February 20, 2014 |
Filing
60
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE COPYRIGHT VALIDITY by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court ORDERS Bentley to SHOW CAUSE in writing by Monday, March 3, 2014, why the Court should not invalidate Copyright Registration number PAu 3-628-749 for want of a fixed medium of expression. If Bentley has produced a motion picture, she shall lodge a copy with the Court by that date. (lc)
|
February 6, 2014 |
Filing
48
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE. LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II.The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing by Monday, February 10, 2014, why she has not moved for entry of default with the Clerk of Court. No hearing will be held.The Court also reminds Bentley that she must refile her default-judgment motions that the Court struck on February 4, 2014, to comply with the Courts January 27, 2014 Order to Show Cause. (See ECF Nos. 4347.) Bentley must notice a hearing date for the motions when she refiles them. See C.D. Cal. L.R. 6-1. (lc). Modified on 2/6/2014. (lc).
|
January 14, 2014 |
Filing
31
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE. LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:For the final time, the Court ORDERS Bentley to SHOW CAUSE by Friday, January 17, 2014, why the Court should not dismiss her case for lack of prosecution. No hearing will be held . The Court will discharge this Order only upon the filing of valid proofs of service on the remaining defendants and applications for entry of default with the Clerk where appropriate or a notice of voluntary dismissal. Failure to timely respond will result in dismissal of Bentleys case. (lc). Modified on 1/14/2014. (lc).
|
November 13, 2013 |
Filing
25
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO STAY ACTION 24 AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:The Court GRANTS the parties Request and consequently STAYS this case until further order by the Court. The Court also ORDERS the parties to SHOW CAUSE by Friday, December 13, 2013, why settlement has not been finalized in this case. No hearing will be held The Court will discharge this Order upon filing of a stipulated dismissal or proposed dismissal order. (lc)
|
October 22, 2013 |
Filing
21
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than October 25, 2013 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will co nsider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendants John David Ware and James Randall Argue OR Answer by the defendant(s). In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (cch)
|
October 10, 2013 |
Filing
19
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CASE RE LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution. The Court also ORDERS Bentley to submit a status report by Tuesday,November 12, 2013, demon strating good cause why she still has not served Ong and Bradshaw. If Bentley successfully serves either or both Defendants before that date,she shall file the appropriate proof of service immediately. Failure to timely respond will result in dismissal of Defendants Ong and Bradshaw from this action. (lc). Modified on 10/10/2013. (lc).
|
October 3, 2013 |
Filing
14
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE. LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE by Thursday, October 10, 2013, why the Court should not dismiss her case for lack of prosecution. No hearing will be held. The Court will discharge this Order upon a written statement demonstrating good cause or valid proofs of service for each Defendant. Failure to timely respond will result in dismissal of this action. (lc). Modified on 10/3/2013 (lc).
|