David Johnson v. Gutierrez et al
Plaintiff: |
David Johnson |
Defendant: |
Jesus Fernandez, M.D., Dep Gutierrez and Victoria Malingkas, MLP |
Case Number: |
5:2015cv00071 |
Filed: |
January 13, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Jacqueline Chooljian |
Presiding Judge: |
Dolly M. Gee |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 28, 2018 |
Filing
68
JUDGMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the Order Accepting Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge 67 , IT IS ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom)
|
April 24, 2018 |
Filing
58
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH SCHEDULING ORDER AND TO FILE STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. To date, plaintiff has failed to file a status report or to seek an exte nsion of time to do so. IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff shall show cause in writing, on or before May 8, 2018, as to why monetary sanctions or other disciplinary measures as deemed appropriate, including dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute should not be imposed for failure to file a timely status report as called for by the Case Management Order. (See document for further details.) (sbou)
|
January 16, 2018 |
Filing
52
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Dolly M. Gee for Report and Recommendation (Issued) 41 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Autho rities 32 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1) the Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; (2) Defendants shall file an Answer to the First Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order; and (3) the Clerk shall serve copies of this Order and the Report and Recommendation on plaintiff and counsel for defendants. See order for details. (hr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?