Integrated Financial Associates Inc v. Marshall Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Integrated Financial Associates Inc
Defendant: Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc, Nara Bank National Association, MB-Bona LLC, First Private Bank & Trust, Marshall Bank NA, Gold Security Bank, Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, Statewide Reconveyance Group Inc a California corporation doing business as Statewide Foreclosure Services, Randall Blanchard, Marshall Financial Group LLC, Saigon National Bank, Community Business Bank and Does 1 through 100 inclusive
Cross Defendant: Statewide Reconveyance Group Inc a California corporation doing business as Statewide Foreclosure Services, a California Corporation, All Persons Unknown, Golden Security Bank and Roes
Case Number: 5:2010cv00209
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Oswald Parada
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 13-56774. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. Order received in this district on 5/2/14. (mat)
October 11, 2013 Filing 325 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 13-56774, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #324 as to Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (car)
October 1, 2013 Filing 324 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. Appeal of Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #322 , Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,, #235 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,,,,,, #276 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-12779137 paid.) (Waldron, Gary)
April 29, 2013 Filing 323 Receipt of remand letter from Superior Court of California, Riverside RIC 532644 (twdb)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Granting #296 Motion to Remand Case to State Court. Case Remanded to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside RIC532644. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (Attachments: #1 TRANSMITTAL) (Mailed certified copy of this order and public docket to Riverside Superior Court 4/18/13.) (rla) Modified on 4/18/2013 (rla).
April 18, 2013 Filing 321 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings re Transcript #320 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Paddock, Denise) TEXT ONLY ENTRYTranscripts 5:10-cv-00209-AG-OP Integrated Financial Associates Inc v. Marshall Bank NA et al (OPx),CONSOL,DISCOVERY,PROTORD,REOPENED UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT for the CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIANotice of Electronic Filing The following transaction was entered on 4/18/2013 at 10:59 AM PDT and filed on 4/18/2013 Case Name: Integrated Financial Associates Inc v. Marshall Bank NA et al Case Number: 5:10-cv-00209-AG-OP Filer: Document Number: 320 Docket Text: TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 022513 DCCD GUILFORD 10D INTEGRATED CT. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: DENISE PADDOCK, phone number WWW.OCRECORD.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/9/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2013. TO ORDER TRANSCRIPT: WWW.OFFICIALCOURTTRANSCRIPTS.COM(Paddock, Denise) 5:10-cv-00209-AG-OP Notice has been electronically mailed to: Alan J Kessel kessela@pepperlaw.com, judinn@pepperlaw.com Corbett H Williams cwilliams@waldronbragg.com, lgraham@waldronbragg.com Daniel M Hargis dhargis@seyfarth.com, jsnyder@seyfarth.com Daniel Rick Sable dsable@seyfarth.com Eric R McDonough emcdonough@seyfarth.com, jaguilera@seyfarth.com Gary A Waldron gwaldron@waldronbragg.com, jgonzales@waldronbragg.com, lgraham@waldronbragg.com Jacob C Gonzales jgonzales@waldronbragg.com Lauren Ann Deeb ldeeb@bakerlaw.com, kspake@bakerlaw.com Lawrence E Butler lbutler@seyfarth.com, krodrigues@seyfarth.com Paul B George georgep@lanepowell.com, beldingt@lanepowell.com, docketing-pdx@lanepowell.com, thomasl@lanepowell.com Robin M Cleary rcleary@seyfarth.com, jmcdermott@seyfarth.com 5:10-cv-00209-AG-OP Notice has been delivered by First Class U. S. Mail or by other means BY THE FILER to : Suzanne Burke Spencer Smith Ellison 7700 Irvine Center Drive Suite 200 Irvine, CA 92618The following document(s) are associated with this transaction:Document description:Main Document Original filename:C:\fakepath\022513 DCCD GUILFORD 10D INTEGRATED CT.pdfElectronic document Stamp:[STAMP cacdStamp_ID=1020290914 [Date=4/18/2013] [FileNumber=15468690-0] [503d984a5566d86187a272c07b1892434f518233279a8 9c75fb0e598a8ab74ac63395a454446c31427bbab951d2ce49775f83083abe2391e467b4dfb0f2dfc7e]]
April 18, 2013 Filing 320 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 022513 DCCD GUILFORD 10D INTEGRATED CT. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: DENISE PADDOCK, phone number WWW.OCRECORD.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/9/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2013. TO ORDER TRANSCRIPT: WWW.OFFICIALCOURTTRANSCRIPTS.COM(Paddock, Denise)
April 17, 2013 Filing 319 REPLY In Support Of First MOTION to Remand Case to RIVERSIDE SUPERIOR COURT #296 Defendant Randall Blanchard's Reply Brief In Support Of Remand filed by Defendant Randall Blanchard. (Waldron, Gary)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #306 Request to Substitute Attorney Alan J. Kessel. Attorney Lauren Ann Deeb terminated (twdb)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #290 Request to Substitute Attorney Alan J. Kessel. Attorney Lauren Ann Deeb terminated. (twdb)
April 16, 2013 Filing 315 TRIAL BRIEF MB-Bona LLC, MB-Bona LLC.. (George, Paul)
April 16, 2013 Filing 314 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS MB-Bona LLC, MB-Bona LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(George, Paul)
April 16, 2013 Filing 313 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT MB-Bona LLC, MB-Bona LLC. (George, Paul)
April 16, 2013 Filing 312 Proposed Special Interrogatory Form filed by Cross Defendant MB-Bona LLC, Defendant MB-Bona LLC re: Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law #311 (George, Paul)
April 16, 2013 Filing 311 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW MB-Bona LLC, MB-Bona LLC. (George, Paul)
April 16, 2013 Filing 310 DEFENDANT RANDALL BLANCHARD'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW filed by Defendant Randall Blanchard (Waldron, Gary)
April 16, 2013 Filing 309 TRIAL BRIEF filed by DEFENDANT Randall Blanchard.. (Waldron, Gary)
April 16, 2013 Filing 308 PROPOSED Special JURY VERDICT filed by Defendant Randall Blanchard. (Waldron, Gary)
April 16, 2013 Filing 307 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendant Randall Blanchard.. (Waldron, Gary)
April 16, 2013 Filing 306 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel, Pepper Hamilton, LLP in place of attorney Jason W. Glicksman, Baker & Hostetler, LLP filed by defendant and cross-defendant Saigon National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kessel, Alan)
April 16, 2013 Filing 305 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Cross Defendant MB-Bona LLC, Defendant MB-Bona LLC. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #304 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amended Declaration of Alan J. Kessel, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5)(Kessel, Alan)
April 15, 2013 Filing 304 Opposition Opposition re: First MOTION to Remand Case to RIVERSIDE SUPERIOR COURT #296 filed by Cross Defendant MB-Bona LLC, Defendant MB-Bona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Goldman, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #291 Request to Substitute Attorney for MB-Bona LLC. (twdb)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #288 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Lauren Ann Deeb terminated (twdb)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #289 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Lauren Ann Deeb terminated (twdb)
April 11, 2013 Filing 298 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Randall Blanchard, identifying Integrated Financial Associates, Inc.; Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC; Randall Blanchard; Federal Deposit Ins. Corporation as Receiver for Marshall Bank, N.A.; The Marshall Group, Inc.; Marshall BankFirst Corporation; Nara Bank National Association; Golden Security Bank; First Private Bank & Trust; Saigon National Bank; Community Business Bank; MB-Bona, LLC; Statewide Reconveyance Group, Inc.; Marshall Financial Group, LLC; and BankFirst. (Waldron, Gary)
April 11, 2013 Filing 297 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First MOTION to Remand Case to RIVERSIDE SUPERIOR COURT #296 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (db)
April 10, 2013 Filing 296 NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION to Remand Case to RIVERSIDE SUPERIOR COURT filed by DEFENDANT Randall Blanchard. (Waldron, Gary)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 303 CIVIL JURY SELECTION PROCEDURES AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: denying #268 Motion in Limine to Exclude; taking under advisement #270 Motion in Limine to Exclude; denying #271 Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting #272 Motion in Limine to Exclude; denying #273 Motion in Limine to Exclude; taking under advisement #275 Motion in Limine to Exclude (twdb)
April 8, 2013 Filing 318 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing and Pretrial Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Defendants motion for remand shall be filed by the close of business on April 10, 2013. taking under advisement #270 Motion in Limine to Exclude; taking under advisement #275 Motion in Limine to Exclude; See minute order for further information.Court Reporter: Denise Paddock. (twdb)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 299 FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER approved by Judge Andrew J. Guilford (twdb)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, RE STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: In accordance with the terms of the Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as receiver for Marshall Bank, N.A., and Defendant Randall Blanchard, by and through their attorneys of record, and good cause appearing therefor, the Court hereby orders the claims asserted by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as receiver for Marshall Bank in the above-captioned action dismissed without prejudice. (rla)
April 4, 2013 Filing 294 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Oswald Parada: This matter was referred to this Court for a settlement conference by District Judge Andrew J. Guilford. After three and one-half hours of settlement discussions between the parties, no settlement could be reached. No settlement having reached, this matter is referred to District Judge Guilford for all further proceedings. Court Recorder: CS RS #3: 04-04-12. (jh)
April 3, 2013 Filing 293 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents), #287 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (db)
April 2, 2013 Filing 292 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Alan J Kessel counsel for Cross Defendant Nara Bank National Association, Defendant Nara Bank National Association. Changing address and firm name to Pepper Hamilton, LLP, 4 Park Plaza, Suite 1200, Irvine, CA 92614. Changing email and fax number to kessela@pepperlaw 949.863.0151. Filed by plaintiff, defendants and cross-defendants Nara Bank National Association, Golden Security Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Saigon National Bank, Community Business Bank, and MB-Bona, LLC (Kessel, Alan)
April 2, 2013 Filing 291 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Alan J. Kessel filed by plaintiff, defendant and cross-defendant MB-Bona LLC, MB-Bona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kessel, Alan)
April 2, 2013 Filing 290 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Alan J. Kessel filed by defendant and cross-defendant First Private Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kessel, Alan)
April 2, 2013 Filing 289 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Alan J. Kessel filed by defendant and cross-defendant Community Business Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kessel, Alan)
April 2, 2013 Filing 288 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Alan J. Kessel filed by defendant and cross-defendant Nara Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kessel, Alan)
April 1, 2013 Filing 287 OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #279 , Declaration (Motion related),,,, #286 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #282 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #280 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #284 , Declaration (Motion related),,,, #285 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #283 , Non-Opposition to Motion, #281 Proof of Service served on 4-01-2013. (Waldron, Gary)
April 1, 2013 Filing 286 DECLARATION of Jacob C. Gonzales In Opposition to Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude EVIDENCE REGARDING NON-MARSHALL BANK ENTITIES #268 , Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Riverside Superior Court's Denial of Marshall Bank's Prejudgment Writ of Attachment Application #272 , Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT THAT STEARNS BANK AND SECURITY STATE BANK WERE "WAREHOUSE LENDERS" AND NOT PARTICIPANTS IN THE MARSHALL BANK LOAN #273 , Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude EVIDENCE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S ALLEGED DAMAGES AS OFFSET TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS #275 , Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Federal Reserve Bank's Examination of Bankfirst and Consent Decree #270 , Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Marshall Bank's Lending Limits and the FDIC's Receivership of Marshall Bank #271 Declaration of Jacob C. Gonzales in Support of Defendant Randall Blanchard's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions in LImine Nos. 1 through 6 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
April 1, 2013 Filing 285 DECLARATION of Randall Blanchard In Opposition to Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude EVIDENCE REGARDING NON-MARSHALL BANK ENTITIES #268 , Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Riverside Superior Court's Denial of Marshall Bank's Prejudgment Writ of Attachment Application #272 , Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT THAT STEARNS BANK AND SECURITY STATE BANK WERE "WAREHOUSE LENDERS" AND NOT PARTICIPANTS IN THE MARSHALL BANK LOAN #273 , Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude EVIDENCE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S ALLEGED DAMAGES AS OFFSET TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS #275 , Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Federal Reserve Bank's Examination of Bankfirst and Consent Decree #270 , Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Marshall Bank's Lending Limits and the FDIC's Receivership of Marshall Bank #271 Declaration of Defendant Randall Blanchard In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine Nos. 1 through 6 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
April 1, 2013 Filing 284 Opposition In Opposition to re: Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude EVIDENCE REGARDING NON-MARSHALL BANK ENTITIES #268 Defendant Randall Blanchard's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 6 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
April 1, 2013 Filing 283 Opposition In Opposition to re: Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude EVIDENCE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S ALLEGED DAMAGES AS OFFSET TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS #275 Defendant Randall Blanchard's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
April 1, 2013 Filing 282 Opposition In Opposition to re: Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT THAT STEARNS BANK AND SECURITY STATE BANK WERE "WAREHOUSE LENDERS" AND NOT PARTICIPANTS IN THE MARSHALL BANK LOAN #273 Defendant Randall Blanchard's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
April 1, 2013 Filing 281 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Riverside Superior Court's Denial of Marshall Bank's Prejudgment Writ of Attachment Application #272 Defendant Randall Blanchard's Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
April 1, 2013 Filing 280 Opposition In Opposition to re: Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Marshall Bank's Lending Limits and the FDIC's Receivership of Marshall Bank #271 Defendant Randall Blanchard's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 2 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
April 1, 2013 Filing 279 Opposition In Opposition to re: Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Federal Reserve Bank's Examination of Bankfirst and Consent Decree #270 Defendant Randall Blanchard's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
March 28, 2013 Filing 278 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Cross Defendant MB-Bona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Final Pretrial Conference Order)(Kessel, Alan)
March 28, 2013 Filing 277 Revised Joint Exhibit List filed by Co-Plaintiff MB-Bona LLC.. (Kessel, Alan)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT: Three groups of Cross-Defendants have filed motions to dismiss the Second Amended Cross-Complaint (SAXC) of Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC (Twelve Oaks). One Motion to Dismiss (MB-Bona MTD) was filed by MB-Bona. A second Motion to Dismiss (Marshall MTD) was filed by The Marshall Group, Inc., Marshall Financial Group, LLC, and Marshall BankFirst Corporation (collectively, Marshall Defendants). A third Motion to Dismiss (PBD MTD) was filed by the Participant Banks Defendants (Participant Banks). The Court GRANTS the Motions. The Court DISMISSES Twelve Oaks' SAXC without leave to amend. (rla)
March 25, 2013 Filing 275 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude EVIDENCE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S ALLEGED DAMAGES AS OFFSET TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS filed by Co-Plaintiff MB-Bona LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/23/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.(Kessel, Alan)
March 25, 2013 Filing 274 DECLARATION of Alan J. Kessel IN SUPPORT OF Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Riverside Superior Court's Denial of Marshall Bank's Prejudgment Writ of Attachment Application #272 , Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT THAT STEARNS BANK AND SECURITY STATE BANK WERE "WAREHOUSE LENDERS" AND NOT PARTICIPANTS IN THE MARSHALL BANK LOAN #273 , Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Federal Reserve Bank's Examination of Bankfirst and Consent Decree #270 , Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Marshall Bank's Lending Limits and the FDIC's Receivership of Marshall Bank #271 filed by Cross Defendant MB-Bona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F-J, #3 Exhibit K-M)(Kessel, Alan)
March 25, 2013 Filing 273 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT THAT STEARNS BANK AND SECURITY STATE BANK WERE "WAREHOUSE LENDERS" AND NOT PARTICIPANTS IN THE MARSHALL BANK LOAN filed by Co-Plaintiff MB-Bona LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/23/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.(Kessel, Alan)
March 25, 2013 Filing 272 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Riverside Superior Court's Denial of Marshall Bank's Prejudgment Writ of Attachment Application filed by Co-Plaintiff MB-Bona LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/23/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.(Kessel, Alan)
March 25, 2013 Filing 271 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Marshall Bank's Lending Limits and the FDIC's Receivership of Marshall Bank filed by Co-Plaintiff MB-Bona LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/23/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.(Kessel, Alan)
March 25, 2013 Filing 270 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Federal Reserve Bank's Examination of Bankfirst and Consent Decree filed by Co-Plaintiff MB-Bona LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/23/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.(Kessel, Alan)
March 25, 2013 Filing 269 DECLARATION of Paul B. George In Support of Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude EVIDENCE REGARDING NON-MARSHALL BANK ENTITIES #268 filed by Cross Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Cleary, Robin)
March 25, 2013 Filing 268 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude EVIDENCE REGARDING NON-MARSHALL BANK ENTITIES filed by Plaintiff MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA. Motion set for hearing on 4/23/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.(Cleary, Robin)
March 18, 2013 Filing 267 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Cross-Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Golden Security Bank, MB-Bona LLC, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Kessel, Alan)
March 18, 2013 Filing 266 Witness List filed by Cross-Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Golden Security Bank, MB-Bona LLC, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank.. (Kessel, Alan)
March 18, 2013 Filing 265 Joint Exhibit List filed by Cross-Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Golden Security Bank, MB-Bona LLC, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank.. (Kessel, Alan)
March 18, 2013 Filing 264 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Oswald Parada, re Stipulation to Continue the Settlement Conference from March 7 to April 4, 2013, at 9:30 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Oswald Parada, located in Courtroom 3, U.S. District Court, Eastern District at Riveside, CA. See Stipulation by parties, ECF #261 (jh)
February 27, 2013 Filing 261 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Settlement Conference from March 7, 2013 to April 4, 2013 filed by Cross-Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Golden Security Bank, MB-Bona LLC, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kessel, Alan)
February 25, 2013 Filing 263 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: 1) CROSS-DEFENDANTS THE MARSHALL GROUP, INC, MARSHALL BANKFIRST CORPORATION, AND MARSHALL FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE STRIKE, TWELVE OAKS PARTNERS, LLC'S SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (DKT #242); 2) CROSS-DEFENDANT MB-BONA, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS TWELVE OAKS PARTNERS, LLC'S SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (DKT #243); 3) PARTICIPANT BANKS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT(DKT #244): Matter is argued and taken under submission. Court Reporter: Not Present. (rla)
February 11, 2013 Filing 260 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's Second Amended Cross-Complaint #243 filed by Cross Defendant MB-Bona LLC. (Kessel, Alan)
February 11, 2013 Filing 259 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Cross-Complaint #244 , MOTION to Dismiss Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's Second Amended Cross-Complaint #243 Response to Twelve Oaks' Objections to Request for Judicial Notice filed by Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, MB-Bona LLC, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Kessel, Alan)
February 11, 2013 Filing 258 REPLY In Support of MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Cross-Complaint #244 filed by Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Kessel, Alan)
February 11, 2013 Filing 257 REPLY MOTION to Dismiss Case #242 or, in the alternative, Strike Twelve Oaks Partnes' Second Am. Cross-Complaint filed by Cross Defendants Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, Defendants Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC. (Cleary, Robin)
February 4, 2013 Filing 256 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's Second Amended Cross-Complaint #243 Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to Cross-Defendant MB-Bona's Motion to Dismiss The Second Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
February 4, 2013 Filing 255 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case #242 Request for Judicial Notice In Support Of Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to Cross-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss The Second Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
February 4, 2013 Filing 254 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case #242 Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to Cross-Defendants The Marshall Group, Inc.'s Marshall BankfFirst Corporation's & Marshall Financial Group, LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
February 4, 2013 Filing 253 Objection In Support Of re: MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Cross-Complaint #244 Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Evidentiary Objections to Request for Judicial Notice In Support Of Cross-Defendants Participant Banks and MB-Bona's Concurrently Filed Rule 12(b)(6) Motions to Dismiss the SACC filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
February 4, 2013 Filing 252 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Cross-Complaint #244 Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to Cross-Defendants Participant Banks' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss The Second Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
February 1, 2013 Filing 251 NOTICE of Interested Parties Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Cross-Defendants Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. (Hargis, Daniel)
January 31, 2013 Filing 250 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Cross-Defendant Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, (Kessel, Alan)
January 31, 2013 Filing 249 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Cross-Defendant MB-Bona LLC, (Kessel, Alan)
January 25, 2013 Filing 248 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Gary A Waldron counsel for Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. Filed by Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC (Waldron, Gary)
January 24, 2013 Filing 247 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #241 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Change of Attorney Information G-06. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
January 24, 2013 Filing 246 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Cross-Complaint #244 , MOTION to Dismiss Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's Second Amended Cross-Complaint #243 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #242 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (db)
January 23, 2013 Filing 245 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Cross-Complaint #244 , MOTION to Dismiss Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's Second Amended Cross-Complaint #243 filed by Cross-Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, MB-Bona LLC, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Kessel, Alan)
January 23, 2013 Filing 244 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross-Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. Motion set for hearing on 2/25/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Kessel, Alan)
January 23, 2013 Filing 243 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's Second Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross-Defendant MB-Bona LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/25/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Kessel, Alan)
January 23, 2013 Filing 242 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Cross-Defendants Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. Motion set for hearing on 2/25/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Eric McDonough, #3 Proposed Order)(Hargis, Daniel)
January 23, 2013 Filing 241 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION filed by Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Oswald Parada. Settlement Conference set for 3/7/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Oswald Parada. (adu)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER to Joint Stipulation to Respond to Second Amended Cross-Complaint by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Upon the Joint Stipulation to Respond to Second Amended Cross-Complaint #236 filed by the parties on December 12, 2012, the Court hereby orders the following: 1. Twelve Oaks' Second Amended Cross-Complaint shall be filed by December 13, 2012, pursuant to the Court's November 13, 2012 Order; 2. The respective responses of the Bank Cross-Defendants, MB-Bona, and the Marshall Entities to Twelve Oaks' Second Amended Cross- Complaint shall be filed on January 23, 2013, with the L.R. 7-1 meet and confer conference for any motions to be filed in response to the Second Amended Cross-Complaint to occur on or before January 14, 2013; 3. Twelve Oaks' oppositions to any motions filed in response to the Second Amended Cross-Complaint shall be filed on or before February 4, 2013; and 4. Any reply briefs in support of any motions filed in response to Twelve Oaks' Second Amended Cross-Complaint shall be filed on or before February 11, 2013, for hearing on such motions on February 25, 2013. Nothing in this order changes the trial date in this matter or any other related deadlines. (dro)
December 13, 2012 Filing 239 SECOND AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM against cross-defendants Integrated Financial Associates Inc, Marshall Financial Group LLC, First Private Bank & Trust, Community Business Bank, Saigon National Bank, MB-Bona LLC, All Persons Unknown, Statewide Reconveyance Group Inc, Golden Security Bank amending Cross-claim, filed by Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners. LLC (dro)
December 13, 2012 Filing 237 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC of Twleve Oaks Partners LLC's Verified Second Amended Cross-Complaint. (Waldron, Gary)
December 12, 2012 Filing 236 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Second Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross-Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, MB-Bona LLC, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kessel, Alan)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court GRANTS the Motions. See minute order for more information. granting #217 Motion to Dismiss ; granting #218 Motion to Dismiss ; granting #219 Motion to Dismiss ; granting #220 Motion to Strike and document is stricken. (twdb)
November 5, 2012 Filing 234 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: 1. CROSS-DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT [DKT #217]; 2. MOTION BY PARTICIPANT BANKS TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLIANT[DKT #218]; 3. CROSS-DEFENDANT MB-BONA, LLC TO DISMISS TWELVE OAKS PARTNERS, LLCS FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT [DKT #219]; 4. MOTION BY PARTICIPANT BANKS AND MB-BONA TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE DISMISS TWELVE OAKS' CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES [DKT #220]: Matter is argued and taken under submission. Court Reporter: Not Present. (rla)
October 22, 2012 Filing 233 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Cross-Complaint #218 , MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Cross-Complaint #219 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice filed by Cross-Defendant Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, MB-Bona LLC, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10-11)(Kessel, Alan)
October 22, 2012 Filing 232 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Cross-Complaint #218 , MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Cross-Complaint #219 Response to Twelve Oaks' Objections to Request for Judicial Notice filed by Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Defendant MB-Bona LLC. (Kessel, Alan)
October 22, 2012 Filing 231 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Strike Claims for Punitive Damages #220 filed by Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Defendant MB-Bona LLC. (Kessel, Alan)
October 22, 2012 Filing 230 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Cross-Complaint #219 filed by Defendant MB-Bona LLC. (Kessel, Alan)
October 22, 2012 Filing 229 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Cross-Complaint #218 filed by Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Kessel, Alan)
October 22, 2012 Filing 228 REPLY In Support of Motion to Dismiss Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's First Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Defendants Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, Cross Defendant Marshall Bankfirst Corporation. (Cleary, Robin)
October 15, 2012 Filing 227 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION to Strike Claims for Punitive Damages #220 Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to Cross-Defendants Participant Banks' and MB-Bona's Motion to Strike filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
October 15, 2012 Filing 226 Objection In Opposition to re: MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Cross-Complaint #219 Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Evidentiary Objections to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Cross-Defendants Participant Banks and MB-Bona's Concurrently Filed Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismss the FACC filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
October 15, 2012 Filing 225 Opposition In Opposition to re: MOTION to Dismiss Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's First Amended Cross-Complaint #217 Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to Cross-Defendants the Marshall Group, Inc.'s Marshall BankFirst Corporations's and Marshall Financial Group, LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
October 15, 2012 Filing 224 Opposition In Opposition to re: MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Cross-Complaint #218 Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to Cross-Defendants Participant Banks' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
October 15, 2012 Filing 223 Opposition In Opposition to re: MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Cross-Complaint #219 Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to Cross-Defendants MB-Bona's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
October 15, 2012 Filing 222 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. correcting Notice of Lodging #198 Notice of Errata to Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's First Amended Cross-Complaint (Attachments: #1 Verification)(Waldron, Gary)
October 5, 2012 Filing 221 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Cross-Complaint #218 , MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Cross-Complaint #219 filed by Cross-Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, MB-Bona LLC, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Kessel, Alan)
October 5, 2012 Filing 220 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Claims for Punitive Damages filed by Cross-Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, MB-Bona LLC, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Kessel, Alan)
October 5, 2012 Filing 219 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross-Defendant MB-Bona LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Kessel, Alan)
October 5, 2012 Filing 218 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross-Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Kessel, Alan)
October 5, 2012 Filing 217 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's First Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross-Defendants Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robin Cleary, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Cleary, Robin)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, granting Stipulation to Continue #215 . See order for more information. ( Jury Trial set for 4/23/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford., Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2012 08:30 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.) (twdb)
August 21, 2012 Filing 215 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date filed by Cross-Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Deeb, Lauren)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND MOTION TO CONTINUE: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Consolidate and Motion to Continue. No trial date has yet been set in the IFA Action. The Court VACATES all pending trial, pretrial, and discovery dates in the Marshall Action, and sets the new consolidated trial date for February 5, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. The discovery cut-off date will be November 5, 2012. The pre-trial conference will be January 28, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. (See document for further details.) All future filings in either action will use the IFA case number, EDCV 10-0209 AG (OPx). The IFA caption shall appear first, with the Marshall caption directly below it. Under the Marshall case number in the caption, the parties shall state (Consolidated with Case No. EDCV 10-0209 AG (OPx)). (rla)
July 9, 2012 Filing 213 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Court and counsel confer. Matters remain under submission. Court Reporter: Denise Paddock. (db)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #201 Request to Substitute Attorney Paul B. George for MB Bona, LLC crossdefendant. Eric McDonough terminated. (twdb)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #200 Request to Substitute Attorney Alan J. Kessel. Attorney Eric R McDonough terminated (twdb)
June 27, 2012 Filing 210 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of Attachment "A" to Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC and Defendant Randall Blanchard's Status Report Pursuant to Court's June 12, 2012 Order re Status Report #209 (Waldron, Gary)
June 25, 2012 Filing 209 STATUS REPORT Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC and Defendant Randall Blanchard's Status Report Pursuant to Court's June 12, 2012 Order filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: (See document for details.) The Court would like a brief update from the parties regarding the current status of the case. The Court is particularly interested in any items that might affect this Court's final ruling on the items under submission. Each party may submit an update no longer than 8 pages, due no later than June 25, 2012. In addition to the 8 pages, charts are welcome. The June 18, 2012 hearings on the two Motions for Leave [Docket #197 in case EDCV10-0209-AG(OPx) and DKT #173 IN CASE EDCV 10-0212-AG(OPx)] and the Status Conference are all CONTINUED until July 9, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. (rla) (rla)
June 6, 2012 Filing 205 STATUS REPORT JOINT REQUEST FOR A STATUS CONFERENCE ON JUNE 18, 2012 filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary) Modified on 6/7/2012 (db).
June 4, 2012 Filing 208 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing #194 held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford:Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Matter is argued. The Court orders that the tentative ruling shall become the order of the court. Motion DENIED. A separate order denying motion to issue. Court Reporter: Denise Paddock. (twdb)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: DENYING THE MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY THE MARSHALL GROUP, INC. AND MARSHALL BANKFIRST CORP. #194 : (See document for details.) The Court DENIES the Motion to Dismiss. (rla)
June 4, 2012 Filing 204 REPLY In Support of MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Cross-Complaint #197 Reply Brief In Support Of Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC'S Motion For Leave to File First Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
May 25, 2012 Filing 203 DECLARATION of Eric R. McDonough Opposition MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Cross-Complaint #197 filed by Defendants Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cleary, Robin)
May 25, 2012 Filing 202 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Cross-Complaint #197 filed by Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, MB-Bona LLC, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Nara Bank National Association, The Marshall Group Inc. (Cleary, Robin)
May 23, 2012 Filing 201 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Paul B. George in place of attorney Eric McDonough filed by Cross-Defendant MB-Bona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(George, Paul)
May 23, 2012 Filing 200 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Eric McDonough filed by Cross-Defendant MB-Bona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Kessel, Alan)
May 21, 2012 Filing 199 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's Verified Cross-Complaint For Failure To Exhaust Administrative Claims Process #194 filed by Defendants Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc, Cross Defendants Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (McDonough, Eric)
May 21, 2012 Filing 198 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC re MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Cross-Complaint #197 (Waldron, Gary)
May 21, 2012 Filing 197 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Waldron, Gary)
May 14, 2012 Filing 196 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Dismiss Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's Verified Cross-Complaint For Failure To Exhaust Administrative Claims Process #194 filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
May 10, 2012 Filing 195 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Dismiss Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's Verified Cross-Complaint For Failure To Exhaust Administrative Claims Process #194 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (db)
May 7, 2012 Filing 194 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's Verified Cross-Complaint For Failure To Exhaust Administrative Claims Process filed by Defendants and Cross-Defendants Marshall Financial Group LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/4/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Cleary, Robin)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Oswald Parada: THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THE ENTRY OF THE PROTECTIVE ORDER ON THE TERMS AND CONDITIONS PROVIDED FOR IN THE PARTIES STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. (am)
March 23, 2012 Filing 192 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Waldron, Gary)
March 23, 2012 Filing 191 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #190 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment. The correct event is: Discovery motion (protective order). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (twdb)
March 16, 2012 Filing 190 Stipulated Protective Order filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC (Waldron, Gary)
March 2, 2012 Filing 189 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 101711 DCCD GUILFORD 10D INTEGRATED G46 (Paddock, Denise)www.pacertranscripts.com
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Case previously closed in error. Make JS-5. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) (rla)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Case should have been closed on entry dated 12/14/11. re: Order Dismissing Case #186 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER DISMISSING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, Plaintiff has still failed to retain new counsel. The Court must therefore DISMISS Plaintiff's Second Amended Complain it its entirety, against all Defendants. (rla)
December 9, 2011 Filing 185 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 101711 DCCD GUILFORD 10D INTEGRATED G46 WWW.PACERTRANSCRIPTS.COM (Paddock, Denise)
December 6, 2011 Filing 184 NOTICE and Application for Judgment Dismissing Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint With Prejudice filed by Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Kessel, Alan)
December 2, 2011 Filing 183 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 101711 DCCD GUILFORD 10D INTEGRATED. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Denise Paddock, phone number transcripts@ocrecord.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER WWW.PACERTRANSCRIPTS.COM. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/23/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2012. (Paddock, Denise)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #179 Motion to Dismiss Case. The Court GRANTS Defendants Motion with leave to amend. IFA may file an Amended Complaint within 14 days of this Order. (twdb)
November 7, 2011 Filing 181 JOINDER in MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #179 filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc, Cross Defendants Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (McDonough, Eric)
October 24, 2011 Filing 180 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #179 filed by Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Kessel, Alan)
October 24, 2011 Filing 179 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Kessel, Alan)
October 17, 2011 Filing 178 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Court and counsel confer. Matter remains stayed.Court Reporter: Denise Paddock. (db)
October 15, 2011 Filing 177 STATUS REPORT and Disclosure of Loss of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to LR 16-2.1 filed by Cross Defendant Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Mahaffey, Douglas)
October 10, 2011 Filing 176 STATUS REPORT REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Kessel, Alan)
October 10, 2011 Filing 175 STATUS REPORT RE INTEGRATED FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES, INC. BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Kessel, Alan)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER VACATING PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The tentative ruling in this matter was prepared in January 2011. Counsel have requested that the tentative not issue. With the passage of time, the Court finds that a further hearing would likely behelpful before any ruling issues. Thus, the Court VACATES all pending motions in this cases pending further hearing. vacating #55 Motion to Consolidate Cases; vacating #61 Motion to Dismiss ; vacating #61 Motion to Dismiss Case ; vacating #64 Motion to Dismiss Case ; vacating #69 Motion to Dismiss ; vacating #71 Motion to Dismiss ; vacating #74 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; vacating #83 Motion for Leave to File. (twdb)
September 9, 2011 Filing 173 NOTICE to Counsel Re Court's [In Chambers] Order Re Bankruptcy Proceeding and Setting Status Conference filed by Defendants and Cross-Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Judge Guilford's Court Minute Order of September 2, 2011)(McDonough, Eric)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford re Bankruptcy Proceedings and Setting Status Conference. Status Conference set 10/17/2011 at 9:00 a.m. (See Order for further details) (db)
August 12, 2011 Filing 171 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 012411 DCCD GUILFORD 10D INTEGRATED G46 (Paddock, Denise)
June 27, 2011 Filing 170 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 012411 DCCD GUILFORD 10D INTEGRATED. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Denise Paddock, phone number transcripts@ocrecord.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER www.pacertranscripts.com. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/18/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2011. (Paddock, Denise)
May 19, 2011 Filing 169 OBJECTIONS to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #165 TWELVE OAKS PARTNERS LLC'S OBJECTIONS TO COURT'S JANUARY 24, 2011 TENTATIVE filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
May 19, 2011 Filing 168 RESPONSE filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc Regarding Pending Tentative and Request for Hearing in Light of Changed Circumstances (Cleary, Robin)
May 19, 2011 Filing 167 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 012411 DCCD GUILFORD 10D MARSHALL BANK G46 www.pacertranscripts.com (Paddock, Denise)
May 19, 2011 Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 012411 DCCD GUILFORD 10D MARSHALL BANK. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Denise Paddock, phone number transcripts@ocrecord.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. www.pacertranscripts.com Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/9/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2011. (Paddock, Denise)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Second Order Regarding Pending Tentative. A party has asked questions about this Courts April 15, 2011, Order. The Order stated that some parties and the Court want the Court to issue its 58-page tentative, which would make the tentative a final order of this Court. On January 24, 2011, a hearing was held on the issues in the tentative, but some time after that hearing, Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates, Inc. apparently filed bankruptcy in Nevada. With all this in mind, if any party has an objection to the issuance of the tentative as a final order, that party is ORDERED to file a document with the Court setting forth the basis for the objection by May 20, 2011. (twdb)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford Re Pending Tentative Order; Court prepared tentative order on multiple pending motions heard 01/24/11; Any party objecting to issuance of the tentative is ORDERED to file document setting forth the basis for objection by 05/20/11; (ln)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. If any party has an objection to the issuance of the tentative, that party is ordered to file a document with the Court setting forth the basis for the objection by 05/20/2011. (db)
April 13, 2011 Filing 162 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc, re Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, #159 By Personal Delivery served on 4/12/2011. (Spencer, Suzanne)
April 12, 2011 Filing 160 OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc, re Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, #159 By Mail served on 4/12/2011. (Spencer, Suzanne)
April 11, 2011 Filing 161 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: RE MOTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD [DKT #154]. A separate order granting motion to issue. Court Reporter: Denise Paddock. (rla)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #154 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, effective when Counsel files the proof of service described in this Order. If Plaintiff chooses to continue prosecuting this case, Plaintiff must obtain new counsel. The Court ORDERS Counsel to serve on Plaintiff this Order, especially the third page, which contains important information. Service shall be by hand delivery of a copy of this Order if possible, and if not possible, by mail. Counsel must file a proof of this service, which identifies the best address for Plaintiff, no later than May 16, 2011. (rla)
March 18, 2011 Filing 158 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings: Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Integrated Financial Associates, Inc. filed by Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Petition Cover Pages)(Spencer, Suzanne)
March 14, 2011 Filing 157 NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION of The Sall Law Firm to Withdraw as Attorney of Record #154 Continued Hearing Date filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. Motion set for hearing on 4/11/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Spencer, Suzanne)
March 14, 2011 Filing 156 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION of The Sall Law Firm to Withdraw as Attorney of Record #154 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (db)
March 11, 2011 Filing 155 DECLARATION of Robert K. Sall In Support of MOTION of The Sall Law Firm to Withdraw as Attorney of Record #154 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Spencer, Suzanne)
March 11, 2011 Filing 154 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of The Sall Law Firm to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. Motion set for hearing on 4/4/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Spencer, Suzanne)
February 4, 2011 Filing 153 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #152 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Dismissal. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (dg)
January 28, 2011 Filing 152 NOTICE filed by Defendant/Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a) or (c) (Waldron, Gary)
January 24, 2011 Filing 151 MINUTES OF t Motion Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guiford re 1. INTEGRATED FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES, INCS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES 2. DEFENDANTS THE MARSHALL GROUP, INC., MARSHALL FINANCIAL GROUP,LLC, MARSHALL BANKFIRST CORPORATION, AND MB-BONA, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [DKT #61] 3. THE PARTICIPANT BANK DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [DKT #69] 4. MARSHALL DEFENDANTS JOINDER IN MOTION TO DISMISS [DKT#68] 5. DEFENDANTS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS THE FDIC AS RECEIVER FOR MARSHALL BANK, N.A., MARSHALL GROUP, INC., MARSHALL BANKFIRST CORPORATION, AND MBBONA, LLC (COLLECTIVELY, CROSS-DEFENDANTS) MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY VERIFIED CROSS COMPLAINT [DKT #71] 6. DEFENDANTS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS FDIC, AS RECEIVER FOR MARSHALL BANK, N.A. MOTION TO DISMISS TWELVE OAKS PARTNERS, LLCS VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST ADMINISTRATIVE CLAIMS PROCESS [DKT #74] 7. PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO RECORD NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [DKT #83] 8. FDIC, AS RECEIVER FOR MARSHALL BANK, NAS MOTION TO DISMISS INTERGRATED FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES, INCS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [DKT #64] Matters are argued and taken under submission.Court Reporter: Denise Paddock. (db)
January 13, 2011 Filing 150 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Paul B George counsel for Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. Changing firm name to Lane Powell PC, 601 SW Second Ave., Suite 2100, Portland, OR 97204-3158. Changing email to georgep@lanepowell.com. Filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendant Nara Bank National Association, Golden Security Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Saigon National Bank and Community Business Bank (George, Paul)
January 10, 2011 Filing 149 REPLY Support MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #69 filed by Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Kessel, Alan)
January 10, 2011 Filing 148 JOINDER in MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #69 Joinder in FDIC's Objections to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Kessel, Alan)
January 10, 2011 Filing 147 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #69 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kessel, Alan)
January 10, 2011 Filing 146 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #69 to IFA's Objections to Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Kessel, Alan)
January 10, 2011 Filing 145 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case #64 (Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) filed by Cross Defendant Marshall Bank NA, Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Response to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Response to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Stephanie Lunde in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(McDonough, Eric)
January 10, 2011 Filing 144 Evidentiary Objections to Request for Judicial Notice In Support of re: MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 10, 2011 Filing 143 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Lawrence E. Butler In Support of re: MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 10, 2011 Filing 142 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Stephanie Lunde In Support of re: MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 10, 2011 Filing 141 DECLARATION of Suzanne Burke Spencer In Support of MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Spencer, Suzanne)
January 10, 2011 Filing 140 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2, Part 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Spencer, Suzanne)
January 10, 2011 Filing 139 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Verified Cross-Complaint #71 filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cleary, Robin)
January 10, 2011 Filing 138 REPLY In Support MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 10, 2011 Filing 137 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Verified Cross-Complaint #71 filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (Cleary, Robin)
January 10, 2011 Filing 136 Objection to Request for Judicial Notice re: MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Case #61 filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. (Cleary, Robin)
January 10, 2011 Filing 135 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Case #61 filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. (Cleary, Robin)
January 10, 2011 Filing 134 Response to Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Thomas Zilka re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Cleary, Robin)
January 10, 2011 Filing 133 Response to Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Visal Ong re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Cleary, Robin)
January 10, 2011 Filing 132 Response to Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Sherry Hunt re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Cleary, Robin)
January 10, 2011 Filing 131 Response to Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of George Howard re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Cleary, Robin)
January 10, 2011 Filing 130 Objections to Declaration of Shannon M. Hamada re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Cleary, Robin)
January 10, 2011 Filing 129 Objections to Declaration of Jacob C. Gonzales re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Cleary, Robin)
January 10, 2011 Filing 128 DECLARATION of Lawrence E. Butler in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Exhibit 4-7)(Cleary, Robin)
January 10, 2011 Filing 127 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Reply for Motion to Dismiss Cross-Complaint for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Claims Process filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cleary, Robin)
January 10, 2011 Filing 126 REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Cleary, Robin)
January 10, 2011 Filing 125 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in Support of Joint Reply to Oppositions re: Renewed MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-0212, #55 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 10, 2011 Filing 124 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Renewed MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-0212, #55 in Support of Plaintiff's Joint Reply filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J)(Spencer, Suzanne)
January 10, 2011 Filing 123 DECLARATION of Suzanne Burke Spencer in Support of Joint Reply to Oppositions to Renewed MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-0212, #55 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Spencer, Suzanne)
January 10, 2011 Filing 122 DECLARATION of Jacob C. Gonzales in Support of Joint Reply to Oppositions to Renewed MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-0212, #55 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 10, 2011 Filing 121 REPLY (Joint) to Defendants' Oppositions to Renewed MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-0212, #55 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 4, 2011 Filing 120 Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Thomas Zilka In Support of Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion Oppositon to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
January 4, 2011 Filing 119 DECLARATION of Stephanie Lunde in opposition to MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3-5)(Cleary, Robin)
January 4, 2011 Filing 118 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. correcting Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #100 to Declaration of Stephanie Lunde in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Record Notice of Pendency of Action (Cleary, Robin)
January 3, 2011 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case #64 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 3, 2011 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #69 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 3, 2011 Filing 115 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Renewed MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-0212, #55 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates, LLC's Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendants and Cross-Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(McDonough, Eric)
January 3, 2011 Filing 114 DECLARATION of Randall Blanchard Declaration of Randall Blanchard In Support of Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
January 3, 2011 Filing 113 DECLARATION of Eric R. McDonough In Opposition to Renewed MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-0212, #55 Declaration of Eric R. McDonough In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates, LLC's Motion to Consolidate filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc, Cross Defendants Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(McDonough, Eric)
January 3, 2011 Filing 112 Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Sherry Hunt In Support of Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion In Opposition to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
January 3, 2011 Filing 111 Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Visal Ong In Support of Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion In Opposition to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
January 3, 2011 Filing 110 Opposition of Defendants and Cross-Defendants FDIC As Receiver for Marshall Bank, N.A.; The Marshall Group, Inc.; Marshall Bankfirst Corporation; MB-Bona LLC; and Marshall Financial Group, LLC to Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates, Inc.'s Motion for Order Consolidating Cases re: Renewed MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-0212, #55 filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc, Cross Defendants Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (McDonough, Eric)
January 3, 2011 Filing 109 Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of George Howard In Support of Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion In Opposition to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
January 3, 2011 Filing 108 Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of George Howard In Support of Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion Oppositon to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
January 3, 2011 Filing 107 DECLARATION of Shannon M. Hamada Declaration of Shannon M. Hamada In Support of Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
January 3, 2011 Filing 106 DECLARATION of Jacob C. Gonzales In Support of Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
January 3, 2011 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 Memorandum in Support of Twelve Oaks Partners LLC's Opposition to FDIC Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
January 3, 2011 Filing 104 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC's In Support of its Opposition to FDIC-Receiver's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion re MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10 (1-92), #2 Exhibit 10 (93-192), #3 Exhibit 10 (193-276); Exh. 16, #4 Exhibit 17 (1-62), #5 Exhibit 17 (63-156), #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 19 - Exh. 26, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28 (1-88), #10 Exhibit 28 (89-176), #11 Exhibit 29 - Exh 36, #12 Exhibit 37 - Exh 46)(Waldron, Gary)
January 3, 2011 Filing 103 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 Objection to Declaration of William Dyer filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc, Cross Defendants Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (Cleary, Robin)
January 3, 2011 Filing 102 Objection Opposition re: MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 Objections to Declaration of Suzanne Burke Spencer filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc, Cross Defendants Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (Cleary, Robin)
January 3, 2011 Filing 101 Objection Opposition to re: MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 Objection to Declaration of Randall W. Blanchard filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc, Cross Defendants Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (Cleary, Robin)
January 3, 2011 Filing 100 DECLARATION of Stephanie Lunde in Opposition to MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc, Cross Defendants Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3-5)(Cleary, Robin)
January 3, 2011 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Lawrence E. Butler in Opposition to MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc, Cross Defendants Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8-13)(Cleary, Robin)
January 3, 2011 Filing 98 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ISO Opposition to Motion for Leave to Record Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Defendants and Cross-Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Pgs 1-50, #2 Exhibit 1, Pgs 51-100, #3 Exhibit 1, Pgs 101-150, #4 Exhibit 1, Pgs 151-182, #5 Exhibit 2-5)(Cleary, Robin)
January 3, 2011 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Record Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc, Cross Defendants Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (Cleary, Robin)
January 3, 2011 Filing 96 Evidentiary Objections to Request for Judicial Notice In Opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #69 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 3, 2011 Filing 95 Evidentiary Objections to Request for Judicial Notice In Opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss Case #64 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 3, 2011 Filing 94 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Stephanie Lunde In Opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss Case #64 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 3, 2011 Filing 93 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #69 , MOTION to Dismiss Case #64 , MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Case #61 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Spencer, Suzanne)
January 3, 2011 Filing 92 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Stephanie Lunde In Opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Case #61 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 3, 2011 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Case #61 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
January 3, 2011 Filing 90 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Verified Cross-Complaint #71 OPPOSITION TO FDIC-R'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT TWELVE OAKS PARNTERS LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (Waldron, Gary)
December 31, 2010 Filing 89 Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Consolidate Cases Opposition re: Renewed MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-0212, #55 filed by Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. (Kessel, Alan)
December 27, 2010 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
December 27, 2010 Filing 87 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Spencer, Suzanne)
December 27, 2010 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Randall Blanchard in Support of MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Spencer, Suzanne)
December 27, 2010 Filing 85 DECLARATION of William Dyer in Support of MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Spencer, Suzanne)
December 27, 2010 Filing 84 DECLARATION of Suzanne Burke Spencer in Support of MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action #83 filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Spencer, Suzanne)
December 27, 2010 Filing 83 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Record Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Spencer, Suzanne)
December 27, 2010 Filing 82 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction DECLARATION OF THOMAS ZIKLA #77 , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction DECLARATION OF HENRY HUNT #78 , MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial DECLARATION OF GEORGE HOWARD #76 , MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial DECLARATION OF LAWRENCE E. BUTLER #75 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Declaration. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (nca)
December 23, 2010 Filing 81 DECLARATION of VISAL ONG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Cleary, Robin)
December 23, 2010 Filing 80 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2)(Cleary, Robin)
December 22, 2010 Filing 79 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT #74 (Cleary, Robin)
December 22, 2010 Filing 78 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction DECLARATION OF HENRY HUNT filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Cleary, Robin)
December 22, 2010 Filing 77 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction DECLARATION OF THOMAS ZIKLA filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Cleary, Robin)
December 22, 2010 Filing 76 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial DECLARATION OF GEORGE HOWARD filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (1of2; pp. 1-50), #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 (2of2; pp. 51-88), #5 Exhibit Ex. 4)(Cleary, Robin)
December 22, 2010 Filing 75 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial DECLARATION OF LAWRENCE E. BUTLER filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (1of3; pp. 1-64), #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 (2of3; pp. 65-114), #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 (3of3; pp. 115-155), #4 Exhibit Ex. 2, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3 (1 of 2; pp. 1-58), #6 Exhibit Ex. 3 (2 of 2; pp. 59-121), #7 Exhibit Ex. 4, #8 Exhibit Ex. 5 (1of2; pp. 1-50), #9 Exhibit Ex. 5 (2of2; pp. 51-94), #10 Exhibit Ex. 6 (1of5; pp. 1-64), #11 Exhibit Ex. 6 (2of5; pp. 65-120), #12 Exhibit Ex. 6 (3of5; pp. 121-181), #13 Exhibit Ex. 6 (4of5; pp. 182-251), #14 Exhibit Ex. 6 (5of5; pp. 252-284), #15 Exhibit Ex. 7, #16 Exhibit Ex. 8)(Cleary, Robin)
December 22, 2010 Filing 74 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction TWELVE OAKS PARTNES' CROSS-COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Cleary, Robin)
December 22, 2010 Filing 73 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Granting re MOTION to Dismiss Verified Cross-Complaint #71 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cleary, Robin)
December 22, 2010 Filing 72 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Verified Cross-Complaint #71 filed by Defendants and Cross-Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Pages 1-25, #2 Exhibit 1, Pages 26-49, #3 Exhibit 1, Pages 50-74, #4 Exhibit 1, Pages 75-87, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, Pages 1-50, #8 Exhibit 4, Pages 51-100, #9 Exhibit 4, Pages 101-179)(Cleary, Robin)
December 22, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Verified Cross-Complaint filed by Defendants and Cross-Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Cleary, Robin)
December 15, 2010 Filing 70 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #69 filed by Cross Defendant Nara Bank National Association, Defendant Nara Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C)(Kessel, Alan)
December 15, 2010 Filing 69 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Nara Bank National Association. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Kessel, Alan)
December 15, 2010 Filing 68 JOINDER in MOTION to Dismiss Case #64 filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. (Cleary, Robin)
December 15, 2010 Filing 67 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case #64 filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cleary, Robin)
December 15, 2010 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Stephanie Lunde in support of MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Case #61 filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Cleary, Robin)
December 15, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Cleary, Robin)
December 15, 2010 Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cleary, Robin)
December 15, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order Granting re MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Case #61 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cleary, Robin)
December 15, 2010 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Stephanie Lunde in support of MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Case #61 filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cleary, Robin)
December 15, 2010 Filing 61 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Cleary, Robin)
December 1, 2010 Filing 60 ANSWER to Crossclaim, of Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Integrated Financial Associates Inc.(Spencer, Suzanne)
December 1, 2010 Filing 59 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc, upon Defendant Marshall Financial Group LLC served on 11/19/2010, answer due 12/10/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon National Registered Agents, Inc., authorized agent for service of process on Marshall Financial Group, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Sall, Robert)
November 17, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re second Amended Complaint #58 as to defendants Community Business Bank, Does, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Statewide Reconveyance Group Inc, The Marshall Group Inc, Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. (twdb)
November 17, 2010 Filing 58 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Community Business Bank, Does, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Statewide Reconveyance Group Inc, The Marshall Group Inc, Twelve Oaks Partners LLC #1 ,filed by plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 part 5, #5 part 6)(twdb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2010: #6 summons) (twdb).
November 15, 2010 Filing 57 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Court and counsel confer. The Court orders the stay lifted in this matter. All preliminary motions shall be noticed for hearing on January 24, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's motion to consolidate set for December 13, 2010 is continued to January 24, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. The Court grants leave to re-file the Second Amended Complaint in Federal Court. All discovery motions shall be noticed for hearing before Judge Guilford. Discovery may commence. The deadlines and hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled: (Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.) Court Reporter: Denise Paddock. (wr)
November 12, 2010 Filing 56 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Renewed MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-0212, #55 filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Spencer, Suzanne)
November 12, 2010 Filing 55 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Renewed MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 10-0212, filed by Plaintff and Cross-Defendant Integrated Financial Associates Inc. Motion set for hearing on 12/13/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum (Supplemental) in Support of Motion to Consolidate Cases)(Spencer, Suzanne)
November 8, 2010 Filing 54 STATUS REPORT (Joint) filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Counsel Signatures)(Spencer, Suzanne)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford granting Request to Substitute Attorney #41 Alan J. Kessel as attorney of record for Defendant/Cross-Defendant Gold Security Bank, in place and stead of Manatt, Phelps & Philli9ps, LLP. Attorneys Carole E Reagan; Dean J Zipser and Kenneth B Julian terminated. (dro) Modified on 8/4/2010 (dro).
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford granting Request to Substitute Attorney #42 Alan J. Kessel in as attorney of recrod for Defendant/Cross-Defendant Community Business Bank. Attorneys Carole E Reagan; Dean J Zipser and Kenneth B Julian terminated. (dro) Modified on 8/4/2010 (dro).
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #40 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Dean J Zipser; Kenneth B Julian and Carole E Reagan terminated (db)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #39 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Dean J Zipser; Kenneth B Julian and Carole E Reagan terminated (db)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #38 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Dean J Zipser; Kenneth B Julian and Carole E Reagan terminated (db)
August 2, 2010 Filing 48 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #43 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #44 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #47 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #45 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #46 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rrp)
August 2, 2010 Filing 47 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant and cross-defendant Community Business Bank, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Dean J. Zipser #42 served on August 2, 2010. (Kessel, Alan)
August 2, 2010 Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant and cross-defendant Gold Security Bank, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Dean J. Zipser #41 served on August 2, 2010. (Kessel, Alan)
August 2, 2010 Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant and cross-defendant Saigon National Bank, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Dean J. Zipser #40 served on August 2, 2010. (Kessel, Alan)
August 2, 2010 Filing 44 OF SERVICE filed by defendant and cross-defendant First Private Bank & Trust, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Dean J. Zipser #39 served on August 2, 2010. (Kessel, Alan)
August 2, 2010 Filing 43 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant and cross-defendant Nara Bank National Association, re REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Dean J. Zipser #38 served on August 2, 2010. (Kessel, Alan)
August 2, 2010 Filing 42 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Dean J. Zipser filed by defendant and cross-defendant Community Business Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Kessel, Alan)
August 2, 2010 Filing 41 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Dean J. Zipser filed by defendant and cross-defendant Gold Security Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Kessel, Alan)
August 2, 2010 Filing 40 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Dean J. Zipser filed by defendant and cross-defendant Saigon National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Kessel, Alan)
August 2, 2010 Filing 39 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Dean J. Zipser filed by defendant and cross-defendant First Private Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Kessel, Alan)
August 2, 2010 Filing 38 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alan J. Kessel in place of attorney Dean J. Zipser filed by defendant and cross-defendant Nara Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Kessel, Alan)
July 19, 2010 Filing 37 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) #36 . The following error(s) was found: Docket text does not match text of filed document. Docket text states Notice of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Joseph Luis Chairez. Filed text has notice of change of information for attorney Alan Kessel. Attorney Joseph Luiz Chairez does not appear on case docket. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (vh)
July 16, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Joseph Luis Chairez counsel for Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. Changing firm nam to Baker & Hostetler LLP. Changing email to akessel@bakerlaw.com. Filed by Defendants/Cross-Defendants Nara Bank National Association, Golden Security Bank ("Gold Security Bank"), First Private Bank & Trust, Saigon National Bank, Community Business Bank (Chairez, Joseph)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ENTERING STAY by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, re Stipulation to Stay Case #32 : IT IS ORDERED that the action, including any cross-claims, is stayed through the earlier of: 1) 180 days after IFA, Twelve Oaks and/or Participant Banks submit their respective administrative claims to FDIC-Receiver or 2) 10 days after FDIC-Receiver serves Notice of the disposition of IFA, Twelve Oaks and/or Participant Banks respective Claims. Scheduling Conference is vacated. The parties shall appear for a status conference on November 15, 2010. The parties shall file a joint status report by November 8, 2010. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rla)
May 11, 2010 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Carole E Reagan counsel for Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. Filed by defendant and cross-defendant Nara Bank National Association; Gold Security Bank; First Private Bank & Trust; Saigon National Bank; and Community Business Bank (Reagan, Carole)
May 11, 2010 Filing 33 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Dean J Zipser counsel for Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. Filed by Defendants and Cross-Defendants Nara Bank National Association; Gold Security Bank; First Private Bank & Trust; Saigon National Bank; and Community Business Bank (Zipser, Dean)
May 5, 2010 Filing 32 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Exhaustion of Mandatory Administrative Claims Process filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cleary, Robin)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ENTERING MANDATORY STAY by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: GRANTING #30 Request to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to 12 U.S.C. Section 1819(d)(12), the action, including any cross-claims, is stayed for an additional 30 days to April 29, 2010. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference, previously set for April 19, 2010, is continued to May 24, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. (rla)
March 24, 2010 Filing 30 Second REQUEST to Stay Case for Additional 30-Day Mandatory Stay filed by Defendant and Cross-Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 5, #2 Proposed Order Entering Mandatory Stay)(McDonough, Eric)
March 2, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Paul B George counsel for Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. Adding Paul B. George as attorney as counsel of record for Defendant/Cross-Defendants: Nara Bank National Association, Golden Security Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Saigon National Bank, Community Business Bank for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendants Nara Bank National Association, Golden Security Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Saigon National Bank, Community Business Bank (George, Paul)
March 2, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Paul B. George on behalf of Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. Filed by Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank, Cross Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank (George, Paul)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ENTERING MANDATORY STAY by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: GRANTING Request to Stay Case #8 . IT IS ORDERED that the action, including any cross-claims, is stayed for a period of sixty days to March 30, 2010. (rla)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re Early Meeting of Parties and Scheduling Conference by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (ade)
February 23, 2010 Filing 25 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s) #14 , Notice of Related Case(s) #13 filed by Defendants MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc, Cross Defendants Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, The Marshall Group Inc. (McDonough, Eric)
February 22, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kenneth B Julian counsel for Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. Adding Alan J. Kessel as attorney as counsel of record for Nara Bank National Association, Golden Security Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Saigon National Bank, Community Business Bank for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Nara Bank National Association, Golden Security Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Saigon National Bank, Community Business Bank (Julian, Kenneth)
February 22, 2010 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Kenneth B Julian counsel for Defendants Community Business Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Gold Security Bank, Nara Bank National Association, Saigon National Bank. Adding Kenneth B. Julian as attorney as counsel of record for Nara Bank National Association, Golden Security Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Saigon National Bank, Community Business Bank for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Nara Bank National Association, Golden Security Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Saigon National Bank, Community Business Bank (Julian, Kenneth)
February 19, 2010 Filing 22 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant/Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC.. (Waldron, Gary)
February 18, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #17 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Jury Demand. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rrp)
February 18, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE of Compliance With 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(B) filed by Defendants and Cross-Defendants FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, as receiver for MARSHALL BANK. N.A. MB-Bona LLC, Marshall Bank NA, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Marshall Financial Group LLC, The Marshall Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(B))(McDonough, Eric)
February 17, 2010 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Gary A Waldron counsel for Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. Adding Jacob C. Gonzales as attorney as counsel of record for Defendant/Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant/Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC (Waldron, Gary)
February 17, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Gary A Waldron counsel for Defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC, Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. Adding Gary A. Waldron as attorney as counsel of record for Defendant/Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant/Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners, LLC (Waldron, Gary)
February 16, 2010 Filing 17 Demand for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Integrated Financial Associates Inc (Spencer, Suzanne)
February 16, 2010 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Integrated Financial Associates Inc, re Notice of Related Case(s) #14 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #15 served on 2/13/10. (Spencer, Suzanne)
February 12, 2010 Filing 15 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Integrated Financial Associates Inc, (Spencer, Suzanne)
February 12, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Integrated Financial Associates Inc. Related Case(s): 5:10-cv-0212-GW-OP (Spencer, Suzanne)
February 12, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Cross-Complainant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC. Related Case(s): 5:10-cv-00212 (Waldron, Gary)
February 12, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. Pursuant to the procedure adopted by the Court, the above entitled case has been returned to the Clerk for random reassignment. This case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. Case number will now read EDCV10-00209 AG (OPx). (am)
February 10, 2010 COPY OF ANSWER to filed in Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC 532644. Exhibit of Notice of Removal, #1 filed by defendants Nara Bank National Association, Gold Security Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Saigon National Bank, Community Business Bank.(am)
February 10, 2010 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed in Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC 532644. Exhibit of Notice of Removal, #1 filed by defendant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC.(am)
February 10, 2010 COPY OF CROSSCLAIM against Cross defendants All Persons Unknown, Roes, The Marshall Group Inc, Marshall Bankfirst Corporation, Nara Bank National Association, Gold Security Bank, First Private Bank & Trust, Saigon National Bank, Community Business Bank, Statewide Reconveyance Group Inc, Integrated Financial Associates Inc, Marshall Bank NA filed in Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC 532644, filed by Cross Claimant Twelve Oaks Partners LLC.(am)
February 10, 2010 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Marshall Bank NA, re REQUEST to Mandatory Stay #8 served on 2/10/10. (am) (am).
February 10, 2010 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Marshall Bank NA, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #6 , Notice of Removal, #1 , Declaration (non-motion) #7 served on 2/10/10. (am) (am).
February 10, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Marshall Bank NA. Related Case(s): None (am) (am).
February 10, 2010 Filing 8 REQUEST to Mandatory Stay filed by defendant Marshall Bank NA. (am) (am).
February 10, 2010 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Eric R. McDonough in support of Notice of Removal, #1 filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (am) (am).
February 10, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Marshall Bank NA, (am) (am).
February 10, 2010 Filing 5 EXHIBIT 1 - VOLUME 5 OF 5 Filed filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. as to Notice of Removal, #1 . (am) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2010: #1 Exhibit Vol 5 of 5 Part 2, #2 Exhibit Vol 5 of 5 Part 3, #3 Exhibit Vol 5 of 5 Part 4, #4 Exhibit Vol 5 of 5 Part 5) (am).
February 10, 2010 Filing 4 EXHIBIT 1 - VOLUME 4 OF 5 Filed filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. as to Notice of Removal, #1 . (am) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2010: #1 Exhibit Vol 4 of 5 Part 2, #2 Exhibit Vol 4 of 5 Part 3, #3 Exhibit Vol 4 of 5 Part 4) (am).
February 10, 2010 Filing 3 EXHIBIT 1 - VOLUME 3 OF 5 Filed filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. (am) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2010: #1 Exhibit Vol 3 of 5 Part 2, #2 Exhibit Vol 3 of 5 Part 3, #3 Exhibit Vol 3 of 5 Part 4) (am).
February 10, 2010 Filing 2 EXHIBIT 1 - VOLUME 2 OF 5 Filed filed by Defendant Marshall Bank NA. as to Notice of Removal, #1 . (am) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2010: #1 Exhibit Vol 2 of 5 Part 2, #2 Vol 2 of 5 Part 3, #3 Exhibit Vol 2 of 5 Part 4) (am).
February 10, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC 532644 with copy of summons and complaint.Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Oswald Parada. (Filing fee $ 350 ), filed by defendant Marshall Bank NA.(am) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2010: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 3a, #4 Part 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2010: #6 CV18) (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integrated Financial Associates Inc v. Marshall Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Bankfirst Corporation
Represented By: Eric R McDonough
Represented By: Robin M Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Marshall Group Inc
Represented By: Eric R McDonough
Represented By: Robin M Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nara Bank National Association
Represented By: Lauren Ann Deeb
Represented By: Paul B George
Represented By: Carole E Reagan
Represented By: Dean J Zipser
Represented By: Kenneth B Julian
Represented By: Alan J Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MB-Bona LLC
Represented By: Eric R McDonough
Represented By: Paul B George
Represented By: Alan J Kessel
Represented By: Robin M Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Private Bank & Trust
Represented By: Lauren Ann Deeb
Represented By: Paul B George
Represented By: Carole E Reagan
Represented By: Dean J Zipser
Represented By: Kenneth B Julian
Represented By: Alan J Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Bank NA
Represented By: Eric R McDonough
Represented By: Daniel Rick Sable
Represented By: Daniel M Hargis
Represented By: Lawrence E Butler
Represented By: Robin M Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Security Bank
Represented By: Lauren Ann Deeb
Represented By: Paul B George
Represented By: Carole E Reagan
Represented By: Dean J Zipser
Represented By: Kenneth B Julian
Represented By: Alan J Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twelve Oaks Partners LLC
Represented By: Jacob C Gonzales
Represented By: Corbett H Williams
Represented By: Gary A Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statewide Reconveyance Group Inc a California corporation doing business as Statewide Foreclosure Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Blanchard
Represented By: Jacob C Gonzales
Represented By: Gary A Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Financial Group LLC
Represented By: Eric R McDonough
Represented By: Robin M Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saigon National Bank
Represented By: Lauren Ann Deeb
Represented By: Paul B George
Represented By: Carole E Reagan
Represented By: Dean J Zipser
Represented By: Kenneth B Julian
Represented By: Alan J Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Business Bank
Represented By: Lauren Ann Deeb
Represented By: Paul B George
Represented By: Carole E Reagan
Represented By: Dean J Zipser
Represented By: Kenneth B Julian
Represented By: Alan J Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Statewide Reconveyance Group Inc a California corporation doing business as Statewide Foreclosure Services, a California Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: All Persons Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Golden Security Bank
Represented By: Alan J Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrated Financial Associates Inc
Represented By: Suzanne Burke Spencer
Represented By: Brandon Niles Krueger
Represented By: Robert K Sall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?