April 12, 2018 |
Filing
141
ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO VACATE DISMISSALS PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 60(b) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Report and Recommendation 139 Re: Plaintiff 's Request to Vacate Dismissals Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(b) is accepted. 2. The Court denies petitioner's Rule 60(b) request to vacate the dismissals in Jones v. Eller, ED CV 17-99-JLS (PLA), and Jones v. Pruette, ED CV 14-936-JLS (PLA). 3. The clerk shall serve this order on all counsel or parties of record. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (ch)
|
September 25, 2017 |
Filing
125
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Final Report and Recommendation 120 is accepted. 2. The Motion for Summary Judgment of defendants' Pruette and Ponder (ECF No. 98 ) is DENIED. 3. The clerk shall serve this Order on all counsel or parties of record. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (ch)
|
August 13, 2015 |
Filing
61
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Pursuant to this Court's Order of April 27, 2015, each party was ordered to file a Status Report no later than July 27, 2015. To date, plaintiff's Status Report has not been filed with the Court. Accordingly, no later than August 28, 2015, plaintiff is ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure toprosecute and follow court orders. Filing of the Status Report by plaintiff, on or before August 28, 2015, shall be deemed compliance with this Order to Show Cause. (es)
|
January 23, 2015 |
Filing
38
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams: Currently pending with the Court is the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint filed by defendants Pruette, Akhigbe, Leibert and Ponder on January 13, 2015. On January 16, 2015, plaintiff filed his Notice of Further Retaliation by Defendant, in which he raises serious allegations of misconduct by at least one defendant in this action. No later than February 6, 2015, defendants shall file a response to the Notice, which shall include declarations as necessary to rebut plaintiffs allegations, if defendants intend to do so. The Court will then determine what, if any, action will be taken. (es)
|
September 8, 2014 |
Filing
18
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams: On September 2, 2014, the Court received plaintiffs Motion to Receive Relief from Payment 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (Motion). Accordingly, as the Court does not have the discretion to waive th e filing fee in this action, plaintiffs motion is denied. In light of plaintiffs apparent financial difficulty however, the Court grants plaintiff a 60 day extension of time in which to comply with the Courts August 12, 2014 Order. Therefore, no la ter than November 11, 2014, plaintiff is ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the required fee. Receipt of the partial $10.00 filing fee by the Court on or before November 11, 2014, shall be deemed compliance with the Order to Show Cause. (See attached Order for details.) (es)
|
August 12, 2014 |
Filing
15
MINUTES (In Chambers) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Pursuant to this Court's Order of June 23, 2014, plaintiff was ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee of $10.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of the order (i.e., by Jul y 23, 2014). The $10.00 partial filing fee has not been received by the Court. Accordingly, NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 11, 2014, plaintiff is ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the required fee. Receipt of the partial $10.00 filing fee by the Court on or before September 11, 2014, shall be deemed compliance with this Order to Show Cause. (ch)
|