Seventeenth Set of Requests For Production of Documents To The United States of America [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion To Compel Further Responses To Its Seventeenth Set of Requests For Production of Documents To The United States of America)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 22, 2012 Filing 1586 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel The United States to Comply with The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request For Monetary Sanctions [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Comply with The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request For Monetary Sanctions [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Comply with The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request For Monetary Sanctions [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1514 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Briefing In Support of Its Motion To Compel the United States To Comply With The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request For Monetary Sanctions, #2 Part 2 to Part 1 to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Briefing In Support of Its Motion To Compel the United States To Comply With The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request For Monetary Sanctions)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 22, 2012 Filing 1585 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Goodrich Corporation, Pyro Spectaculars, Inc. filed by Defendant Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mroz, Erik)
June 22, 2012 Filing 1584 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Goodrich Corporation, Pyro Spectaculars, Inc. filed by Defendant Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mroz, Erik)
June 21, 2012 Filing 1579 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Order #1576 . The following error was found: Attached document is not a Notice of Entry, but just a copy of order signed by special master. Attached document should have been submitted as a separate, additional attachment to an actual Notice of Entry. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ir)
June 20, 2012 Filing 1588 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) Filed Under Seal. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
June 20, 2012 Filing 1587 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT K to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms Filed Under Seal. (mat)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1583 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Exhibits S, U, and NN to the Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein shall be filed under seal. re:granting #1577 Application to Seal (lw)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1581 ORDER GRANTING GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION REQUESTING SEALING OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS FILED IN SUPPORT OF GOODRICH'S MOTION TO COMPEL The United States To Re-run Document Searches Of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #1578 Application: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Exhibits K to the Declaration of David Edsall Jr. shall be filed under seal. (bm)
June 20, 2012 Filing 1580 REPORT of Special Master; Order Granting in part Goodrich Corporation's Motion to compel deposition Testimony related to EPA's document Issues pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) filed by Special Master Venetta S Tassopulos. (ir)
June 20, 2012 Filing 1576 NOTICE of Entry of of Special Master Extending Percipient Discovery Cut-off United States of America. (MacAyeal, James)
June 19, 2012 Filing 1582 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER RE GOODRICH CORPORATION'S AND PYRO SPECTACULARS INC'S Motion Requesting In Camera Review Of Documents Logged On The United States' Privilege Logs. (bm)
June 19, 2012 Filing 1578 APPLICATION REQUESTING Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed in Support of Goodrich's Motion to Compel the United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms filed by Goodrich Corporation. Lodged proposed order. (lw)
June 19, 2012 Filing 1577 APPLICATION REQUESTING Sealing of Exhibits S,U, and NN of the Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA Sections 107(a)(2) and (3) filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. Lodged proposed order. (lw)
June 19, 2012 Filing 1575 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Tracy J Egoscue counsel for Cross Defendant City of Rialto. Adding Tracy J. Egoscue as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Tracy J. Egoscue will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Tracy J. Egoscue is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto (Egoscue, Tracy)
June 19, 2012 Filing 1574 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Exhibit K to Declaration of David Edsall Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Motion To Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches Of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Motion To Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches Of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 19, 2012 Filing 1573 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Exhibit K to Declaration of David Edsall Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Motion To Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches Of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support of Goodrich's Motion To Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches Of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 19, 2012 Filing 1572 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Discovery Cut-Off #1568 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Stipulations-Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
June 19, 2012 Filing 1571 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Exhibits S, U & NN of The Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein. (Attachments: #1 Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Exhibits S, U, & NN of the Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant To CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Exhibits S, U, & NN of the Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant To CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3))(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 18, 2012 Filing 1570 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel The United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel the United States to Re-Run Document Searches of Key EPA Custodians Using More Expansive Search Terms)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 18, 2012 Filing 1569 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3) filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement of Facts In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgement Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #2 Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgement Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #3 Exhibits A-C to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #4 Exhibits D-E to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #5 Exhibits F-I to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #6 Exhibits J-L to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #7 Exhibits M-N to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #8 Exhibit O to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #9 Exhibits P-Q to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #10 Exhibits R-T to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #11 Exhibits U-Z to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #12 Exhibits AA-ff to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #13 Exhibit GG to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #14 Exhibit HH to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3), #15 Exhibit II to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3, #16 Exhibits JJ-LL to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgement Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3, #17 Exhibits MM-OO to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3, #18 Exhibits PP-UU to Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2) & (3, #19 [Proposed] Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law RE: Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 107(a)(2)(3), #20 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding United States Liability Pursuant to CERCLA 109(a)(2) & 3)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 18, 2012 Filing 1568 JOINT STATEMENT of Stipulation re Motion for Extentsion of Percipient Cut-off MOTION for Order for Extension of Percipient Discovery Cut-Off [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Order for Extension of Percipient Discovery Cut-Off [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] #1537 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MacAyeal, James)
June 15, 2012 Filing 1567 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Discovery [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy R. Gillespie)(Gillespie, Amy)
June 15, 2012 Filing 1566 REPORT of UNITED STATES' REPORT OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDERS filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy R. Gillespie with Exhibits A-D, #2 Exhibit E-P to Declaratin of Amy R. Gillespie, #3 Declaration of Alexander Panio, #4 Declaration of Elizabeth B. Dawson, #5 Exhibit A-F to Declaration of Elizabeth B. Dawson, #6 Exhibit G to Declaration of Elizabeth B. Dawson, #7 Exhibit H to Declaration of Elizabeth B. Dawson, #8 Exhibit I-N to Declaration of Elizabeth B. Dawson, #9 Exhibit O-X to Declaration of Elizabeth B. Dawson)(Gillespie, Amy)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1565 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Notice of Change of Attorney Information #1557 , for the following reasons: Other: Document is blank when viewing and printing. (bm)
June 15, 2012 Filing 1564 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] #1511 filed by Cross Defendant The United States of America. (Rosskam, David)
June 14, 2012 Filing 1563 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 6/4/2012 to 6/4/2012 as to Plaintiff City of Colton Court Reporter Miriam Baird. Court will contact Joy Valdez at joy.valdez@bbklaw.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 6/4/2012. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Tanaka, Gene)
June 13, 2012 Filing 1561 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] #1511 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Second Supplemental Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Brief In Support of Its Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6))(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 13, 2012 Filing 1560 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Peter R Duchesneau counsel for Defendant Goodrich Corporation. Changing address & firm name to Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP, 11355 W. Olympic Blvd., LA CA 90064. Changing email & fax number to wcale@manatt.com, 310-312-4224. Adding Whitney Cale as attorney as counsel of record for Goodrich Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation (Duchesneau, Peter)
June 13, 2012 Filing 1559 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Peter R Duchesneau counsel for Defendant Goodrich Corporation. Changing Address & Firm Name to Manatt, Phelps & Phillips LLP, 11355 W. Olympic Blvd., LA CA 90064. Changing email & fax number to pduchesneau@manatt.com, 310-312-4224. Adding Peter Duchesneau as attorney as counsel of record for Goodrich Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation (Duchesneau, Peter)
June 13, 2012 Filing 1558 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Peter Duchesneau / Whitney Cale on behalf of Defendant Goodrich Corporation. Filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation (Duchesneau, Peter)
June 13, 2012 Filing 1557 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Tracy J Egoscue counsel for ThirdParty Defendant City of Rialto. Tracy J. Egoscue will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Tracy J. Egoscue is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto (Egoscue, Tracy) DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 6/14/12. Modified on 6/15/2012 (bm).
June 13, 2012 Filing 1556 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Order Re Stipulation #1552 , Report #1554 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Orders (Non-Motion)-Order #1552 , Miscellaneous Filings (Non-Motion)-Report #1554 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
June 12, 2012 Filing 1562 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER re United States' Motion to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules #1348 filed by Special Master Venetta S Tassopulos. (ir)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1555 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #1543 , for the following reasons: Document is blank. (ir)
June 12, 2012 Filing 1554 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER; ORDER RE STIPULATION BETWEEN THE UNITED STATES AND GOODRICH CORPORATION ON PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS SUBJECT TO THE SPECIAL MASTER'S MAY 31st ORDER, dated June 8, 2012 (Cosgrove, Bonnie)
June 12, 2012 Filing 1553 REPLY Support MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1523 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion To Compel the United States To Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1552 ORDER RE STIPULATION BY AND BETWEEN THE UNITED STATES AND GOODRICH CORPORATION ON DEPOSITION OF STEPHEN BERNINGER issued by Special Master June 11, 2012 (Ingersoll, Andrew)
June 11, 2012 Filing 1551 REPLY Support MOTION for Order for waiver of privilege regarding United States' May 15, 2012 and May 21, 2012 Letters [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION for Order for waiver of privilege regarding United States' May 15, 2012 and May 21, 2012 Letters [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION for Order for waiver of privilege regarding United States' May 15, 2012 and May 21, 2012 Letters [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] #1519 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion To Assess the United States' Assertion of Privilege In Its May 15, 2012 and May 21, 2012 Letters)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1550 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Joint Status Report, Stipulation of all parties, and Order to Amend Case Management Order No 1 as Modified by Order #1541 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, with regard to fact discovery, that: 1. To the extent fact discovery remains, the following fact discovery deadlines shall be stayed and suspended, effective February 17, 2012, pending further order of the Court: (a) those between and among the Settling Defendants; (b) those between and among the Governmental Parties; (c) those between and among any Settling Defendant and any Governmental Party; and (d) those between and among the Settling Parties and all other parties to the Consolidated Actions,except as set forth in paragraph 2, below; 2. The fact discovery deadlines set forth in paragraph 8 of CMO No. 1 (Dkt. No. 601), involving the United States and Goodrich Corporation shall remain as set forth in paragraph 2 of Order (Dkt. # 1432), entered on April 4, 2012, unless otherwise modified by court order subject to any appeal; 3. All objections to the fact discovery which were preserved by paragraph 3 of Order (Dkt. # 1432), entered on April 4, 2012, shall continue to be preserved; in the event that a tentative settlement agreement as to a particular party or parties is not finalized and approved by the Court, any pending discovery motion directed at that party or parties which was withdrawn pursuant to Order (Dkt. # 1432), entered on April 4, 2012, may be re-noticed; and IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, with regard to expert witnessdiscovery and other related pre-trial dates, that paragraph 8 of CMO No. 1 (Dkt. # 601), as amended by Order (Dkt. # 1432), is further amended as follows: Status Conference 9/10/12; Expert witness disclosures exchanged 11/13/12; Rebuttal expert witness disclosures exchanged 1/14/13; Expert discovery closes 4/30/13; Deadline for filing dispsitive motions 2/28/13; Pretrial Status Conference 4/15/13; Trial date 6/25/13; Court shall hold a status conference on September 10, 2012, at 3 p.m., at which time the parties shall advise the Court of the status of all settlements. Five court days prior to the status conference, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report. (ir)
June 8, 2012 Filing 1549 STIPULATION for Discovery as to the Deposition of Stephen Berninger [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ingersoll, Andrew)
June 8, 2012 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings JUNE 5, 2012; 3:00 P.M re Transcipt #1548 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(mw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 8, 2012 Filing 1548 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on JUNE 5, 2012; 3:00 P.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MIRIAM V. BAIRD, CSR 11893, phone number MVB11893@AOL.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2012. (mw)
June 8, 2012 Filing 1547 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel The United States to Comply with The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request For Monetary Sanctions [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Comply with The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request For Monetary Sanctions [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Comply with The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request For Monetary Sanctions [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1514 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cosgrove, Bonnie)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1546 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING THE UNITED STATES OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW FOR MODIFICATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTERS MARCH 29 ORDER AMENDING THE CMO (Dkt. No. #1446 ) by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: See order for details. (jy)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1545 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING THE UNITED STATES OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTERS MARCH 21 SANCTIONS ORDER (Dkt. No. #1437 ) by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: See order for details. (jy)
June 7, 2012 Filing 1544 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1523 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Panio)(Hurst, Patricia)
June 7, 2012 Filing 1543 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Tracy J Egoscue counsel for Cross Defendants City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, Plaintiff City of Rialto, Third Party Defendants City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, City of Rialto, Counter Claimants City of Rialto, City of Rialto, Cross Claimant City of Rialto, Defendant City of Rialto, Counter Defendant City of Rialto. Tracy J. Egoscue will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Tracy J. Egoscue is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto (Egoscue, Tracy) **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 6/12/12** Modified on 6/12/2012 (ir).
June 6, 2012 Filing 1541 Joint STIPULATION for Order To Amend CMO No. 1 filed by defendants Emhart Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhbit A-[Proposed] Order re Joint Status Report, Stipulation of all Parties, and Proposed Order to Amend CMO NO. 1, As Modified by Order (Dkt #1432), #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Wyatt, Robert)
June 6, 2012 Filing 1540 BRIEF filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. Regarding Continuance of Trial Date and Attendant Case Management Deadlines (Wickersham, Matthew)
June 5, 2012 Filing 1537 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Extension of Percipient Discovery Cut-Off [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Edsall, Jr., #2 Exhibits A-O to the Declaration of David Edsall, Jr., #3 Exhibits P-S to the Declaration of David Edsall, Jr.)(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 5, 2012 Filing 1535 REPLY support MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] #1511 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Matthew C. Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion To Compel Deposition Testimony Related To EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6))(Wickersham, Matthew)
June 5, 2012 Filing 1534 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy R Gillespie on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Gillespie, Amy)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1539 MINUTES: STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENTS: The Court is updated on the status of the case, and is provided with the following information. Tentative settlement reached with the following defendants: Emhart parties; county parties; City of Rialto; City of Colton; Raytheon Company; American Promotional Events, Inc.; Broco, Inc.; Ensign-Bickford Company; and the U.S. Department of Defense. Ongoing negotiations with the following defendants: Goodrich, Corp.; James Hescox; Rialto Concrete Products, Inc.; General Dynamics Corp.; Whitaker Corp.; Explosive Engineering, Inc.; and American West, Inc.Counsel for defendant Goodrich is directed to prepare and circulate a five-page brief addressing the options suggested by plaintiffs' counsel today, and submit it to the Court along with a proposed order by close of business Wednesday, June 6, 2012 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (ir)
June 4, 2012 Filing 1538 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER Re Goodrich Corporation's And Pyro Spectaculars Inc.'s Motion Requesting In Camera Review Of Documents Logged on The United states' Privilege Logs. (bm)
June 4, 2012 Filing 1533 Opposition re: MOTION for Order for waiver of privilege regarding United States' May 15, 2012 and May 21, 2012 Letters [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION for Order for waiver of privilege regarding United States' May 15, 2012 and May 21, 2012 Letters [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION for Order for waiver of privilege regarding United States' May 15, 2012 and May 21, 2012 Letters [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] #1519 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hurst, Patricia)
June 4, 2012 Filing 1530 OBJECTIONS to Deposition of Silva and RFPs 1222 and 1223 filed by Defendants John Callagy, John Callagy, John Callagy, John Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Stephen Callagy, County of San Bernardino, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Fredericksen, Linda Fredericksen, Linda Fredericksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust under Trust Agreement dated February 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Michelle Ann Pointon, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Anthony Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, Third Party Defendants John Callagy, John Callagy, John Callagy, Mary Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust under Trust Agreement dated February 20, 1985, Linda Frederiksen as Trustee of the Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Frederiksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated November 19, 1991, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, Counter Claimants John Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Stephen Callagy, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Fredericksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 20, 1985, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust under Trust Agreement dated February 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated 11/19/91, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, The Schulz Trust, Cross Defendants John Callagy, John Callagy, John Callagy, John Callagy, John Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Stephen Callagy, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, Edward Stout as The Trustee of The Stout Rodriquez Trust, Edward Stout as the Trustee of the Stout-Rodriguez Family, Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of The E.F. Schulz Trust, John Callagy as Trustee of the Fredericksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 20, 1985, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated Feb. 20, 1985, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated Feb. 20, 1985, John Callagy as Trustee of the Shulz Trust, John Callagy as Trustee of the Shulz Trust, John Callagy, as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated Feb. 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The E.F. Schulz Trust, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated 11/19/91, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated 11/19/91, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated 1/19/91, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Linda Frederiksen, as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated Feb. 15, 1985, Linda Frederiksen, as Trustee of The Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated Nov. 19, 1991, Michelle Ann Pointon, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Anthony Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, Cross Claimants John Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Stephen Callagy, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Fredericksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 20, 1985, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust under Trust Agreement dated February 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated 11/19/91, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc., Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, The Schulz Trust, Third Party Plaintiffs John Callagy, Stephen Callagy, Stephen Callagy, County of San Bernardino, Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Fredericksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 20, 1985, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated Feb. 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc., Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, The Schulz Trust, The Schulz Trust, Plaintiffs County of San Bernardino, Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc., Counter Defendants County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, County of San Bernardino, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc, Robertson's Ready Mix Inc. (Lawton, David)
June 1, 2012 Filing 1542 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Barnes Johnson. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5)(mat)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1532 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: GRANTING United States' Application for an Order to file under seal pursuant to Protective Order regarding EPA Deliberative process documents and Information, DN 1162, Declaration of Barnes Johnson in support of United States' opposition to Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence #1531 . United States' ex parte application for sealed filing is granted. The documents sought to be filed under seal and the United States' ex parte application for seal documents shall both be filed under seal. The government may produce the documents as permitted or required by applicable law. (ir)
June 1, 2012 Filing 1531 APPLICATION for an Order to File under seal pursuant to Protective Order regarding EPA Deliberative process documents and Information, DN 1162, Declaration of Barnes Johnson in support of United States' opposition to Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Lodged Proposed Order. (ir)
June 1, 2012 Filing 1529 JOINDER in MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1494 filed by Defendant James Hescox. (Isola, David)
June 1, 2012 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/22/12 1:54 p.m. re Transcipt #1528 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 1, 2012 Filing 1528 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/22/12 1:54 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Huntington Court Reporters, phone number (626) 792-7250. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2012. (ha)
June 1, 2012 Filing 1527 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff United States of America. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #1520 Corrected Declaration of George Socha, Jr. (Rosskam, David)
June 1, 2012 Filing 1526 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] #1511 [Corrected] filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rosskam with Exhibits A-D, #2 Exhibit E-H to the Declaration of David Rosskam)(Rosskam, David)
June 1, 2012 Filing 1525 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff United States of America. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion,, #1524 Re: Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony Related to EPA Document Issues (Rosskam, David)
May 31, 2012 Filing 1536 MODIFICATION OF SPECIAL MASTER'S MAY 1, 2012 ORDER RE UNITED STATES' PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PREPARED BY SAIC #1485 by Special Master Venetta S. Tassopulos. (See Order for complete details) (afe)
May 31, 2012 Filing 1524 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] #1511 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David Rosskam and Exhibits A-D, #2 Exhibit Exhibits E-H to Declaration of David Rosskam)(Rosskam, David)
May 31, 2012 Filing 1523 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel The United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel the United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents, #2 Exhibits Part 1 to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel the United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents, #3 Exhibits Part 2 to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel the United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents, #4 Exhibits Part 3 to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel the United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents, #5 Exhibits Part 4 to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel the United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents, #6 Exhibits Part 5 to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel the United States to Review Its Entire Privilege Log and Produce All Non-Privileged Documents)(Wickersham, Matthew)
May 30, 2012 Filing 1521 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Application and Proposed Order for Filing Under Seal Declaration of Barnes Johnson. (Rosskam, David)
May 30, 2012 Filing 1520 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1494 Opposition filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dana Allen, #2 Declaration of Allan Curlee, #3 Declaration of Danny Durkee, #4 Declaration of David Rosskam, #5 Declaration of David Ruiz, #6 Declaration of George J. Socha, Jr., #7 Declaration of Jeffrey Spector, #8 Declaration of Gerald Vincent, #9 Declaration of John Paul Woodley, Jr., #10 Declaration Jeremy Gillessen, #11 Declaration of George Sloan, #12 Declaration James R. MacAyeal)(Rosskam, David)
May 30, 2012 Filing 1519 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for waiver of privilege regarding United States' May 15, 2012 and May 21, 2012 Letters [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion To Assess The United States' Assertions of Privilege In Its May 15, 2012 And May 21, 2012 Letters, #2 Exhibits to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion To Assess The United States' Assertions of Privilege In Its May 15, 2012 And May 21, 2012 Letters)(Wickersham, Matthew)
May 29, 2012 Filing 1522 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS E, F, & G to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman in support of Goodrich Corporation's MOTION to Compel The United States to Comply with The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request For Monetary Sanctions. (mat)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1518 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #1517 Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Exhibits Filed in Support of Goodrich's Motion to Compel The United States to Comply with teh Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request for Monetary Sanctions, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Exhibits E,F, and G to the Declaration of Vaughn a. Blackman shall be filed under seal. (lw)
May 25, 2012 Filing 1517 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION REQUESTING SEALING Of Exhibits Filed In Support Of Goodrich's Motion To Compel The United States To Comply With The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order And Request For Monetary Sanctions filed by defendant Goodrich Corporation. Lodged prop ord. (bm)
May 25, 2012 Filing 1516 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Exhibits E, F, G to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich's Motion to Compel the United States to Comply With The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order And Request for Monetary Sanctions. (Wickersham, Matthew)
May 25, 2012 Filing 1515 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 5/22/2012 to 5/22/2012 as to Plaintiff United States of America Court Smart (CS). Transcript portion requested: Other: 5/22/2012. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Hurst, Patricia)
May 24, 2012 Filing 1514 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel The United States to Comply with The Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request For Monetary Sanctions [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel the United States to Comply with the Special Master's May 1, 2012 Order and Request for Monetary Sanctions)(Wickersham, Matthew)
May 23, 2012 Filing 1512 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings May 22, 2012 to May 22, 2012 as to Defendant Goodrich Corporation Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Kristina Eckert, Paralegal at keckert@gibsondunn.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Hearing on two Motions. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Wickersham, Matthew)
May 22, 2012 Filing 1513 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. Court and counsel present. Court holds hearing re United States' Objections and Motion forModification, etc. Motion taken under submission.Court Recorder: CS 05/22/12. (afe)
May 21, 2012 Filing 1511 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (Part 1), #2 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony Related to EPA's Document Issues Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (Part 2))(Wickersham, Matthew)
May 18, 2012 Filing 1510 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Douglas C Smith counsel for Defendants Ken Thompson, Inc., Rialto Concrete Products Inc. Nathan A. Perea will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Nathan A. Perea is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Nathan A. Perea (Smith, Douglas)
May 16, 2012 Filing 1506 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: APPLICATION for Leave to File Certain Exhibits filed in support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence #1505 scanned and docketed twice. Already placed on docket (Document 1501) (ir)
May 15, 2012 Filing 1509 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS to the Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's to Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5)(mat)
May 15, 2012 Filing 1508 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS to the Declaration of Krist A Hernandez in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence filed Under Seal. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9, Part 10, Part 11, Part 12)(mat)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1507 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Application Requesting sealing of certain exhibits filed in support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for sanctions against the United States for Spoliation of evidence #1501 , Exhibits 7,8, 18, 35, 37, 49, 91, 109, 119, 124 and portions of exhibits 13 and 61 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez and exhibits 1, 3, 5, 6, 16, and 17 to the Declaration of David Edsall Jr shall be filed under seal. (ir)
May 15, 2012 Filing 1504 STATUS REPORT of Status of Weston and CSC Document Production filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rachael Amy Kamons, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(Kamons, Rachael)
May 14, 2012 Filing 1503 REPORT of Submission of the United States regarding additional litigation hold notices for in camera review filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bonnie Cosgrove)(Cosgrove, Bonnie)
May 14, 2012 Filing 1502 SUPPLEMENT Goodrich Corporation's Memorandum re: United States' Submission of Additional EPA Litigation Hold Communications to the Special Master for in Camera Review [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Edsall, Jr. Part 1, #2 Declaration of David Edsall, Jr. Part 2)(Wickersham, Matthew)
May 11, 2012 Filing 1499 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Certificate of Service #1496 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. The correct event is: Miscellaneous Filings (Non-Motion)-Amended Document (Non-Motion). Other error(s) with document(s): Should be linked back to document being amended. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
May 10, 2012 Filing 1505 APPLICATION Requesting sealing of Certain Exhibits filed in support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Goodrich Corporation. Lodged Proposed Order. (ir)
May 10, 2012 Filing 1501 APPLICATION REQUESTING SEALING of Certain Exhibits filed in support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence #1494 . Lodged Proposed Order. (ir)
May 10, 2012 Filing 1500 NOTICE OF LODGING OF NON-PAPER Physical Exhibits filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation pursuant to Local Rule 11-5.1 in support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence #1494 (ir)
May 10, 2012 Filing 1498 Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Limitations Regarding Deposition of Nancy Marvel filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kamons, Rachael)
May 10, 2012 Filing 1497 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Address #1493 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notices-Change of Address. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
May 10, 2012 Filing 1496 Amended Certificate of Service for Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence (Dennis, Patrick)
May 10, 2012 Filing 1495 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Application to File under seal, [Proposed] Order re application to file under seal, Under seal documents, Notice of lodging non-paper Physical exhibits and Lodging of non-paper Physical Exhibits. (Dennis, Patrick)
May 9, 2012 Filing 1494 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Dintzer, #2 Declaration of Patrick W. Dennis, #3 Declaration of Neven Kresic, P.G., Ph.D. Part 1, #4 Declaration of Neven Kresic, P.G., Ph.D. Part 2, #5 Declaration of Neven Kresic, P.G., Ph.D. Part 3, #6 Declaration of Neven Kresic, P.G., Ph.D. Part 4, #7 Declaration of Neven Kresic, P.G., Ph.D. Part 5, #8 Declaration of Neven Kresic, P.G., Ph.D. Part 6, #9 Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #10 Exhibits 1-10 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #11 Exhibits 11-15 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #12 Exhibits 16-19 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #13 Exhibits 20-29 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #14 Exhibits 30-40 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #15 Exhibit 41 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #16 Exhibits 42-46 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #17 Exhibits 47-54 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #18 Exhibits 55-58 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #19 Exhibits 59-60 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #20 Exhibits 61-69 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #21 Exhibits 70-73 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #22 Exhibit 74 Part 1 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #23 Exhibit 74 Part 2 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #24 Exhibits 75-78 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #25 Exhibits 79-88 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #26 Exhibits 89-98 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #27 Exhibits 99-101 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #28 Exhibits 102-112 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #29 Exhibit 113 Part 1 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #30 Exhibit 113 Part 2 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #31 Exhibit 114 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #32 Exhibits 115-122 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #33 Exhibits 123-125 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #34 Exhibit 126 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #35 Exhibits 127-128 to the Declaration of Krista Hernandez, #36 Declaration of David Edsall, Jr. Part 1, #37 Declaration of David Edsall, Jr. Part 2, #38 Declaration of David Edsall, Jr. Part 3, #39 Declaration of David Edsall, Jr. Part 4, #40 Certificate of Service)(Dennis, Patrick)
May 9, 2012 Filing 1493 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS filed by Plaintiff City of Colton. (Sakai, Danielle)
May 8, 2012 Filing 1492 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Review of Special Master's March 29, 2012 Order #1446 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Hurst, Patricia)
May 8, 2012 Filing 1491 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Review of The United States' Objections to and Motion for Modification of the Special Master's March 21, 2012 Order Granting in Part Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions Against the United States re #1401 Order on Mot MOTION for Review of The United States' Objections to and Motion for Modification of the Special Master's March 21, 2012 Order Granting in Part Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions Against the United States re #1401 Order on Mot #1437 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patricia Hurst)(Hurst, Patricia)
May 8, 2012 Filing 1490 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #1486 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice/Change of Attorney Information (G-06). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
May 7, 2012 Filing 1486 NOTICE Notice of Change of Attorney Information-Withdrawal of Leah B. Silverthorn (PHV) filed by defendant Astro Pyrotechnics Inc, Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.. (Mroz, Erik)
May 3, 2012 Filing 1489 Mail Returned addressed to Larry M Corcoran re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #1472 . Verified with operator #55 from DOJ that attorney is no longer there. (afe)
May 3, 2012 Filing 1488 Mail Returned addressed to Larry M Corcoran re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112) #1470 . Verified with operator #55 from DOJ that attorney is no longer there. (afe)
May 3, 2012 Filing 1487 Mail Returned addressed to Larry M Corcoran re Order on Application to Seal (document), Order on Application to Seal (document) #1455 . Verified with operator #55 from DOJ that attorney is no longer there. (afe)
May 1, 2012 Filing 1485 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER; ORDER RE: GOODRICH CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL UNITED STATES TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS PREPARED BY SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION #1310 by Special Master Venetta S Tassopulos. IT IS ORDERED: Goodrich's Motion is granted in part. The United States EPA shall produce all Facility Site Reports that refer or relate to Goodrich Corporation Corporation's activities and/or operations in the Rialto - Colton Groundwater Basin within fourteen (14) days. (See Order for complete details) (afe)
April 30, 2012 Filing 1482 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Valerie K Mann counsel for Plaintiff United States of America.Valerie K. Mann is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America (Mann, Valerie)
April 27, 2012 Filing 1484 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER; ORDER GRANTING IN PART GOODRICH CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR COSTS RE Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories #1070 by Special Master Venetta S Tassopulos. (See Order for Complete Details) (afe)
April 27, 2012 Filing 1480 REPLY Support First MOTION to Compel Production by the United States of Weston Solutions, Inc. And Computer Sciences Corporation Documents In Accordance With Rule 34 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER]First MOTION to Compel Production by the United States of Weston Solutions, Inc. And Computer Sciences Corporation Documents In Accordance With Rule 34 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER]First MOTION to Compel Production by the United States of Weston Solutions, Inc. And Computer Sciences Corporation Documents In Accordance With Rule 34 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1447 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
April 26, 2012 Filing 1479 DECLARATION of C. Scott Spear In Opposition to Motion to Compel Testimony filed by Defendant United States Department of Defense. (Smaczniak, Kim)
April 24, 2012 Filing 1483 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS A, B, and C to the Third Supplemental Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply to the United States' Response to the Special Master's April 10, 2012 Questions Concerning Goodrich's Motion to Compel the United States to Produce all Documents Prepared by Saic Filed Under Seal. (mat)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1481 ORDER GRANTING GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION REQUESTING SEALING OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS FILED IN SUPPORT OF GOODRICH CORPORATION'S REPLY TO THE UNITED STATES' RESPONSE TO THE SPECIAL MASTER'S APRIL 10, 2012 QUESTIONS CONCERNING GOODRICH'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE UNITED STATES TO PRODUCE ALL DOCUMENTS PREPARED BY SAIC by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Exhibits A, B, and C to the Third Supplemental Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman shall be filed under seal. re: granting #1474 Application to Seal (lw)
April 23, 2012 Filing 1473 OPPOSITION to First MOTION to Compel Production by the United States of Weston Solutions, Inc. And Computer Sciences Corporation Documents In Accordance With Rule 34 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER]First MOTION to Compel Production by the United States of Weston Solutions, Inc. And Computer Sciences Corporation Documents In Accordance With Rule 34 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER]First MOTION to Compel Production by the United States of Weston Solutions, Inc. And Computer Sciences Corporation Documents In Accordance With Rule 34 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1447 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew Helmlinger, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-F to Helmlinger Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibits G-J to Helmlinger Declaration, #4 Declaration Declaration of Brian Thompson, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A to Thompson Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B to Thompson Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibits C-Q to Thompson Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibits R-AA to Thompson Declaration)(Kamons, Rachael)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1472 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: re: #1468 ; The Court, pursuant to the joint stipulation of the parties, hereby grants the request to continue the hearings on the aforementioned motions (dkts. #1437 and #1446 ) to May 22, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. (jy)
April 23, 2012 Filing 1471 Goodrich Coporation's opposition re: MOTION for Review of Special Master's March 29, 2012 Order #1446 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SEGAL] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Wickersham)(Wickersham, Matthew)
April 23, 2012 Filing 1470 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Stipulation, #1468 , Proof of Service #1469 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Title page is missing. The correct event is: Stipulations-Order. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1477 GRANTING IN PART GOODRICH CORPORATION'S MOTION SEEKING LEGAL FEES INCURREDRESPONDING TO THE UNITED STATES' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENFORCE THE ORDER OF THE SPECIAL MASTER DATED DECEMBER 13, 2011 #1388 , by Special Master Venetta S. Tassopulos. IT IS ORDERED; 1. The United States shall pay the sum of Eleven thousand forty ($11,040) dollars to Goodrich Corporation as costs and fees incurred in responding to the United States Ex Parte Application to Enforce the Order of the Special Master Dated December 13, 2011 within thirty days of the filing of this Order. 2. Pursuant to the provisions of the Order Re Redesignation of Venetta S. Tassopulos, United States Magistrate Judge (Ret.) as Special Master and Rule 53 (e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the "REPORT AND ORDER" shall be filed with the clerk and a copy provided for the Honorable Suzanne Segal and served on each party by First Resolution Services Inc. (see document for further details) (afe)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1474 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION Requesting sealing of Certain Exhibits filed in support of Goodrich Corporation's reply to the United States' response to the Special Master's April 10, 2012 Questions concerning Goodrich's Motion to compel the United States to produce all documents prepared by SAIC. Lodged Proposed Order. (ir)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1469 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United States Department of Defense, re Motion Related Document,,, #1468 JOINT STIPULATION RE: GOODRICH CORPORATIONS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING ON THE UNITED STATES OBJECTIONS AND MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTERS MARCH 21 SANCTIONS ORDER [DKT 1461] served on 4/20/2012. (Dawson, Elizabeth)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1468 JOINT STIPULATION RE: GOODRICH CORPORATION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING ON THE UNITED STATES OBJECTIONS AND MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTERS MARCH 21 SANCTIONS ORDER [DKT 1461] re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing the United States' Objections to and Motion For Modification of the Special Master's March 21 Sanctions Order [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE] EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing the United States' Objections to and Motion For Modification of the Special Master's March 21 Sanctions Order [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE] EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing the United States' Objections to and Motion For Modification of the Special Master's March 21 Sanctions Order [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE] #1461 JOINT STIPULATION filed by Defendant United States Department of Defense. (Dawson, Elizabeth)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1467 REPLY Opposition MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1310 United States' Response to Goodrich Corporation's Additional Briefing filed by Defendant United States of America, Plaintiff United States of America. (Rosskam, David)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1466 REPLY Support MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1310 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Third Supplemental Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply To the United States' Response to The Special Master's April 10, 2012 Questions Concerning Goodrich's Motion to Compel The United States To Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC, #2 Exhibits to Third Supplemental Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply To the United States' Response to The Special Master's April 10, 2012 Questions Concerning Goodrich's Motion to Compel The United States To Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC)(Wickersham, Matthew)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1465 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Exhibits A, B, & C to Third Supplemental Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman. (Wickersham, Matthew)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1464 NOTICE Notice of Unavailability filed by Defendants Thomas O Peters, Stonehurst Site LLC, The 1996 Thomas O Peters and Kathleen S Peters Revocable Trust. (Kippen, Daniel)
April 19, 2012 Filing 1478 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS C & R to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Production by the United States of Weston Solutions, Inc. And Computer Sciences Corporation Documents In Accordance With Rule 34 filed Under Seal. (mat)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1476 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Application requesting sealing of certain Exhibits filed in support of Goodrich's Motion to compel production by the United States of Weston Solution Inc and Computer Sciences Corporation documents in accordance with Rule 34 #1475 . Exhibits C and R to the Declaration of David Edsall Jr shall be filed under seal. (ir)
April 19, 2012 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice (Other) #124 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing the United States' Objections to and Motion For Modification of the Special Master's March 21 Sanctions Order [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE] EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing the United States' Objections to and Motion For Modification of the Special Master's March 21 Sanctions Order [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE] EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing the United States' Objections to and Motion For Modification of the Special Master's March 21 Sanctions Order [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE] #1461 , Answer to Crossclaim #90 , Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #1460 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #89 , Motion Related Document,,,, #1462 e-mailed to CJohnson@dlflawyers.com, MBures@dlflawyers.com and RDongell@dlflawyers.com bounced due to nable to deliver message to the following recipients, due to being unable to connect successfully to the destination mail server.. Primary e-mail addresses were already correct. Possible problems with their mail server. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to CJohnson@dlflawyers.com, MBures@dlflawyers.com and RDongell@dlflawyers.com. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 19, 2012 Filing 1462 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING GOODRICH CORPORATION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING DATE ON THE UNITED STATES' OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER'S MARCH 21 SANCTIONS ORDER re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing the United States' Objections to and Motion For Modification of the Special Master's March 21 Sanctions Order [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE] EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing the United States' Objections to and Motion For Modification of the Special Master's March 21 Sanctions Order [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE] EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing the United States' Objections to and Motion For Modification of the Special Master's March 21 Sanctions Order [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE] #1461 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
April 19, 2012 Filing 1461 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing the United States' Objections to and Motion For Modification of the Special Master's March 21 Sanctions Order [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Wickersham In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application For an Order Continuing the Hearing Date on the United States' Objections To And Motion For Modification of The Special Master's March 21 Sanctions Order)(Wickersham, Matthew)
April 19, 2012 Filing 1460 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Emil A Macasinag counsel for Defendant County of San Bernardino.Emil A. Macasinag is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants County of San Bernardino, Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc., Schulz Parties, Zambelli Parties (Macasinag, Emil)
April 18, 2012 Filing 1463 MAIL RETURNED addressed to Larry M Corcoran at US Dept of Justice re Order #1432 (ir)
April 18, 2012 Filing 1458 SUPPLEMENT to Joint MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO DISCOVERY MASTER]Joint MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO DISCOVERY MASTER]Joint MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO DISCOVERY MASTER]Joint MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO DISCOVERY MASTER]Joint MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO DISCOVERY MASTER] #1070 United States' Response to the Declaration of Patrick W. Dennis filed by Defendant United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits)(Dawson, Elizabeth)
April 17, 2012 Filing 1457 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1310 Supplement in Response to Special Master's April 10, 2012 Questions filed by Defendant United States of America, Plaintiff United States of America. (Rosskam, David)
April 17, 2012 Filing 1456 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1310 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Second Supplemental Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Additional Briefing In Support of Its Motion To Compel The United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC)(Wickersham, Matthew)
April 16, 2012 Filing 1459 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibits C and R to Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Production by the United States of Weston Solutions, Inc.'s and Computer Sciences Corporation Documents in Accordance with Rule 34 File Under Seal. (mat)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1455 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez GRANTING #1454 Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing Of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support Of Goodrich's Motion To Compel Production By The United States Of Weston Solutions, Inc. And Computer Sciences Corporation Documents In Accordance With Rule 34. (bm)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1453 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Request to Substitute Attorney Jad T. Davis of Kutak Rock LLP in place and stead of Ropers Majeski Kohn Bentley #1444 GRANTED. (ir)
April 16, 2012 Filing 1452 Goodrich Corporation's Opposition to re: MOTION for Review of The United States' Objections to and Motion for Modification of the Special Master's March 21, 2012 Order Granting in Part Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions Against the United States re #1401 Order on Mot MOTION for Review of The United States' Objections to and Motion for Modification of the Special Master's March 21, 2012 Order Granting in Part Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions Against the United States re #1401 Order on Mot #1437 [DICOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SEGAL] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Wickersham Part 1, #2 Declaration of Matthew C. Wickersham Part 2)(Wickersham, Matthew)
April 13, 2012 Filing 1475 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION Requesting sealing of Certain Exhibits filed in support of Goodrich's Motion to compel production by the United States of Weston Solutions Inc and Computer Sciences Corporation documents in accordance with Rule 34. (ir)
April 13, 2012 Filing 1454 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION REQUESTING SEALING OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS FILED IN SUPPORT OF GOODRICH'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION BY THE UNITED STATES OF WESTON SOLUTIONS, INC. AND COMPUTER SCIENCES CORPORATION DOCUMENTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 34, filed by defendant Goodrich Corporation. (afe)
April 13, 2012 Filing 1450 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Allan E Anderson counsel for Defendant Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co.. Allan E. Anderson will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Allan E. Anderson is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company (Anderson, Allan)
April 13, 2012 Filing 1448 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Exhibits C & R To Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Production By The United States of Weston Solutions, Inc. And Computer Sciences Corporation Documents In Accordance with Rule 34. (Wickersham, Matthew)
April 12, 2012 Filing 1447 NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION to Compel Production by the United States of Weston Solutions, Inc. And Computer Sciences Corporation Documents In Accordance With Rule 34 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Production by the United States of Weston Solutions, Inc. and Computer Sciences Corporation Documents In Accordance with Rule 34, #2 Exhibits A-E To Declaration of David Edsall Jr., #3 Exhibits F-N To Declaration of David Edsall Jr., #4 Exhibits O-T to Declaration of David Edsall Jr.)(Wickersham, Matthew)
April 12, 2012 Filing 1446 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Special Master's March 29, 2012 Order filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James R. MacAyeal, #2 Proposed Order)(MacAyeal, James)
April 11, 2012 Filing 1445 DECLARATION of Patrick W. Dennis Joint MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO DISCOVERY MASTER]Joint MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO DISCOVERY MASTER]Joint MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO DISCOVERY MASTER]Joint MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO DISCOVERY MASTER]Joint MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO DISCOVERY MASTER] #1070 Declaration of Patrick W. Dennis In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Request for Costs re Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO DISCOVERY MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Dennis, Patrick)
April 11, 2012 Filing 1444 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Jad T Davis in place of attorney Alan E. Anderson filed by Defendant Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Jad)
April 11, 2012 Filing 1443 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jad T Davis counsel for Defendant Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Co.. Changing firm name to Kutak Rock LLP 18201 Von Karman Ave., Suite 1100, Irvine, CA 92612. Changing e-mail to jad.davis@kutakrock.com. Adding Jad t. Davis as attorney as counsel of record for Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company aka Zambelli Fireworks Internationale; Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company, Inc for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Zambelli Fireworks Manufacturing Company (Davis, Jad)
April 9, 2012 Filing 1442 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER RE: The City of Rialto's and Rialto Utility Authority's Motion to Compel the Deposition of Eric Lardiere by Special Master Venetta S. Tassopulos. IT IS SO ORDERED (1) The City of Rialto's and Rialto Utility Authority's Motion to Compel the Deposition of Eric Lardiere is GRANTED in part #1351 (2) It is further ordered that Eric Lardiere shall appear as a Rule 30(b)(6) witness and shall be required to testify for a period of time not to exceed seven (7) hours on the subject discussed above and in the ruling which was accepted by the parties as discussed in the transcript of proceedings. (3) In accordance with Rule 53(e), the "REPORT AND ORDER" shall be filed with the clerk and a copy provided for the Honorable Suzanne Segal and served on each party by First Resolution Services Inc. (See order for further details) (afe)
April 9, 2012 Filing 1441 REPLY Support MOTION for Sanctions Motion Seeking Legal Fees incurred Responding to the United States' Ex Parte Application to Enforce the Order of the Special Master Dated December 13, 2011 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Motion Seeking Legal Fees incurred Responding to the United States' Ex Parte Application to Enforce the Order of the Special Master Dated December 13, 2011 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] #1388 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion Seeking Legal Fees Incurred Responding To the United States' Ex Parte Application To Enforce the Order of the Special Master Dated December 13, 2011)(Wickersham, Matthew)
April 6, 2012 Filing 1451 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT R to Declaration of Patrick W. Dennis in Support of Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Goodrich Corporation's MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Pursuant to Rule 30(B)(6) filed Under Seal. (mat)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1449 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #1440 Application Requesting Sealing Of Exhibit Filed In Support Of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum Re Motion To Compel Deposition Testimony Pursuant To Rule 30(b)(6). (bm)
April 5, 2012 Filing 1440 APPLICATION Requesting Sealing of Exhibits filed in support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum regarding Motion to compel deposition testimony pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) Lodged Order. (ir)
April 5, 2012 Filing 1437 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of The United States' Objections to and Motion for Modification of the Special Master's March 21, 2012 Order Granting in Part Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions Against the United States re #1401 Order on Motion for Sanctions on Discovery Matters,, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 5/8/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hurst, Patricia)
April 5, 2012 Filing 1436 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Cross Defendant Goodrich Corporation of EXHIBIT R TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PATRICK W. DENNIS. (Wickersham, Matthew)
April 4, 2012 Filing 1435 SUPPLEMENT Memorandum In Support of Goodrich's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony Pursuant to Rule 30(B)(6) [Discovery Matter Referred to Special Master] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Patrick W. Dennis In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony Pursuant to Rule 30(B)(6))(Wickersham, Matthew)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1432 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION Of All Parties Requesting That The Court Amend Certain Case Management Order Deadlines But Not The Trial Date Or Dispositive Motion Date by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct #1424 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, with regard to fact discovery, that: 1. The following fact discovery deadlines shall be stayed and suspended, effective February 17, 2012, pending finalization of the Tentative Agreements and their approval by the Court: (a) those between and among the Settling Defendants; (b) those between and among the Governmental Parties; (c) those between and among any Settling Defendant and any Governmental Party; and (d) those between and among the Settling Defendants and all other parties to the Consolidated Actions. 2. Except as described in paragraph 1 of this Order, fact discovery deadlines set forth in CMO No. 1, paragraph 8 (Dkt. No. 601), involving the United States and Goodrich Corporation are extended by the Special Master's order, entered on March 22, 2012, (Dkt # 1401), subject to any appeal by the United States; 3. All objections to the fact discovery stayed by this Order, which existed as of the date of this Order, are preserved; in the event that a Tentative Agreement as to a particular party or parties is not finalized and approved by the Court, any pending discovery motion directed at that party or parties that was withdrawn pursuant to this Order may be re-noticed; and 4. The Court shall hold a status conference on June 4, 2012, at 3 p.m., at which time the parties shall advise the Court of the status of such settlements. In the event one or more of the proposed Consent Decrees memorializing the Tentative Agreements is not lodged with the Court by June 4, 2012, as to any specific Settling Defendant for which a Consent Decree has not been lodged, the Court shall reset the schedule for completion of any stayed fact discovery. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, with regard to expert witness discovery and other related pre-trial dates, that paragraph 8 of CMO #No. 1 (Dkt #601) is amended as follows: Status Conference: June 4, 2012; Expert witness disclosures exchanged: August 13, 2012; Rebuttal expert witness disclosures exchanged: October 15, 2012; Expert discovery closes: January 30, 2013; Deadline for filing dispositive motions: November 30, 2012; Pretrial Status Conference: January 14, 2013; Trial Date: March 25, 2013. (bm)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1428 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Stay and Suspend all discovery obligations under CMO No 1. as result of Tentative Agreements reached by Certain parties and the United States #1396 . The following fact and expert discovery deadlines shall be stayed and suspended pending finalization of the Tentative Agreements and their approval by the Court: (a) those between and among the Settling Defendants; (b) those between and among the Governmental Parties; (c) those between and among any Settling Defendant and any Governmental Party; and (d) those between and among the Settling Defendants and all other parties to the Consolidated Actions; Except as described in paragraph 1 of this Order, fact and expert witness discovery deadlines set forth in CMO No. 1, paragraph 8 (Dkt. No. 601), involving (a) the United States and any other party in the Consolidated Actions, and (b) any other Governmental Party and any party other than the Stipulating Parties are neither stayed nor suspended by this Order; All objections to the discovery stayed by this Order, which existed as of the date of this Order, are preserved; 4. In the event that a Tentative Agreement as to a particular party or parties is not finalized and approved by the Court, any pending motion directed at that party or parties that was withdrawn pursuant to this Order may be re-noticed; and The Court shall hold a status conference on June 4, 2012, at 3:00 p.m., at which time the parties shall advise the Court of the status of such settlements. Inthe event one or more of the proposed Consent Decrees memorializing the Tentative Agreements is not lodged with the Court by June 4, 2012, as to any specific Settling Defendant for which a Consent Decree has not been lodged, the Court shall reset the schedule for completion of any stayed discovery which, by agreement of the Stipulating Parties, shall include July 13, 2012, as the date for the exchange of the initial expert witness disclosures stayed and suspended by this Order, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (ir)
April 3, 2012 Filing 1427 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #1425 (Amended) served on 4/3/2012. (Kamons, Rachael)
April 3, 2012 Filing 1426 DECLARATION of Rachael Amy Kamons re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #1425 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G, #2 Exhibit Exhibit H part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit H part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit H part 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit H part 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibits I-M, #7 Exhibit Exhibit N, #8 Exhibit Exhibits O-S)(Kamons, Rachael)
April 2, 2012 Filing 1438 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS A and B to the Declaration of Kim Smaczniak in Support of United States' Opposition to Goodrich's MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Pursuant to Rule 30(b)6) filed Under Seal Pursuant to United States' Designation of Confidentiality. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1434 ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES' APPLICATION #1433 FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CONFIDENTIAL STATUS OF DOCUMENTS, THE DEPOSITION OF CHRISTINA GRAULAU AND SPREADSHEET CREATED BY CHRISTINA GRAULAU - EXHIBITS A AND B TO THE DECLARATION OF KIM SMACZNIAK IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES' OPPOSITION TO GOODRICH CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO RULE30(b)(6), by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (afe)
April 2, 2012 Filing 1425 opposition in Opposition to re: MOTION for Sanctions Motion Seeking Legal Fees incurred Responding to the United States' Ex Parte Application to Enforce the Order of the Special Master Dated December 13, 2011 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION for Sanctions Motion Seeking Legal Fees incurred Responding to the United States' Ex Parte Application to Enforce the Order of the Special Master Dated December 13, 2011 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] #1388 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Kamons, Rachael)
April 2, 2012 Filing 1424 Joint STIPULATION to amend Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #601 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kamons, Rachael)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1433 UNITED STATE'S APPLICATION for an Order to file under seal exhibits filed in support of United State's opposition to Goodrich Corporation's motion to compel testimony pursuant to rule 30(b)(6)filed by defendant United States Department of Defense. (afe)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1422 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Anna Louise Cole counsel for Cross Claimants Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Fredericksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 20, 1985, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust under Trust Agreement dated February 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated 11/19/91, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Mary Mitchell, Mary Mitchell, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, The Schulz Trust, Cross Defendants Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of The E.F. Schulz Trust, John Callagy as Trustee of the Fredericksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 20, 1985, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated Feb. 20, 1985, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated Feb. 20, 1985, John Callagy as Trustee of the Shulz Trust, John Callagy as Trustee of the Shulz Trust, John Callagy, as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated Feb. 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated 11/19/91, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated 11/19/91, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated 1/19/91, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Linda Frederiksen, as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated Feb. 15, 1985, Linda Frederiksen, as Trustee of The Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated Nov. 19, 1991, Mary Mitchell, Mary Mitchell, Mary Mitchell, Mary Mitchell, Mary Mitchell, Mary Mitchell, Mary Mitchell, Mary Mitchell, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, Third Party Defendants Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust under Trust Agreement dated February 20, 1985, Linda Frederiksen as Trustee of the Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Frederiksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated November 19, 1991, Mary Mitchell, Mary Mitchell, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, Third Party Plaintiffs Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Fredericksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 20, 1985, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated Feb. 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Mary Mitchell, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, The Schulz Trust, The Schulz Trust, Defendants Jeanine Elzie, Linda Fredericksen, Linda Fredericksen, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust under Trust Agreement dated February 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Mary Mitchell, Mary Mitchell, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, Counter Claimants Jeanine Elzie, Jeanine Elzie, Linda Frederiksen, Linda Frederiksen, John Callagy as Trustee of the Fredericksen Children's Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 20, 1985, John Callagy as Trustee of the Frederiksen Children's Trust under Trust Agreement dated February 20, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Michelle Ann Pointon Trust Under Trust Agreement Dated February 15, 1985, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of The Walter M. Pointon Trust Dated 11/19/91, Linda Fredericksen as Trustee of the Walter M. Pointon Trust under Trust dated 11/19/91, Mary Mitchell, Mary Mitchell, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Elizabeth Rodriguez, Edward Stout, Edward Stout, The Schulz Trust. Changing e-mail to alemay@candffirm.com. Adding Anna Louise Le May as attorney as counsel of record for EDWARD STOUT; ELIZABETH RODRIGUEZ; JOHN CALLAGY AS TRUSTEE OF THE FREDERIKSEN CHILDRENS TRUST UNDER TRUST AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 20, 1985; LINDA FREDERIKSEN; LINDA FREDERIKSEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE WALTER M. POINTON TRUST DATED 11/19/91; LINDA FREDERIKSEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE MICHELLE ANN POINTON TRUST UNDER TRUST AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 15, 1985; JOHN CALLAGY; MARY CALLAGY (erroneously named as MARY MITCHELL); JEANINE ELZIE; STEPHEN CALLAGY (collectively referred to as THE SCHULZ TRUST) for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants EDWARD STOUT; ELIZABETH RODRIGUEZ; JOHN CALLAGY AS TRUSTEE OF THE FREDERIKSEN CHILDRENS TRUST UNDER TRUST AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 20, 1985; LINDA FREDERIKSEN; LINDA FREDERIKSEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE WALTER M. POINTON TRUST DATED 11/19/91; LINDA FREDERIKSEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE MICHELLE ANN POINTON TRUST UNDER TRUST AGREEMENT DATED FEBRUARY 15, 1985; JOHN CALLAGY; MARY CALLAGY (erroneously named as MARY MITCHELL); JEANINE ELZIE; STEPHEN CALLAGY (collectively referred to as THE SCHULZ TRUST) (Cole, Anna)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1421 OPPOSITION to Motion to Compel filed by Defendants United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, Cross Defendants United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, Third Party Defendants United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, Counter Claimant United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kim Smaczniak)(Hill, Leslie)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1420 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, Cross Defendants United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, Third Party Defendants United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Defense, Counter Claimant United States Department of Defense of APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS FILED IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES OPPOSITION TO GOODRICH CORPORATIONS MOTION TO COMPEL TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO RULE 30(b)(6). (Hill, Leslie)
March 29, 2012 Filing 1431 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER; ORDER GRANTING IN PART GOODRICH CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE UNITED STATES TO PRODUCE EPA WITNESSES FOR DEPOSITION #1356 , by Special Master Venetta S. Tassopulos. IT IS ORDERED (1) Goodrich's Motion is GRANTED in part as set forth above. (2) In accordance with Rule 53(e) the "REPORT AND ORDER" shall be filled with the clerk and a copy provided for the Honorable Suzanne Segal and served on each party by First Resolution Services, Inc. (See Order for further details) (afe)
March 29, 2012 Filing 1430 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER RE SPECIAL MASTER'S JANUARY 20, 2012 ORDER #1340 GRANTING GOODRICH CORPORATION'S REQUEST FOR COSTS INCURRED FOR FAILURE OF UNITED STATES TO COMPLY WITH THE SPECIAL MASTER'S JULY 6, 2011 ORDER #824 , by Special Master Venetta S. Tassopulos. IT IS ORDERED: (1) The United States shall pay the sum of forty-one thousand four hundred seventy ($41,470) dollars to Goodrich Corporation as costs and fees incurred in litigating the Motion to Compel Compliance with the July 6, 2011 Order and for Sanctions as discussed above, within thirty days of the filing of this Order. (2) Pursuant to the provisions of the Order Re Redesignation of Venetta S. Tassopulos, United States Magistrate Judge (Ret,) as Special Master and Rule 53 (e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the "REPORT AND ORDER" shall be filled with the clerk and a copy provided for the Honorable Suzanne Segal and served on each party by First Resolution Services, Inc. (afe)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1429 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER; ORDER GRANTING GOODRICH CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF LITIGATION HOLD LETTERS PREPARED BY THE UNITED STATES #1274 by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. IT IS ORDERED: Goodrich's Motion is GRANTED in part. The United States DoD shall produce to Goodrich all of the redacted documents which were submitted to the Special Master and the document under tab B-16, with the elimination of the redaction on the last line of the first page as discussed in the telephone conference. It is furthered ordered Goodrich's request for sanction's is DENIED. In accordance with Rule 53 (e) the "Report AND ORDER" shall be filed with the clerk and a copy provided for the Honorable Suzanne Segal and served on each party by First Resolution Services, Inc. (See Order for further details) (afe)
March 29, 2012 Filing 1418 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM Court of Appeals Case Number: 12-55409; Re: #1319 (Wickersham, Matthew)
March 29, 2012 Filing 1415 OBJECTIONS to Stipulation for Discovery, #1396 Objection by James Hescox as Personal Representativeof Harry Hescox to the Stipulation to Stay and Suspend all Discovery Obligations Under CMO No. 1 filed by Defendant James Hescox. (Isola, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 1414 OBJECTIONS to Order on Motion for Sanctions on Discovery Matters,, #1401 Objection by James Hescox as Personal Representative of Harry Hescox to the Report of Special Master, Order Granting in Part Goodrich Corporation's Motion for Sanctions against the United States filed by Defendant James Hescox. (Isola, David)
March 28, 2012 Filing 1413 REPLY in support of MOTION to Compel Deposition of Eric Lardiere #1351 filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dennis S. Ellis)(Ellis, Dennis)
March 28, 2012 Filing 1412 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff United States of Americato Objections - non-motion, #1399 United States' Response to Goodrich Corporation's Objections to Stipulation to Stay and Suspend All Discovery Obligations Under CMO No. 1 as the Result of Tentative Agreements Reached by Certain Parties and the United States (Gitin, Deborah)
March 28, 2012 Filing 1411 DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED as to Defendants Wong Chung Ming, AND Tung Chun Company pursuant to Order filed 3/27/12. (ir)
March 27, 2012 Filing 1439 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS F, G, H, I, J, K and L to the Declaration of Patrick W. Dennis in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony Pursuant to Rule 30(B)(6) filed Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6)(mat)
March 27, 2012 Filing 1423 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS F, G, H, I, J, K and L to The Declaration of Patrick W. Dennis in Support of Goodrich Corporation's MOTION to Compel Deposition of Further Custodian Deposition Testimony Pursuant to Rule 30(B)(6) filed Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5)(mat)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1419 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Application requesting sealing of Certain exhibits filed in support of Goodrich Corporation's motion to compel deposition testimony pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) #1404 . Exhibits F, G, H, I, J, K, and L to the Declaration of Patrick W Dennis shall be filed under seal. (ir)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1410 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Application for Entry of Default against Wong Chung Ming and Tung Chun Company #1354 . Wong Chung Ming and Tung Chun Company, having been properly served and failed to plead or otherwise defend themselves, entry of default against Wong Chung Ming and Tung Chun Company is hereby entered with respect to the following pleading: Colton's Complaint in Case No. CV 09-01864 PSG (SSx), filed October 6, 2009, ECF No. 1, and Amendment to Complaint, filed February 1, 2010, ECF No. 212. (ir)
March 27, 2012 Filing 1409 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM Court of Appeals Case Number: 12-55411; Re: #1334 (Zagon, Brian)
March 26, 2012 Filing 1408 Stipulation Regarding Page Limits for Goodrich Corporation's Intended Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence; and Order [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] (Wickersham, Matthew)
March 26, 2012 Filing 1407 REPLY filed by Defendant Emhart Industries Inc to Objections - non-motion, #1399 Response of Emhart Industries, Inc., Kwikset Locks, Inc., and Black & Decker Inc., to Goodrich Corporation's Objections to Stay and Suspend all Discovery Obligation under CMO N. 1 as the result of tentative agreements reached by certain parties and the United States (Wyatt, Robert)
March 26, 2012 Filing 1400 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition of Further Custodian Deposition Testimony from the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick W. Dennis Part 1, #2 Declaration of Patrick W. Dennis Part 2)(Dennis, Patrick)
March 23, 2012 Filing 1399 OBJECTIONS TO THE STIPULATION TO STAY AND SUSPEND ALL DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS UNDER CMO NO. 1 AS A RESULT OF TENTATIVE AGREEMENTS REACHED BY CERTAIN PARTIES AND THE UNITED STATES filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Edsall Jr.)(Wickersham, Matthew)
March 23, 2012 Filing 1398 REPLY MOTION to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1348 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Mann, Valerie)
March 23, 2012 Filing 1396 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Stay and Suspend All Discovery Obligations Under CMO No. 1 as Result of Tentative Agreements Reached by Certain Parties and the United States filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gitin, Deborah)
March 23, 2012 Filing 1395 STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Goodrich Corporation's intended Motion for Sanctions Against the United States for Spoliation of Evidence; and [Proposed] Order [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation.(Wickersham, Matthew)
March 23, 2012 Filing 1394 OPPOSITION to Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Extend the Discovery Cut-Off and Amend the Case Management Order to Compel Additional EPA Depositions filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Panio, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kamons, Rachael)
March 23, 2012 Filing 1391 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to United States' 4th Requests for Admission and 6th Request for Production of Documents to Goodrich Corp. filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jeffrey Spector with Exhibits)(Spector, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2012 Filing 1404 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION Requesting Sealing Of Certain Exhibits Filed In Support Of Goodrich Corporation's Motion To Compel Deposition Testimony Pursuant To Rule 30(b)(6) filed by plaintiff Goodrich Corporation. (bm)
March 22, 2012 Filing 1401 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER; ORDER GRANTING IN PART GOODRICH CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST THE UNITED STATES #1235 by Special Master. The Special Master orders that the Discovery Cut-Off, as that Cut-Off applies to Goodrich Corporation and the United States, is extended four months, from February 29, 2012 to June 29, 2012, with the rights and obligations of the parties relating to this discovery being as set forth in this report. The Special Master further orders that the deadline for the exchange of expert reports between Goodrich and the United States is extended from April 13, 2012 to August 10,2012. (See report for complete details) (afe)
March 22, 2012 Filing 1388 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Motion Seeking Legal Fees incurred Responding to the United States' Ex Parte Application to Enforce the Order of the Special Master Dated December 13, 2011 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Edsall Jr.)(Wickersham, Matthew)
March 22, 2012 Filing 1387 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Sertain Exhibits filed in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony Pursuant to 30(b)(6); [Proposed] Order and under seal exhibits. (Dennis, Patrick)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1417 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS G, H, I, N, and T to the Supplemental Declaration of Matthew C. Wickersham in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel the United States to Produce EPA Witnesses for Deposition filed Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1416 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBITS J and K to the Amended Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition to The United States' MOTION to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Orders. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 ORDER GRANTING GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION #1386 REQUESTING SEALING OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS FILED IN SUPPORT OF GOODRICH'S OPPOSITION TO THE UNITED STATES' MOTION TO COMPEL GOODRICH CORPORATION'S COMPLIANCE WITH THE JANUARY 6, 2006 PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND WITH RULE 26(b)(5)(B) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (afe)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1402 ORDER GRANTING GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION #1385 REQUESTING SEALING OF EXHIBIT FILED IN SUPPORT OF GOODRICH'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF IT'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE UNITED STATES TO PRODUCE EPA WITNESSES FOR DEPOSITION, by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (afe)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1382 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony Pursuant to Rule 30(b)6) [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick W. Dennis in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Depsoition Testimony Pursuant to Rule 30(B)(6) Part 1, #2 Declaration of Patrick W. Dennis in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel Depsoition Testimony Pursuant to Rule 30(B)(6) Part 2)(Dennis, Patrick)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1381 REPLY in support of MOTION for Sanctions as to Emhart Industries, Inc. #1307 filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Dennis S. Ellis, #2 Declaration of Peter H. Weiner)(Ellis, Dennis)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1380 DECLARATION of Rachael Amy Kamons in support of MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Goodrich Corporation #1377 , MOTION to Compel Goodrich to Permit Arcadis to Respond to Subpoena for Documents #1379 , MOTION to Compel Answers to Requests for Admission (Set Three) #1378 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G, #2 Exhibit Exhibit H part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit H part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibits I-R, #5 Exhibit Exhibits S-X, #6 Exhibit Exhibits Y-DD)(Kamons, Rachael)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1379 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Goodrich to Permit Arcadis to Respond to Subpoena for Documents filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Kamons, Rachael)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1378 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Requests for Admission (Set Three) filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Kamons, Rachael)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1377 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Goodrich Corporation filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Kamons, Rachael)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 ORDER GRANTING EMHART INDUSTRIES, INC.'S APPLICATION For An Order To File Under Seal Exhibits To Declaration Of James L. Meeder In Support Of Emhart Industries, Inc.'s Opposition To The City Of Rialto's Motion For Sanctions by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #1392 Application to Seal. (bm)
March 20, 2012 Filing 1386 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION requesting sealing of certain exhibits filed in support of Goodrich's opposition to the United States' Motion to compel Goodrich Corporation's compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order governing confidential information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B)of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, filed by defendant Goodrich Corporation. (afe)
March 20, 2012 Filing 1385 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION requesting sealing of exhibit filed in support Goodrich's supplemental brief in support of it's motion to compel the United States to Produce EPA witnesses for deposition, filed by DEFENDANT Goodrich Corporation. (afe)
March 20, 2012 Filing 1374 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Application Requesting Sealing of Exhibits ot Supplemental Declaration of Matthew Wickersham in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Brief in Support if its Motion to Compel the U.S. to Produce EPA Witnesses for Deposition; [Proposed] Order; Exhibits to be filed under seal. (Wickersham, Matthew)
March 20, 2012 Filing 1373 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Application Requesting Sealing of Certain Exhibits filed in Support of Goodrich's Opposition to the United States Motion to Compel Goodrich's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order; [Proposed] Order and Exhibits to be filed under seal. (Wickersham, Matthew)
March 20, 2012 Filing 1372 DECLARATION of Amended Declaration of David Edsall Jr. in opposition to MOTION to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1348 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
March 19, 2012 Filing 1392 EMHART INDUSTRIES, INC.'S APPLICATION For An Order To File Under Seal Exhibits To Declaration Of James L. Meeder In Support Of Emhart Industries, Inc.'s Opposition To The City of Rialto's Motion For Sanctions filed by defendants Black and Decker, Inc., Emhart Industries Inc, Kwikset Locks Inc. (bm)
March 19, 2012 Filing 1371 opposition Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1348 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Edsall Jr. In Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition to United States' Motion to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and With Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, #2 Exhibits to Declaration of David Edsall Jr., #3 Appendix in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Opposition to the United States' Motion to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and With rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure)(Wickersham, Matthew)
March 19, 2012 Filing 1370 SUPPLEMENT Goodrich Corporation's Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel the United States to Produce EPA Witnesses for Deposition [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplmental Declaration of Matthew C. Wickersham)(Wickersham, Matthew)
March 19, 2012 Filing 1366 NOTICE Notice of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Emhart Industries Inc. (Wyatt, Robert)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1403 ORDER GRANTING GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION #1368 REQUESTING SEALING OF EXHIBIT B AND PART OF EXHIBIT R TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF VAUGHN A. BLACKMAN, FILED IN SUPPORT OF GOODRICH CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE UNITED STATES TO PRODUCE ALL DOCUMENTS PREPARED BY SAIC, by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (afe)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1397 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT B and Confidential Portions of Exhibit R to the Supplemental Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel the United States to Produce all Documents Prepared by SAIC Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order. (mat)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1365 Opposition yes re: MOTION for Sanctions as to Emhart Industries, Inc. #1307 Opposition filed by Defendant Emhart Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James L. Meeder in support of Emhart Industries, Inc.'s Opposition to the City of Rialto's Motion for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit Exhibts to James L. Meeder Declaration in support of Emhart Opposition to the City of Rialto's Motion for Sanctions, #3 Declaration Declaration of Theodore Morris in support of the Emhart Parties' Opposition to the City of Rialto's Motion for Sanctions against Emhart Industries, Inc., #4 Proof of Service)(Wyatt, Robert)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1364 Opposition in opposition to re: MOTION to Compel Deposition of Eric Lardiere #1351 filed by Defendant Whittaker Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Johnson in Support of Opposition of Whittaker Corporation to City of Rialto's and Rialto Utility Authority's Motion to Compel the Deposition of Eric Lardiere, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher T. Johnson, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Christopher T. Johnson, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Christopher T. Johnson, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Christopher T. Johnson, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Christopher T. Johnson, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Christopher T. Johnson, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Christopher T. Johnson, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Christopher T. Johnson, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Christopher T. Johnson, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Christopher T. Johnson, #12 Exhibit K to Declaration of Christopher T. Johnson)(Johnson, Christopher)
March 15, 2012 Filing 1368 Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting sealing of exhibit B and part of exhibit R to the supplemental declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman filed in support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC #1361 , filed by Goodrich Corporation. (afe)
March 15, 2012 Filing 1363 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Application Requesting Sealing of Exhibits to Supplemental Declaraion of Vaughn Blackman; [Proposed] Order and Exhibits to be filed under seal. (Wickersham, Matthew)
March 15, 2012 Filing 1362 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Tung Chun Company, Chung Ming Wong #1354 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as Clerk is not authorized to enter default against a foreign entity. Request forwarded to assigned Judge for consideration. (bm)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1376 ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES' APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING EPA DELIBERATIVE PROCESS DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION ND 1162 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, (shb)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1375 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting Goodrich's Corporation's Application Requesting the Sealing of Exhibit Filed in Support of Goodrich's Motion to Compel the United States to Produce EPA Witnesses for Deposition and Impose a Stay Propounded by the United States. (shb) Modified on 3/20/2012 (shb).
March 14, 2012 Filing 1369 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT B Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order Regarding EPA Deliberative Process Documents and Information, DN 1164. (mat)
March 14, 2012 Filing 1367 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT F to the Declaration of Matthew Wickersham in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel the United States to Produce EPA Witnesses for Deposition, and Impose a Stay on Discovery Propounded by the United States filed Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order. (mat)
March 14, 2012 Filing 1361 REPLY Goodrich Corporation's Reply in Support of MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1310 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman Part 1, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman Part 2)(Wickersham, Matthew)
March 14, 2012 Filing 1360 JOINDER in MOTION to Compel Deposition of Eric Lardiere #1351 filed by Plaintiff City of Colton. (Tanaka, Gene)
March 13, 2012 Filing 1384 APPLICATION requesting sealing of exhibit filed in support of Goodrich's motion to compel the United States to produce EPA witness for deposition and impose a stay on discovery propounded by the United States filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. Lodged Proposed Order. (ir)
March 13, 2012 Filing 1383 APPLICATION for order to File under seal pursuant to Protective Order regarding EPA Deliberative process documents and Information, DN 1162 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Lodged Proposed order. (ir)
March 13, 2012 Filing 1359 OPPOSITION to Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel The United States to Produce EPA Witnesses for Deposition, and Impose a Stay on Discovery Propounded by the United States filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rachael Amy Kamons, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Kamons, Rachael)
March 13, 2012 Filing 1358 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Application Requesting Sealing of Exhibit filed in Support of Motion to Compel the United States to Produce EPA Witnesses for Deposition, etc.; [Proposed] Order; Exhibit to be filed under seal. (Wickersham, Matthew)
March 13, 2012 Filing 1357 Amended NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Exhibit B (excerpt of sealed deposition of Michele Benson) to Declaration of Valerie Mann in Support of US' Opposition to Goodrich's Motion to Compel US to Produce Documents Prepared by SAIC. (Mann, Valerie)
March 12, 2012 Filing 1356 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Goodrich Corporation's Motion to Compel the United States to Produce EPA Witnesses for Deposition, and Impose a Stay on Discovery Propounded by the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham in Support of Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application, #2 Goodrich Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel the United States to Produce EPA Witnesses for Deposition, and Imposed a Stay on Discovery Propounded by the United States, #3 Declaration of Matthew Wickersham in Support of Goodrich Corporation'sMotion to Compel the United States to Produce EPA Witnesses for Deposition, and Imposed a Stay on Discovery Propounded by the United States, #4 [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Ex Parte Application)(Wickersham, Matthew)
March 12, 2012 Filing 1355 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff City of Colton. correcting REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Tung Chun Company, Chung Ming Wong #1354 (Tanaka, Gene)
March 12, 2012 Filing 1354 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Tung Chun Company, Chung Ming Wong filed by Plaintiff City of Colton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration G. Tanaka Declaration, #2 Notice of Lodging, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Tanaka, Gene)
March 9, 2012 Filing 1351 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition of Eric Lardiere filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Dennis S. Ellis, #3 Exhibit A to Ellis Declaration, #4 Exhibit B-1 to Ellis Declaration, #5 Exhibit B-2 to Ellis Declaration, #6 Exhibit C-O to Ellis Declaration, #7 Exhibit P-Z to Ellis Declaration, #8 Exhibit AA-KK to Ellis Declaration)(Ellis, Dennis)
March 9, 2012 Filing 1350 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Exhibit B (deposition under seal) to Valerie Mann Declaration in support of US Opposition to Goodrich's Motion to Compel United States to Produce Documents Prepared By SAIC. (Mann, Valerie)
March 9, 2012 Filing 1349 Opposition in Opposition re: MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] MOTION to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1310 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Valerie Mann in support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A-J to Mann Declaration, #3 Declaration of Sarah Mueller, #4 Declaration of Kim Muratore, #5 Declaration of Katherine Moore)(Mann, Valerie)
March 7, 2012 Filing 1353 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER; ORDER DENYING United States' Ex Parte Application #1296 to Enforce the Order of the Special Master Dated December 13, 2011. (See report for full details) (afe)
March 7, 2012 Filing 1348 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Goodrich Corporation's Compliance with the January 6, 2006 Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and with Rule 26(b)(5)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian K. Thompson, #2 Exhibit A-C to Thompson Declaration, #3 Exhibit D-J to Thompson Declaration, #4 Exhibit K-P to Thompson Declaration, #5 Exhibit Q to Thompson Declaration, #6 Exhibit R-U to Thompson Declaration, #7 Exhibit V-II to Thompson Declaration, #8 Proposed Order)(MacAyeal, James)
March 6, 2012 Filing 1344 DECLARATION of Second Supplemental Declaration of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein in Support of First MOTION to Compel Production of Litigation Hold Letters Prepared by the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER]First MOTION to Compel Production of Litigation Hold Letters Prepared by the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER]First MOTION to Compel Production of Litigation Hold Letters Prepared by the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1274 [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Wickersham, Matthew)
March 5, 2012 Filing 1343 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Spector in opposition to First MOTION to Compel Production of Litigation Hold Letters Prepared by the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER]First MOTION to Compel Production of Litigation Hold Letters Prepared by the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER]First MOTION to Compel Production of Litigation Hold Letters Prepared by the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO SPECIAL MASTER] #1274 Supplemental Declaration filed by Defendant United States of America. (Spector, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1342 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #1323 Request to Substitute Attorney. The Court hereby orders that the request of: American Promotional Events, Inc.-WEST; American Promotional Events, Inc., Defendant, to substitute Olivia Wright, Retained Counsel, as attorney of record in place and stead of Jennifer Hartman King. (bm)
March 2, 2012 Filing 1341 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 12-55411 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #1334 as to Defendant Astro Pyrotechnics. (dmap)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1339 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Granting Stipulation re Stay of discovery and withdrawal of motions as a result of Tentative Settlement agreement between Plaintiff Governments and Settling Defendants #1324 . The Court further finds the following: 1) The Government Parties, the Defendants, and RRM are relieved from all deadlines and cut-offs for Outstanding Discovery and pending Motions, including those deadlines and cut-offs described in Case Management Order No. 1. (Docket No. 601); 2) The Government Parties, the Defendants, and RRM shall not be deemed to have waived any objection to such discovery to the extent those objections existed at that time the Stipulation was filed with the Court; and 3) In the event the TA is not memorialized in a final agreement and approved by this Court, the Government Parties, the Defendants, and RRM may, as appropriate, seek permission from this Court to re-notice the pending motions and seek responses to the outstanding discovery more specifically described in Paragraphs 4 and 5 of the Stipulation, subject to objections those objections that existed at the time the Stipulation was filed with the Court. (ir)
March 2, 2012 Filing 1336 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 12-55409, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #1319 (car)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1346 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, ORDERING Application and Order to Seal Exhibits submitted by Defendant Goodrich Corporation received on 3/1/12 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Other: Exhibits not submitted with ap & order; Exhibit HH not submitted concurrently with this application. (bm)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1335 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1318 , After full consideration by this Court of the Stipulation to Dismiss, Without Prejudice, Environmental Enterprises, Inc.' s Claims Against Goodrich Corporation and Goodrich Corporation's Claims Against Environmental Enterprises, Inc., and for good cause showing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. All federal and state claims, whether pled or "deemed" by Environmental Enterprises against Goodrich shall be dismissed, without prejudice; 2. All federal and state claims, whether pled or "deemed" by Goodrich against Environmental Enterprises shall be dismissed, without prejudice; 3. Nothing set forth in this Stipulation shall operate as "an adjudication on the merits" of Goodrich's claims against Environmental Enterprises or Environmental Enterprises' claims against Goodrich and the effect of Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(B) shall not apply to these stipulated dismissals, without prejudice; and, 4. Environmental Enterprises and Goodrich are to bear their own costs andbear their own attorneys' fees. (lw)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1334 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendants Astro Pyrotechnics, Inc. and Pyro Spectaculars, Inc. Astro Pyrotechnics Inc, Pyro Spectaculars Inc. Appeal of Consent Judgment #1258 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-10012403 paid.) (Zagon, Brian)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1333 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendants Emhart Industries Inc. Appeal of Consent Judgment #1258 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-10011834 paid.) (Wyatt, Robert)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1332 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Scott A Sommer counsel for Cross Defendants City of Rialto, Rialto Utility Authority.Martin Sul is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto and Rialto Utility Authority (Sommer, Scott)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1331 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Scott A Sommer counsel for Plaintiff City of Rialto, Cross Defendant Rialto Utility Authority.Andrew D. Lanphere is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto and Rialto Utility Authority (Sommer, Scott)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1330 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Scott A Sommer counsel for Cross Defendants City of Rialto, Rialto Utility Authority.Mark E. Elliott is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto and Rialto Utility Authority (Sommer, Scott)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1329 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Scott A Sommer counsel for Cross Defendants City of Rialto, Rialto Utility Authority.Scott Sommer is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto and Rialto Utility Authority (Sommer, Scott)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1328 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Scott A Sommer counsel for Cross Defendants City of Rialto, Rialto Utility Authority.Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto and Rialto Utility Authority (Sommer, Scott)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1327 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Enforce Discovery Cutoff filed by Defendant Whittaker Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Christopher T. Johnson, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-F, #3 Exhibit Exhibits G-P, #4 [Proposed] Motion, #5 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Johnson, Christopher)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1326 DECLARATION of Dennis S. Ellis re Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition (non-motion) #1325 to Whittaker Corporation's Ex Parte Application to Enforce Fact Discovery Cutoff filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K, #2 Exhibit L-Q)(Ellis, Dennis)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1325 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Plaintiff City of Rialto. to Whittaker Corporation's Ex Parte Application to Enforce Fact Discovery Cutoff (Ellis, Dennis)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1324 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Stay of Discovery and Withdrawal of Motions As a Result of Tentative Settlement Agreement Between Plaintiff Governments and Settling Defendants filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gitin, Deborah)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1323 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Olivia Wright in place of attorney Jennifer Hartman King filed by Defendants American Promotional Events Inc, American Promotional Events Inc-West. Request set for hearing on 3/19/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Goldberg, Steven)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1322 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation of Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Exhibits To the Second Declaration of Patrick W. Dennis & [Proposed] Order Granting Goodrich Corporation's Application Requesting Sealing of Exhibits. (Wickersham, Matthew)
February 29, 2012 Filing 1352 SEALED DOCUMENT- EXHIBIT I to Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman in Support of Goodrich's Motion to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC. (mat)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1345 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Goodrich Corporation's Application requesting sealing of portions of exhibits filed in support of Goodrich's Motion to compel the United States to produce all documents prepared by SAIC #1337 , Exhibit I to the Declaration of Vaughn Blackman shall be filed under seal. (ir)
February 29, 2012 Filing 1338 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Goodrich Corporation, re APPLICATION to Seal #1337 served on 2/29/2012. (lw)
February 29, 2012 Filing 1337 GOODRICH CORPORATION'S APPLICATION Requesting Sealing of Portions of Exhibits Filed in Support of Goodrich's Motion to Compel the United States to Produce All Documents Prepared by SAIC filed by Goodrich Corporation. Lodged proposed order. (lw)
February 29, 2012 Filing 1321 DECLARATION of Jeremy S. Ochsenbein in support of Joint MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's and Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.'s Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER]Joint MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's and Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.'s Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER]Joint MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's and Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.'s Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER]Joint MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's and Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.'s Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER]Joint MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's and Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.'s Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER]Joint MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's and Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.'s Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER]Joint MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's and Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.'s Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER]Joint MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's and Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.'s Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER]Joint MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's and Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.'s Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER]Joint MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's and Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.'s Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER]Joint MOTION for Sanctions Goodrich Corporation's and Pyro Spectaculars, Inc.'s Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against the United States [DISCOVERY MATTER REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] #1235 [DISCOVERY MATTER; REFERRED TO THE SPECIAL MASTER] filed by Defendant Goodrich